Purzel Video GMBH v. Does 1-91
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-02292
District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 4:12 AM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Purzel Video GMBH, Plaintiff

Represented by Simmons Browder Gianaris Angelides & Barnerd LLC

v.
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com
No Logo Doe 22, Defendant
No Logo Doe 30, Defendant
No Logo Doe 33, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 33

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/06/2013 Doe 33
No Logo Doe 40, Defendant
No Logo Doe 47, Defendant
No Logo Doe 53, Defendant
No Logo Doe 59, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 59

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/06/2013 Doe 59
No Logo Doe 79, Defendant
No Logo Doe 90, Defendant
No Logo Doe Number 20, Defendant
No Logo Doe Number 24, Defendant
No Logo Doe Number 55, Defendant
No Logo Doe Number 65, Defendant
No Logo Doe Number 87, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-91, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Memorandum and Order
33 Filed & Entered:  08/30/2013 Docket Text Order
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
    Docket Text ORDER: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 12 without prejudice [Doc. No. 32]; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 30, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Doe No. 12 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1)(A)(i) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Purzel Video GMBH Doe No. 12 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1)(A)(i) (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        29 Filed & Entered:  08/05/2013 Docket Text Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013 Motion to Dismiss Party
          MOTION to Dismiss Party Purzel Video GmbH by Defendant Doe 12. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
            Docket Text ORDER: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendants 21, 34, 44 and 74; So Ordered. Doe Defendants 21, 34, 44 and 74 are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 5, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
              Doe Nos. 21, 34, 44 and 74 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1)(A)(i) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Purzel Video GMBH Doe Nos. 21, 34, 44 and 74 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1)(A)(i) (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 26 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Name and Serve Defendants Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) filed by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Motion for Extension
                  MOTION for Extension of: Time to Name and Serve Defendants Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                    24 Filed & Entered:  06/21/2013 Docket Text Order
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
                      Docket Text ORDER Re: 23 Motion to Dismiss Party Doe Nos. 22, 53 and 90 by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH; ORDERED GRANTED. Doe Defendants 22 and 90 are dismissed without prejudice, and Doe Defendant 52 is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 21, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Motion to Dismiss Party
                        22 Filed & Entered:  05/31/2013 Docket Text Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
                          Docket Text ORDER Re: 21 Motion to Dismiss Party Doe Defendant #79 by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH; ORDERED GRANTED. Doe Defendant No. 79 is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 31, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Motion to Dismiss Party
                            20 Filed & Entered:  05/01/2013 Docket Text Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
                              Docket Text ORDER Re: 19 Motion to Dismiss Party Specific Doe Defendant 40 by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH; ORDERED GRANTED. Doe 40 is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 1, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Motion to Dismiss Party
                                18 Filed & Entered:  04/01/2013 Docket Text Order
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Docket Text ORDER Re: 17 Motion to Dismiss Specific Doe Defendants: Does 20, 24, 55, 65 & 87 by Purzel Video GMBH; ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Doe No. 20, IP Address 97.85.128.253; Doe No. 24, IP Address 71.10.190.10; Doe No. 55, IP Address 69.76.204.240; Doe No. 65, IP Address 24.217.226.32; and Doe No. 87, IP Address 24.216.211.194, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 1, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Specific Doe Defendants: Does 20, 24, 55, 65 & 87 by Purzel Video GMBH Plaintiff'sof Specific Doe Defendants: Does 20, 24, 55, 65 & 87 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesko, Paul) Modified docket text and event type on 3/29/2013 (NCL). (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Quash, 13 PRO SE MOTION Combined Response to the Pro Se Objection Set Forth in Docket Number 13 and Doe Number 33's Pro Se Motion to Quash filed by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Docket Text ORDER Re: 14 Motion to Dismiss Party Specific Doe Defendant by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH; ORDERED GRANTED. Doe Defendant No. 47, IP Address 69.179.124.243, is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 18, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Party Specific Doe Defendant by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                            PRO SE MOTION to Contest Subpoena by Defendant Doe 59. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Envelope)(KSM) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Quash by Defendant Doe 33 {Attachment of Letter}. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letter, # 2 Envelope)(KSM) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Docket Text ORDER Re: 10 Motion to Dismiss Party Specific Doe Defendant by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH; ORDERED GRANTED. Doe Defendant 30, IP 209.125.114.130, is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 4, 2013. (SAA) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Party Specific Doe Defendant by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery prior to rule 26(f) conference (filed December 11,2012) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, plaintiffmay immediately serve discovery on the third party ISPs identified in Exhibit A to plaintiffs complaint to obtain the identity of each Doe defendant by serving a subpoena pursuant to FED. R. Cry. P. Ru1e 45 that seeks documents that identify each Doe defendant, including the name, current (and permanent) addresses, e-mail addresses, and Media Access Control addresses for each defendant. The disclosure of this information is consistent with the ISPs' obligations under the Cable Service Privacy Act, 47 U.S.C. § 551(c)(2)(B), which provides:.......SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Response to Court due by 3/12/2013. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/18/2012. (NCL) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to take discovery to ascertain the identities of the 91 Doe Defendants is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 4.) A separate Order permitting discovery shall be issued herein. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/18/2012. (NCL) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                        REPORT to Commissioner of the filing of an action. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (DLT) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 4 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH re 4 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference . (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH Process Server: Civil Action Group, Ltd, D/B/A APS (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Purzel Video GMBH.. (Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    COMPLAINT against defendant Does 1-91 with receipt number 0865-3595312, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by Purzel Video GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Original Filing Form, # 3 Summons, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B)(Lesko, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 221 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?