EEOC v. Amalgamated Sugar Co

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00378
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 2:08 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Equal Employment Opportunity Commission"

Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zulema Hinojos-Fall +1 206 220 6883
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley Katahira +1 206 220 6918 +1 206 220 6911 wesley.katahira@eeoc.gov
TERMINATED: 11/29/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Luis Lucero, Jr. +1 206 220 6878 +1 206 220 6911 luis.lucero@eeoc.gov
v.
No Logo Amalgamated Sugar Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Candy W Dale +1 208 336 5193

Represented by Givens Pursley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Blaine White +1 208 388 1200 +1 208 388 1300 rbw@givenspursley.com

Represented by LAW OFFICES OF TERRY L. GODDARD JR. PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John McDonagh +1 208 323 1003 mmcdonagh@q.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (170) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBIT RELEASE FORM to counsel for def w/attached exhibit list (ks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBIT RELEASE FORM to counsel/pla EEOC (ks) Modified on 2/26/2008 (ks). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2008: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Demonstrative Exhibit Index, # 3 Impeachment Exhibit Index) (ks).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Zulema Hinojos-Fall re: 167 Return of Exhibits (ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Return of Exhibits (ks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: None
MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals dismissing the appeal [164-1], dismissing the appeal [153-1] (rr)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: None
ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion to stay the Courts judgment awarding costs pending appeal [162-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff EEOC from Dist. Court decision [161-2] (Receipt # Fees Not Paid - Government Agency) (rr) (Entered: 01/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion to stay the Courts judgment awarding costs pending appeal [162-1] (wm) (Entered: 11/17/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/11/2001
MOTION by pla to stay the Courts judgment awarding costs pending appeal (wm) (Entered: 11/17/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: None
JUDGMENT: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle Judgment for def in the amount of $ 5,479.85; terminating case (cc: all counsel) (JUDGMENT SCANNED) (dkh)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle denying motion for attorney fees [143-1] granting in part and denying in part bill of costs [155-1], dft shall be awarded costs in the amount of $5,479.85 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 10/26/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: None
ORDER of the 9th Circuit granting Court Reporter Vicki Jones's Motion for Extension of time to file transcripts. (rr) Modified on 12/04/2000 (Entered: 10/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Record; cc: attys, 9CCA (rr)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Wesley Katahira in support of memorandum [156-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in opposition to amended bill of costs [155-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None
AMENDED BILL OF COSTS by def re judgment [142-2] ; Taxation ddl set for 10/17/00 (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form - Transcripts Necessary 5/1/00, 5/1-10/00, 5/11/00, 4/24/00 (rr) (Entered: 08/09/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff EEOC from Dist. Court decision [142-2] (Receipt # Fees Not Applicable - Government Agency) (rr) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None
REPLY by def to memorandum in opposition to bill of costs [149-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None
REPLY by def to response to motion for attorney fees [143-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Wesley Katahira in support of memorandum [149-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in opposition to bill of costs [146-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Wesley Katahira in support of memorandum in opposition to petition for atty fees [147-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in opposition re: motion for attorney fees [143-1] (wm) (Entered: 06/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None
BILL OF COSTS by def re judgment [142-2] ; Taxation ddl set for 6/14/00 (wm) (Entered: 05/26/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Candy W. Dale in support of dfts motion for attorney fees [143-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/26/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by def in support of motion for attorney fees [143-1] (wm) Modified on 05/26/2000 (Entered: 05/26/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by def for attorney fees (wm) Modified on 05/26/2000 (Entered: 05/26/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: None
JUDGMENT: Judgment that pla take nothing against dft and that dfts recover from pla the costs of action; dismissing case (cc: all counsel) (JUDGMENT SCANNED) (wm) (Entered: 05/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: None
JURY INSTRUCTIONS (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 05/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: None
PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (wm) (Entered: 05/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: None
SPECIAL VERDICT FORM (wm) (Entered: 05/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL FINAL DAY NINE - plas written rule 50 motion orally denied and dfts oral renewed rule 50 motion orally denied, denying motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1], denying motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1], finding moot the motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2], denying motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3], finding moot the motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4], denying motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [111-1], finding moot the motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records excerpts [114-1] LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/12/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion for judgment as a matter of law as to dfts bona fide occupational qualification defense [136-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/11/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for judgment as a matter of law as to dfts bona fide occupational qualification defense (wm) (Entered: 05/11/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY EIGHT - LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/11/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY SEVEN - granting in part and denying in part dfts oral motion rule 50 motion [134-1] LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM BY DFTS re: emotional distress damages (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM of law by pla in support of its argument that objective evidence is not required for emotional damage awards under title VII (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY SIX - LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY FIVE - LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY FOUR - LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY THREE - LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Dan Taylor served on 5/2/00 (wm) (Entered: 05/03/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY TWO - LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL DAY ONE - jury trial began LMB (wm) (Entered: 05/02/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: None
STATEMENT by pla in support of supplemental jury instructions [117-1] (wm) (Entered: 05/02/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: None
SECOND SET OF REVISED SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INTRUCTIONS by def [108-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle denying motion in limine precluding certain evidence [50-1], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4], deferred ruling on motion in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual [71-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
