Global Revolution TV v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-05086
District Judge George B. Daniels, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 9:08 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Global Revolution TV, Plaintiff
No Logo Treasurer Joshua Boss, Plaintiff
No Logo Treasurer Peter Harris, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo John Doe and Richard Roe and other presently unidentified officials, Defendant
No Logo John Doherty, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Brookfield Office Properties Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo John Doherty, Third Party Plaintiff
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Third Party Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Third Party Plaintiff
City of New York City of New York, Third Party Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND SETTLEMENT: NOW, THEREFORE! this matter is settled on the following terms: The above-referenced action, is discontinued with prejudice and without costs, expenses, or any additional fees! except those set forth in paragraphs "3" and "4" below...The City of New York ("the City"}, on behalf of all Defendants, shall pay to Global Revolution TV Seventy-Five Thousand Dollars ($75,000} ("the settlement amount") in full settlement of all of Plaintiffs' claims for damages. Payment of the settlement amount shal1 be made by forwarding a check in the amount of Seventy-Five Thousand Dollars ($75,000) directly to Plaintiffs' attorney at 10 Spring Street, Suite 1, New York, New York 10012 and made jointly payable to Global Revolution TV and Stecklow Cohen &. Thompson. So that the City can make payment of the settlement amount, Plaintiffs shall forward the following to the undersigned counsel for the City: 1) a "So Ordered" copy of this stipulation; 2) the Taxpayer ID number used by Global Revolution TV; 3) the Taxpayer ID number used by Plaintiffs' counsel; 4) an executed affidavit of no liens for each named plaintiff; and 5) a release executed by each named Plaintiff; Defendants shal1 pay Plaintiffs' attorneys fees of Forty-Nine Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($49,500) pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1988, and Three Hundred Fifty Dollars ($350) for costs and expenses incurred in this matter...and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/9/2013) (mt) Modified on 4/9/2013 (mt). Modified on 4/18/2013 (mt). (Entered: 04/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 4/4/2013 re: We respectfully suggest that the April 10, 2013 conference be canceled. ENDORSEMENT: So ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/9/2013) (rdz) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Sheryl R. Neufeld dated 2/27/2013 re: I am an attorney in the office of Michael A. Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, counsel for defendants in the above-referenced actions. I am writing on behalf of counsel for all parties in both of the above-referenced cases to request that your Honor adjourn the scheduled March 6, 2013 settlement conference. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 4/8/13 at 3 pm in Courtroom 9A. ( Settlement Conference set for 4/8/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 2/27/2013) (djc) Modified on 3/1/2013 (djc). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Wylie Stecklow dated 2/7/2013 re: Counsel to Plaintiffs request an extension of time for Plaintiff's response to Defendants' January 30, 2013 Rule 12(c) motion for partial judgment on the pleadings. Both parties have agreed upon a March 13, 2013 deadline for Plaintiffs' response and an April 3, 2013 deadline for Defendants' to serve their reply, if any. Also, both parties request that the next status conference be moved from its March 5, 2013 date and adjourned to the same date (April 10, 2013) as the related case. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 4/3/2013) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2013) (djc) Modified on 2/11/2013 (djc). (Entered: 02/11/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial).. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. (Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Sheryl R. Neufeld in Support re: 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial).. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial). Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. Responses due by 2/13/2013(Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above referenced matter has been scheduled for March 6, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas, in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York 10007. Judge Maas' settlement procedures are attached. Requests for adjournment must be made to the Court, in writing, at least 48 hours prior to the conference. (mro) Modified on 1/23/2013 (mro). (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/8/2013) (ja) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Sheryl R. Neufeld dated 12/6/2012 re: Request to adjourn the 12/11/2012 conference. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to January 8, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. ( Case Management Conference reset for 1/8/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2012) (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This plan is also a scheduling order pursuant to Rules 16 and 26(F) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Additional parties may be joined and the pleadings may otherwise be amended as a matter of course on or before January 30, 2013, except that plaintiffs may as a matter of course substitute individuals for all or some of the John Does and Richard Roes on or before March 1, 2013. Discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by April 5, 2013. Dispositive motions are to be served by May 10, 2013. Answering papers are to be served within 28 days. Reply papers are to be served within 28 days. A final pretrial conference will be held on June 25, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. The Joint Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than June 17, 2013. All motions and applications shall be governed by the Court's Individual Rules of Practice. The parties shall be ready for trial within 48 hours notice on or after July 17, 2013. The estimated trial time is 5 days, and this is a jury trial. The Next Case Management Conference will be held on December 11, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2013. Discovery due by 4/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2013. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/26/2012) (ja) Modified on 11/26/2012 (ja). (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Based upon representations made by counsel for Brookfield that at the present time it has no basis to believe that Brookfield's employees or agents played any role in the removal of computer equipment from Zuccotti Park on November 15, 2011, the Third-Party Complaint dated July 31, 2012 against Brookfield is hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 4l(c) as further set forth in this order., John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Michael Bloomberg and Brookfield Office Properties, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/12/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Douglas H. Flaum dated 10/3/2012 re: Brookfield respectfully requests that the Court grant Brookfield additional time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Third-Party Complaint dated July 31, 2012, Making such answer or response due by October 19, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/11/2012) (js) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Douglas H. Flaum dated 8/29/2012 re: Counsel respectfully requests that the Court grant Brookfield Office Properties, Inc. additional time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the third party complaint until 10/5/12. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Brookfield Office Properties, Inc. answer due 10/5/2012. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/30/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels, from Douglas H. Flaum, dated 8/17/2012, re: request that the Court grant Brookfield an additional 14 days to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Third Party Complaint dated July 31, 2012, making such answer or response due by September 5, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Brookfield Office Properties, Inc. answer due 9/5/2012. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/20/2012) (ja) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Third Party Complaint. Brookfield Office Properties, Inc. served on 8/1/2012, answer due 8/22/2012. Service was accepted by Richard G Leland, Esq.. Document filed by The City of New York; Raymond Kelly; Michael Bloomberg; John Doherty. (Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                  THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Brookfield Office Properties, Inc. Document filed by The City of New York, Raymond Kelly, Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty.(mro) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York.(Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld on behalf of Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York (Neufeld, Sheryl) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, John Doherty, John Doe and Richard Roe and other presently unidentified officials, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1042386)Document filed by Global Revolution TV, Joshua Boss, Peter Harris.(mro) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?