Branch Banking & Trust Company v. Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00643-RWS
District Judge Richard W. Story, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 3:56 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Branch Banking And Trust Company, Plaintiff
BB&T Corporation BB&T Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Branch Banking & Trust Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JOHN GREGORY PERRY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Allen Ebbs +1 404 872 7000 +1 404 870 8183 aebbs@wcsr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George William Long, III +1 404 888 7443 wlong@wcsr.com
v.
No Logo Lawrence Todd Maxwell, Defendant
No Logo Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC, Defendant
No Logo William D. Drost, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Office Atlanta
Filed 2/28/2013
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/12/2015
Origin 4
Reopened 10/15/2014
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags 4months,CLOSED
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff Branch Banking & Trust Company has informed the Court that Defendant William D. Drost's debts have been discharged as part of a bankruptcy proceeding. As such, Plaintiff does not intend to pursue its claims against Defendant Drost at this time. Judgement has already been entered against Defendants Odyssey and Maxwell [Doc. No. 66]. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/12/2015. (cem)
    LREF
    Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
    Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Thomas C. Saunders re [70] Order. (cem)
      LREF
      Blank  Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (cem)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Case Under Chapter 7 of the United States Bankruptcy Code and Notice of Automatic Stay by Lawrence Todd Maxwell (Sandler, Theodore) Modified on 3/30/2015 to modify entry to reflect efiled pleading. (cem)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
          Case Reassigned to Judge Richard W. Story. Judge Harold L. Murphy no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:13-cv-643-RWS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dob)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Certification of Judgment
            CERTIFICATION of Judgment for registration in another District of the 10/30/14 judgment against defendants Odyssey and Maxwell. Forwarded original to Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLC in the SASE provided. (jpa)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
              Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney for Branch Banking & Trust Company re Writ Issued. USPS 7010 0290 0000 1441 3558. (dob)
                LREF
                Blank  Writ Issued
                WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $821,912.01. (dob)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Notice of Application for Writ
                  NOTICE of Application for Writ by Branch Banking & Trust Company (Ebbs, Arthur)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
                    CONSENT JUDGMENT against Defendants Odyssey and Maxwell in the amount of $821,912.01 at the interest rate as provided by statute. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 10/30/2014. (dob)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Submission to District Judge
                      Submission of [65] Stipulation, submitted to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (dob)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Stipulation
                        STIPULATION of Entry of Final Judgment by Branch Banking & Trust Company, William D. Drost, Lawrence Todd Maxwell, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Ebbs, Arthur)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Order on Motion to Reopen CaseCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [63] Motion to Reopen Case for the limited purpose of permitting Plaintiff to file a Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 10/15/2014. (dob)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Submission to District Judge
                            Submission of [63] MOTION to Reopen Case , submitted to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (dob)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              Case Reassigned to Judge Harold L. Murphy. Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:13-cv-643-HLM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dob)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014, Terminated: 10/15/2014 Motion to Reopen Case
                                MOTION to Reopen Case by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                  Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas C. Saunders re [62] Order to Dismiss (jpa)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Order to DismissCourt Filing
                                    Order to Dismiss the action without prejudice to the right of any party, anytime within 60 days, to reopen or vacate this order of dismissal if settlement fails. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 7/28/14. (jpa)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  case no longer referred
                                      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (rth)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Terminated Case
                                        Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: 5/21/2014 Leave of Absence
                                          Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/26/14, 7/27/14, 7/28/14, 7/29/14, 7/30/14, 7/31/14, 8/1/14, 8/2/14, by George William Long, III. (Long, George)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                            Order directing parties appear for Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1879 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. All parties SHALL submit a BRIEF informal confidential ex partememorandum to the undersigned no later than 12:00 p.m. on July 22, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 5/9/2014. (dob)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                              Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas Saunders re [59] Order Referring Case to Settlement Judge (jpa)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Order Referring Case to Settlement JudgeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman for a mediation session. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 4/23/14. (jpa)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                  Submission of [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment , submitted to District Judge Robert L. Vining. (dob)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                    Submission of [57] Order, Set Submission Deadline, submitted to District Judge Robert L. Vining. (dob)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT by Branch Banking & Trust Company, William D. Drost, Lawrence Todd Maxwell, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                        Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas Saunders re [57] Order (jpa)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report informing the court of their respective positions regarding the impact of defendant Drost's bankruptcy filing in this case. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 3/21/14. (jpa)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE by William D. Drost Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Clark, Matthew)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                              Submission of [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment , submitted to District Judge Robert L. Vining. (dob)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Statement of Material Facts
                                                                  Statement of Material Facts re [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William D. Drost, Lawrence Todd Maxwell, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Benjamin Falk)(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Response to Statement of Material Facts
