Blackstone River, LLC v. eHarmony, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00519-DF
District Judge David Folsom, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 2:27 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Blackstone River, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Eharmony, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Hult +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mhult@orrick.com
No Logo Humor Rainbow, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob K Baron +1 617 305 2102 +1 617 523 6850 jacob.baron@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Match.com, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob K Baron +1 617 305 2102 +1 617 523 6850 jacob.baron@hklaw.com
Space Jacob K Baron +1 617 305 2102 +1 617 523 6850 jacob.baron@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
v.
No Logo Eharmony, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Hult +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mhult@orrick.com
No Logo Humor Rainbow, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob K Baron +1 617 305 2102 +1 617 523 6850 jacob.baron@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2011 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Match.com, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob K Baron +1 617 305 2102 +1 617 523 6850 jacob.baron@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Matrima, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Plentyoffish Media Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher Hall & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Christopher Hall chrishall@halliplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Truebeginnings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carstens & Cahoon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Vincent Jerome Allen +1 972 367 2001 +1 972 367 2002 allen@cclaw.com
No Logo Blackstone River, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Eharmony, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Hult +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mhult@orrick.com
Office Marshall
Filed 11/30/2010
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/4/2011
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: 10/4/2011 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, eHarmony Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (mrm, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, granting [103] Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plentyoffish Media Inc, Blackstone River LLC. Plentyoffish Media Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (mrm, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, granting [106] Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Humor Rainbow Inc, Blackstone River LLC. Humor Rainbow Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/11. (mrm, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, granting [105] Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Match.com LLC, Match.Com LLC, Blackstone River LLC. Match.com LLC terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/11. (mrm, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011, Terminated: 9/30/2011 Motion to Dismiss
          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Blackstone River LLC, Humor Rainbow Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011, Terminated: 9/30/2011 Motion to Dismiss
            Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Blackstone River LLC, Match.com LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion to Dismiss
              Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by eHarmony Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011, Terminated: 10/3/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Blackstone River LLC, Plentyoffish Media Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [101] Motion to Extend Deadline to provide initial disclosures pursuant to paragraph 1 of the Court's Discovery Order of August 29, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/21/11. (mrm, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/20/2011, Terminated: 9/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Serve Initial Disclosures by Blackstone River LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [99] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/14/11. (mrm, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011, Terminated: 9/14/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Serve Initial Disclosures by eHarmony Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Blackstone River LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Smith, Melissa)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER:( Joinder of Parties due by 12/5/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2012.), (Tutorial set for 2/29/2012 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Markman Hearing set for 3/1/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Jury Selection set for 10/2/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/29/11. (mrm, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                              DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/29/11. (mrm, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                NOTICE of CANCELLATION: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/11 at 10:00 am is Cancelled. (mrm, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [92] MOTION to Dismiss Humor Rainbow, Inc.'s and Match.com, LLC's Pleadings filed by Humor Rainbow Inc, Match.com LLC. (Baron, Jacob)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [80] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Dkt 75 - First Amended Complaint] filed by Plentyoffish Media Inc. (Jones, Michael)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss Humor Rainbow, Inc.'s and Match.com, LLC's Pleadings by Blackstone River LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [80] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Dkt 75 - First Amended Complaint] filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Response to Non-Motion
                                            RESPONSE to [83] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendant eHarmony, Inc. by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Response to Non-Motion
                                              RESPONSE to [82] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Match.com, LLC by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Response to Non-Motion
                                                RESPONSE to [81] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Humor Rainbow, Inc. by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Response to Non-Motion
                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***RESPONSE to [81] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Humor Rainbow, Inc. by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/14/2011 (ehs, ).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING [85] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Blackstone River LLC, Matrima Inc terminated as dft.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/14/2011. (sm, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 87, Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011, Terminated: 7/14/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blackstone River LLC (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2011 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/28/11. (mrm, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                            Defendant eHarmony, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Blackstone River, LLC's First Amended Complaint ANSWER to [75] Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against eHarmony Inc by eHarmony Inc.(Hult, Matthew)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                              ANSWER to [75] Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Blackstone River LLC by Match.com LLC.(Gardner, Allen)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                ANSWER to [75] Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Blackstone River LLC by Humor Rainbow Inc.(Gardner, Allen)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Dkt 75 - First Amended Complaint] by Plentyoffish Media Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Markus Frind, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [61] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plentyoffish Media Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Markus Frind)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [76] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 6/17/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/14/11. (ehs, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Hall for Plentyoffish Media Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-3655) (ehs, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011, Terminated: 6/14/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [61] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plentyoffish Media Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) (Re-filed) (Corrected) against Humor Rainbow Inc, Match.com LLC, Plentyoffish Media Inc, eHarmony Inc, filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) (Re-filed) against Humor Rainbow Inc, Match.com LLC, Plentyoffish Media Inc, eHarmony Inc, filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/10/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 74, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 72, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [71] Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/6/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Humor Rainbow Inc, Match.com LLC, Matrima Inc, Plentyoffish Media Inc, eHarmony Inc, filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/10/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011, Terminated: 6/6/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Blackstone River LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [61] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [55] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE to [54] Answer to Complaint - Blackstone River's Response to Match.com's Counterclaims by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of eHarmony Inc (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [55] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by eHarmony Inc. (Von der Ahe, Christina)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER, granting [64] Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, Peter J..Brann, David Swetnam-Burland, and Stacy O. Stitham filed by Humor Rainbow Inc. Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth and Peter J Brann terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/16/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011, Terminated: 5/16/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, Peter J..Brann, David Swetnam-Burland, and Stacy O. Stitham by Humor Rainbow Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Bauer on behalf of Humor Rainbow Inc (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob K Baron on behalf of Humor Rainbow Inc (Baron, Jacob)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plentyoffish Media Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Marcus Frind, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Answer