NOTICE by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle of trial schedule and location, trial is set for 5/1/00 (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle granting motion in limine precluding certain [50-1], granting motion to exclude certain witnesses [51-1], granting motion for order denying dfts proposed order [61-1], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1], denying motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3], deferred ruling on motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4], deferred ruling on motion in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual [71-1], denying motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [98-1], granting motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records exception [101-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 04/28/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS by pla to dfts voir dire [84-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/28/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: None
RESPONSE by def to motion plas in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records excerpts [114-1], motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [111-1], motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records exception [101-1], motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [98-1], motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1], motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2], motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3], motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4], motion in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual [71-1], motion for order denying dfts proposed order [61-1], motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/28/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS by pla re jury [97-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Zulema Hinojos-Fall regarding motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records excerpts [114-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records excerpts [114-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records excerpts (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [111-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [111-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony (wm) (Entered: 04/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
OBJECTION AND RESPONSE by def to motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by def in opposition re: motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: None
REVISED SUPPLEMENTAL jury instructions by def re jury [82-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/25/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS by def to jury [97-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/25/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND MOTION - taking under advisement on 4/24/00 the motion in limine precluding certain evidence [50-1] and the motion to exclude certain witnesses [51-1] and the motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] and the motion for order denying dfts proposed order [61-1] and the motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1] and the motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2], and the motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3] and the motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4] and the motion in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual [71-1] and the motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records exception [101-1] and the motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [98-1] ; Case Mgmt ddl set for 4/27/00 for pla to object to dfts voir dire and dft to respond to outstanding motions in limine; All Pending Motions Hrg held 4/24/00 ; Pretrial conference held 4/24/00 LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS by pla to dfts jury instructions [82-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS by pla to [97-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Zulema Hinojos-Fall regarding motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records exception [101-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/24/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records exception [101-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/24/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla in limine to conduct an expedited voir dire of dfts records custodians in order to establish the foundation for the business records exception (wm) (Entered: 04/24/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of plas motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [98-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/24/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony [98-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/24/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla in limine to exclude ultimate opinion testimony (wm) (Entered: 04/24/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
JURY INSTRUCTIONS (proposed) by pla (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by pla (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
SPECIAL VERDICT (proposed) for pla (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
TRIAL BRIEF by pla (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
WITNESS list by pla (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
NOTICE by pla of itemized list of special damages (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal regarding motion in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual [71-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual [71-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
PRETRIAL STATEMENT by pla (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Wesley Katahira in support of motion reply [87-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
REPLY by pla to response to motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
SUBPOENA as to: Ryan Kuehmichel served on 4/12/00 (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE AND REPORT by def (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by def (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
EXHIBIT AND WITNESS list by def (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (proposed) by def with proposed special verdict included (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
TRIAL BRIEF by def (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
PRETRIAL STATEMENT by pla (wm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude EEOC atty letter to dfts atty [71-4] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude dfts video and photos [71-3] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude cumulative witnesses [71-2] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude prior EEOC no probable cause determinations [71-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla in limine re sections from the 1995 EEOC compliance manual (wm) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: None
REPLY by def to response to motion to exclude certain witnesses [51-1], motion in limine precluding certain evidence [50-1] (wm) (Entered: 04/04/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Michael J McDonagh regarding motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] (dkh) (Entered: 03/31/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by def Amalgamated Sugar Co in opposition re: motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] (dkh) (Entered: 03/31/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING ; All Pending Motions Hrg set for 4/24/00 at 10:00 ; Pretrial conference set for 4/24/00 at 10:00 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by pla regarding motion to deny proposed order (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in opposition to dfts motion in limine precluding certain evidence [50-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in opposition re: motion in limine precluding certain evidence [50-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion for order denying dfts proposed order [61-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion for order denying dfts proposed order [61-1] (wm) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla for order denying dfts proposed order (wm) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Barbara J. Standal in support of motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by pla in support of motion in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial [58-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by pla in limine to exclude dft expert witness from testifying at trial (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: None
