B. et al v. Patrick et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-30073

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 4:20 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Children's Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Pitman Gretter +1 212 683 2210 egretter@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org
TERMINATED: 07/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 683 2210
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E. Polansky +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 jpolansky@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Brodin Nili +1 617 574 6489 +1 617 574 7541 rnili@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Teresa Russo - PHV +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 srusso@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily J. Grannon fox +1 617 439 2776 efox@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Persky +1 617 439 2826 +1 617 310 9826 jpersky@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Andres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Children's Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Pitman Gretter +1 212 683 2210 egretter@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org
TERMINATED: 07/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 683 2210
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E. Polansky +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 jpolansky@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Brodin Nili +1 617 574 6489 +1 617 574 7541 rnili@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Teresa Russo - PHV +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 srusso@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Persky +1 617 439 2826 +1 617 310 9826 jpersky@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Camila R., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Children's Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Pitman Gretter +1 212 683 2210 egretter@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org
TERMINATED: 07/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 683 2210
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E. Polansky +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 jpolansky@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Brodin Nili +1 617 574 6489 +1 617 574 7541 rnili@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Teresa Russo - PHV +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 srusso@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily J. Grannon fox +1 617 439 2776 efox@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Persky +1 617 439 2826 +1 617 310 9826 jpersky@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Connor B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Children's Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Pitman Gretter +1 212 683 2210 egretter@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org
TERMINATED: 07/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 683 2210
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E. Polansky +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 jpolansky@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Brodin Nili +1 617 574 6489 +1 617 574 7541 rnili@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Teresa Russo - PHV +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 srusso@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily J. Grannon fox +1 617 439 2776 efox@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Persky +1 617 439 2826 +1 617 310 9826 jpersky@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Rakeem D., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Children's Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Pitman Gretter +1 212 683 2210 egretter@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org
TERMINATED: 07/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 683 2210
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E. Polansky +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 jpolansky@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Brodin Nili +1 617 574 6489 +1 617 574 7541 rnili@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Teresa Russo - PHV +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 srusso@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily J. Grannon fox +1 617 439 2776 efox@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Persky +1 617 439 2826 +1 617 310 9826 jpersky@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Seth T., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Children's Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Pitman Gretter +1 212 683 2210 egretter@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org
TERMINATED: 07/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 683 2210
TERMINATED: 06/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica E. Polansky +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 jpolansky@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Brodin Nili +1 617 574 6489 +1 617 574 7541 rnili@childrensrights.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Teresa Russo - PHV +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 srusso@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Persky +1 617 439 2826 +1 617 310 9826 jpersky@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
v.
No Logo Angelo McClain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason B. Barshak +61772 722 00x2309 +1 617 727 3118 Jason.Barshak@ago.state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lawrence Quinan, Jr. +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5785 robert.quinan@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Spector +6177272 200 ext2076 +1 617 727 5785 amy.spector@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of Attorney General Martha Coakley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D. Bayless +1 617 963 2916 jeremy.bayless@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T. Collins +1 617 963 2312 +1 617 727 3076 jeffrey.collins@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Liza J. Tran liza.tran@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan G. Killian +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 bryan.killian@ago.state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by One Ashburton Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H. Joseph +1 617 963 2803 steven.joseph@state.ma.us
No Logo Deval L. Patrick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason B. Barshak +61772 722 00x2309 +1 617 727 3118 Jason.Barshak@ago.state.ma.us
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Lawrence Quinan, Jr. +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5785 robert.quinan@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Spector +6177272 200 ext2076 +1 617 727 5785 amy.spector@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T. Collins +1 617 963 2312 +1 617 727 3076 jeffrey.collins@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Liza J. Tran liza.tran@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D. Bayless +1 617 963 2916 jeremy.bayless@state.ma.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H. Joseph +1 617 963 2803 steven.joseph@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan G. Killian +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 bryan.killian@ago.state.ma.us
No Logo Judyann Bigby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason B. Barshak +61772 722 00x2309 +1 617 727 3118 Jason.Barshak@ago.state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lawrence Quinan, Jr. +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5785 robert.quinan@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Spector +6177272 200 ext2076 +1 617 727 5785 amy.spector@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of Attorney General Martha Coakley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D. Bayless +1 617 963 2916 jeremy.bayless@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T. Collins +1 617 963 2312 +1 617 727 3076 jeffrey.collins@state.ma.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Liza J. Tran liza.tran@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan G. Killian +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 3076 bryan.killian@ago.state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by One Ashburton Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H. Joseph +1 617 963 2803 steven.joseph@state.ma.us
No Logo Citizens Commission on Human Rights New England, Amicus
No Logo Emilie Blattman Costello, Third Party Witness
No Logo Judge Gail Garinger, Third Party Witness

