J.W. et al v. Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-01369
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 8:15 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ai, Plaintiff
No Logo JW-, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane Education Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/24/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret O'Sullivan Kane +1 651 222 8611 +1 651 221 2623 mkane@kaneeducationlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of Stephen L Smith, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen L Smith +1 612 305 4355 +1 612 234 4425 smith@trial-advocate.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sellano L Simmons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sellano L Simmons +1 612 305 4354 +1 612 305 4353 slsimmons@slsimmonslaw.com
No Logo M.d, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Jayne Ropella, Defendant
No Logo Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Defendant
No Logo Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany D Krueger +1 612 373 8353 +1 612 339 4181 bkrueger@greeneespel.com
No Logo Timothy M. Olmsted, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Hashmall +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dhashmall@felhaber.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D Schwandt +1 612 373 8545 +1 612 338 0535 mschwandt@felhaber.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 448 - Civil Rights: Education
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 83 Filed: 9/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 1. Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron's Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 82 ) is ADOPTED. 2. Petitioner Margaret O'Sullivan Kane's Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs (Doc. No. 70 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and Attorney Kane is entitled to attorney fees and costs in the amount of $37,627.50. 3. To the extent necessary for Kane to collect these fees and costs, her attorney's lien is considered perfected in the amount of $37,627.50. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/13/2013. (BJS)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Settlement Conference held on 1/23/2013. Binding settlement reached. Terms stated on the record. Any transcript or copy of the audio file of the terms of settlement is CONFIDENTIAL and shall be SEALED, with access being allowed only to the parties and their counsel. (Tape #Courtroom 6B/01.23.13/17:00-17:22) (jam) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625 . (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Defendant St. Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625 is not required to produce documents labeled TOSPPS 216-219. Those documents are outside the timeframe identified in the Court's Order and the subject matter of the documents is not embraced by any of the allegations in the lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/12/2012. (jz) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          AMENDED ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE A Settlement Conference set for 1/23/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 11/28/2012. (jz) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 11/21/2012. (jz) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Compel. (See text of Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 11/21/2012. (jz) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER 1. Margaret O'Sullivan Kane's Motion to Establish An Attorney Lien [Docket No. 41 ] is GRANTED. An Attorney Lien consistent with Minn. Stat. Section 481.13 against any judgment or settlement in plaintiffs' favor is established in an amount not to exceed $56,590.00. 2. All objections by plaintiffs to the establishment of this lien are waived. 3. To the extent that the plaintiffs dispute Kane's fees, those disputes shall be arbitrated pursuant to the parties' fees agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 11/19/2012. (jz) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2012 re Motion to Establish Attorney's Lien by Margaret O'Sullivan Kane [Docket No. 41 ] GRANTED. Order to be issued. (jz) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Timothy M. Olmsted. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Margaret O'Sullivan Kane in SUPPORT OF 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by J.W. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) Modified on 11/2/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Attorney Fees by J.W. (Kane, Margaret) Modified on 11/2/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by J.W. Motion to Establish Fees and Costs (Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. 1. Plaintiffs' claims under the Minnesota Human Rights Act (Minn. Stat. ch. 363A), Count One of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Timothy M. Olmsted with each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees on this claim; 2. Plaintiffs' state law punitive damage claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants, consistent with Minn. Stat. § 549.191; 3. Plaintiffs' punitive damage claims under Section 1983 against Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625 and Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 4. Plaintiffs' official capacity claims against Jayne Ropella are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/31/2012. (BJS) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION of Dismissal by A.I., J.W., M.D., Timothy M. Olmsted, Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Dunlop, Sybil) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held before Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/26/2012. Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. No. 13 ). Submitted. Written Order Forthcoming.(Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (MMP) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2012 re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (LJG) (Entered: 10/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sellano L Simmons on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Simmons, Sellano) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for A.I., J.W., M.D.. (Smith, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                        REPLY re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dunlop, Sybil) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Margaret O'Sullivan Kane in OPPOSITION TO 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by J.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Privilege Log, # 2 Exhibit(s) SPPS Policy)(Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by J.W.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2012 re 11 MOTION to Compel. Motions taken under advisement as of September 17, 2012. Order to be issued. (jz) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625 re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy M. Olmsted. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette Bazis in OPPOSITION TO 11 MOTION to Compel filed by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Compel filed by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Compel filed by Timothy M. Olmsted. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 11 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) Modified on 9/7/2012 (akl). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 11 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Margaret O'Sullivan Kane in SUPPORT OF 11 MOTION to Compel filed by J.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9-12, # 10 Exhibit(s) A-B, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Compel filed by J.W.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 11 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-AFFIDAVIT of Margaret O'Sullivan Kane in SUPPORT OF 11 MOTION to Compel filed by J.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Index, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7, # 9 Exhibit(s) 8, # 10 Exhibit(s) 9-12, # 11 Exhibit(s) A-B, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) Modified on 9/5/2012 (akl). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Compel filed by J.W.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kane, Margaret) Modified on 9/5/2012 (akl). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 11 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Kane, Margaret) Modified on 9/5/2012 (akl). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 11 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by J.W. (Kane, Margaret) Modified on 8/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER for Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/3/12. (kt) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2012. Discovery due by 3/30/2013. Motions (non-disp) due 5/15/2013. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2013. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/2/12. (jam) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Pretrial Conference held on 7/26/2012. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (jam) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Compel Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2012 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kane, Margaret) Modified on 8/2/2012 (akl). (Entered: 07/29/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by A.I., J.W., M.D., Timothy M. Olmsted, Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625.(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 for Failure to State a Claim by Timothy M. Olmsted. (Hashmall, David) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2012 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 06/08/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(jz) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Jayne Ropella, Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625.(JME) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625, Jayne Ropella from Ramsey County. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-65497) assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil Rights-Other list referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron., filed by Saint Paul Public Schools Board of Education, Saint Paul Public Schools Independent School District No. 625, Jayne Ropella. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-Summons & Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) B-Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit(s) C-Affidavit of Service, # 4 Affidavit of Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JME) Modified on 6/8/2012 (JME). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 500 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?