Barghouti v. Davis
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01258-GPM-DGW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 1:17 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jamal Barghouti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary L. Klein +1 816 983 8363 +1 816 983 8080 hillary.klein@huschblackwell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Cartwright Thomas +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 noah.thomas@huschblackwell.com
v.
No Logo David Rednour, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEGAL COUNCIL FOR HEALTH JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley D Gillespie +1 217 782 9056 +1 217 782 8767 BGillespie@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Higgerson +1 217 557 0261 +1 217 524 5091 chiggerson@atg.state.il.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Lu +1 217 782 9026 +1 217 782 8767 tlu@atg.state.il.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen L McNaught +1 217 782 1841 +1 217 524 5091 kmcnaught@atg.state.il.us
No Logo Sarah Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Warden Randy Pfister, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of EXCERPT OF CLOSING ARGUMENT (TRIAL DAY 2 OF 2) held on 6/17/2015, before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Court Reporter Molly Clayton, Telephone number 618.482.9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2015. (mnc) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Furnishing Jury Meals. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/17/15. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
      STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
        Defendant's Exhibit List. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
          Plaintiff's Exhibit List. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 89 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
            JURY VERDICT FORMS. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
              Jury Instructions. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Day 2 of Jury Trial completed on 6/17/2015. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                  Preliminary Jury Instruction. (drb) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Day 1 of Jury Trial held on 6/16/2015. Day 2 of Jury Trial set for 6/17/2015 at 8:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (drb) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      VIDEO WRIT ISSUED as to employee Angela Crain, nursing supervisor, to be held Wednesday, June 17, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. at the East St. Louis Courthouse by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (drb) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE AND ORDER: IDOC and the Warden of Menard Correctional Center shall arrange to have employee, Angela Crain, nursing supervisor, present via video conference on Wednesday, June 17, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/15/15. (drb) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION in Limine by Ryan Davis. (Lu, Terry) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER, GRANTING 79 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Pretrial Order Witness List. The motion explains that, in the Final Pretrial Order, Defendant listed Gail Walls (Health Care Unit Administrator at Menard CC) as a witness. Defendant has since learned that Ms. Walls is unable to testify at trial and Defendant would like to call Angela Crain (Nursing Supervisor at Menard CC) in her place. As Plaintiff has no objection to the motion, the Court GRANTS this request. Defendant may call Angela Crain as a witness at trial. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 06/10/2015. (bak)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE AND ORDER: IDOC and the Warden of Menard Correctional Center shall arrange to have Jamal Barghouti present on 6/16/2015 at 8:30 a.m. in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/8/2015. (jmp) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Pretrial Order by Ryan Davis. (Lu, Terry) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/3/15. (sgp) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER re 74 Pretrial Conference - Final: Defendant's objection to the tardy disclosure of Plaintiff's witness ("Plaintiff's mother") is overruled. However, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a stipulation/notification of the substance of this witness' testimony by June 9, 2015. The Oral Motion for Protective Order made by Defendant is GRANTED. The stipulated Protective Order will be entered by separate docket entry. Parties are reminded that if a settlement conference would be beneficial, they should contact chambers forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/3/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS - striking Set/Reset Hearings. Notice entered in incorrect case. See attached document for specifics. (anm) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Parties to email to Judge Rosenstengel's chambers, NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov, proposed jury instructions by 6/9/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/3/15. (sgp) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/2/2015. Noah Thomas and Theodore Bynum appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Terry Lu and Karen McNaught appeared on behalf of Defendant. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Electronic.) (jmp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore R. Bynum on behalf of Jamal Barghouti (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                              MOTION in Limine to Bar Plaintiff from Referring to Events Which Precede the Relevant Time Period by Ryan Davis. (Lu, Terry) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. McNaught on behalf of Ryan Davis (McNaught, Karen) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence of Past and Current Convictions by Jamal Barghouti. (Thomas, Noah) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Status Conference held on 5/13/2015. Attorney Thomas for Plaintiff and attorney Lu for Defendant. Parties indicate that they have conferred and addressed their discovery disputes. Plaintiff is granted leave to depose Defendant. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2015 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Parties shall submit the proposed final pretrial order by 5/29/15. Jury Trial RESET for 6/16/2015 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference is CONVERTED to a telephonic Status Conference set for 5/13/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Parties should be prepared to discuss outstanding discovery issues and the rescheduling of the final pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/13/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Cartwright Thomas on behalf of Jamal Barghouti (Thomas, Noah) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 65 Notice (Other) filed by Jamal Barghouti. See attached document for specifics. (anm) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                            STRICKEN PURSUANT TO NOTICE AT DOC. 66 -NOTICE by Jamal Barghouti of Service of Subpoenas (Klein, Hillary) Modified on 1/26/2015 (anm). (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: The status conference set for 2/12/15 is hereby CANCELLED. If the parties believe that a status conference is necessary prior to the May 13, 2015 final pretrial conference, they may contact chambers. (sgp) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/22/2015. Attorney Klein for Plaintiff and attorney Lu for Defendant. Discovery deadline RESET to 4/1/2015. (sgp) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 61 Motion to Clarify: By way of clarification, Plaintiff is permitted to serve non-party subpoenas that are necessary in order to effectively prepare for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/5/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Clarify Order Regarding Discovery by Jamal Barghouti. (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 59 Notice (Other) filed by Jamal Barghouti. Although said document was not signed, notices of filing of discovery are not required by this court. