Bolar v. Garcia et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00867
District Judge Nina Gershon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2016 at 9:47 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shelia Mariah Bolar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 274

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia Mariah Bolar +1 212 592 3137
v.
No Logo 1010 Wins News Radio, Defendant
No Logo Aladdin Hotel of New York City, Defendant
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Alix Pustilnik, Defendant
No Logo American Broadcasting Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Angeloyd Bolar Fenrick, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Regan, Defendant
No Logo Attorney Shelia Delaney, Defendant
No Logo Audrey Hall, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Moss, Defendant
No Logo Bernadette Ford, Defendant
No Logo Bishop James I. Clark, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Bishop Stephen Bouman, Defendant
No Logo Burnett Linton, Defendant
No Logo Cable News Network, Defendant
No Logo Captain Driscoll, Defendant
No Logo Chairman Sumner Redstone, Defendant
No Logo Circuit Executive Karen Grove Milton, Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Colonel Frank Bernelli, Defendant
No Logo Columbia Broadcasting System, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Columbia House, Defendant
No Logo Columbia Presbyterian Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Patricia L. Gatling, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Raymond W. Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Constance Elaine Fleming, Defendant
No Logo Cordella Wetherill-Brown, Defendant
No Logo County of New York, Defendant
No Logo County of Queens, Defendant
No Logo Creative Artists Agency, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Daniel O'Leary, Defendant
No Logo David N. Kelley, Defendant
No Logo Demaris Brazario, Defendant
No Logo Denise Alvarez, Defendant
No Logo Denise Rich, Defendant
No Logo Dennis M. Walcott, Defendant
No Logo Deputy Chief Allison J. Nichol, Defendant
No Logo Deputy Chief Jeanine Worden, Defendant
No Logo Deputy Mayor Daniel L. Doctoroff, Defendant
No Logo Detective Villamon, Defendant
No Logo Detective Gwendolyn Booker, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Korenstein, Defendant
No Logo Ed Hunt, Defendant
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
No Logo Executive Director Florence L. Finkle, Defendant
No Logo Gary Churgin, Defendant
No Logo Gregory May, Defendant
No Logo Harpo Productions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helen Marshall, Defendant
No Logo Helen Missale, Defendant
No Logo Helena Harris, Defendant
No Logo Honorable Alma Cordova, Defendant
No Logo Honorable Ernest Cavallo, Defendant
No Logo Honorable James Cissell, Defendant
No Logo Honorable Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant
No Logo Honorable Rolando Acosta, Defendant
No Logo Honorable Ruben A. Martino, Defendant
No Logo Investigator Camille Hughes, Defendant
No Logo Investigator Ewa Zajac, Defendant
No Logo J. Arlak, Defendant
No Logo J. Michael McMahon, Defendant
No Logo Comey, James B., Defendant
Officially listed as "James B. Comey"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2013 - May 9, 2017
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
No Logo James Finkelmeier, Defendant
No Logo Janet Reno, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrion L. Aubry, Defendant
No Logo Jerilyn Perine, Defendant
No Logo Jim Liander, Defendant
No Logo Joan Van Tol, Defendant
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant
No Logo John Bolar, Defendant
No Logo John Whalen, Defendant
No Logo John Wodatch, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Carl Fenrick, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Wilkes, Defendant
No Logo Judy Van Horn, Defendant
No Logo Kenroy Cruickshank, Defendant
No Logo Law School Admission Council, Defendant
No Logo Lee Bishop, Defendant
No Logo Louis Freeh, Defendant
No Logo Lt. Sorenson, Defendant
No Logo Lucinda-Covert Vail, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Adam Trosterman, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Alex Fengesten, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Cheryl Laffer, Defendant
No Logo M.D. David Sherman, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Dennis Peppas, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Ethan Halm, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Frank Messineo, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Gregory Johnston, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Henry Thomas Grinvalsky, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Herbert Pardes, Defendant