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Klibaner +1 617 963 2239 +1 617 722 0184 alex.klibaner@state.ma.us
No Logo Lauren Ashley James, Third Party Witness

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L. Carter +1 617 951 8063 christopher.carter@bingham.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany J. Flaherty +1 212 705 7339 bethany.flaherty@bingham.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sujata M. Tanikella +1 212 705 7494 sujata.tanikella@bingham.com
No Logo Michael S. Greenberg, Third Party Witness

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael S. Greenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Greenberg +1 413 746 0022 +1 413 747 8044
No Logo Friends of Children, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blessed & Gifted Hands

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Aleo +1 413 584 7331 +1 617 482 4392 mealeo@yahoo.com
No Logo Jane Lyons, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blessed & Gifted Hands

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Aleo +1 413 584 7331 +1 617 482 4392 mealeo@yahoo.com
  Entries (296) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day Seven held on 2/5/2013. P-3, Lenette Lessing resumes the stand. The Court announces to the parties that the exhibits will not be placed in case file at the conclusion of the trial due to names and personal data in said exhibits. The exhibits will be returned to counsel upon conclusion of this matter. Court adjourned until 9:00 AM, Wednesday, February 6, 2013. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.)) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day Six held on 2/4/2013. P-5, Dr. Johnson resumes the stand. P-6, Professor Erik Nordheim (sworn). P-3, Lenette Lessing resumes the stand. Trial continued to 9:00 AM Tuesday, February 5, 2013. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Mail Returned
      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Bethany J. Flaherty (Paine, Matthew)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day Five held on 1/31/2013. The plaintiff's evidence continues with P-4, Raelene Freitag (sworn). P-5, Kristen Johnson (sworn). Court adjourned until Monday, February 4, 2013 at 9:00 AM. Bench Trial day six set for 2/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young., Bench Trial day seven set for 2/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young., Bench Trial day eight set for 2/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young., Bench Trial day nine set for 2/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young., Bench Trial day ten set for 2/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.). (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day Four held on 1/30/2013. The plaintiff's evidence continues with P-4, Raelene Freitag (sworn). Court adjourned until Thursday, January 31, 2013 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.)) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day Three held on 1/25/2013. P-2, Dr. Christopher Bellonci resumes the stand. P-3, Lenette Lessing (sworn). Court adjourned at 1:00 PM. Trial continued to Wednesday, January 30, 2013 at 9:00 AM. (Bench Trial Day Four set for 1/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young., Bench Trial Day Five set for 1/31/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day Two held on 1/24/2013. P-2, Christopher Bellonci resumes the stand. Court adjourned until 1/25/2013 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.)) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial Day Two set for 1/24/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Bench Trial Day Three set for 1/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Bench Trial Day One held on 1/22/2013. Openings made by plaintiff and defendant. The plaintiffs' evidence commences with P-1, Lauren Ashley James (sworn), P-2, Dr. Christopher Bellonci (sworn). Court adjourned until Thursday, January 24, 2013 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Borten, Russo for the pltfs., Tran, Collins and Barshak for the defts.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: 1/21/2013 Exhibit
                    Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List by All Defendants.. (Tran, Liza)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: 1/21/2013 Trial Brief
                      TRIAL BRIEF by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: 1/21/2013 Exhibit
                        Defendants' Amended Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List by All Defendants.. (Tran, Liza)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/19/2013, Entered: 1/19/2013 Exhibit
                          Reference Key to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by All Defendants.. (Tran, Liza)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Exhibit
                            Objections to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Exhibit List by All Defendants.. (Tran, Liza)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Exhibit
                              Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List by All Defendants.. (Tran, Liza)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 284 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Trial Brief
                                TRIAL BRIEF by All Defendants. (Tran, Liza)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [281] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Sujata M. Tanikella. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [280] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Bethany J. Flaherty. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sujata M. Tanikella Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4286620 by Lauren Ashley James. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sujata M. Tanikella)(Carter, Christopher)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bethany J. Flaherty Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4286566 by Lauren Ashley James. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bethany J. Flaherty)(Carter, Christopher)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial Day One set for 1/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Bench Trial Day Two set for 1/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Bench Trial Day Three set for 1/24/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Bench Trial Day Four set for 1/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2013. The Court inquires as to settlement. Bench trial to begin on Tuesday, January 22, 2013 at 9:00 AM. The plaintiffs have 20 trial days to complete their case. The 20 days will be interrupted only by criminal trials and civil matter Jepson v. Deutsche Bank 12-cv-11226. At the conclusion of the plaintiffs' case, the Court will break from this matter and turn to any civil jury trials on the running trial list that need to be heard. A further final pretrial conference will be held. The defense will then be given 20 trial days, the Court will again suspend for other matters and allow another 10 trial days if needed. The Court anticipates taken the matter under advisement at the conclusion of the trial. Any requests for findings and rulings shall be filed at the conclusion of the Commonwealth's case. (Court Reporter: None.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013 Pretrial Memorandum
                                              PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by All Parties. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Appendix B, # (3) Appendix C, # (4) Appendix D)(Tran, Liza)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Exhibit
                                                Supplemental Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Motion to Correct
