In re: LONGWEI PETROLEUM INVESTMENT HOLDING LIMITED SECURITIES LITIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00214

Tags
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 2:22 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charlie Muniz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 pdahlstrom@pomlaw.com
Space Marc Ian Gross +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 migross@pomlaw.com
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Chris Basnett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com
Space Michael Marc Goldberg +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mmgoldberg@glancylaw.com
Space Gregory Bradley Linkh +1 646 722 4180 glinkh@glancylaw.com
Space Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com
No Logo June Ma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Anne Aniskevich +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 498 4699 eaniskevich@cohenmilstein.com
Space S Douglas Bunch +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dbunch@cohenmilstein.com
Space Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 meisenkraft@cohenmilstein.com
Space KENNETH MARK REHNS +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 krehns@cohenmilstein.com
Space Daniel S. Sommers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dsommers@cohenmilstein.com
Space Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com
No Logo Paul Howard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
Space David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
Space Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony J. Costantini +1 212 692 1000 +1 212 692 1020 ajcostantini@duanemorris.com
Space Kevin Paul Potere +1 212 692 1000 +1 212 692 1020 Kppotere@duanemorris.com.com
No Logo Cai Youngjun, Defendant
No Logo Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Defendant
No Logo Dora Dong, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Cole, Defendant
No Logo Gerald A. DeCiccio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunter Taubman Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark David Hunter +1 305 629 8816 +1 305 629 8877 mdhunter@htwlaw.com
Space Jenny D Johnson-Sardella +1 305 629 8877 jsardella@htwlaw.com
No Logo James Crane, Defendant
No Logo Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sichenzia Ross Friedman Ference LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Anthony Varnavides +1 212 930 9700 +1 212 930 9725 gvarnavides@srff.com
No Logo Michael Toups, Defendant
No Logo Russell Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Xue Yongping, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Dandy, Movant
No Logo Donald Pritt, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
No Logo Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Movant
No Logo Greg Lagermeier, Movant
No Logo Khaled Mously, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
No Logo Malkit Sappal, Movant
No Logo Marcin Kolakowski, Movant
No Logo Richard D Kozma, Movant
No Logo Todd Okimoto, Movant
No Logo Volker Piasta, Movant
No Logo William Tylutki, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mario Alba, Jr. +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 malba@csgrr.com
No Logo LPH Investor Group, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard William Gonnello +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 rgonnello@faruqilaw.com
Space Frank P. McConville +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 fmcconville@faruqilaw.com
Space Megan Marie Sullivan +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 msullivan@faruqilaw.com
  Entries (330) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 321 Letter filed by Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Counsel to initiate call to chambers. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/13/2017) (cf) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated 02.09.2017 re: Permission to Appear Telephonically for Fairness Hearing on March 6, 2017 at 10:00 am. Document filed by Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 319 Letter filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Fairness Hearing in this action is scheduled for March 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Fairness Hearing set for 3/6/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/18/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold dated 01/17/2017 re: Settlement Funding Status. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Vu, Quynh) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/1/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/1/2016 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/31/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/31/2016 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Richard Hamano dated 1/3/2017 re: Expediting this lawsuit. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/10/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 312 Letter filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted (final extension). At that time, Court will consider rejecting the settlement. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/29/2016) (cf) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold dated 12/27/2016 re: Funding Status. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Kaufhold, Steven) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 310 Letter filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/30/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold and Stuart J. Guber dated 11/29/2016 re: Status of Funding of Settlement. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Kaufhold, Steven) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Based on the record herein, the continued Fairness Hearing scheduled for November 28, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. is adjourned sine die. Counsel are directed to bring the Court up to date as to the status of funding the settlement, in writing, by November 29, 2016. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold dated 11/22/2016 re: Request for Permission to Appear Telephonically for Hearing Scheduled November 28, 2016 at 2:00 p.m.. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Kaufhold, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated November 22, 2016 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/28/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/28/2016 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: The fairness hearing regarding the proposed settlement of this action is further adjourned to November 28, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. (See H'rg. Tr., dated Nov. 1, 2016.) The fairness hearing will continue in Courtroom 1 7B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Fairness Hearing set for 11/28/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/1/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 302 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Request granted, on the understanding that Mr. Nemecek, will appear in person. The call should be placed jointly with counsel for the Auditor Defendants. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/26/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Enforce the Stipulation of Settlement addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated October 25, 2016. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold dated 10/24/2016 re: Telephonic Appearance for Final Approval of Settlement Hearing on November 1, 2016. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Kaufhold, Steven) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 299 Letter, filed by Russell Anderson, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. Counsel must initiate the call to the Court. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/21/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated 10/18/2016 re: appear telephonically at fairness hearing scheduled November 1, 2016. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice, which stated that "[t]he Court may adjourn the Fairness Hearing" (Order, filed June 23, 2016, at 3), the fairness hearing currently scheduled for Thursday, October 20, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to Tuesday, November 1, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. ( Fairness Hearing set for 11/1/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/18/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from STUART J. GUBER dated October 13, 2016 re: Courtesy Copies. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    DECLARATION of Stuart J. Guber in Support re: 285 MOTION to Approve Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Certification of the Settlement Class ., 287 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and an Award to Class Plaintiff.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections, # 2 Exhibit B - Exclusions)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 285 MOTION to Approve Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Certification of the Settlement Class ., 287 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and an Award to Class Plaintiff. . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying 293 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. No adjournment of fairness hearing is granted. No motions absent a pre-motion letter with legal authorities supporting the relief requested. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/13/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Enforce the Stipulation of Settlement addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated 10/11/2016. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 04/29/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 4/29/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2017.(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated September 22, 2016 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Stuart J. Guber in Support re: 285 MOTION to Approve Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Certification of the Settlement Class ., 287 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and an Award to Class Plaintiff.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Faruqi Firm Resume, # 2 Exhibit B - Faruqi Time Report, # 3 Exhibit C - Faruqi Expense Report, # 4 Exhibit D - Pritt Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E - Zhang Report)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 287 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and an Award to Class Plaintiff. . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and an Award to Class Plaintiff. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 285 MOTION to Approve Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Certification of the Settlement Class . . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION to Approve Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Certification of the Settlement Class . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER terminating 282 Letter Motion for Conference. Conference held on 8/10/16. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold dated 08/02/2016 re: Emergency Conference. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Vu, Quynh) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated August 2, 2016. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated July 21, 2016 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Ronald A. Bertino of Heffler Claims Group. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement Stipulation and Settlement set forth therein, subject to further consideration at the Fairness Hearing described below to be held on October 20, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Deadline for filing and serving all opening briefs and supporting documents in support of the Applications - Within 90 days of entry of this Order: September 21, 2016. Deadline for submitting Requests for Exclusion or any written objection, including any responses or oppositions to any of the Applications - Within 105 days of entry of this Order: October 6, 2016. Deadline for filing reply papers in further support of the Applications or in response to objections, if any, and to provide the Court with the information set forth in paragraph 16 - Within 112 days of entry of this Order: October 13, 2016. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 9/21/2016., Responses due by 10/6/2016, Replies due by 10/13/2016., Fairness Hearing set for 10/20/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/23/2016) (cf) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joint Notice of Filing of Amendment No. 2 and Amended Exhibits to Stipulation of Settlement. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Amendment No. 2 to Stipulation of Settlement), # 2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A ([Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice), # 3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A (Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action), # 4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A (Proof of Claim), # 5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A (Summary Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement))(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated May 17, 2016 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 276 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiffs, Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, is directed to file with the Court the completed Stipulation of Settlement and corresponding exhibits by Tuesday, May 17, 2016 at 5:00p.m. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/13/2016) (cf) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JONATHAN GASKIN granting 240 Motion for Jonathan Gaskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/11/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF STEVEN KAUFHOLD granting 241 Motion for Steven Kaufhold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/11/2016) (cf) Modified on 2/11/2016 (cf). (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 273 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated February 9, 2016 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 272 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Joint Notice of Filing of Amendment No. 1 and Amended Exhibits to Stipulation of Settlement re: 265 Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Amendment No. 1 to Stipulation of Settlement), # 2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A ([Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice), # 3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A (Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action), # 4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A (Proof of Claim), # 5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A (Summary Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement))(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 271 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Steven S. Kaufhold dated 12/17/2015 re: Response to Jacob Goldberg's Letter regarding Class Action Settlement Stipulation. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Vu, Quynh) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 270 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jacob A. Goldberg dated 12/16/15 re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Stipulation. Document filed by Todd Okimoto.(Goldberg, Jacob) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Milligan Wilson, Jr on behalf of LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. New Address: Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 26th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10017, 212-983-9330. (Wilson, James) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Megan Marie Sullivan on behalf of LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. New Address: Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 26th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10017, 212-983-9330. (Sullivan, Megan) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Richard William Gonnello on behalf of LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. New Address: Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, 685 Third Avenue, 26th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10017, 212-983-9330. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated November 5, 2015 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Stuart J. Guber in Support re: 263 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement .. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 263 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement . . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 261 Letter filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: Application of Nemecek + May granted, on condition that counsel are responsible to call in on time. Pl's counsel will appear in person. Nemecek + May to place 1 call jointly. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/5/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from David P. Nemecek dated October 5, 2015 re: Request to Appear Telephonically for Status Conference. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated 10/02/2015 re: Permission to Appear Telephonically for Status Conference on October 6, 2015. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 257 Letter, filed by Charlie Muniz, June Ma, LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt, Paul Howard, Chris Basnett. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted upon consent. Status conference adjourned until Tuesday, October 6th at 9:30 am. (Status Conference set for 10/6/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/14/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for September 16, 2015 at 10:00 am is rescheduled to September 16,2015 at 2:30pm. (Status Conference set for 9/16/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/11/2015) (tn) Modified on 9/11/2015 (tn). (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from STUART J. GUBER dated SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 re: Request Adjournment of September 16, 2015 Status Conference. Document filed by Chris Basnett, Paul Howard, LPH Investor Group, June Ma, Charlie Muniz, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from David P. Nemecek dated August 12, 2015 re: Declaration in Support of Stipulation and Order of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants Michael Toups, Douglas Cole and Gerald DeCiccio. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan B Gaskin on behalf of Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Kaufhold on behalf of Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from David P. Nemecek dated August 11, 2015 re: Stipulation and Order of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants Michael Toups, Douglas Cole and Gerald DeCiccio. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 251 Letter filed by Charlie Muniz, June Ma, LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt, Paul Howard, Chris Basnett. ENDORSEMENT: Fact and expert discovery extended to 9/15/15 and no further. 