No Logo M.D. John Lemery, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Jonathan Shammash, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Joseph Cooke, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Lauri Romanzi, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Lorraine Pan, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Melissa Tracey, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Michael Menefee, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Natan Bar-Chama, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Nicole Iovine, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Ralph Sacco, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Ramon Jervis, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Rosemarie Carrerra, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Sabahat Bokhari, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Sarah Clarke, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Stanley Goldsmith, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn McMillan, Defendant
No Logo Mario Maltese, Defendant
No Logo Marjorie Fisher, Defendant
No Logo United States Attorney, S.D.N.Y., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mary Jo White"
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael R. Bloomberg"
No Logo Michael Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Michael Pryce, Defendant
No Logo Montefiore Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Moreen Linton, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Tse, Defendant
No Logo Myra Ames, Defendant
No Logo Natalie Sobchak, Defendant
No Logo National Broadcasting Corporation, Inc., Defendant
New York City Department Of Housing Preservation & Development New York City Department Of Housing Preservation & Development, Defendant
No Logo New York University Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo New York University Office of Public Safety, Defendant
No Logo New York-Presbyterian Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo News Corporation/Fox News, Defendant
No Logo Nina Sass, Defendant
No Logo North Shore Medical Center of Manhasset, Defendant
No Logo NYU Health Services, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Antwon, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Carbono, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Contrario, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Criscuolo, Defendant
No Logo P.O. D'Alto, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Derosalia, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Duran, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Espinal, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Janusz, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Jenkins, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Kelly, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Mecca, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Quinones, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Riley, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Stroh, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Velez, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Ward, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Wytoshynsky, Defendant
No Logo P.O. Gwendolyn McKenzie, Defendant
No Logo Paralegal Grace Kim, Defendant
No Logo Petros Solomon, Defendant
No Logo President Philip D. Shelton, Defendant
No Logo President Richard Lovett, Defendant
No Logo Pro Se Clerk Denise Cortes, Defendant
No Logo R.N. Hilary Whilby, Defendant
No Logo R.N. Stephanie Dlugacz, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca DeChabert, Defendant
No Logo Ric Wake, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD A. BROWN, Defendant
No Logo Dist Atty, NY County, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Morgenthau"
No Logo Robert Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Roberto Zapata, Defendant
No Logo Rona Richman, Defendant
No Logo Roomfinders, Defendant
No Logo Roseann McKechnie, Defendant
No Logo Roy McGown, Defendant
Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rupert Murdoch"
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Fox Corp
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney of Cincinnati, OH, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Bolar Wilkerson, Defendant
No Logo Sarah L. Shudofsky, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Garry, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Thaens, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Torres, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Cook, Defendant
No Logo Shelia Gowan, Defendant
No Logo Siobhan Berry, Defendant
No Logo Stephanie Bolar Hatcher, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Pere, Defendant
No Logo Terri Grueninger, Defendant
No Logo Thelia Bolar Allen, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Asreen, Defendant
No Logo Time Warner Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tracey Gatling, Defendant
No Logo Various Active Duty, Reserve and National Guard Security and Military Police Forces, Defendant
No Logo Various agents and employees of the U.S. Army Criminal Investigation Division, Defendant
No Logo Various Assistant Directors, Special Agents-in-Charge, Defendant
No Logo Various known and unknown Department of Housing Preservation and Development of New York City Code Enforcement Inspectors, Defendant
