McRo Inc. v. Rockstar Games Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01513
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 12:47 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
Space Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Rockstar Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph C. Schoell +1 302 467 4245 +1 302 467 4201 joseph.schoell@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erin Wiggins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin Wiggins

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J Ball, Jr. +1 202 223 7352 +1 202 240 7352 dball@paulweiss.com
Space Alexandra R. Clark +1 212 373 3227 arclark@paulweiss.com
Space Marguerite Sophia Dougherty +1 212 373 3148 +1 212 492 0148 mdougherty@paulweiss.com
Space Jenny C Wu +1 212 373 3751 +1 212 492 0642 jcwu@paulweiss.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORAL ORDER: Due to the stay in these cases, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pretrial conference and jury trial are CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Official Transcript of Status Conference held on November 10, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Ellie Corbett Hannum, Telephone (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Petrsoric - filed by McRo Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
        STIPULATION to Stay by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
          Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Case Status. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Claim Construction Chart to October 16, 2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for parties to submit a Joint Claim Construction Chart to October 2, 2014 - filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Alexandra R. Clark as co-counsel. Reason for request: Attorney is no longer associated with the firm. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the Deadline for Joinder of other Parties and Amendment of the Pleadings to 10/3/2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Invalidity Contentions filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on August 6, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014.((bpg) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Proposed Claim Constructions filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION Setting Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motion by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Berger - filed by McRo Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' August 1, 2014 Letter - re (69 in 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB) Letter, (70 in 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB) Letter, (68 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                  Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Meghan Dougherty regarding Letter Brief of Defendants/Movants for August 6, 2014 Discovery Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Planet Blue's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions to Rockstar Games, Inc.; (ii) Planet Blue's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions to 2K Games, Inc.; (iii) Planet Blue's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions to Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.; (iv) Plaintiff Planet Blue's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. and 2K Games, Inc. First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things Nos. 1-97; and (v) Plaintiff Planet Blue's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. and 2K Games, Inc. First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-14 filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for substantial completion of document production to August 13, 2014 - filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit the Interim Status Report to 7/28/2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER: (a) The Court will permit Defendants to file the proposed motion prior to the current case dispositive motion deadline, but the Court will hear argument on the motion at the same time as the Markman hearing scheduled in these cases, that is, at the hearing scheduled for 8:30a.m. on December 5,2014. (D.I. 30 at § 12)(b) The parties shall, by joint letter and/or stipulation filed no later than August 11, 2014, propose a briefing schedule regarding the proposed motion--one that will permit the motion to be argued at the December 5, 2014 hearing date referenced above. Briefing on the motion should be completed by no later than November 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/18/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                REQUEST for Oral Argument by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendants RockStar, Take-Two and 2K Games filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' Request for Leave to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under Section 101 - re (44 in 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB) Letter, (57 in 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB) Letter, (55 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Letter, (54 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB) Letter, (56 in 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathanial J. McPherson - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Meghan Dougherty regarding Defendants' request for leave to file an early motion for summary judgment of invalidity under Section 101. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Production pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference is hereby re-scheduled for August 7, 2015 beginning at 9:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants RockStar, Take-Two and 2K Games and (ii) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendants RockStar, Take-Two and 2K Games filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 48 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Denial of Petitions for Inter Partes Review by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Disclosures Paragraph 3 filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rockstar Games Inc.- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Rockstar Games Inc..(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement filed by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING (23 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB and related cases) MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by 2K Games Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC, Take-Two Interactive Software Inc.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- (43) in case 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB; (42) in case 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB; (41) in case 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB: granting in part and denying in part (17) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB; granting in part and denying in part (18) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB; granting in part and denying in part (17) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART (17 in 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) filed by Rockstar Games Inc., and (18 in 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Second Amended Complaint) filed by Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. and (17 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Second Amended Complaint) filed by 2K Games Inc. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/3/2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/17/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) Modified on 3/19/2014 (dlk). (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/14/2014 at 11:45 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/6/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(dlk) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATEMENT re (40 in 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 29 in 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 37 in 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 39 in 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 38 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Notice (Other) -- Defendants' Statement in Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Subsequent Proceedings in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases -- by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Harmonix Music Systems Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Subsequent Proceedings in California Cases by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 27 MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 4-10)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 24, 2014 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (33 in 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB) Answering Brief in Opposition, of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 27 MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit proposed Protective Order to 2/10/2014 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Erin Wiggins as Counsel by Rockstar Games Inc. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER, Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines Status Report due by 7/24/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2014. Discovery due by 11/20/2014. Tutorial on the technology due by 10/16/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 10/16/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 11/5/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/5/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/7/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2015. A Jury Trial is set for 8/17/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 01/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01509-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01510-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01513-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01517-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01519-LPS-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Meghan Dougherty regarding Defendants' positions on parties' scheduling order disputes. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 27 MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases filed by Rockstar Games Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 3)(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay in View of Inter Partes Review and California Cases - filed by 2K Games Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Rockstar Games Inc., Bethesda Softworks LLC, Harmonix Music Systems Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/16/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss - Unopposed - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Unopposed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Rockstar Games Inc. re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Atkins - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) filed by Rockstar Games Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The Amended Complaint) - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF ITS RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT IN VIEW OF PLAINTIFFS SUBSEQUENT FILING OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rockstar Games Inc. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 13 Opening Brief in Support, 14 Declaration (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rockstar Games Inc.- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rockstar Games Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Ball Jr., Jenny C. Wu, Erin Wiggins, and Alexandra R. Clark - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Rockstar Games Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Meghan Dougherty. Attorney Joseph C. Schoell terminated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Rockstar Games Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. for Rockstar Games Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dougherty, Meghan) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Move, Answer Or Respond to Complaint to February 28, 2013 - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Schoell, Joseph) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 29, 2013 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT to JANUARY 17, 2013 - filed by Rockstar Games Inc.. (Schoell, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Rockstar Games Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177511.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?