                                                  MOTION to Correct [234] MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence Relating to the CRC Report Under the Daubert Standard and Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and [234-16] Exhibit F by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit F)(Joseph, Steven)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      Transcript of Motion Hearing held on January 10, 2013, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 2/5/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2013. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2013 re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. After hearing from the parties, the Court enters and Order denying [209] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The motion is denied, not on the merits, but as a matter of judicial economy. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Bartosz, Lowry for the pltfs., Collins, Barshak, Tran for the defts.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [258] Unopposed MOTION to Seal the Deposition Transcript of Lauren James (DOCKET No 221-1) (Paine, Matthew)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [260] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [261] Opposition to Motion, [266] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [259] Opposition to Motion, [264] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [263] Opposition to Motion, [268] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [269] Exhibit List, [257] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [267] Opposition to Motion, [258] MOTION to Seal the Deposition Transcript of Lauren James (DOCKET No 221-1), [256] Opposition to Motion, [262] Affidavit in Opposition, [265] Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                              Amended Trial Exhibit List by All Defendants.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [231] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Cathy R. Crabtree Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Opposition re [231] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Cathy R. Crabtree Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Polansky in Opposition re [233] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Christopher Bellonci Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Polansky, Jessica)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Opposition re [233] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Christopher Bellonci Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Polansky, Jessica)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Polansky in Opposition re [227] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Cheryl Haddad filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Polansky, Jessica)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Opposition re [227] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Cheryl Haddad filed by All Plaintiffs. (Polansky, Jessica)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [232] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Arburta Jones Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Opposition re [232] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Arburta Jones Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Polansky in Opposition re [223] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Individual Case Histories filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Polansky, Jessica)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Opposition re [223] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Individual Case Histories filed by All Plaintiffs. (Polansky, Jessica)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Motion to Seal
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal the Deposition Transcript of Lauren James (DOCKET No 221-1) by All Defendants.(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Rachel Brodin Nili in Opposition re [225] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Events Occurring While Class Members Were Not in State Custody filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Opposition re [225] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Events Occurring While Class Members Were Not in State Custody filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Laurence D. Borten in Opposition re [229] MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Additional Three Expert Witness Reports Submitted on November 19, 2012 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Opposition re [229] MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Additional Three Expert Witness Reports Submitted on November 19, 2012 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Laurence D. Borten in Opposition re [234] MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence Relating to the CRC Report Under the Daubert Standard and Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Opposition re [234] MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence Relating to the CRC Report Under the Daubert Standard and Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [228] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the "Hitting the M.A.R.C." Report filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Opposition re [221] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Tesimony of Lauren James filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Rachel Brodin Nili in Opposition re [230] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Lenette Azzi-Lessing, PhD, or in the Alternative to Significantly Limit Her Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Opposition re [230] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Lenette Azzi-Lessing, PhD, or in the Alternative to Significantly Limit Her Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Sara Michelle Bartosz in Opposition re [244] MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Exhibit List and Limit Plaintiffs' Use of Deposition Designations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [244] MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Exhibit List and Limit Plaintiffs' Use of Deposition Designations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: 12/28/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Exhibit List and Limit Plaintiffs' Use of Deposition Designations by All Defendants.(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [235] Opposition to Motion, [220] Exhibit List, [237] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, [231] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Cathy R. Crabtree Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., [226] Witness List, [242] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,, [229] MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Additional Three Expert Witness Reports Submitted on November 19, 2012, [219] Witness List, [225] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Events Occurring While Class Members Were Not in State Custody, [241] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [238] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [232] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Arburta Jones Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., [223] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Individual Case Histories, [236] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,, [224] Exhibit List, [233] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Christopher Bellonci Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., [228] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the "Hitting the M.A.R.C." Report, [239] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [221] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Tesimony of Lauren James, [234] MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence Relating to the CRC Report Under the Daubert Standard and Federal Rule of Evidence 702, [227] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Cheryl Haddad, [230] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Lenette Azzi-Lessing, PhD, or in the Alternative to Significantly Limit Her Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702, [222] Witness List, [240] Response. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Second AFFIDAVIT of Sara Bartosz in Opposition re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 56, # (2) Exhibit 58, # (3) Exhibit 59, # (4) Exhibit 60, # (5) Exhibit 61, # (6) Exhibit 62, # (7) Exhibit 63, # (8) Exhibit 64, # (9) Exhibit 65, # (10) Exhibit 66, # (11) Exhibit 68, # (12) Exhibit 69, # (13) Exhibit 70, # (14) Exhibit 71, # (15) Exhibit 73, # (16) Exhibit 74, # (17) Exhibit 75, # (18) Exhibit 77, # (19) Exhibit 80, # (20) Exhibit 81, # (21) Exhibit 82, # (22) Exhibit 83, # (23) Exhibit 93, # (24) Exhibit 95, # (25) Exhibit 97, # (26) Exhibit 98, # (27) Exhibit 99, # (28) Exhibit 100, # (29) Exhibit 101, # (30) Exhibit 102, # (31) Exhibit 105, # (32) Exhibit 106)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                      Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowry, Marcia)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Response
