McRO Inc v. Insomniac Games Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10340
District Judge George H Wu, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 1:32 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

v.
No Logo Insomniac Games Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hopenfeld, Singer, Rice & Saito LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin L Singer +1 415 500 6080 +1 415 534 6078 bls@hsrslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen Rubin Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Rubin +1 310 393 0900 +1 310 496 0810 sr@stephenrubin.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Order) (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS BETWEEN MCRO, INC., DBA PLANET BLUE AND INSOMNIAC GAMES, INC. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby confirms that: Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, all claims, counterclaims and defenses in this action between Plaintiff, McRO, Inc., dba Planet Blue ("Planet Blue") and Defendant and Counterclaimant Insomniac Games, Inc. ("Insomniac") are hereby dismissed with prejudice; and The parties shall bear their own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court consolidates the above-entitled action with McRO, Inc. v. Namco Banda Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Joint Status Report will be filed by noon on April 15, 2013. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lom) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance re 4/1/13 Scheduling Conference filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/31/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. for Telephone Appearance re 4/1/13 Scheduling Conference (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            TEXT ONLY NOTICE - A Scheduling Conference for related case, CV12-10331, is set for April 1, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. The schedule issued on said date shall also be the schedule for all related "McRO" cases. Parties may appear telephonically at the conference provided that notice is given to Judge Wu's Clerk. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/29/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Insomniac Games Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ,filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 21 day summons issued)(pj) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric P. Berger on behalf of Defendant, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James J. McGuire on behalf of Defendant, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (filed 02/05/13) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs will have until March 18, 2013 to manually file the First Amended Complaint. Additionally, the Clerk's Office's Notice of Discrepancies regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, issued on February 28, 2013, is deemed MOOT.Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (bp) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. re First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                        APPLICATION for attorney Eric P. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11743743 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                          APPLICATION for attorney James J. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11743249 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER by Judge George H. Wu; Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Case 20 originally scheduled for March 7, 2013 is ADVANCED to March 4, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge George H. Wu. (jag) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re MOTION to Dismiss Case 20 filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 20 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 17 by Judge George H. Wu. Defendant INSOMNIAC GAMES, INC. may have until February 4, 2013 to respond to the Complaint. (kti) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Raskin on behalf of plaintiff, designating Irene Lee as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 4, 2013 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin L. Singer in Support of Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                          APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11571483 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge John A Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 12-10340 GW(FFMx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Insomniac Games, Inc.. (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin L Singer on behalf of Defendant Insomniac Games Inc (Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendant Insomniac Games Inc.(Singer, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 15 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, upon Defendant Insomniac Games Inc served on 12/10/2012, answer due 12/31/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ana Shakaryan, Person In Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A Kronstadt: Please read this Order carefully. It governs this case and differs in some respect from the Local Rules. The Initial Standing Order can also be found on the Court's Website under Judge Kronstadt's Procedures and Schedules, which is always the most recent and updated version. (dfi) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Vincent Filardo, Jr. for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRO Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Defendant Insomniac Games Inc. Case assigned to Judge John A Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Space Space

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?