                                                                                                              Amended ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Blackstone River LLC by Match.com LLC.(Baron, Jacob)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob K Baron on behalf of Match.com LLC (Baron, Jacob)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Bauer on behalf of Match.com LLC (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [55] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eHarmony Inc (Von der Ahe, Christina)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by eHarmony Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Von der Ahe, Christina)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by Match.com LLC.(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match.com LLC (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by Match.com LLC.(Gardner, Allen) Modified on 4/15/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTY Document # 52, Dft's Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [50] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; MATCH.COM, LLC be given to and including April 15, 2011 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/13/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                    Answer Due Deadline Updated for Match.com LLC to 4/15/2011. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony Inc to 4/15/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011, Terminated: 4/13/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by Match.com LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony Inc.( Hult, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [46] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Blackstone River LLC, True Beginnings LLC terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony Inc.( Hult, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011, Terminated: 3/25/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blackstone River LLC (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony Inc to 4/11/2011. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [44] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; MATCH.COM, LLC answer due 4/11/11. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/23/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                      Answer Due Deadline Updated for Match.com LLC to 4/11/2011. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011, Terminated: 3/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Match.com LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; MATCH.COM, LLC be given to and including April 15, 2011 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/16/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [40] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; True Beginnings, LLC shall have up to and including April 11, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/16/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                              Answer Due Deadline Updated for Match.com LLC to 4/15/2011; True Beginnings LLC to 4/11/2011. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011, Terminated: 3/16/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Match.com LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011, Terminated: 3/16/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  Sixth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by True Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blackstone River LLC. Plentyoffish Media Inc waiver sent on 2/9/2011, answer due 4/11/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant True Beginnings, LLC shall have up to and including March 15, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/3/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Due Deadline Updated for True Beginnings LLC to 3/15/2011. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011, Terminated: 3/3/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                          Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by True Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; True Beginnings, LLC shall have up to and including March 1, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/28/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony Inc.( Hult, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Match.com LLC.( Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony Inc to 3/15/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Match.com LLC to 3/15/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011, Terminated: 3/1/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                      Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by True Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [20] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Humor Rainbow, Inc. by Blackstone River LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackstone River LLC. Matrima Inc served on 2/5/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 2/28/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re True Beginnings LLC.( Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Plentyoffish Media Inc. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011, Terminated: 2/3/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by True Beginnings LLC. (Allen, Vincent) Modified on 2/3/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Humor Rainbow Inc identifying Corporate Parent Match.Com LLC for Humor Rainbow Inc. (Stitham, Stacy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for True Beginnings LLC to 2/22/2011. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 28, Third Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony Inc.( Hult, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED (different address) as to Matrima Inc. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony Inc to 3/1/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including March 1, 2011 re Match.com LLC. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Match.com LLC to 3/1/2011. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J Brann on behalf of Humor Rainbow Inc (Brann, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Humor Rainbow Inc (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Asher Swetnam-Burland on behalf of Humor Rainbow Inc (Swetnam-Burland, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Blackstone River LLC by Humor Rainbow Inc.(Stitham, Stacy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant True Beginnings, LLC shall have up to and including February 4, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/24/11. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Due Deadline Updated for True Beginnings LLC to 2/4/2011. (mrm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011, Terminated: 1/24/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by True Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackstone River LLC. Humor Rainbow Inc served on 12/21/2010 by CM RRR c/o Sam Yagan, answer due 1/11/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Match.com LLC (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: 12/28/2010 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Returned Unexecuted by Blackstone River LLC as to Plentyoffish Media Inc. stating "moved unable to forward" per postal service (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: 12/27/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Plentyoffish Media Inc. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Match.com LLC to 2/1/2011. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including February 1, 2011 re Match.com LLC. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackstone River, LLC. Match.com, LLC served on 12/3/2010 by CM RRR c/o National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 12/27/2010. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackstone River, LLC. True Beginnings, LLC served on 12/1/2010, answer due 1/21/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackstone River, LLC. eHarmony, Inc. served on 12/3/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Service Co, answer due 2/1/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackstone River, LLC. Matrima, Inc. served on 12/3/2010 by CM RRR c/o Scraff & Wilson PLLC, answer due 12/27/2010. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Returned Unexecuted by Blackstone River, LLC as to Humor Rainbow, Inc.. not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re True Beginnings, LLC.( Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent Jerome Allen on behalf of True Beginnings, LLC (Allen, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Humor Rainbow, Inc.. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for True Beginnings, LLC to 1/21/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony, Inc..( Hult, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony, Inc. to 2/1/2011. 40 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Humor Rainbow, (Attachments: # (1) Match.com LLC, # (2) Matrima Inc, # (3) Plentyoffish Media Inc, # (4) Truebeginnings LLC, # (5) eHarmony Inc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blackstone River, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vertigo Holding, LLC for Blackstone River, LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Original Complaint - against Humor Rainbow, Inc., Match.com, LLC, Matrima, Inc., Plentyoffish Media, Inc., True Beginnings, LLC, eHarmony, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2779861.), filed by Blackstone River, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,184,968, # (3) Exhibit B - US Patent No. 7,725,347)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Magistrate Availability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Judge David Folsom. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?