                                                                                                                        Response by All Plaintiffs to [211] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 . (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Elissa Glucksman Hyne in Opposition re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 96, # (2) Exhibit 108)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Rachel Brodin Nili in Opposition re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 12, # (2) Exhibit 53, # (3) Exhibit 54, # (4) Exhibit 55, # (5) Exhibit 67, # (6) Exhibit 76, # (7) Exhibit 84, # (8) Exhibit 85, # (9) Exhibit 88, # (10) Exhibit 89, # (11) Exhibit 92, # (12) Exhibit 94, # (13) Exhibit 103, # (14) Exhibit 104)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              First AFFIDAVIT of Sara Bartosz in Opposition re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 10, # (3) Exhibit 11, # (4) Exhibit 13, # (5) Exhibit 14, # (6) Exhibit 16, # (7) Exhibit 20, # (8) Exhibit 27, # (9) Exhibit 28, # (10) Exhibit 29, # (11) Exhibit 30, # (12) Exhibit 31, # (13) Exhibit 32, # (14) Exhibit 33, # (15) Exhibit 34, # (16) Exhibit 35, # (17) Exhibit 36, # (18) Exhibit 37, # (19) Exhibit 41, # (20) Exhibit 42, # (21) Exhibit 43, # (22) Exhibit 44, # (23) Exhibit 47, # (24) Exhibit 48, # (25) Exhibit 49, # (26) Exhibit 50, # (27) Exhibit 51, # (28) Exhibit 52)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Laurence D. Borten in Opposition re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2, # (2) Exhibit 3, # (3) Exhibit 4, # (4) Exhibit 5, # (5) Exhibit 6, # (6) Exhibit 7, # (7) Exhibit 8, # (8) Exhibit 9, # (9) Exhibit 15, # (10) Exhibit 17, # (11) Exhibit 18, # (12) Exhibit 19, # (13) Exhibit 21, # (14) Exhibit 22, # (15) Exhibit 23, # (16) Exhibit 24, # (17) Exhibit 25, # (18) Exhibit 26, # (19) Exhibit 38, # (20) Exhibit 39, # (21) Exhibit 40, # (22) Exhibit 45, # (23) Exhibit 46, # (24) Exhibit 57, # (25) Exhibit 72, # (26) Exhibit 78, # (27) Exhibit 79, # (28) Exhibit 86, # (29) Exhibit 87, # (30) Exhibit 90, # (31) Exhibit 91, # (32) Exhibit 107)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowry, Marcia)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence Relating to the CRC Report Under the Daubert Standard and Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Part 1 of 11), # (2) Exhibit A (Part 2 of 11), # (3) Exhibit A (Part 3 of 11), # (4) Exhibit A (Part 4 of 11), # (5) Exhibit A (Part 5 of 11), # (6) Exhibit A (Part 6 of 11), # (7) Exhibit A (Part 7 of 11), # (8) Exhibit A (Part 8 of 11), # (9) Exhibit A (Part 9 of 11), # (10) Exhibit A (Part 10 of 11), # (11) Exhibit A (Part 11 of 11), # (12) Exhibit B, # (13) Exhibit C, # (14) Exhibit D, # (15) Exhibit E, # (16) Exhibit F, # (17) Exhibit G)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Christopher Bellonci Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Arburta Jones Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Collins, Jeffrey) (Main Document 232 replaced on 1/3/2013) (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Cathy R. Crabtree Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Lenette Azzi-Lessing, PhD, or in the Alternative to Significantly Limit Her Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Additional Three Expert Witness Reports Submitted on November 19, 2012 by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude the "Hitting the M.A.R.C." Report by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Cheryl Haddad by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                    Pretrial Witness List Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(ii) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Events Occurring While Class Members Were Not in State Custody by All Defendants.(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Pretrial Exhibit List Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Individual Case Histories by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                            Pretrial Witness List Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(i) by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Tesimony of Lauren James by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                Pretrial Exhibit List Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) by All Defendants.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                  Pretrial Witness List Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(i) by All Defendants. (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [216] Joint Motion to Set Final Pretrial Conference. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Hearing for a Final Pre-Trial Conference by All Defendants.(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Responses are due on or before 12/24/2012. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Set/Reset Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Motions due by 12/3/2012. Ready for Trial on or after 1/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Status Conference held on 11/28/2012. The parties report status of the case. The Court sets the following deadlines: Summary Judgment motions are due on or before 12/3/2012; Responses are due 12/24/2012. A hearing on the motion(s) will be held at the January 10, 2013 motion session. The case is placed on the January 2013 running trial list but will not go forward before January 21, 2013 (Bench trial). The Court vacates any daubert or motions in limine deadlines. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Gleason, Lowry for the pltf.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [211] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , [210] Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [209] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by All Defendants.(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [204] Assented to MOTION for Discovery Regarding Expert Depositions (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 11/28/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [205] Joint Motion for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by All Parties.(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Discovery Regarding Expert Depositions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Notice of Case AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case transferred in from Western Division (Springfield) on 11/19/2012 Case Number 3:10-cv-30073. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston) (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER OF TRANSFER, this case is hereby ordered transferred to the Clerk in Boston to be redrawn to another judge. See the attached order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Order on Motion to Change VenueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting [180] Motion to Change Venue. ALLOWED. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [196] Opposition to Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by 21 Days by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [191] Emergency MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by 21 Days filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Expert Depositions ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [193] Motion Regarding Certain Expert Depositions. Endorsed stipulation to enter. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Discovery Regarding Expert Depositions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [183] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Structured Interview Materials of Defendants' Expert Witness Jerry Milner, in which Plaintiffs seek "all notes, transcriptions, or recordings of all interviews conducted by [the expert]] as part of his expert report, as well as the structured interview tool or form used by [the expert]." Insofar as it appears that Defendants have not opposed the production of the form or interview tool, if any, used by the expert, Plaintiffs' motion is ALLOWED; Defendants shall produce any such form or tool to Plaintiffs by November 9, 2012. However, Plaintiffs' motion is otherwise DENIED. Without more of a showing of substantial need on Plaintiffs' part, the court agrees with Defendants that the expert's notes, transcriptions, or recordings do not fall within the "facts or data" which must be part of the expert's report, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)(ii). As the First Circuit explained in 2004, with reference to the then-existing version of the rule ("the data or other information considered by the witness"), Rule 26, upon which Plaintiffs rely, "does not require that the expert report contain, or be accompanied by, all working notes or recordings." Gillespie v. Sears, 386 F.3d 21, 34-35 (1st Cir. 2004). There is no telling difference between the two versions of this subsection of the rule, except to make clear that the change was designed to provide "work-product protection against discovery regarding draft reports and disclosures or attorney-expert communications." Fed. R. Civ. P. 2010 Advisory Committee Note. To be sure, Plaintiffs also argue that the expert's report itself is inadequate insofar as it fails to attribute facts to the particular interviewees listed in its Appendix B. That failure, however, if failure it be, does not mandate that the expert's notes, etc. be produced as part of Defendants' Rule 26 obligations. Nonetheless, the expert, of course, should be prepared to address inquiries regarding such attributions at his deposition. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by 21 Days by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [183] MOTION to Compel Production of Structured Interview Materials by Defendants' Expert Witness Jerry Milner filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [180] MOTION to Change Venue Leave to File Granted on November 5, 2012 filed by All Defendants. (Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [187] Motion for Leave to File Reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [180] MOTION to Change Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [183] MOTION to Compel Production of Structured Interview Materials by Defendants' Expert Witness Jerry Milner by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [183] MOTION to Compel Production of Structured Interview Materials by Defendants' Expert Witness Jerry Milner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Structured Interview Materials by Defendants' Expert Witness Jerry Milner by All Plaintiffs.(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [181] assented-to Motion to Enter Stipulation and Order Regarding Expert Depositions. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Discovery Regarding Expert Depositions by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation)(Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Motion to Change Venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Change Venue by All Defendants.(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/11/2012 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: Counsel appear for Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2012. Colloquy re: status of case and current schedule. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: All motions in limine and Daubert motions due by 12/3/2012. Responses due by 12/17/2012. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered, in accord with the parties' agreement this day during the telephone conference, supplementing the existing schedule as follows: all motions in limine and Daubert motions shall be filed by December 3, 2012, with oppositions due by December 17, 2012, it being understood that the court (at the pretrial conference on December 20, 2012) will schedule a hearing on the motions in anticipation of the trial now set for January 21, 2013 (or during the four weeks following). In proposing this schedule, Defendants represented that any summary judgment motion they pursue would not entail any Daubert expert issues. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 10/10/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION Requesting a Telephone Conference Regarding the Deadlines for the Parties' Motions in Limine by Judyann Bigby, Angelo McClain, Deval L. Patrick.(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [164] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, as follows. First, Defendants' experts and their reports shall be disclosed by October 12, 2012, except those experts who will be addressing the CRC case record review reports, who shall be disclosed, etc. by October 19, 2012. Second, all expert depositions shall be completed by November 2, 2012, except the case record review experts who shall be deposed, if at all, by November 9, 2012. In all other respects, Defendants' motion is denied. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to [170] Response to Defts' [169] EMERGENCY Suppl. Memorandum in support of [164] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by November 19, 2012 and Extend All Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Collins, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/27/2012 to link to document [170]. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [170] Response to Motion for 31-Day Extension of Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines and 21-Day Extension of all Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [169] EMERGENCY MEMORANDUM in Support of [164] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by November 19, 2012 and Extend All Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara) Modified on 9/27/2012 to link to document [169], not [164]. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re [164] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by November 19, 2012 and Extend All Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by All Defendants. (Barshak, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [166] Opposition to Motion For 31-Day Extension of Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines and 21-Day Extension of all Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [166] Opposition to Motion for 31-Day Extension of Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines and 21-Day Extension of all Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [164] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by November 19, 2012 and Extend All Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [164] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by November 19, 2012 and Extend All Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by November 19, 2012 and Extend All Post-Expert Discovery Deadlines by All Defendants.(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2012 re [150] MOTION to Quash filed by Friends of Children, Inc., Jane Lyons. The court heard arguments from all parties and made the following ruling."The motion to quash is denied in part and allowed in part as follows: (1) the depositions of Friends of Children and Jane Lyons will take place at a mutually agreeable date in September; (2) defendants may schedule one separate date for each of the depositions but will make every attempt to complete both depositions in a single day; (3) the depositions will take place at the offices of the Massachusetts Attorney General in Springfield, Massachusetts; and (4) Friends of Children and Lyons' request for attorneys' fees and costs incurred in bringing the motion to quash is denied." (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Persky & Borten for Plaintiff; Joseph for Defendant; Aleo for Movant;) (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion [150] MOTION to Quash : A Motion Hearing is set for 9/7/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. If parties desire to appear by phone they should email Steve York at (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov) by the close of business on 9/6/2012, with a number you can be reached at for the hearing. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [160] Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Depositions of ACF and Emilie Blattman Costello by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Joseph, Steven) Modified on 8/24/2012 to add the word Unopposed to the text. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered, as a result of the telephone conference this day with counsel, acknowledging the parties' representation in their Joint Statement (Document No. 137) with regard to bifurcation and hereby ordering that the summary judgment motions, if any, and the trial, if necessary, shall address -- in accord with the court's revised schedule (see electronic order of May 17, 2012) -- the issues of liability only. Once the issues of liability are resolved, the parties, if necessary, shall meet and confer so as to propose protocols addressing supplemental discovery for a remedy trial. Further, the October 25, 2012 case management conference is canceled with the consent of the parties. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Motions ReferredCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [150] MOTION to Quash referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [150] MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1 of 3), # (2) Exhibit A (2 of 3), # (3) Exhibit A (3 of 3))(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER regarding Disclosure of Personal Data ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney) (Main Document 156 replaced on 8/13/2012 with the correct main document) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 8/13/2012 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [154] Unopposed Emergency Motion for Protective Order and, accordingly, withdrawing [145] Motion for Order, [149] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, and [151] Opposition. Further order to issue. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: 8/8/2012 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [152] Third -Party Witness's assented-to Motion to Defer Action and, accordingly, reserving ruling on [145] Defendants' Motion to Order Disclosure of Personal Data and [149] Third-Party's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Defer Action Pending Filing of Unopposed Emergency Motion and Proposed Order Regarding Disclosure of Personal Data re [145] MOTION for Order to Allow Disclosure of Personal Data , [149] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [145] MOTION for Order to Allow Disclosure of Personal Data by Lauren Ashley James.(Carter, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [149] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [145] MOTION for Order to Allow Disclosure of Personal Data filed by All Defendants. (Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Friends of Children, Inc., Jane Lyons. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jane Lyons, # (2) Affidavit of Attorney Michael Aleo)(Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [145] MOTION for Order to Allow Disclosure of Personal Data by Lauren Ashley James.(Carter, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Emilie Blattman Costello, All Defendants re [147] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order . (Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Emilie Blattman Costello, All Defendants.(Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [145] MOTION for Order to Allow Disclosure of Personal Data filed by Emilie Blattman Costello. (Markham, Adrienne) (Main Document 146 replaced on 7/30/2012 with correct signed document) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 7/30/2012 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to Allow Disclosure of Personal Data by All Defendants.(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [143] Defendants' assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to July 20, 2012, to Produce Non-Privileged Documents. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth) Modified on 7/9/2012 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/20/2012 to Produce Non-Privileged Documents and a Privilege Log by All Defendants.(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [141] Opposition to Motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [138] MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Response to Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by All Defendants . (Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [138] MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Sanctions by All Defendants.(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding Privilege Log, Supplementation of Discovery and Bifurcation. (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Motion Hearing held on May 17, 2012, before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond Gonsalves at 508-984-7003, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond Gonsalves. Redaction Request due 6/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 5/25/2012 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Sara M. Bartosz re Notice of Hearing on Motion for Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [132] MOTION for Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Position Statement in support of [132] MOTION for Discovery pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Joseph, Steven) Modified on 5/2/2012 to change the text to reflect the document that is being filed. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery Conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by All Defendants.(Joseph, Steven) Modified on 5/1/2012 (Jones, Sherry). Modified on 5/1/2012 to change the relief type of the motion to MOTION for a hearing. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [123] MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Access to Files for 37 Children from the Northern Region for Plaintiffs' Case Record Review filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by All Plaintiffs re [128] Opposition to Motion to Extend Court Deadlines. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Sara M. Bartosz in Opposition re [121] MOTION for Extension of Time to Move All Court Deadlines By Two Months filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [121] MOTION for Extension of Time to Move All Court Deadlines By Two Months filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [120] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [120] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [123] MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Access to Files for 37 Children from the Northern Region for Plaintiffs' Case Record Review by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [123] MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Access to Files for 37 Children from the Northern Region for Plaintiffs' Case Record Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Defendants to Provide Access to Files for 37 Children from the Northern Region for Plaintiffs' Case Record Review by All Plaintiffs.(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection by Michael S. Greenberg to Third Party Subpoena dated 4/6/2012. (Finn, Mary) (Main Document 122 replaced on 4/13/2012 with correct redacted objection) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 4/13/2012 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Move All Court Deadlines By Two Months by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Depositions ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION Enter Stipulation and Order Regarding Depositions by All Defendants, All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [116] Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies in Initial Disclosures by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [112] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies in Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [114] Response to Motion to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Case Record Review Tool by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [110] MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Case Record Review Tool filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [112] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies in Initial Disclosures filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies in Initial Disclosures by All Defendants.(Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [110] MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Case Record Review Tool filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Case Record Review Tool by All Defendants.(Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Potentially Privileged Documents ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [106] Response to Motion for Extension of Time, with attachments by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [106] Response to Motion for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [104] MOTION for Extension of Time to deadlines for the case record review MOTION to Continue to the trial date filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (Western Division only)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE issued to Attorney Elizabeth Pitman Gretter and Sarah Russo regarding mandatory registration and use with ECF in compliance with the Standing Order entered by Judge Ponsor and Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to extend deadlines for the case record review, MOTION to Continue the trial date by All Defendants.(Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth Pitman Gretter and Sarah Russo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3822695 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Elizabeth Pitman Gretter, # (2) Affidavit of Sarah Russo)(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Bayless on behalf of All Defendants (Bayless, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Joseph on behalf of All Defendants (Joseph, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [96] MOTION Addressing Defendants' Refusal to Comply with this Court's Orders MOTION for Hearing and Conditional CROSS MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines, Including the Trial Date filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by All Plaintiffs re [97] Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [96] MOTION Addressing Defendants' Refusal to Comply with this Court's Orders by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [96] MOTION Addressing Defendants' Refusal to Comply with this Court's Orders filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Addressing Defendants' Refusal to Comply with this Court's Orders and MOTION for a hearing by All Plaintiffs.