Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Laminar Research, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00468-RWS

Tags
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 7:38 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
v.
No Logo Laminar Research, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator
Office Tyler
Filed 7/20/2012
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Anderson
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Cases
612-cv-00462-LED, 612-cv-00463-LED, 612-cv-00464-LED, 612-cv-00466-LED, 612-cv-00467-LED
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, LED3, PATENT/TRADEMARK
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER withdrawing Wesley Hill, T. John Ward, Jr. and Claire Abernathy Henry as attorneys for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/4/15. (mjc, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER that the clerk REOPEN the lead case and the member cases; Case reopened. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/02/15. (mll, )
      LREF
      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
      Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [45] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Steven Wayne Hartsell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/14. (mll, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014, Terminated: 10/27/2014 Withdraw as Attorney
            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 10/28/2014 (mll, ).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER STAYING CASE. This matter is hereby STAYED pending further motion of any party demonstrating good cause to lift the stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case, and this action is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. All pending motions are denied as moot without prejudice to re-filing once the stay is lifted. Any party may request the Court lift the stay for good cause, and the Court will do so only upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/06/13. (mll, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Order on Motion to Change VenueCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [18] Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv462 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. A uniform Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order shall govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and, if necessary, file objections to the previously agreed to Docket Control and Discovery Orders filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Steven Wayne Hartsell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Laminar Research, LLC (PR 3-4(a)) (Smith, Melissa)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Laminar Research, LLC (PR 3-3 and 3-4(b)) (Smith, Melissa)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Remark
                            This Civil Action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv462, which is designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings, except for venue motions, should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
                              LREF
                              Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                              ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # [38] and [39] Notice of Discovery Disclosure,. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENTS ERRORED BY ATTY.*** (mjc, )
                                LREF
                                Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # [38] and [39] Notice of Discovery Disclosure,. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENTS ERRORED BY ATTY.*** (mjc, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Laminar Research, LLC (PR 3-3 and 3-4) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Laminar Research, LLC (PR 3-1 and 3-2) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: 1/21/2013 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [18] Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                        ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/13. cc:attys 1-17-13 (mll, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013, Terminated: 1/17/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [18] Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Laminar Research, LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: 12/27/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [18] Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [29] Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Markman Hearing set for 1-30-2014 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/12. cc:attys 12-18-12 (mll, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                    Markman Hearing set for 1/30/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                      Markman Hearing set for 1/30/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012, Terminated: 12/17/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2014. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 7/26/2013. Markman Hearing set for 1/20/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. David Folsom added as mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER entered. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012, Terminated: 12/10/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Hartsell, Steven)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE by Laminar Research, LLC OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time. The Deadline to Submit Discovery Order and Docket Control Order is extended to 12-05-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12 (mll, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [20] Joint Motion to modify briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/2012. (gsg)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012, Terminated: 11/28/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File DISCOVERY ORDER and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Laminar Research, LLC, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Hartsell, Steven)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012, Terminated: 11/27/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # (1) Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012, Terminated: 8/5/2013 Motion to Change Venue
                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Laminar Research, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 10:30 AM is moved to 1:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (cwk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 10:30 AM is moved to 1:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (cwk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/12. cc:attys 10-18-12(mll, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: 10/16/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Laminar Research, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Laminar Research, LLC. (Redmond, Megan)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Answer
                                                                                            ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Laminar Research, LLC.(Redmond, Megan)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                              APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan J Redmond for Laminar Research, LLC. (pkb, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline A Bader for Laminar Research, LLC. (pkb, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric A Buresh for Laminar Research, LLC. (pkb, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft has to 10-15-2012 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/12. cc:attys 8-22-12 (mll, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012, Terminated: 8/22/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Laminar Research, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Laminar Research, LLC on 8/4/2012, by personal service; answer due: 8/27/2012. (mll, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Laminar Research, LLC., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Laminar Research, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3690187.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,857,067)(Hill, Jack)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                        Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                          Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,212 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?