Couch v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00045
District Judge Steve C Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 18, 2016 at 5:17 AM DT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth A. Monyak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Ahern Monyak +1 404 463 0816 +1 404 651 6920 emonyak@law.ga.gov
No Logo Nairobi Couch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mykkeltvedt & Loftin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Davis Kingsley Loftin +1 404 228 1550 +1 404 228 5568 davis@ml-llc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Norman Mykkeltvedt +1 404 228 1550 +1 404 228 5568 jeff@ml-llc.com
v.
No Logo R Roof V LLC, Defendant
No Logo Red Roof Inns, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley King LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Burke Blackwell Johnson +1 770 831 7770 johnson@buckleyking.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diem N. Kaelber +1 614 360 3956 kaelber@bucklaw.com
No Logo WHG Hospitality, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LORETTA L PINKSTON, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loretta L. Pinkston +1 404 656 3370 +1 404 651 6950 LPinkston@Law.Ga.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this action. If this matter is not reopened by the parties within sixty (60) days it will be deemed to have been dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 09/27/12. (aaq) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER REOPENING CASE: Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 08/07/12. (aaq) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 69 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
        ORDER of the Supreme Court of Georgia RE: Opinion on two questions certified to this Court. (aaq) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit to the Georgia Supreme Court a certified copy of the Court's order certifying the questions of law 66 as well as certified copies of the portions of the record indicated herein. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 12/12/11. (aaq) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to administratively close this action pending a final decision of the Georgia Supreme Court regarding the certification. This action shall be reopened by the Court on its own initiative or upon motion by a party following receipt of a notice disclosing the Georgia Supreme Courts decision. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 12/8/11. (aaq) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER CERTIFYING QUESTIONS OF LAW REGARDING APPORTIONMENT TO THE GEORGIA SUPREME COURT PURSUANT TO O.C.G.A. § 15-2-9(a) granting the 65 Motion. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 12/8/11. (aaq) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION to Certify Questions of Law Regarding Apportionment to the Georgia Supreme Court Pursuant to OCGA 15-2-9(a) by Nairobi Couch. (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE re 59 Order, Set Submission Deadline,,,, filed by Elizabeth A. Monyak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Monyak, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by LORETTA L PINKSTON. (Pinkston, Loretta) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                      REPLY BRIEF re 56 Supplemental MOTION in Limine Apportionment, 41 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Apportionment filed by Nairobi Couch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Brief Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Reply Brief Exhibit B)(Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Apportionment filed by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Nairobi Couch Rule 5.1 Notice of Constitutional Question (Loftin, Davis) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            CORRECTED ORDER: This Court hereby certifies to the Georgia Attorney General, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b), that the constitutionality of O.C.G.A. § 51-12-33 is drawn in to question in the 41 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Apportionment. The Attorney General is requested to submit his position in reference to this issue no later than NOVEMBER 4, 2011. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve the Georgia Attorney General with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 09/01/11. (aaq) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER: This Court hereby certifies to the Georgia Attorney General, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b), that the constitutionality of O.C.G.A. § 51-12-33 is drawn in to question in the 41 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Apportionment. The Attorney General is requested to submit his position in reference to this issue no later than October 4, 2011. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve the Georgia Attorney General with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 09/01/11. (aaq) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                (56) ---REDOCKETED AS--- SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in support of the 41 MOTION in Limine filed by Nairobi Couch. (aaq) Modified on 8/29/2011 to edit document link. (aaq). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                  ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- Supplemental MOTION in Limine Apportionmentby Nairobi Couch. (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/29/2011 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER allowing a supplemental briefing schedule signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 08/12/11. (aaq) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                      (53) ---REDOCKETED CORRECTLY AS --- RESPONSE to 38 MOTION in Limine filed by R Roof V LLC and Red Roof Inns, Inc. (aaq) Modified on 8/12/2011 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                        ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- REPLY BRIEF re 38 MOTION in Limine filed by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Johnson, Burke) Modified on 8/12/2011 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION in Limine filed by Nairobi Couch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (part 1), # 4 Exhibit C (part 2), # 5 Exhibit C (part 3))(Loftin, Davis) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C Jones: Pretrial Conference held on 8/5/2011. In light of the filing of plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Apportionment 41 , this matter WILL NOT proceed to trial as scheduled on August 15, 2011. The Court directed counsel for plaintiff to discuss with its client if it wishes for this Court to proceed to ruling on the motion in limine or defer ruling until such time as the Supreme Court of Georgia has ruled in a similar case. Counsel to advise the Court on Monday, August 8th. (Court Reporter Lois Phillips)(pdw) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by Diem N. Kaelber on behalf of R Roof V LLC and Red Roof Inns, Inc. (aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE Of Manual Filing by Nairobi Couch. (aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                  DEPOSITION of William Frederick (Bill) Booth taken on 12/14/10 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                    DEPOSITION of Sirin Sirinsapasitti taken on 08/18/10 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                      DEPOSITION of Michelle Ryans taken on 08/18/10 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                        DEPOSITION of James Joseph (Jay) Moyer taken on 12/03/10 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                          DEPOSITION of Vincent E. Vittatoe taken on 06/22/10 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                            DEPOSITION of Amy Odessa Karp taken on 02/15/11 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                              DEPOSITION of Lauralyn Frederickson, M.D. taken on 02/15/11 filed by Nairobi Couch.