Main Street Legal Services, Inc. v. National Security Council
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00948
District Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 10:18 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Main Street Legal Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas C. Cox +1 718 340 4241 +1 718 340 4276 douglas.cox@law.cuny.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Main Street Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marlowe Boettcher

Toggle Switch Represented by New Wave Surgical Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ramzi Kassem +1 718 340 4558 +1 718 340 4478 ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu
v.
No Logo National Security Council, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Anne Mahoney +1 718 254 6026 +1 718 254 6081 Kathleen.Mahoney@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
Space Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
    USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 4653065060 re 21 Notice of Appeal filed by Main Street Legal Services, Inc. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 20 Clerk's Judgment, by Main Street Legal Services, Inc.. Appeal Record due by 10/21/2013. (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
        CLERK'S JUDGMENT. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the National Security Council's motion to dismiss under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is granted; and that the complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 8/7/2013. (Siegfried, Evan) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court finds that the NSC is not an"agency" under FOIA, and is, therefore, not subject to the requirements set forth in granting that Act. Accordingly, the NSC's motion to dismiss 14 under Rule 12(b)(6) is granted and the complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/6/2013. Forwarded for judgment. (Siegfried, Evan) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Powell on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
              Letter to Court Enclosing Courtesy Copies by National Security Council (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                REPLY in Support re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by National Security Council. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Main Street Legal Services, Inc.. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                    Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by National Security Council. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                      Letter Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Main Street Legal Services, Inc. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Craig Cox on behalf of Main Street Legal Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Letter
                          Letter re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by National Security Council (Littleton, Judson)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Anne Mahoney on behalf of National Security Council (aty to be noticed) (Mahoney, Kathleen)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Proposed Scheduling Order
                              Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule) by National Security Council (Littleton, Judson)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to Motion re [7] Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Main Street Legal Services, Inc.. (Kassem, Ramzi)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013 Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                  Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by National Security Council. (Littleton, Judson)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: The docket sheet indicates that the plaintiff has filed return of service on the defendant and the time for answering has expired. Plaintiff must by April 15, 2013, either (1) move for entry of default and, if appropriate, for default judgment or (2) file a status report. If plaintiff moves for entry of default or default judgment, plaintiff must file the motion electronically and comply with the requirements of Local Rules 55.1 and 55.2. If plaintiff has been communicating with defendant and feels a conference would be useful, plaintiff should promptly call chambers to schedule an initial or settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 3/25/2013. (Abdallah, Fida)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Summons Returned Executed
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street Legal Services, Inc.. Main Street Legal Services, Inc. served on 2/25/2013, answer due 3/18/2013. (Kassem, Ramzi)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Main Street Legal Services, Inc. re [2] Summons Issued February 21, 2013 (Kassem, Ramzi)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                          In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                            Summons Issued as to National Security Council. (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against National Security Council Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Main Street Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?