Harrigan v. New England Dragway, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-10132

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 28, 2019 at 1:29 AM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dylan Harrigan , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Alpert +1 617 227 2380 +1 617 367 8840 trepla2380@juno.com
v.
No Logo American Suzuki Motor Corporation,, Defendant
No Logo New England Dragway, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Connarton, Jr. +1 617 439 4758 connarton@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate E. McCarron +1 508 756 6288 Mccarron@burnsandfarrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duggan & Caccavaro - MA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Duggan +1 781 762 0077 +1 781 762 9299 tjd@dcclawyers.com
No Logo Judy A. Harrigan , ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Sokol +1 617 723 6500 +1 617 742 8636 david@dsokollaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Sokol +1 617 723 6500 +1 617 742 8636 david@dsokollaw.com
No Logo Ralph T. Harrigan, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Sokol +1 617 723 6500 +1 617 742 8636 david@dsokollaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Sokol +1 617 723 6500 +1 617 742 8636 david@dsokollaw.com
No Logo New England Dragway, Inc, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Connarton, Jr. +1 617 439 4758 connarton@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Connarton, Jr. +1 617 439 4758 connarton@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate E. McCarron +1 508 756 6288 Mccarron@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate E. McCarron +1 508 756 6288 Mccarron@burnsandfarrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duggan & Caccavaro - MA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Duggan +1 781 762 0077 +1 781 762 9299 tjd@dcclawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Duggan +1 781 762 0077 +1 781 762 9299 tjd@dcclawyers.com
No Logo New England Dragway, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Connarton, Jr. +1 617 439 4758 connarton@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate E. McCarron +1 508 756 6288 Mccarron@burnsandfarrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duggan & Caccavaro - MA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Duggan +1 781 762 0077 +1 781 762 9299 tjd@dcclawyers.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: 85 . At the status conference on March 4, 2015, Plaintiff produced the photograph requested by Defendant New England Drag Way, Inc.'s motion to compel. Dkt. No. 85 . Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. (York, Steve) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/7/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Status Report due by 7/6/2015 (York, Steve) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Status Conference held on 3/4/2015. The Court reviewed the status of discovery with the parties. A Scheduling order to be issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Alpert for plaintiff; Duggan for the defendant;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The Status Conference has been rescheduled for 3/4/2015 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: 74 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court grants the motion to extend discovery deadlines as set out in the amended scheduling order dated December 1, 2014. The Court will not grant any further extensions absent good cause shown. The parties are reminded that L.R. 26.1(c) limits the number of depositions to ten per side. (York, Steve) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Dylan Harrigan re 77 Order,, 81 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Plaintiff Dylan Harrigan's First Supplemental Response to Court Order. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 Order,, 78 Response to Court Order Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respnd To Court Order to November 26, 2014. (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      STATUS REPORT by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 Order,, 78 Response to Court Order Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respnd To Court Order to November 26, 2014 by Dylan Harrigan.(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Dylan Harrigan re 77 Order,, Plaintiff's Preliminary Status. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On November 14, 2014, the parties filed a joint motion to extend discovery deadlines. Dkt. No. 74 . The parties have not adequately explained why they need an additional three months to complete discovery. It appears from the parties' brief explanation that the third-party defendants have resolved their insurance coverage issue and may proceed with fact discovery. In order for the Court to adequately evaluate the parties' request to extend the fact discovery deadline, the parties shall submit the names of the remaining witnesses to be deposed and the dates of their depositions by close of business on November 21, 2014.(York, Steve) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Status Conference has been reset for 12/10/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please Note: TIME CHANGE ONLY (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Status Conference has been reset for 12/10/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please Note: TIME CHANGE ONLY (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2015 to Complete Discovery by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc..(Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to Third Party Complaint (First Amended) by Ralph T. Harrigan, Judy A. Harrigan.(Sokol, David) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Judy A. Harrigan, Ralph T. Harrigan, filed by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc..(Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On August 18, 2014, defendant New England Dragway, Inc. filed a motion to amend the third-party complaint against Ralph T. Harrigan and Judy A. Harrigan. Dkt. No. 68 . The motion is unopposed. The Court grants the motion. The defendant shall file the first amended third party complaint (attached as exhibit 1 to the motion) on or by September 12, 2014 (York, Steve) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 69 Order, by Timothy J. Duggan on behalf of New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc. filed by on behalf of New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re 68 MOTION to Amend Third-Party Complaint Against Ralph T. Harrigan and Judy A. Harrigan. Defendant's motion to amend does not contain a Local Rule 7.1 certification that counsel conferred and attempted in good faith to narrow the issues before filing the motion. Accordingly, counsel for Defendant shall comply with Local Rule 7.1 on or before August 22, 2014. (York, Steve) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Amend Third-Party Complaint Against Ralph T. Harrigan and Judy A. Harrigan by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Third Party Complaint)(Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 57 Motion to Amend 55 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to Include Language Required by 28 U.S.C. sec. 1292(b) to Allow for Appeal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery, other than expert discovery, must be completed by 12/1/2014. A Status Report is due by 12/8/2014. The Status Conference has been rescheduled for 12/10/2014 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 64 Joint Motion to Amend Second Scheduling Order Deadlines. (York, Steve) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend Second Scheduling Order Deadlines by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc..(Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Duggan on behalf of New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc. (Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Timothy J. Duggan (Duggan, Timothy) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kate E. McCarron on behalf of New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc. (McCarron, Kate) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery, other than expert discovery, must be completed byd by 7/31/2014. A Status Report is due by 8/4/2014. A Status Conference is set for 8/6/2014 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by New England Dragway, Inc. Defendant's Proposed Discovery Schedule. (Connarton, John) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Plaintiff Dylan Harrigan's Proposed Discovery Schedule by Dylan Harrigan.