No Logo Various known and unknown Internal Revenue Service Employees, Defendant
No Logo Various known and unknown Public Safety Officer at New York University, Defendant
No Logo Various known and unknown U.S. Army and Air National Guard Members, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown Agents and Employees of the United States Air Force Office of Special Investigations, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown Central Intelligence Agency Employees, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department's 103rd, 105th, 113th and 115th Police Precinct, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department's 46th Precinct, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department's 6th, 25th, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown National Security Agency Employees, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown New York University Trustees, Defendant
No Logo Various unknown security guards employees of New York University Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Various Unknown United States Secret Service Agents, Defendant
No Logo Vice President Jules A. Martin, Defendant
No Logo Vito Mastaciulo, Defendant
No Logo Warner Brothers Music Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Warner-Chappell Music Publishing, Defendant
No Logo WCBS New Radio 880, Defendant
No Logo William Alllee, Defendant
No Logo William Keezer, Defendant
No Logo Zoraida Velasquez, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 13 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shelia Mariah Bolar. Appellant's motions for IFP, for Intervention and for "Release of Restitution Monies" are denied and the appeal is dismissed. Issued as Mandate: 1/16/08. USCA#07-3572. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 10 Clerk's Judgment, 9 Order, by Shelia Mariah Bolar. No Fee Paid. IFP was Revoked for purposes of an appeal. NOA served ECF. Please Note: This NOA was originally sent to the USCA & received on 8/14/07. It is then forwarded to the EDNY for proper filing. (Gonzalez, Mary) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      Letter dated 7/9/07 from Shelia Mariah Bolar to Judge Dearie, re: pltff's leave to file an amended complaint and requesting that a letter previously addressed to Judge Gershon by pltff, be made part of the docket. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        Letter dated 7/23/07 to Judge Dearie from Shelia Mariah Bolar regarding issues relating to this matter. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None
          CLERK'S JUDGMENT directing that plaintiff take nothing of the defts; that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; that pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3) any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis is denied for purpose of an appeal. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 7/25/07. c/m with appeal pkg (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: The complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal.. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 7/23/07. c/m by chambers (fwd for judgment) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: On 4/16/07, I ordered plaintiff to file an amended complaint against defendants within 30 days. By order dated 5/23/07, I granted plaintiff's request for an additional 30 days to comply with the court's order. Plaintiff now requests additional time to file her amended complaint. Plaintiff's request is granted. Plaintiff must file her amended complaint by 7/11/07, and is advised that no further extensions will be granted. In addition, plaintiff is again reminded to comply with relevant Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as set forth in the 4/16/07 order, when re-pleading her case. Failure to do so will result in dismissal. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 6/27/07. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                Letter dtd 5/15/07 To Judge Gershon by Shelia Mariah Bolar regarding the letter sent to chambers dtd 5-02-07 (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Letter dtd. 6/18/2007 from Shelia Mariah Bolar to Judge Gershon, advising she has yet to receive a response from the last letter written to Your Honor and further requesting an extension of time in which to file an amd. complaint. (Fwd. to Judge Gershon). (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Plaintiff's request is granted. Plaintiff must file her amended complaint by 6/18/07, and is reminded to comply with the relevant Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as set forth in the 4/16/07 order, when re-pleading her case. Failure to do so will result in dismissal. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 5/23/07. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Letter undated from Shelia Mariah Bolar to Judge Gershon, acknowledging receipt of Your Honor's Order dated 4/17/07, furnishing the Court with further details of his case, informing the Court that petitioner expects to file a more detailed complaint no later than 5/17/07 and supply the Court with his business voicemail #212-592-3137. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, and directs plaintiff to submit an amended complaint within thirty days of this Order. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 4/16/2007. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shelia Mariah Bolar. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against Ethan Halm, Lauri Romanzi, Frank Messineo, David Sherman, Rosemarie Carrerra, Alex Fengesten, Gregory Johnston, New York University Medical Center, North Shore Medical Center of Manhasset, NYU Health Services, Stephanie Bolar Hatcher, Denise Rich, Ric Wake, Roy McGown, Robert Shaw, Ed Hunt, Cordella Wetherill-Brown, Gary Churgin, Helen Missale, Warner Brothers Music Corporation, Warner-Chappell Music Publishing, Sarah Bolar Wilkerson, John Whalen, James Finkelmeier, Citigroup Inc., Judy Van Horn, Columbia House, Roomfinders, Mario Maltese, Gwendolyn Booker, Demaris Brazario, Aladdin Hotel of New York City, Angeloyd Bolar Fenrick, Richard Lovett, Creative Artists Agency Inc., Denise Cortes, Natalie Sobchak, Denise Alvarez, Arthur Regan, Adam Trosterman, Hilary Whilby, Lorraine Pan, Stephanie Dlugacz, Joseph Carl Fenrick, Various unknown security guards employees of New York University Medical Center, Zoraida Velasquez, John Lemery, New York-Presbyterian Medical Center, Columbia Presbyterian Medical Center, Montefiore Medical Center, Sabahat Bokhari, Ralph Sacco, Stanley Goldsmith, Joseph Cooke, Constance Elaine Fleming, Jonathan Shammash, Law School Admission Council, Sarah Clarke, Salomon Smith Barney of Cincinnati, OH, Korenstein, Lee Bishop, Daniel O'Leary, Jim Liander, Marjorie Fisher, Rona Richman, John Bolar, Bernadette Ford, Nina Sass, Tammy Pere, Allison J. Nichol, Jeanine Worden, Natan Bar-Chama, Sergeant Cook, County of Queens, County of New York, Gwendolyn McKenzie, Thelia Bolar Allen, Quinones, Driscoll, Sorenson, Petros Solomon, Siobhan Berry, Shelia Gowan, Terri Grueninger, Myra Ames, Various known and unknown Internal Revenue Service Employees, Joseph Esposito, Jeffrion L. Aubry, Janusz, William Alllee, Wytoshynsky, Frank Bernelli, Michael Pryce, J. Arlak, Garry, William Keezer, Torres, Riley, Tracey Gatling, Jenkins, Tse, Alix Pustilnik, Villamon, Espinal, Duran, Velez, Rebecca DeChabert, Gregory May, Criscuolo, Carbono, Stroh, Kelly, Ward, Antwon, Contrario, D'Alto, Mecca, Derosalia, Thaens, James B. Comey, Various known and unknown U.S. Army and Air National Guard Members, Various agents and employees of the U.S. Army Criminal Investigation Division, Various Active Duty, Reserve and National Guard Security and Military Police Forces, David N. Kelley, Henry Thomas Grinvalsky, Louis Freeh, Various Assistant Directors, Special Agents-in-Charge, Various Unknown United States Secret Service Agents, Various Unknown Central Intelligence Agency Employees, Various Unknown National Security Agency Employees, Various Unknown Agents and Employees of the United States Air Force Office of Special Investigations, Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, Patricia L. Gatling, Dennis M. Walcott, Daniel L. Doctoroff, Raymond W. Kelly, Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department, Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department's 6th, 25th, Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department's 103rd, 105th, 113th and 115th Police Precinct, Various Unknown Law Enforcement Officers of the New York Police Department's 46th Precinct, Jerilyn Perine, Michael Garcia, Vito Mastaciulo, Various known and unknown Department of Housing Preservation and Development of New York City Code Enforcement Inspectors, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, Rolando Acosta, Ruben A. Martino, Michael B. Mukasey, James Cissell, Alma Cordova, Ernest Cavallo, Robert M. Morgenthau, Sarah L. Shudofsky, Richard A. Brown, Helen Marshall, J. Michael McMahon, Benjamin Moss, Roseann McKechnie, Helena Harris, Karen Grove Milton, Thomas Asreen, Florence L. Finkle, Ewa Zajac, Mary Jo White, Camille Hughes, Kenroy Cruickshank, Audrey Hall, Joseph Wilkes, Roberto Zapata, Stephen Bouman, James I. Clark, Jr, Various Unknown New York University Trustees, Jules A. Martin, New York University Office of Public Safety, Eric Holder, Various known and unknown Public Safety Officer at New York University, Marilyn McMillan, Lucinda-Covert Vail, Sumner Redstone, WCBS New Radio 880, 1010 Wins News Radio, National Broadcasting Corporation, Inc., Columbia Broadcasting System, Inc., American Broadcasting Corporation, Inc., News Corporation/Fox News, Janet Reno, Rupert Murdoch, Cable News Network, Time Warner Corporation, Harpo Productions Inc., Joan Van Tol, Philip D. Shelton, Shelia Delaney, John Wodatch, Grace Kim, Burnett Linton, John Ashcroft, Moreen Linton, Dennis Peppas, Michael Menefee, Nicole Iovine, Melissa Tracey, Cheryl Laffer, Herbert Pardes, Ramon Jervis, Alberto Gonzales, filed by Shelia Mariah Bolar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 1,126 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?