BROWN v. TAPELLA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-01108-RLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 6:32 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES M. BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr & Allison PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore S. Allison +1 202 331 7600 +1 202 293 3999 tsallison@karrallison.com
v.
No Logo ROBERT C. TAPELLA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 56 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by JAMES M. BROWN ; ORDERED that the motion for summary affirmance be granted. USCA Case Number 13-5077. (md, ) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins Page Numbers: 1 - 69. Date of Issuance:May 8, 2013. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Court Reporter Email Address : rrstonestreet@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2013.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 56 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 54 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, by JAMES M. BROWN. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3236198. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Withdrawal by ROBERT C. TAPELLA re 51 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER re: Defendant's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; it is hereby, ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 31) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Exclude Exhibits (Dkt. No. 40) and Plaintiffs Memorandum to Strike or Exclude Evidence (Dkt. No. 44) are DENIED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the action against Defendant is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/1/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 53 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/1/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION to Strike 51 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (and Other Relief) by JAMES M. BROWN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                  WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 2/1/2013.....NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (McDaniel, Oliver) Modified on 2/4/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHMENT TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE OR EXCLUDE by ROBERT C. TAPELLA re 49 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First and Second Requests for Production of Documents)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                      Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION to Strike 41 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Excess of the Page Limitations Prescribed [Attachment 5, Exh. 1] filed by ROBERT C. TAPELLA. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT C. TAPELLA. (rdj) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re Summary Judgment by JAMES M. BROWN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 41 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Excess of the Page Limitations Prescribed;and ORDERED that Defendant Reply Memorandum shall be filed. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 11/9/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 40 MOTION To Exclude Exhibits filed by ROBERT C. TAPELLA. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Strike 41 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Excess of the Page Limitations Prescribed [Attachment 5, Exh. 1] by JAMES M. BROWN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                  Notice re 42 (Corrected) filed by JAMES M. BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Allison, Theodore) Modified on 10/31/2012 (rdj). (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION To Exclude Exhibits filed by JAMES M. BROWN. (Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Excess of the Page Limitations Prescribed by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Reply Memorandum, # 3 Statement of Facts (Supplemental), # 4 Declaration of Reynold C. Schweickhardt, # 5 Declaration of William T. Harris)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                        MOTION To Exclude Exhibits by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment (Additional); Defendant's shall have from Monday, October 15,2012, up to and including, Thursday, October 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/16/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment (Additional) by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment;it is hereby: ORDERED that Defendants Motion for an Extension of Time, from Tuesday, September 25, 2012, up to and including, Monday, October 15, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 9/24/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 09/22/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                  LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by JAMES M. BROWN 34 Memorandum in Opposition filed by JAMES M. BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34A, # 35 Exhibit 34B, # 36 Exhibit 34C, # 37 Exhibit 34D, # 38 Exhibit 34E, # 39 Exhibit 34F, # 40 Exhibit 34G, # 41 Exhibit 34H, # 42 Exhibit 34I, # 43 Exhibit 34J, # 44 Exhibit 34K, # 45 Exhibit 34L, # 46 Exhibit 34M, # 47 Exhibit 34N, # 48 Exhibit 34O, # 49 Exhibit 34P, # 50 Exhibit 35A, # 51 Exhibit 35B, # 52 Exhibit 35C, # 53 Exhibit 35D, # 54 Exhibit 35E, # 55 Exhibit 35F, # 56 Exhibit 35G, # 57 Exhibit 35H, # 58 Exhibit 35I, # 59 Exhibit 35J, # 60 Exhibit 35K, # 61 Exhibit 35L, # 62 Exhibit 35M, # 63 Exhibit 35N, # 64 Exhibit 35O, # 65 Exhibit 35P, # 66 Exhibit 36, # 67 Exhibit 37, # 68 Exhibit 38, # 69 Exhibit 39, # 70 Exhibit 40)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment (part 1) filed by JAMES M. BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by ROBERT C. TAPELLA re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment (rdj) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS SUPPORTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#31] by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Statement of Facts)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Dep. of James Brown), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Brooke Declaration), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Prop. Removal - 1/08), # 6 Exhibit 4 (Not. Prop. Removal - 2/08), # 7 Exhibit 5 (Ehrenfeld Dec.), # 8 Exhibit 6 (EEO Counseling Rpt), # 9 Exhibit 6A (EEO Compl - 2/15/08), # 10 Exhibit 7 (AFGE Grievance), # 11 Exhibit 8 (PIP), # 12 Exhibit 9 (Not Prop Removal - 8/08), # 13 Exhibit 10 (EEO Counseling Rpt - 9/08), # 14 Exhibit 11 (Schweikhardt memo), # 15 Exhibit 12 (Removal Approval Ltr), # 