(Bartosz, Sara). Added an additional relief - MOTION for Hearing on 2/17/2012 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Potentially Privileged Documents by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barshak, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2012: # (1) Correct Main Document, # (2) Proposed Protective Order) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 2/16/2012 to delete the duplicate of the main document which was added as an attachment and to separate the proposed protective order from the main document and to add it as an attachment. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Case Management Conference held on January 11, 2012, before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: None. Digital Recording transcribed by Karen Aveyard at 978-466-9383. Redaction Request due 2/24/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED, cc:cl. By 1/25/12, Ds to provide Ps with the two lists discussed at the conference; by 2/1/12, Ps shall inform Ds in writing of the sample lists Ps wish to use in their case record review; all remaining fact disc., except for the case record review, compl. by 4/30/12; Ds compl. prod. of the records for Ps' case record review (at a rate of approximately 30 per week) by 5/31/12; Ps expert discl by 7/13/12; Ds' expert discl by 8/29/12; expert depos compl by 9/28/12; case management conference set before the undersigned on 10/2/12 at 10:00 a.m. (the 8/3/12 conference is canceled); Ds' S/J motion, if any, by 10/26/12; Ps' opp to S/J motion by 11/16/12l hearing on any motion for S/J set for 11/28/12 at 2:00 p.m., at which time the court will also hold a Final Pretrial Conference before Judge Michael A. Ponsor; Jury Trial set for 1/7/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor.(Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [91] Joint submission of Sara Michelle Bartosz by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F (1 of 3), # (7) Exhibit F (2 of 3), # (8) Exhibit F (3 of 3))(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by All Plaintiffs.(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Judyann Bigby, Angelo McClain, Deval L. Patrick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to extend scheduling order deadlines by six months , MOTION to Modify scheduling order deadlines ( Responses due by 1/20/2012) by Judyann Bigby, All Defendants, Angelo McClain, Deval L. Patrick.(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION for a scheduling conf. on 1/11/2012 by All Parties.(Collins, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/27/2011 to make this document a pending motion, not a joint submission. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second AFFIDAVIT of Sara Michelle Bartosz in Support re [81] MOTION to Compel Production of Data and Case Records for Expert Review MOTION for Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [81] MOTION to Compel Production of Data and Case Records for Expert Review MOTION for Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by All Plaintiffs.(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [81] MOTION to Compel Production of Data and Case Records for Expert Review MOTION for Hearing filed by All Defendants. (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Sara Michelle Bartosz in Support re [81] MOTION to Compel Production of Data and Case Records for Expert Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [81] MOTION to Compel Production of Data and Case Records for Expert Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Production of Data and Case Records for Expert Review by All Plaintiffs.(Nili, Rachel). Added an additional relief - MOTION for Hearing on 11/25/2011 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [76] MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time and Request for 16.3 Case Management Conference filed by Judyann Bigby, All Defendants, Angelo McClain, Deval L. Patrick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Defendants Motion to Decertify the Plaintiffs Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c), (Dkt. No. [66]), is hereby DENIED. Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on their Motion to Decertify the Class, (Dkt. No. [67]), is also hereby DENIED, as moot. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Sara M. Bartosz in Support re [76] MOTION to Compel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [76] MOTION to Compel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for additional time to conduct depositions and MOTION to Compel by All Plaintiffs.(Borten, Laurence). Added an additional relief - MOTION for Extension of Time on 11/7/2011 due to the motion contains two reliefs. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (Western Division only)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE issued to Attorney Jessica Elyse Polansky regarding mandatory registration and use with ECF in compliance with the Standing Order entered by Judge Ponsor and Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica Elyse Polansky Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3635203 by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Jessica Elyse Polansky)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 12, 2011, before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086 Redaction Request due 11/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [67] MOTION to Stay re [66] MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class (Stay Class-Based Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Decertify) MOTION to Stay re [66] MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class (Stay Class-Based Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Decertify) MOTION to Stay re [66] MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class (Stay Class-Based Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Decertify) Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Connor B., Rakeem D., All Plaintiffs, Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [66] MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class filed by Connor B., Rakeem D., All Plaintiffs, Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Susan Lambiase filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [66] MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class filed by All Defendants. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Discovery pending ruling re [66] MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class (Stay Class-Based Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Decertify) by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of James Dehnke in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Class-Based Discovery Pending a Ruling on their Motion to Decertify the Plaintiff Class)(Quinan, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2011 to correct the text. (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 67 replaced on 9/7/2011 with correct signed main document) (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to to Decertify the Plaintiff Class by All Defendants. (Quinan, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2011 to delete the memorandum that was an attachment and to docket it separately (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER Appointing Next Friend, ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPOINTING NEXT FRIENDS by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER entered.(Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: 6/16/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Judyann Bigby, Angelo McClain, Deval L. Patrick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Protective Order)(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Collins on behalf of All Defendants (Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Michael A. Ponsor: PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED, cc:cl. All fact discovery, including no more than 20 non-expert depos per side, compl by 3/30/12; Ps' expert discl by 5/15/12; Ds' expert discl by 6/29/12; expert depos compl by 7/31/12; Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 at 2:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; Ds' S/J motion due 8/24/11; Ps' opp to Ds' motion by 9/14/12, with Ds' reply by 9/21/12; hearing on any S/J motions set for 10/10/12 at 2:00 p.m. before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2012 at 2:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor; Jury Trial set for 1/7/2013 at 9:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Liza J. Tran on behalf of All Defendants (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Barshak on behalf of All Defendants (Barshak, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by All Plaintiffs re [55] Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Borten, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by All Parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 16.1(D)(3) Cert - Connor B., # (2) Exhibit 16.1(D)(3) Cert - Adam S., # (3) Exhibit 16.1(D)(3) Cert - Camila R., # (4) Exhibit 16.1(D)(3) Cert - Andre S., # (5) Exhibit 16.1(D)(3) Cert - Rakeem D.)(Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED, cc:cl. Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2011 at 10:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint statement and LR 16.1 cert by 3/24/11. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Order on Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel (Dkt No. [2]) is hereby ALLOWED. This case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by All Defendants.(Tran, Liza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on February 4, 2011, before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086 Redaction Request due 3/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2011. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan G. Killian on behalf of All Defendants (Killian, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to February 11, 2011 to File Answer by All Defendants.(Killian, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Michael A Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Defendant Patricks Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. [17]) and Defendants Motion to Dismiss(Dkt No. [18]) are hereby DENIED in their entirety. Due to time constraints, the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss left inadequate time for argument regarding Plaintiffs pending Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. No. 2). The clerk will set a date for further argument on this motion. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Motion Hearing held on November 23, 2010, before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086 Redaction Request due 12/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2011. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re [39] Reply to Response to Motion of Sara Bartosz by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to [2] MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Leave to File Granted 11/18/10) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Motion re [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Leave to file granted on 11/17/2010) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Reply Memorandum in Support of Class Certification, # (2) Affidavit of Sara Michelle Bartosz, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [17] MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Corrected Version) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) DCF Policy # 86-011)(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Brodin Nili on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nili, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion to Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Correct [30] Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Motion to File Corrected Version of Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint) by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Version -- Reply Memorandum, # (2) DCF Policy # 86-011)(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [2] MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Walter Affidavit), # (2) Exhibit B (Killian Affidavit with Pearson depo testimony attached), # (3) Exhibit C (Clauson depo transcript excerpts), # (4) Exhibit D (Sullivan depo transcript excerpts), # (5) Exhibit E (Ferreira Affidavit))(Quinan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Document No. 4, by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # (2) Exhibit A to Defs' Class Cert Oppo (Walter Affidavit), # (3) Exhibit B to Defs' Class Cert Oppo (Killian Aff. w/ Pearson testimony), # (4) Exhibit C to Defs' Class Cert Oppo (Clauson depo trnscrpt excerpts), # (5) Exhibit D to Defs' Class Cert Oppo (Sullivan depo trnscrpt excerpts), # (6) Exhibit E to Defs' Class Cert Oppo (Ferreira Affidavit))(Quinan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum in response to the Pltfs' oppositions to their [17], & [18] motions to dismiss filed by All Defendants. Reply Memorandum (Leave to File Granted on 11/4/10). (Attachments: # (1) DCF Policy # 86-011)(Spector, Amy) Modified on 11/5/2010 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Reply Memorandum, # (2) DCF Policy #86-011)(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [17] MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Leave to File Granted 10/14/2010) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2007 Review, # (2) Exhibit State Improvement Plan, # (3) Appendix Massachusetts Trial Court Rules, Uniform Rules for Permanency Hearings, # (4) Appendix Table of Authorities)(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [17] MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [17] MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs.(Bartosz, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/30/2010 to File Response/Reply as to [17] MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by All Plaintiffs.(Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Amy Spector, A.A.G. for Purpose of Filing Table of Authorities in Connection with Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [18] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: 2007 CFSR Report, # (2) Exhibit B: Program Improvement Plan, # (3) Legal Addendum: Court Rules)(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants.(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by All Defendants.(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor by Deval L. Patrick.(Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Spector on behalf of All Defendants (Spector, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information by All Parties. (Quinan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re [2] MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel ; Stipulation Concerning Initial Rule 23 Discovery and Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by All Parties, All Defendants, All Plaintiffs. (Quinan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to August 20, 2010 to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Deval L. Patrick, Judy Ann Bigby and Angelo McClain .(Quinan, Robert) Modified on 6/30/2010 to add Judy Ann Bigby and Angelo McClain as filers. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Quinan, Jr on behalf of Deval L. Patrick, Judyann Bigby and Angelo McClain. (Quinan, Robert) Modified on 6/30/2010 to add Judyann Bigby and Angelo McClain's names to the text. (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Angelo McClain served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/22/2010) (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Judyann Bigby served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Deval L. Patrick served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Angelo McClain served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Judyann Bigby served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Deval L. Patrick served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Persky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (Western Division only)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE issued to Attorney Kara Morrow, Laurence Borton, Marcia Robinson Lowry, Sara Michelle Bartosz, Susan Lambiase regarding mandatory registration and use with ECF in compliance with the Standing Order entered by Judge Ponsor and Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Marcia Robinson Lowry)(Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marcia Robinson Lowry, Susan Lambiase, Sara Michelle Bartosz, Laurence D. Borten, and Kara Morrow Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 0101-2866706 by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Affidavit, # (5) Affidavit)(Gleason, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: Added MOTION to Appoint of Class Counsel on 4/15/2010 (Finn, Mary). Modified on 4/15/2010 (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-2866458 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, # (2) Category Form)(Gleason, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2010) (Finn, Mary).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?