(Alpert, Marc) Modified on 1/23/2014 (to correct entry caption) (York, Steve). (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Amend 55 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to Include Language Required by 28 U.S.C. sec.1292(b) to Allow for Appeal by New England Dragway, Inc..(Connarton, John) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Within two weeks of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint proposal regarding the schedule for any remaining discovery, including expert discovery. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 42 Motion to Strike; granting 45 Motion to Strike; (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 49 Motion re 47 Opposition to Motion. (York, Steve) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Strike 30 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 31 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 28 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Parts of Affidavits of Dylan Harrigan, Ralph Harrigan and Pete Sullivan filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting as unopposed 20 Motion to Amend To File The Amended Complaint That Has Already Been Filed on June 7, 2013. (York, Steve) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2013 re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New England Dragway, Inc., New England Dragway, Inc. The Court heard arguments from the parties and took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Alpert for plaintiff; Connarton Jr. & Sokol for defendants;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  STATE COURT Record. (York, Steve) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION re 47 Opposition to Motion, by Dylan Harrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Dylan Harrigan Deposition transcript, # 2 Ralph Harrigan Deposition transcript)(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Opposition re 45 MOTION to Strike 41 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Chris Dittmar filed by New England Dragway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ellen Canty, # 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Ellen Canty, # 3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Ellen Canty)(Connarton, John) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Opposition re 42 MOTION to Strike 30 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 31 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 28 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Parts of Affidavits of Dylan Harrigan, Ralph Harrigan and Pete Sullivan filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition, # 2 Supplemental Affidavit of Dylan Harrigan, # 3 Peter Sullivan, c v)(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 MOTION to Strike 41 Affidavit filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Strike 41 Affidavit by Dylan Harrigan.(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Response by New England Dragway, Inc. to 27 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 . (Connarton, John) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New England Dragway, Inc.. (Connarton, John) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 30 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 31 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 28 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Parts of Affidavits of Dylan Harrigan, Ralph Harrigan and Pete Sullivan by New England Dragway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connarton, John) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Affidavit of Chris Dittmar by New England Dragway, Inc.. (Connarton, John) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ADDENDUM re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to October 8, 2013 to File Response/Reply as to 25 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (York, Steve) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to October 8, 2013 to File Response/Reply as to 25 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by New England Dragway, Inc..(Connarton, John) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to October 2, 2013 to File by Dylan Harrigan. (York, Steve) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ADDENDUM re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ADDENDUM re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ADDENDUM re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ADDENDUM re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Main Document 30 replaced on 9/27/2013) (York, Steve). (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to October 2, 2013 to File by Dylan Harrigan.(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ralph Harrigan)(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Main Document 27 replaced on 9/27/2013) (York, Steve). (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan Harrigan. (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Chris Dittmar in Support re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Connarton, John) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Connarton, John) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Connarton, John) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc..(Connarton, John) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend To File The Amended Complaint That Has Already Been Filed on June 7, 2013 by Dylan Harrigan.(Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand. (Alpert, Marc) (Modified on 6/10/2013 to Correct Docket Text As Counsel Filed the Amended Complaint Under Wrong Event In CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings are due by 6/7/2013. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/14/2013. Opposition to dispositive motions are due by 9/25/2013. A Motion Hearing is set for 10/23/2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Scheduling Conference held on 5/22/2013. The Court heard from the parties and reviewed the scheduling plan with them. A Scheduling order to be issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Alpert for plantiff; Connarton Jr. for defendant and Sokol for third party defendants;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Connarton, John) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc.. (Connarton, John) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Alpert, Marc) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D) by American Suzuki Motor Corporation, Ralph T. Harrigan, Judy A. Harrigan, New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc..(Connarton, John) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 5/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc... (Connarton, John) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Connarton, Jr on behalf of New England Dragway, Inc, New England Dragway, Inc. (Connarton, John) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Ralph T. Harrigan, Judy A. Harrigan.(Sokol, David) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Ralph T. Harrigan, Judy A. Harrigan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ralph T. Harrigan, Judy A. Harrigan, filed by New England Dragway, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farrey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Sent to Defense Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                              Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NEW ENGLAND DRAGWAY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farrey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey, III on behalf of NEW ENGLAND DRAGWAY, INC. (Farrey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEW ENGLAND DRAGWAY, INC. ( Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-4290500 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Farrey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?