(aaq) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Apportionmentby Nairobi Couch. (Loftin, Davis) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2308 before Judge Steve C Jones. (pdw) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2011 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                      MOTION in Limine by Nairobi Couch. (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        DEPOSITION of Nairobi Devaughn Couch taken on 04/23/10 filed by R Roof V LLC and Red Roof Inns, Inc.(aaq) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Request to File Original Discovery by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc..(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing of Original Deposition by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition First Page)(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                              MOTION in Limine with Brief In Support by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Brief In Support of Motion in Limine, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Incident Report, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Incident Report, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Incident Report, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Incident Report, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Incident Report, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Incident Report, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Incident Report, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Incident Report, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Incident Report, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Incident Report, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Incident Report, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Incident Report, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Incident Report, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Incident Report, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Incident Report, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Incident Report, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Incident Report, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Incident Report, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Incident Report, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Incident Report, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Incident Report, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - Incident Report, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - Incident Report)(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE setting Trial: Jury Trial set for 8/15/2011 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C Jones. (pdw) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Consent MOTION to Continue Case from June 13, 2011 Trial Calendar by Nairobi Couch. (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2011 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE setting Trial: Jury Trial set for calendar beginning 6/13/2011 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/22/2011. (pdw) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Proposed Pretrial Order by Nairobi Couch. (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to file the Pretrial Order through and including March 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 3/17/11. (hfm) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Order by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., Nairobi Couch. (Johnson, Burke) Modified on 3/4/2011 to add plaintiff as joint filer (rvb). (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Order. It is hereby ordered that the time for the parties to file the pre-trial order in this case is extended through and including 03/07/2011. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr on 02/08/2011. (rvb) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Pre-Trial Order by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., Nairobi Couch. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Order)(Johnson, Burke) Modified on 2/8/2011 to add plaintiff as joint filer (rvb). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc..(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery is extended through and including 1/11/2011. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr. on 11/30/2010. (rvb) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        JOint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., Nairobi Couch. (Johnson, Burke) Modified on 11/12/2010 to add plaintiff as joint filer (rvb). (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Expert Report of Jeffrey H. Gross by Nairobi Couch. (Attachments: # 1 Expert Report of Jeffrey H. GRoss)(Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 11/11/2010. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr. on 09/21/2010. (rvb) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC.(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 9/11/2010. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr. on 05/11/2010. (rvb) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Proposed Order by Nairobi Couch, R Roof V LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/10/2010 to add joint filers (rvb). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nairobi Couch (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC.(Johnson, Burke) Modified on 4/1/2010 to delete interested party as filer (rvb). (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nairobi Couch (Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents) (Mykkeltvedt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC.(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER Approving 5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr. on 02/16/2010. (rvb) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED SCHEDULING ORDER Approving 5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr. on 02/16/2010. (rvb) Modified on 2/17/2010 (rvb). (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC.(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 02/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Initial Disclosures by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC.(Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Initial Disclosures by Nairobi Couch.(Loftin, Davis) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Nairobi Couch, Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC. (Loftin, Davis) Modified on 2/16/2010 to add joint filers (rvb). (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Persons by Nairobi Couch. (Loftin, Davis) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Defendants' Intention to Argue Fault of Non-Party by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC (Johnson, Burke) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC. Discovery ends on 6/11/2010.(Johnson, Burke) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number GAN20029), filed by Red Roof Inns, Inc., R Roof V LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(fap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 420 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?