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle ; Jury Trial set for 5/1/00 at 9:00 ; Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/00 at 10:00 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 02/17/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE - granting dfts oral motion to vacate trial [56-1] ; Jury trial reset for 5/1/00 at 9:00 ; Pretrial conference reset for 4/24/00 at 10:00 LMB (wm) (Entered: 02/16/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE - ; Jury trial set for 3/13/00 is reset for 4/11/00 at 1:30 ; Pretrial conference set for 2/28/00 is reset for 4/4/00 at 1:30 LMB (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Candy W. Dale in support of motion to exclude certain witnesses [51-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. McDonagh in support of motion to exclude certain witnesses [51-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by def in support of motion to exclude certain witnesses [51-1], of motion in limine precluding certain evidence [50-1] (wm) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by def to exclude certain witnesses (wm) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None
MOTION by def in limine precluding certain evidence (wm) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM, DECISION, AND ORDER: by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill denying motion for summary judgment [20-1] ; Jury trial set for 3/13/00 at 9:00 , cs Case reassigned to Magistrate Larry M. Boyle (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: None
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Larry M. Boyle ; Jury Trial set for 3/13/00 at 9:00 ; Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/00 at 2:00 (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE by plas (wm) (Entered: 01/13/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: None
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HEARING - ; Jury trial set for 3/13/00 at 9:00 ; Teleconf held 1/6/00 LMB (wm) (Entered: 01/07/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE by dft (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE by dft (wm) (Entered: 01/04/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Telephonic Status Conference set for 10:00 1/6/00 before LMB in Boise (wm) (Entered: 12/28/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by def to opposition to plas supplemental brief re motion for summary judgment [20-1] (wm) (Entered: 12/22/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: None
MINUTES OF MOTIONS HEARING - granting plas motion to supplement the briefing (no motion on file) taking under advisement on 12/3/99 the motion for summary judgment [20-1] BLW (wm) (Entered: 12/06/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by pla re memorandum [38-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney A Luis Lucero for EEOC and substituting attorney Wesley Katahira, Zulema Hinojos-Fall (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by dft in opposition to plas motion for leave to file supplemental brief (no motion on file) (wm) (Entered: 11/17/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING motion for summary judgment [20-1] set before BLW in Cd'A 8:00 12/3/99 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 11/17/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE OF HEARING motion for summary judgment [20-1] set before BLW in 8:00 11/16/99 (cc: all counsel) (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: None
ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by pla (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Alfonso Baez on 11/3/99 at 1:30 (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Cheryl Searle in support of motion for summary judgment [20-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. McDonagh in support of motion for summary judgment [20-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth R. Baumgartner in support of motion for summary judgment [20-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None
REPLY by dft to response to motion for summary judgment [20-1] (wm) (Entered: 10/26/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: None
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill : granting stipulation for protective order [25-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 10/18/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting stipulation for protective order [25-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 10/18/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Barbara J. Standal re motion response [26-1], in accordian file not scanned in (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None
RESPONSE by pla to motion for summary judgment [20-1] (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/15/1999
STIPULATION for protective order (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Michael J McDonagh regarding motion for summary judgment [20-1] (dkh) (Entered: 09/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Cheryl Searle regarding motion for summary judgment [20-1] (dkh) (Entered: 09/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by def in support of motion for summary judgment [20-1] (dkh) (Entered: 09/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by def in support of motion for summary judgment [20-1] (dkh) (Entered: 09/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None
MOTION by def Amalgamated Sugar Co for summary judgment (dkh) (Entered: 09/27/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Earnest F. Harper on 9/22/99 (wm) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Israel Ramirez on 9/16/99 (wm) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of M. Peter Scontrino, PH.D. on 9/17/99 (wm) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting stipulation to dismiss all claims and all damage demands encompassed by pla's complaint which are pertinent to the employment of and failure to rehire Felix Gonzalez with prejudice, all parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees [15-1] (cc: all counsel) (dkh) (Entered: 09/07/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/2/1999
STIPULATION to dismiss (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by pla (wm) (Entered: 07/20/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: None
ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill granting stipulation to extend dates for disclosure of experts [12-1] (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 04/21/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/20/1999
STIPULATION to extend dates for disclosure of experts (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 04/01/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of cancelling deposition duces tecum of Pioquinto Gomez on 3/12/99 (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 03/01/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Baltazar Garza on 3/12/99 (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 03/01/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Pioquinto Gomez on 3/12/99 (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Sergio Hernandez on 3/11/99 (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: None
NOTICE of taking deposition duces tecum of Alfonso Baez on 3/11/99 (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: None
SCHEDULING ORDER by Honorable B. Lynn Winmill ; Telephonic Status Conference held 1/7/99 ; Discovery ddl set for 10/29/99 ; Disp Motion ddl set 9/24/99 ; Jury Trial 1/24/00 1:30 Boise ; Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/00 8:00 (cc: all counsel) (dkh) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 01/22/1999)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: None
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ; Telephonic Status Conference set for 2:30 12/10/98 before BLW in Boise (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER [3-1] by def Amalgamated Sugar Co; jury demand (dkh) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: None
ANSWER by dft; jury demand (wm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 10/16/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon defendant Amalgamated Sugar Co on 9/25/98 (jml) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 09/30/1998)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (jml) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2005 (ja, ). (Entered: 09/30/1998)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 83 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?