Flournoy v. Goldin
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:94-cv-00986
District Judge Alexander Williams, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 6:26 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Walter T. Flournoy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Irving Kator

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irving Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 ikator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo Sean O'Keefe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Walter Sippel, Jr +1 410 209 4807 +1 410 962 9947 john.sippel@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER re GRANTING 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Walter T. Flournoy.. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. on 11/12/03. (gc, Chambers) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Walter T. Flournoy (Kator, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      Paperless ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment extended up to and on 11/6/2003 and Replies due by 11/20/2003.. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. on 10/28/03. (Williams, Alexander) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment by Walter T. Flournoy. Responses due by 11/14/2003 (Kator, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment by Sean O'Keefe. Responses due by 10/27/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Defendant's Memorandum in Support# 3 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits# 4 Exhibit EEO Counselor's report# 5 Exhibit Formal Complaint of Discrimination# 6 Exhibit Final Agency Decision# 7 Exhibit EEOC Decision# 8 Exhibit EEOC Denial of Request for Reconsideration# 9 Exhibit Class Discrimination Complaint# 10 Notice of Filing of Lengthy Exhibit# 11 Exhibit Order Approving Settlement Agreement)(Sippel, John) (Lengthy Exhibits received 10/09/03- FILED SEPARATELY)Modified on 10/10/2003 (elt, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/08/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
            Paperless ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint up to and including October 8, 2003. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. on 09/10/03. (Williams, Alexander) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sean O'Keefe re 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time (Sippel, John) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Sean O'Keefe. Responses due by 9/22/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sippel, John) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Paperless ORDER granting 6 Motion to Reopen Case and give Defendant 60 days from date of this order to respond. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. on 07/10/03. (Williams, Alexander) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sean O'Keefe re 8 Response to Motion to Reopen Proceedings (Sippel, John) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Sean O'Keefe. Replies due by 4/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sippel, John) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None
                        Correspondence re: Warning Letter (ECF) mailed to counsel(ajh, Deputy Clerk) (elt, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Reopen Case by Walter T. Flournoy ; Responses due by 3/31/2003 (c/s)(ajh, Deputy Clerk) (elt, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/17/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER "directing" clerk to administratively close case without prejudice and staying the case for an indefinite period of time. ( signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. ) (c/m 10/12/94 hg) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/1994)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: None
                              Reassignment letter mailed to Counsel. (slf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/1994)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/23/1994 Court Filing
                                ORDER dated 6/23/94 granting [3-1] joint motion to Stay Proceedings ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/1994)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued (60 days) for Daniel S. Goldin (has, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/1994)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: None
                                    DEMAND for jury trial by Walter T. Flournoy (has, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/1994)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?