16 Exhibit 13 (Retirement SF50),(Document Unavailable due to Privacy Information) # 17 Exhibit 14 (EEO Complaint - 11/08), # 18 Exhibit 14 (Master Labor Management Agreement))(McDaniel, Oliver) Modified on 7/16/2012 (jeb, ). (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions And, Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule Modification; it is hereby:ORDERED that the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Motions due by 7/12/2012, Opposition due by 8/24/2012 and Replies due by 9/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/11/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions And, Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule Modification by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and, Second MOTION for Briefing Schedule Modification;it is hereby:ORDERED that the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Motions July 10, 2012.Opposition August 22, 2012.Replies September 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/5/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and, Second MOTION for Briefing Schedule Modification by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the procedures set forth in the attached APPENDIX A. Any party who fails to comply with these instructions risks having its filing(s) stricken, without notice.(SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/28/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and, MOTION for Briefing Schedule Modification; it is hereby: ORDERED that the following briefing schedule is established, with the same parameters asthe Court established in its April 17, 2012 Scheduling Order: Motions due by 7/3/2012. Opposition due by 8/15/2012. Replies due by 9/11/2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/28/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and, MOTION for Briefing Schedule Modification by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER: UPON CONSIDERATION of the Parties Joint Status Report, which sets forth a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule is established: Defendants Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/28/2012. Plaintiffs Opposition due by 8/10/2012. Defendants Reply Memorandum due by 9/7/2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/17/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by JAMES M. BROWN, ROBERT C. TAPELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM by JAMES M. BROWN. (Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING PRE-MOTION LETTER TO THE COURT by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Premotion Letter)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-motion Letter to the Court (Two-Day Extension);and it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have until February 23, 2012, to file a Pre-motion Letterto the Court. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/23/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-motion Letter to the Court (Two-Day Extension) by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Dispositive Motion Letter and, MOTION to Continue the Pre-motion Conference;and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Pre-Motion Conference currently set for February 2, 2012 is hereby rescheduled to March 19, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that no later than February 20, 2012, any party intending to file a dispositive motion shall first submit a letter to the Court, no longer than 1,200 words, which sets forth the claims and grounds for the motion. The non-moving party will have until March 5, 2012 to submit its responsive letter, which shall be no longer than 1,200 words. Letters in reply, if any, shall be no longer than 600 words and submitted not later than March 12, 2012. The Court will set a briefing schedule for dispositive motions at the Pre-Motion Conference. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/26/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY re 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Dispositive Motion Letter and MOTION to Continue the Pre-motion Conference filed by ROBERT C. TAPELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Dispositive Motion Letter and MOTION to Continue the Pre-motion Conference filed by JAMES M. BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Dispositive Motion Letter and, MOTION to Continue the Pre-motion Conference by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AND TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will have up to and including December 30, 2011 for both discovery and mediation; it is FURTHER ORDERED that a Status / Pre-Motion Conference is scheduled for Thursday, February 2, 2012 at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins.(SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/31/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AND TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Oliver W. McDaniel on behalf of ROBERT C. TAPELLA Substituting for attorney Christian A. Natiello (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery;and it is, FURTHER ORDERED that the current deadline for close of discovery is hereby enlarged from August 29, 2011 to October 28, 2011, and that the parties shall observe the following additional dates: A Pre-Motion and Status Conference is scheduled for November 30, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins. The parties should come prepared to discuss the merits of their proposed dispositive motions.(See Order for full details). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 8/30/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ROBERT C. TAPELLA (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. [SEE THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/28/2010. (jth) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JAMES M. BROWN, ROBERT C. TAPELLA. (Allison, Theodore) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER, Ordered that the plaintiff shall show cause in writing within 30 days of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23; and it is further ORDERED that failure to file a timely response may result in the dismissal of this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/9/10. (see order.) (kc ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT C. TAPELLA.(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/27/2010. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 2/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/1/2013. (tcb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against ROBERT C. TAPELLA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616030861) filed by JAMES M. BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?