                                                                  Response to Statement of Material Facts re [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William D. Drost, Lawrence Todd Maxwell, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Clark, Matthew)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Clark, Matthew)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lawrence Todd Maxwell. (Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                        Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas C. Saunders re [50] Order (jpa)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [49] Motion for Extension of Time through 11/4/13 to file their response to the [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 10/11/13. (jpa)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013, Terminated: 10/11/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File a Response to Motion for Summary Judgment re: [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lawrence Todd Maxwell. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                              Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas C. Saunders re [48] Order (jpa)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [47] Motion for Extension of Time through 11/4/13 to respond to the [44] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 10/8/13. (jpa)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013, Terminated: 10/8/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to [44] Motion for Summary Judgment by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Matthew) Modified on 10/8/2013 to add applicable link (dob).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Deposition
                                                                                    DEPOSITION of William D. Drost taken on 08/22/2013 by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits to Deposition of William D. Drost)(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Deposition
                                                                                    DEPOSITION of Lawrence Todd Maxwell taken on 08/22/2013 by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits to Deposition of Lawrence Todd Maxwell)(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013, Terminated: 7/28/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Statement of Material Facts, # (3) Exhibit "A" - Note, # (4) Exhibit "B" - Security Deed, # (5) Exhibit 'C" - Maxwell Guaranty, # (6) Exhibit "D" - Drost Guaranty, # (7) Exhibit "E" - Demand Letter, # (8) Exhibit "F" - Transaction History, # (9) Affidavit of Yvonne M. Beck, # (10) Declaration of Arthur A. Ebbs)(Ebbs, Arthur) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Maxwell's Request for Production of Documents by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Maxwell's Interrogatories by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC's and William D. Drost's 1st Request for Production of Documents by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC's First Continuing Interrogatories by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Notice of Deposition of William D. Drost; (ii) Notice of Deposition of Lawrence Todd Maxwell; and (iii) Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Maxwell's Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Lawrence Todd Maxwell.(Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Maxwell's Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production by Lawrence Todd Maxwell.(Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Requests for Production to Plaintiff, Branch Banking and Trust Company by Lawrence Todd Maxwell.(Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Branch Banking and Trust Company by Lawrence Todd Maxwell.(Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Continuing Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1st Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Drost by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1st Interrogatories to Defendant Drost by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1st Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Maxwell by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1st Interrogatories to Defendant Maxwell by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 1st Request for Production of Documents to Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 1st Interrogatories to Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                  Initial Disclosures by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: re:[18] Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 4/26/13. (jpa)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                      Initial Disclosures by Lawrence Todd Maxwell.(Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                        Initial Disclosures by Branch Banking & Trust Company.(Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                          Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company, William D. Drost, Lawrence Todd Maxwell, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                            Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas Saunders re [17] Order on Motion to Set Aside Default (jpa)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 4/1/2013 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [15] Motion to Set Aside Default as to William D. Trost. Defendants' Drost and Odyssey's answer is due on March 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 3/28/13. (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [1] COMPLAINT by William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC.(Clark, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013, Terminated: 3/28/2013 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default and Stipulation by Branch Banking & Trust Company, William D. Drost, Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Clark, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: William D. Drost and Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC answers' due 3/28/2013. (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/27/2013 Clerks Notation for LOA/CIPCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notation re [13] Certificate of Interested Persons approved by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking & Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation for Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013, Terminated: 3/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to William D. Drost by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Entry of Default as to William D. Drost. (dob)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] COMPLAINT by Lawrence Todd Maxwell. Discovery ends on 8/22/2013.(Sandler, Theodore) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Thomas Saunders re [10] Order on Application for Admission PHV (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Alan Perez re [9] Order on Application for Admission PHV (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/22/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [8] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas C. Saunders. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 3/21/13. (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/22/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan L. Perez. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 3/21/13. (jpa)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [8] APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas C. Saunders Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4464754). Attorney Thomas C. Saunders added appearing on behalf of Lawrence Todd Maxwell (pb)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                          APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [7] APPLICATION for Admission of Alan L. Perez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4464743). Attorney Alan L. Perez added appearing on behalf of Lawrence Todd Maxwell (pb)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013, Terminated: 3/21/2013
                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas C. Saunders Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4464754)by Lawrence Todd Maxwell. (Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013, Terminated: 3/21/2013
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Alan L. Perez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4464743)by Lawrence Todd Maxwell. (Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Howard Sandler on behalf of Lawrence Todd Maxwell (Sandler, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. William D. Drost served on 3/4/2013, answer due 3/25/2013. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. Lawrence Todd Maxwell served on 3/4/2013, answer due 3/25/2013. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC served on 3/5/2013, answer due 3/26/2013. (Ebbs, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Summons Issued as to William D. Drost, Lawrence Todd Maxwell and Odyssey (VIII) DP I, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) L. Maxwell, # (2) W. Drost)(eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113E-4436104.) (Attachments: # (1) Note, # (2) Note Modification, # (3) Deed to Secure Debt, # (4) Maxwell Guaranty, # (5) Drost Guaranty, # (6) Notice, # (7) Confirmation Order, # (8) Verification, # (9) Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 83,778 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?