6/17/15 conf. is adjourned to 9/16/15 @ 10:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 9/16/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.), (Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2015., Fact Discovery due by 9/15/2015.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/29/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from STUART J. GUBER dated MAY 28, 2015 re: Request to Voluntarily Stay Case. Document filed by Chris Basnett, Paul Howard, LPH Investor Group, June Ma, Charlie Muniz, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Quynh Vu dated 4/24/2015 re: Counsel for Defendants write to request to appear telephonically for the status conference scheduled for 4/29/2015 at 12:00 p.m.. ENDORSEMENT: On Consent. Granted. Parties to arrange calls to Court. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/27/2015) (tro) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 247 Letter, filed by Russell Anderson, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/24/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Quynh K. Vu dated April 24, 2015 re: Telephonic Appearance at Status/Settlement Conference Scheduled April 29, 2015. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Vu, Quynh) Modified on 4/24/2015 (ldi). (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated April 24, 2015 re: Telephonic Appearance at Status/Settlement Conference Scheduled April 29, 2015. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 245 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Extension Granted - no more will be. Discovery due by 6/30/2015. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/30/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from David P. Nemecek dated March 27, 2015. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF QUYNH VU 243 Motion for Quynh Vu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/19/2015) (kl) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Quynh Vu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10714207. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing of Quynh Vu, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hace Vice of Quynh Vu)(Vu, Quynh) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 239 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated March 2, 2015 re: Request for Permission to Appear Telephonically. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/4/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Steven S. Kaufhold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10664307. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Jonathan Gaskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10664295. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gaskin, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated March 2, 2015 re: Request for Permission to Appear Telephonically. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 237 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. FINAL discovery deadline is 5/1/15. Discovery due by 5/1/2015. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/30/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from David P. Nemecek dated January 26, 2015. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: Having failed to appear at a conference scheduled for this morning at 9:30 a.m., the parties are hereby directed to appear at a status / settlement conference scheduled on Tuesday, March 10, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Status Conference set for 3/10/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. Settlement Conference set for 3/10/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 234 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery deadline extended to 3/1/15. (Discovery due by 3/1/2015.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/11/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated December 9, 2014. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Mary Ann C. May dated November 2, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' October 29, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Stuart J. Guber dated October 29, 2014. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Stuart J. Guber dated October 29, 2014. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 10/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(ama) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Stuart J. Guber dated October 21, 2014 Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Stipulated Protective Order)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/2/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/2/2014 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record on October 2, 2014, the Clerk's certificates of default [#201 and #202] entered on or about September 17, 2014 are hereby vacated. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/6/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 224 Letter, filed by Russell Anderson, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. See Court's individual rules about adjournments and other resquests and NOT using faxes. Counsel will be responsible to engage call in. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/1/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Mary Ann C. May dated October 1, 2014 re: Request to Appear Telephonically for Pre-motion Conference. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (220) Motion for Robert S. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB (kgo) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (221) Motion for Jonathan O. Hafen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB (kgo) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Jonathan O Hafen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hafen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Robert S Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Clark, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (218) Motion for Mary Ann C. May to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/29/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB (kgo) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Mary Ann C. May to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(May, Mary Ann) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert S Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10138729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(Clark, Robert) Modified on 9/25/2014 (wb). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan O Hafen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10138682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(Hafen, Jonathan) Modified on 9/25/2014 (wb). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Mary Ann C. May to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10138512. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(May, Mary Ann) Modified on 9/25/2014 (wb). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties appear for a TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE with the Court on November 3, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. On the day of the conference, the Parties will jointly place a telephone call to the chambers of Judge Ronald L. Ellis, 500 Pearl Street, Room 1970, at 212-805-0563. Upon receipt of this order, if you need further information, direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2014 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 9/24/2014) (djc) Modified on 9/24/2014 (djc). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated September 24, 2014 re: Response to September 23, 2014 letter. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 47 Complaint,. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(Jurkevich, Jason) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 210 Letter filed by Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC. ENDORSEMENT: PL to respond to this letter by 9/25/14 @ 3:00 P.M. Conference on Oct 2, 2014 @ 10:30. Parties to have good faith settlement discussions prior to conference. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/23/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jason L. Jurkevich dated 09/23/2014 re: Request to vacate clerk's default. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(Jurkevich, Jason) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David P. Nemecek dated September 22, 2014 re: Request to Appear Telephonically for Initial Conference. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 207 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 23, 2014 addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Jason L. Jurkevich dated September 18, 2014. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(Jurkevich, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 196 Letter Motion for Conference Initial Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. All counsel must be present. Plaintiffs counsel is responsible for confirming with each defendants counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. The individuals present must have authority and be prepared to discuss all aspects of the case, including any legal and factual matters related to the claims or counterclaims. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Greenbaum on behalf of Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Greenbaum, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Lee Jurkevich on behalf of Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Jurkevich, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR THE ACCOUNTANT DEFENDANTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firms of SILLS CUMMIS & GROSS P.C. and, pending admission Pro Hac Vice, PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS, P.C. are substituted in place and in the stead of the law firm DUANE MORRIS, LLP as counsel of record for Defendants Child Van Wagoner Bradshaw, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, and Russell E. Anderson ("Accountant Defendants") in the above-captioned matter. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB-RLE, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(kgo) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 10/6/2014, Doc. #226. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC. (km) Modified on 10/6/2014 (kgo). Modified on 10/6/2014 (kgo). (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 10/6/2014, Doc. #226. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Child, Van Wagoner & Bradshaw, PLLC. (km) Modified on 10/6/2014 (kgo). Modified on 10/6/2014 (kgo). (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of STUART J. GUBER in Support re: 199 Request to Enter Default,. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Child, Van Wagoner & Bradshaw, PLLC and Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC . Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT, # 2 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Anthony Costantini, Esq. dated 09/12/2014 re: response to Plaintiffs September 9, 2014 letter requesting a pre-motion conference in connection with a motion to compel discovery of certain audit workpapers.. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/9/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Stuart J. Guber dated September 9, 2014. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER dismissing 194 Letter Motion for Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Please take up with Magistrate Ellis. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/8/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Stuart J. Guber dated September 5, 2014. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt.(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Stuart J. Guber on behalf of LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. New Address: Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, 101 Greenwood Avenue, Suite 600, Jenkintown, Pennsylvania, USA 19046, 215-277-5770. (Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 191 Motion for Stuart J. Guber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/26/2014) (ja) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Stuart J. Guber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LPH Investor Group, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guber, Stuart) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stuart J. Guber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10027934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guber, Stuart) Modified on 8/22/2014 (wb). (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION & ORDER #104651 re: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION filed by Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC.... the Court hereby denies the Auditor Defendants' motion for reconsideration and their alternative request for certification for interlocutory appeal, as set forth herein.... The Auditor Defendants' request to stay the proceedings pending resolution of the appeal is respectfully denied as moot. For the foregoing reasons, the Auditor Defendants' motion for reconsideration [#152] is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/22/2014) (ja) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ca). (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/10/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/10/2014 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLASS ACTION STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINING ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF: that Donald Pritt shall be and hereby is added as a representative Plaintiff in the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed in this Action, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/1/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB, 1:13-cv-00229-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(cd) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Anthony J. Costantini dated July 14, 2014 re: Response to Mr. Gonnello's Letter. Document filed by Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Richard W. Gonnello dated July 11, 2014 re: Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER deferring ruling on 182 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Plaintiffs should take up this matter with Magistrate Judge Ellis. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 07/07/2014) (ama) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Richard W. Gonnello dated July 3, 2014. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. Return Date set for 7/10/2014 at 09:00 AM.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: A status conference in this case, and all related matters, is hereby scheduled for Thursday July 10,2014 at 9:00a.m. ( Status Conference set for 7/10/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/27/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-RMB, 1:13-cv-00278-RMB, 1:13-cv-00422-RMB(ama) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: A status conference in this case, and all related matters, is hereby scheduled for Thursday July 10, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 7/10/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/27/2014) (ja) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Milligan Wilson, Jr on behalf of LPH Investor Group. (Wilson, James) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 176 Letter filed by LPH Investor Group. ENDORSEMENT: Bifurcation is denied, primarily because the merit discovery will overlap and in the end no time will be saved. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/15/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 175 Letter, filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: While I'm not sure "ripe" is the right word call and set up a telephone call with Chambers in the week that begins May 12. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/9/2014) (lmb) Modified on 5/9/2014 (lmb). Modified on 5/9/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Richard W. Gonnello dated May 2, 2014 Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from David P. Nemecek, Jr. dated May 1, 2014 re: Entry of a Protective Order. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/14/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2014 before Judge Harold Baer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Harold Baer dated April 15, 2014 re: Procedural Query. Document filed by Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (55 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 170 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 49 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB, 49 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB) Letter, filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: OK with me. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 4/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(lmb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from David P. Nemecek, Jr. dated April 8, 2014 re: Request to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing on 4/14/2014. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL AND ORDER granting (145) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Anthony Varnavides terminated in case 1:13-cv-00214-HB; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Anthony Varnavides terminated in case 1:13-cv-00229-HB; granting (37) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Anthony Varnavides terminated in case 1:13-cv-00278-HB; granting (37) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Anthony Varnavides terminated in case 1:13-cv-00422-HB. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Sichenzia Ross Friedman Ference LLP ("SRFF") hereby moves this Court for an Entry of an Order (provided below) granting its request to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Michael Toups in the above-captioned action and to have SRFF's name, address, and email address removed from the service list (including ECF service list). Mr. Toups consents to the withdrawal and intends to appear in this action pro se. SRFF's withdrawal will not delay resolution of this matter because no Answer has been filed and no discovery has commenced yet. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB (lmb) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (162) Motion for David P. Nemecek, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-cv-00214-HB. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB (kgo) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from ANTHONY J. COSTANTINI, ESQ. dated MARCH 20, 2014 re: to call to the Court's attention the recent Second Circuit decision affirming the district court decision in Iowa Public Employees' Retirement System v. Deloitte & Touche LLP, 919 F. Supp. 2d 321 (S.D.N.Y.2013), aff'd --- Fed.Appx. ----,2014 WL 998311 (2d Cir. Mar. 17, 2014).. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING: The Court having considered Lead Plaintiffs' application for a default judgment as to liability against Cai Yongjun ("Yongjun") and Xue Yongping ("Xue"); having reviewed all papers filed in connection with the Court's order to show cause; and finding that the requested relief is appropriate pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and good cause having been shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cai and Xue are jointly and severally liable for violating Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended, 15 U.S.C. §§ 78j(b), and SEC Rule 10b-5, 17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5, promulgated thereunder, although the damages owed by Cai and Xue shall be not be determined until such a time when liability and damages for the non-defaulting defendants is also determined. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/19/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(lmb) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from David P. Nemecek, Jr. dated March 13, 2014 re: Request to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing on 3/19/2014. Document filed by Michael Toups.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 47 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael Toups.(Keller, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David P. Nemecek on behalf of Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for David P. Nemecek to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Defendants Michael Toups, Douglas Cole and Gerald DeCiccio. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9434388. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Nemecek, David) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS DOUG COLE AND GERALD DECICCIO: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP hereby is substituted in place and in the stead of the law firm of Hunter Taubman Weiss LLP as counsel of record for defendants Doug Cole and Gerald DeCiccio in the above- captioned action., Attorney Mark David Hunter and Jenny D Johnson-Sardella terminated. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(lmb) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Marc I. Gross hereby moves this Court for entry of an Order (provided below) granting his request to withdraw as counsel for movant Longwei Investor Group in the above-captioned action and to have his name, address and email address removed from the service list (including ECF service list). Longwei Investor Group was not appointed Lead Plaintiff, and has no position in this litigation other than as a member of the Class. Lead Plaintiff is represented by other attorneys and Mr. Gross's withdrawal will not delay resolution of this matter., Attorney Marc Ian Gross terminated. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/6/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel L. Keller on behalf of Michael Toups. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Keller, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 47 Complaint,. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio.(Keller, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel L. Keller on behalf of Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio. (Keller, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Jenny Johnson-Sardella dated February 21, 2014 re: Stipulation and Order of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants Doug Cole and Gerald DeCiccio. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Stipulation and Order)(Johnson-Sardella, Jenny) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re; 144 Memorandum & Opinion,,, (2) MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B), TOGETHER WITH A MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AS TO THESE DEFENDANTS UNTIL THE DETERMINATION OF THESE MOTIONS AND ANY APPEAL THEREFROM. Document filed by Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DOUGLAS COLE AND GERALD DECICCIO TO FILE THEIR ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED among the undersigned parties, subject to approval of the Court, that:Mr. Cole and Mr. DeCiccio shall file and serve their answers and affirmative defenses to the Complaint no later than February 24, 2014. SO ORDERED. Douglas Cole answer due 2/24/2014; Gerald A. DeCiccio answer due 2/24/2014. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 2/06/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT MICHAEL TOUPS' TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT: Based upon the foregoing, Toups' time to file his Answer to the Complaint, presently due on February 10, 2014, is extended until March 10, 2014.SO ORDERED. Michael Toups answer due 3/10/2014. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 2/06/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Jenny Johnson-Sardella dated February 5, 2014 re: Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Douglas Cole and Gerald DeCiccio to File Their Answers and Affirmative Defenses. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Joint Stipulation)(Johnson-Sardella, Jenny) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Michael Toups, with Consent of Plaintiffs' Counsel. Document filed by Michael Toups.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re: (37 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB, 43 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 145 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 37 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB) MOTION for SICHENZIA ROSS FRIEDMAN FERENCE LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Michael Toups.. Document filed by Michael Toups. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Richard W. Gonnello dated January 30, 2014 Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for SICHENZIA ROSS FRIEDMAN FERENCE LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Michael Toups. Document filed by Michael Toups.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS filed by Russell Anderson, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, 100 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Douglas Cole, 65 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Toups, 76 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio. For the reasons stated above, the motion to dismiss by the auditors and Russell Anderson is GRANTED with respect to the § 20(a) claim against Russell Anderson and DENIED with respect to all other claims. All other motions to dismiss are DENIED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close all four motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/27/2014) (ama) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Notice of Attorney Withdrawal and Order. Document filed by Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier, Todd Okimoto. (Gross, Marc) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and supporting papers served on Cai Yongjun & Xue Yongping on January 24, 2014. Service was made by Federal Express & Certified Mail. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 139 Order to Show Cause,,,,. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1 of 3, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2 of 3, # 4 Exhibit B Part 3 of 3, # 5 Exhibit C Part 1 of 5, # 6 Exhibit C Part 2 of 5, # 7 Exhibit C Part 3 of 5, # 8 Exhibit C Part 4 of 5, # 9 Exhibit C Part 5 of 5, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 Order to Show Cause,,,, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING: Defendants Cai Y ongjun and Xue Yongping shall show cause as to why an order pursuant to Rule 55(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure should not be entered granting Lead Plaintiffs a Default Judgment. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/19/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Harold Baer. Lead Plaintiffs shall, within two (2) business days, serve this Order to Show Cause and all documents associated with Lead Plaintiffs' Application for a Default Judgment as to Liability Against Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping via United States Postal Service certified mail sent to their employer Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited's registered agent for service, Vcorp Services, LLC, located at 36 South 18th Avenue, Suite D, Brighton, Colorado 80601. Show Cause Response due by 2/26/2014. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/23/2014) (tn) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(ml) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 136 Request to Enter Default. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against CAI YONGJUN and XUE YONGPING. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFAULT JUDGMENT that Longwei and Dong are jointly and severally liable for violating Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended, 15 U.S.C. §§ 78j(b), and SEC Rule 10b-5, 17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5, promulgated thereunder, although the damages owed by Longwei and Dong shall be not be determined until such a time when liability and damages for the non-defaulting defendants is also determined. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/19/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(ml) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 129 Letter, filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio, Douglas Cole. ENDORSEMENT: Appearance at default hearing by phone is fine. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/17/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 130 Letter filed by LPH Investor Group. ENDORSEMENT: We will miss you but will gladly listen to Mr. McConville. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/17/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Marie Sullivan on behalf of LPH Investor Group. (Sullivan, Megan) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francis Paul McConville on behalf of LPH Investor Group. (McConville, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Richard W. Gonnello dated 12/16/2013 re: Hearing Scheduled December 19, 2013, at 1:00 p.m. on Order to Show Cause. Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Jenny Johnson-Sardella dated December 16, 2013 re: Request for Permission to Appear Telephonically for Hearing Scheduled December 19, 2013, at 1:00 p.m. on Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Douglas Cole, Gerald A. DeCiccio.(Johnson-Sardella, Jenny) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 125 Letter filed by LPH Investor Group. ENDORSEMENT: Hearing 1:00 P.M. Courtroom 23B on December 19 be sure notice is provided, failure to appear will doubtless trigger a default. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 12/19/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Harold Baer.) (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/13/2013) (ama) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Xue Yongping served on 12/9/2013, answer due 12/30/2013. Service was accepted by ERIC WOLZ. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cai Youngjun served on 12/9/2013, answer due 12/30/2013. Service was accepted by ERIC WOLZ. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Richard W. Gonnello dated 12/13/2013 re: Order to Show Cause. Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF STRIKING REPLY IN SUPPORT: This notice strikes as I understand it the first reply and that will be done. The attached Reply which appears more appropriate will be read in its place and stead. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(ama) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/7/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/7/2013 before Judge Harold Baer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Douglas Cole dated December 5, 2013 re: Lead Plaintiffs' Letter dated December 5, 2013. Document filed by Douglas Cole.(Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Richard W. Gonnello dated 12/05/2013 Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS: granting (102) Motion to Serve defendants Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping, in case 1:13-cv-00214-HB. Having considered all papers filed in connection with such motion; and finding that the requested relief is appropriate pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and that good cause exists to grant the motion and no objection having been lodged. IT IS ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs shall effect service of the Summons and Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint on defendants Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping by serving: Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited's registered agent for service at Vcorp Services, LLC, 36 South Avenue, Suite D, Brighton, Colorado 80601. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/04/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB (ama) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Douglas Cole. (Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Striking re: 116 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Douglas Cole. (Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Douglas Cole. (Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of of Striking re: 113 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Douglas Cole. (Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 100 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (100)MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Douglas Cole. (Hunter, Mark) Modified on 12/12/2013 (ama). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and supporting papers served on Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited and Dora Dong on 11/18/13. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 109 Order to Show Cause,,,,. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D Part 1 of 2, # 6 Exhibit D Part 2 of 2, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 109 Order to Show Cause,,,, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST LONGWEI PETROLEUM INVESTMENT HOLDING LIMITED AND DORA DONG. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST LONGWEI PETROLEUM INVESTMENT HOLDING LIMITED AND DORA DONG)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST LONGWEI PETROLEUM INVESTMENT HOLDING LIMITED AND DORA DONG: Defendants shall show cause as to why an order pursuant to Rule 55(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure should not be entered granting Lead Plaintiffs a Default Judgment. ORDERED, that Lead Plaintiffs shall, within two (2) business days, serve this Order to Show Cause and all documents associated with Lead Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment as to liability on Longwei via United States Postal Service certified mail sent to Longwei's registered agent for service, Vcorp Services, LLC, located at 36 South 18th Avenue, Suite D, Brighton, Colorado 80601 and on Dong via United States Postal Service certified mail sent to Dong's residence located at 12486 Sumner Drive, Saratoga, CA 95070. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Harold Baer. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero Part I Judge on 11/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(js) Modified on 11/18/2013 (js). Modified on 11/22/2013 (js). Modified on 11/22/2013 (js). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Dora Dong. (jno) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 106 Request to Enter Default. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against DORA DONG REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Process on Defendants Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping by Alternative Means; Lead Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Serve Process on Defendants Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping by Alternative Means; Declaration of Richard W. Gonnello In Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Process on Defendants Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongpin by Alternative Means; and Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Process on Defendants Cai Yongjun and Xue Yongping by Alternative Means. served on Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Ltd., Cai Yongjun, and Xue Yongping on 11/04/2013. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 102 MOTION to Serve LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 102 MOTION to Serve LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Serve LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Douglas Cole. (Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Cole.(Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited Securities Litigation. (jno) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited served on 7/8/2013, answer due 9/18/2013. Service was accepted by GARY A. VARNAVIDES, COUNSEL FOR LONGWEI PETROLEUM INVESTMENT HOLDING, LTD.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (McConville, Francis) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 96 Request to Enter Default. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dora Dong served on 10/21/2013, answer due 11/12/2013. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF DOUGLAS COLE AND ENTRY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED among the undersigned parties, subject to approval of the Court, that: Cole shall accept service of the summons and Complaint through his counsel, Hunter Taubman Weiss LLP, upon the entry of this Order; Cole shall file and serve his answer to the Complaint or a motion to dismiss no later than 21 days from the entry of this Order; Plaintiffs shall file and serve any opposition to Cole's motion to dismiss no later than 21 days after Cole's motion is served; and Cole shall file and serve any reply no later than 1 days after Plaintiffs' opposition is served. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(rsh) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER terminating 91 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ENDORSEMENT: I gather you already filed a 13 page reply. It doesn't work that way I will read at least the first 10 and decide whether to go further. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/11/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Francis P. McConville dated October 9, 2013 re: Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Serve Douglas Cole and Enter a Briefing Schedule. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF DOUGLAS COLE AND ENTRY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE)(McConville, Francis) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Jenny Johnson-Sardella dated October 8, 2013. Document filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio.(Johnson-Sardella, Jenny) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 76 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio. (Johnson-Sardella, Jenny) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Anthony J. Costantini in Support re: (29 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 71 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS.. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (29 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 71 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS.. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (65 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 17 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 17 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Michael Toups. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF FRANCIS P. MCCONVILLE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS AND (2) AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE in Support re: 83 MOTION to Serve PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (McConville, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF RICHARD W. GONNELLO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS AND (2) AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE in Support re: 83 MOTION to Serve PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(McConville, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 83 MOTION to Serve PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE. MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR (1) LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS AND (2) AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (McConville, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Serve PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DOUGLAS COLE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS., MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McConville, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 76 MOTION to Dismiss. LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GERALD DECICCIO'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (McConville, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of FRANCIS P. MCCONVILLE IN SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL TOUPS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT in Opposition re: 65 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 65 MOTION to Dismiss. LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL TOUPS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenny D Johnson-Sardella on behalf of Gerald A. DeCiccio. (Johnson-Sardella, Jenny) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 76 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio. (Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Gerald A. DeCiccio.(Hunter, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: ORDERED, that SRFF's motion, pursuant to Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules for the Southern and Eastern Districts ofNew York, for leave to withdraw as counsel for Longwei is GRANTED, and SRFF is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Longwei in this action, and SRFF is relieved of all further duties and responsibilities for Longwei in this action; and it is further ORDERED, that Longwei's time to answer or move with respect to the Consolidated Complaint is stayed and tolled to September 18, 2013; and it is further ORDERED ORDERED, that Longwei is directed to retain new counsel in this action through new counsel on or before September 18, 2013. Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited answer due 9/18/2013. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/20/2013) (rdz) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER PARTIALLY LIFTING THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY: IT IS ORDERED that the automatic discovery stay imposed by the PSLRA is hereby lifted so that Lead Plaintiffs may, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45, serve a document preservation subpoena on nonparty GeoInvesting LLC concerning issues relevant to Lead Plaintiffs' claims in this litigation. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/21/2013) (rdz) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (23 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS.. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Anthony J. Costantini, Esq. in Support re: (23 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS.. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CHILD, VAN WAGONER & BRADSHAW, PLLC; ANDERSON BRADSHAW, PLLC; AND RUSSELL ANDERSONS. Document filed by Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Paul Potere on behalf of Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Potere, Kevin) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J. Costantini on behalf of Russell Anderson, Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC, Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Affirmation in Support and exhibits: and Memorandum of Law served on Plaintiffs on August 14, 2013. Document filed by Michael Toups. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Gary A. Varnavides in Support re: (65 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 17 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 17 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (65 in 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 17 in 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 23 in 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 17 in 1:13-cv-00422-HB) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Michael Toups. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Michael Toups.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY AFFIRMATION of Christopher P. Milazzo in Support re: 55 MOTION for SICHENZIA ROSS FRIEDMAN FERENCE LLP to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited. (Milazzo, Christopher) Modified on 8/7/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION for SICHENZIA ROSS FRIEDMAN FERENCE LLP to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited. (Milazzo, Christopher) Modified on 8/7/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Opposition re: 61 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 58 Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and accompanying papers served on Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited and Richard W. Gonnello,Esq. on July 30, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited. (Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant shall show cause as to why an Order should not be entered permitting, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, Sichenzia Ross Friedman Ference LLP to unconditionally withdraw as counsel for Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited; staying all pending and further proceedings in this matter for a period of days, following the written Decision of this Court on this application, to allow Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited time to obtain new counsel in this matter; extending Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited's time to answer Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Harold Baer. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/30/2013) (ama) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited, Michael Toups. (Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Gerald A. DeCiccio served on 7/10/2013, answer due 7/31/2013. Service was accepted by AUDREY DECICCIO, SPOUSE. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION for SICHENZIA ROSS FRIEDMAN FERENCE LLP to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited, Michael Toups. (Varnavides, Gary) Modified on 7/26/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for SICHENZIA ROSS FRIEDMAN FERENCE LLP to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited, Michael Toups. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Varnavides, Gary) Modified on 7/26/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 52 MOTION to Serve LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 52 MOTION to Serve LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Serve LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS CAI YONGJUN AND XUE YONGPING BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Russell Anderson served on 7/15/2013, answer due 8/5/2013. Service was accepted by ANNETTE WRIGHT, ADMINISTRATIVE ASSISTANT. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Child, Van Wagoner and Associates, PLLC served on 7/10/2013, answer due 7/31/2013. Service was accepted by CAMERON PRIBBLE, TAX MANAGER. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Anderson Bradshaw, PLLC served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013. Service was accepted by LORI MURPHY, OFFICE MANAGER. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 350.00.) Document filed by Chris Basnett, Charlie Muniz, Paul Howard, June Ma.(cd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2013: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5) (sdi). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Do the parties consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. P. 73? No. This case is added to the March 2016 Trailing Trial Calendar.Jury Trial. Estimated number of trial days is 10-15. No additional causes of action or defenses may be asserted after August 1, 2014. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2014. Fully briefed motion to dismiss filed or before October 7, 2013. Motions due by 11/1/2015. Discovery due by 7/1/2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(ama) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING THE LPH INVESTOR GROUP'S MOTION FOR (1) CONSOLIDATION; (2) APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF; AND (3) APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL: granting 18 Motion to Consolidate Cases 13CV214 (as Lead Case) with 13cv229,13cv278,13cv422; granting 18 Motion to Appoint LPH Investor Group as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:13-cv-00214-HB; The motion of the LPH Investor Group to consolidate the above-captioned actions ("Consolidated Action") is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), the Consolidated Action is to be consolidated for all purposes, including, without limitation, discovery, pretrial proceedings and trial. The motion of the LPH Investor Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff in the Consolidated Action is GRANTED. The motion of the LPH Investor Group for approval of its counsel as Lead Counsel is GRANTED. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00214-HB, 1:13-cv-00229-HB, 1:13-cv-00278-HB, 1:13-cv-00422-HB(ama) Modified on 5/15/2013 (ama). (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated 5/06/2013 re: We respectfully request that the Court reschedule the Conference to 4:00 p.m. on May 8, 2013, as initially scheduled by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 4:15 p.m. on May 8, 2013. SO ORDERED., ( Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2013 at 04:15 PM before Judge Harold Baer.) (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/07/2013) (ama) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Donald Pritt and Volker Piasta to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 25 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel., 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214; 1:13-cv-278; 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00214, 1:13-cv-00229, 1:13-cv-00278, 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214, 1:13-cv-229, 1:13-cv-278, 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Milberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by William Tylutki. (Alba, Mario) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited.(Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Anthony Varnavides on behalf of Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited, Michael Toups (Varnavides, Gary) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR LEAD PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Volker Piasta, Donald Pritt. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF RICHARD W. GONNELLO IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE LPH INVESTOR GROUPS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF in Support re: 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE LPH INVESTOR GROUPS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214; 1:13-cv-278; 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier, Todd Okimoto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kotz Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Hechter Declaration)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE LPH INVESTOR GROUPS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF in Support re: 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re: 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE LPH INVESTOR GROUPS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND IN OPPOSITION TO ALL COMPETING MOTIONS. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214; 1:13-cv-278; 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier, Todd Okimoto. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214, 1:13-cv-229, 1:13-cv-278, 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Milberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Catherine Dandy, Khaled Mously. (Rado, Andrei) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Richard D Kozma. (Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Motion For Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel re: 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00214, 1:13-cv-00229, 1:13-cv-00278, 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Marcin Kolakowski, Malkit Sappal. (Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Gregory Linkh, Esq. from Linda Eckhouse, Judicial Assistant to the Honorable Harold Baer, Jr. dated 3/15/2013 re: There will be a Pre-Trial Conference (PTC) on the above case at 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, April 25, 2013, in Chambers, Room 2230.(ama) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #26) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Richard D Kozma. (Bunch, Stephen) Modified on 3/7/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #25) - MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Richard D Kozma.(Bunch, Stephen) Modified on 3/7/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of S. Douglas Bunch in Support re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Richard D Kozma. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Richard D Kozma. (Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Richard D Kozma.(Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Greg Linkh in Support re: 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00214, 1:13-cv-00229, 1:13-cv-00278, 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Marcin Kolakowski, Malkit Sappal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B: Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C: Loss Table, # 4 Exhibit D: Firm Resume)(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00214, 1:13-cv-00229, 1:13-cv-00278, 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Marcin Kolakowski, Malkit Sappal. (Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214; 1:13-cv-278; 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier, Todd Okimoto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B, Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C, Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D, Joint Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00214, 1:13-cv-00229, 1:13-cv-00278, 1:13-cv-00422., MOTION to Appoint Marcin Kolakowski and Malkit Sappal to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP. Document filed by Marcin Kolakowski, Malkit Sappal.(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of RICHARD W. GONNELLO in Support re: 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422. MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by LPH Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-00229; 1:13-cv-00278; 1:13-cv-00422., MOTION to Appoint LPH Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by LPH Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of S. Douglas Bunch in Support re: 11 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Richard D Kozma. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bunch, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #22) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214; 1:13-cv-278; 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP. MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier, Todd Okimoto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B, Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C, Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D, Joint Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 3/6/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on DEFENDANTS on 3/6/13. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Volker Piasta, Donald Pritt. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Donald Pritt and Volker Piasta to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Volker Piasta, Donald Pritt. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Richard D Kozma. (Bunch, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Donald Pritt and Volker Piasta to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Volker Piasta, Donald Pritt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Appoint Richard D. Kozma to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Richard D Kozma.(Bunch, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214; 1:13-cv-278; 1:13-cv-422., MOTION to Appoint Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier; Todd Okimoto to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP. Document filed by Excalibur Special Opportunities, L.P., Greg Lagermeier, Todd Okimoto. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Donald Pritt and Volker Piasta to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Donald Pritt, Volker Piasta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Mario Alba Jr. in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint William Tylutki to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by William Tylutki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, # 3 Exhibit C - Certification, # 4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Resume)(Alba, Mario) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint William Tylutki to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by William Tylutki. (Alba, Mario) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel., MOTION to Appoint William Tylutki to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by William Tylutki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Alba, Mario) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Andrei V. Rado in Support re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214, 1:13-cv-229, 1:13-cv-278, 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Milberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Catherine Dandy, Khaled Mously. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Milberg Firm Resume)(Rado, Andrei) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214, 1:13-cv-229, 1:13-cv-278, 1:13-cv-422. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Milberg LLP. MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Catherine Dandy, Khaled Mously. (Rado, Andrei) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:13-cv-214, 1:13-cv-229, 1:13-cv-278, 1:13-cv-422., MOTION to Appoint Khaled Mously and Catherine Dandy to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Milberg LLP. Document filed by Khaled Mously, Catherine Dandy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rado, Andrei) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jd) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against James Crane, Longwei Petroleum Investment Holding Limited, Michael Toups, Cai Youngjun. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401057207)Document filed by Chris Basnett.(jd) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 2,062 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?