USA v. Huynh
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-01089-W

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Wheatley +1 619 557 6008 +1 619 557 6741 joe.wheatley@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 4/24/2008
County San Diego
Terminated 8/14/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - FALSE AND FRAUDULENT U.S. INCOME TAX RETURN
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Judgment Returned Executed
Judgment Returned Executed as to Tammie T. Huynh on 8/18/08. (cap) (kaj).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT as to Tammie T. Huynh (1) filed. 3 years probation. $4,000.00 fine $100.00 P.A.. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (ct)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Plea EnteredCourt Filing
      Minute Entry :Acceptance of plea and P/O Report and Sentencing held on 8/14/2008 for Tammie T. Huynh (1) before Judge Whelan. The Court accepts the guilty plea taken by the magistrate judge. The defendant is placed on 3 years probation.$4,000.00 fine$100.00 P.A. (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson).(Plaintiff Attorney Joseph Wheatley).(Defendant Attorney Ronson Shamoun). (ct)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Sentencing Memorandum
        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Tammie T. Huynh (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 through 11, # (2) Proof of Service)(Shamoun, Ronson) (cap).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Sentencing Summary Chart
          SENTENCING SUMMARY CHART by USA as to Tammie T. Huynh (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Wheatley, Joseph) (cap).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Sentencing Memorandum
            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Tammie T. Huynh (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Wheatley, Joseph) (cap).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
              Minute Entry :Status Conference as to Tammie T. Huynh held on 7/14/2008 before Judge Whelan. At the request of defense counsel, the Court orders the Accept Plea with P.O. Report reset for 8/14/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. The 7/21/08 date is ordered vacated. (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson).(Plaintiff Attorney William Cole).(Defendant Attorney Ronson Shamoun). (ct)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Tammie T. Huynh. At the request of defense counsel, the Court sets a Status Conference, regarding the sentencing date, for 7/14/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (ct)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Abstract of OrderCourt Filing
                  ABSTRACT OF ORDER releasing Tammie T. Huynh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/24/08. (aje)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 BondCourt Filing
                    P/S Bond Entered as to Tammie T. Huynh in amount of $ 2,500. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/24/08. (aje)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release; Bond set for Tammie T. Huynh (1) 2,500 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/24/08. (aje)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER as to Tammie T. Huynh, Excludable(s) started as to Tammie T. Huynh: XK proposed plea agreement and XT1 continuance - tendered a guilty plea; Start date 4/24/08 End date 7/21/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/24/08. (aje)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                          FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION as to Tammie T. Huynh :Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Objection must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/24/08. (aje)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Plea Agreement
                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Tammie T. Huynh (aje)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
                              CONSENT TO PLEA before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler by Tammie T. Huynh. (aje)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joseph Wheatley appearing for USA. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Wheatley, Joseph) (aje).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Tammie T. Huynh (rfm)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Information and Waiver filed. Initial Appearance as to Tammie T. Huynh held on 4/24/2008, Attorney Ronson J Shamoun retained for Tammie T. Huynh. Bond set as to Tammie T. Huynh (1) $2500 Secured by defendant's Signature only. Bond paperwork due by close of business 04/24/08. Arraignment as to Tammie T. Huynh (1) Count 1 held on 4/24/2008. Findings, Consent and Plea Agreement filed. Change of Plea Hearing as to Tammie T. Huynh held on 4/24/2008. Plea tendered by Tammie T. Huynh (1) Guilty on count 1 of the Information. Accept Plea with P.O. Report set for 7/21/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Tape #JMA08-1:10:31-11:01).(Plaintiff Attorney Paul Cook, AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Ron Shamoun, RET). (rfm)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Information - Felony
                                      INFORMATION as to Tammie T. Huynh (1) count(s) 1. (rfm)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Surrender
                                        Surrender of Tammie T. Huynh (rfm)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?