Silverstein v. Imperium Partners Group, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00464
Magistrate Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 11:38 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Robert Silverstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Creizman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Creizman +1 212 972 0200 +1 646 200 5022 ecreiz@creizmanllc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Johnston Polisi +1 212 972 0200 +1 646 200 5022 cpolisi@creizmanllc.com
v.
No Logo Imperium Advisers, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Imperium GP, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Imperium Partners Group, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Imperium Specialty Finance Fund, L.P., Defendant
No Logo John C. Michaelson, Defendant
No Logo WeiserMazars LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira George Greenberg +1 212 308 4411 +1 212 308 4844 igreenberg@eapdlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                Corporate Disclosure Statement by WeiserMazars LLP (Greenberg, Ira) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ira George Greenberg on behalf of WeiserMazars LLP (aty to be noticed) (Greenberg, Ira) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                      FILING FEE: $ 350.00, receipt number Agency Tracking ID: (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/2013, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Robert Silverstein. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 279 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?