GUTHRIE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00234
District Judge Sarah Evans Barker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 2:30 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo PAUL A. GUTHRIE, Plaintiff
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo ELENA KAGAN, Defendant
No Logo ERIC HOLDER, Defendant
No Logo JANE MAGNUS-STINSON, Defendant
No Logo JOHN KERRY, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN, JR."
No Logo MARTIN DEMPSEY, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT MUELLER III, Defendant
No Logo SONIA SOTOMAYOR, Defendant
United States House of Representatives United States House of Representatives, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES"
No Logo United States Congress, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
United States Senate United States Senate, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CLOSED JUDGMENT - The court, having this day made its Entry, IT IS THEREFORE ADJUDGED that this cause of action is dismissed. The claim against Judge Magnus-Stinson is dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/8/2013. c/m (TMA) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    Entry and Order Dismissing Action. (See Entry for details.) Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/8/2013. c/m (TMA) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
      REPLY to Court's, re 16 Entry and Order to Show Cause, no c/s filed by Plaintiff PAUL A. GUTHRIE. (Part 1) (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(MAC) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        Entry and Notice: Based on the partial stay issued on April 3, 2013, the motions filed on April 2, 2013 13 , 14 , 15 are each denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/9/2013. Copy sent to Paul Guthrie via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENTRY and Notice - The plaintiff is recycling claims put to rest in Guthrie v. Obama, et al., No. 1:13-cv-0080-JMS-DKL (S.D.Ind. Jan. 18, 2013). He shall have through April 18, 2013, in which to show cause why this action should not be summarily dismissed for the same reasons. Proceedings except as just directed are stayed until further order. Copy mailed. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/3/2013.(MAC) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiff PAUL A. GUTHRIE. c/s (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(CKM) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Default Judgment, filed by Plaintiff PAUL A. GUTHRIE. c/s (CKM) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Order to Compel, filed by Plaintiff PAUL A. GUTHRIE. c/s (CKM) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                  RETURN of Service, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. JOHN BOEHNER served on 2/28/2013. (MAC) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                    RETURN of Service, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. PATRICK LEAHY served on 2/28/2013. (MAC) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                      RETURN of Service, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. ROBERT MUELLER III served on 2/28/2013. (CKM) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                        RETURN of Service, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. ERIC HOLDER served on 2/14/2013. (CKM) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                          RETURN of Service, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. JOHN KERRY served on 2/14/2013. (CKM) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                            RETURN of Service, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. MARTIN DEMPSEY served on 2/14/2013. (CKM) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                              Submission Service of Process to Barrack Obama, filed by Plaintiff PAUL A. GUTHRIE. (JKS) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                Submission Proof of Service to Joseph Biden, filed by Plaintiff PAUL A. GUTHRIE. (JKS) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTION against All Defendants, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. c/s (Attachments: # 1 Changes Reflected in Amended Compliant, # 2 Summons Issued, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Proof of Service)(CKM) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                    MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MSD) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      Summons Issued as to JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN, JR, MARTIN DEMPSEY, ERIC HOLDER, ELENA KAGAN, JOHN KERRY, JANE MAGNUS-STINSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, SONIA SOTOMAYOR, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, UNITED STATES CONGRESS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SENATE. (MSD) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT against JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN, JR, MARTIN DEMPSEY, ERIC HOLDER, ELENA KAGAN, JOHN KERRY, JANE MAGNUS-STINSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, SONIA SOTOMAYOR, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, UNITED STATES CONGRESS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES SENATE, filed by PAUL A. GUTHRIE. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt IP034138 Filing Fee $350.00)(MSD) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?