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE by Jamal Barghouti Certificate of Service (Klein, Hillary) Modified on 11/26/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER re 57 Status Conference: The Discovery deadline is extended to 2/12/2015. Plaintiff is limited to 10 interrogatories and 10 requests to produce. Discovery requests to be served by 11/26/14. Responses due by 12/31/14. Defendant's deposition to be taken by 1/30/15. If the parties have a dispute as to discovery, they shall contact chambers for a conference. No motions regarding discovery shall be filed except by permission of the Court. No dispositive motions are anticipated. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/12/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff to initiate the conference call. The Court's conference number is 618 482 9004. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/13/2015 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Jury Trial RESET for 6/17/2015 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/13/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Status Conference held on 11/13/2014. Attorney Klein for Plaintiff and attorney Lu for Defendant. Order to issue. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 54 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Ryan Davis. Attorney Bradley D Gillespie terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/13/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Higgerson on behalf of Ryan Davis (Higgerson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Ryan Davis. (Lu, Terry) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Shing-Ren Lu on behalf of Ryan Davis (Lu, Terry) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 51 MOTION to Continue Trial and Reopening of Discovery filed by Jamal Barghouti. The trial date of 12/2/14 is hereby VACATED. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to a telephonic Status Conference for 11/13/2014 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff to initiate the conference call. Parties should be prepared to discuss the parameters of additional discovery in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/12/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Trial and Reopening of Discovery by Jamal Barghouti. (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict with the Court's trial calendar, the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 11/13/2014 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 FPTC Order Template and Instructions)(jmp) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamal Barghouti. (anm) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Docket Annotation - Notices for transmission of documents sent electronically to Stateville Correctional Center turned off, as plaintiff has court-appointed attorney. (myz) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/17/2014. Attorney Klein for Plaintiff and attorney Gillespie for Defendant. This matter is SET for a Final Pretrial Conference set at 10/28/2014 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER RESETTING TRIAL DATE: Jury Trial is reset for 12/2/2014 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Magistrate Judge Wilkerson will set a Final Pretrial Conference by separate notice using he 12/2/14 trial date. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/11/14. (drb) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 159 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear case number 12-1258-NJR-DGW. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/19/2014. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary L. Klein on behalf of Jamal Barghouti (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter to Pro Bono Attorney Klein regarding appointment to case. (mar) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Attorney Hillary L. Klein for Jamal Barghouti added. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/17/2014 at 1:30 PM in before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Defendant to intitate conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/2/14. (sgp) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 40 ); and DENIES Davis's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 21 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/10/14. (jdh) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Davis. Objections to R&R due by 2/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/15/14. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(sgp) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER FOR TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/15/2014. (jmp) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Pavey Hearing held on 1/13/2014. Pro-Se Plaintiff appeared via video. Attorney Bradley Gillespie appeared on behalf of Defendant. Sarah Johnson, witness for the defense appeared via video. Court heard argument on the issue of exhaustion. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Daveanna Johnson.) (jmp) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    VIDEO WRIT ISSUED as to Jamal Barghouti to be held 1/13/2014 at 2:00 p.m. at the East St. Louis Courthouse by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE AND ORDER: IDOC and the Warden of Stateville Correctional Center shall arrange to have Jamal Barghouti present via video on 1/13/2014 at 2:00 p.m. in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/10/2014. (jmp) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response already has been filed on 12/23/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/7/14. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jamal Barghouti. (myz) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT filed by Jamal Barghouti. (cjo ) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 31 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/23/13. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 28 Order on Motion for Recruitment of Counsel by Jamal Barghouti. (jaj) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jamal Barghouti. (jaj) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 154 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. Judge G. Patrick Murphy no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 12/2/13. (trb) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 27 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel filed by Jamal Barghouti, GRANTING 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jamal Barghouti. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment .( Responses due by 12/27/2013). Pavey Evidentiary Hearing RESET for 1/13/2014 02:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff to appear by videoconference and Defendant to appear by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/22/13. (sgp) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Jamal Barghouti. (trb) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jamal Barghouti. (trb) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall fill out and submit the form "Motion for Recruitment of Counsel." Clerk to mail blank copy of form to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/29/13. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jamal Barghouti. (bkl) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Ryan Davis re 22 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gillespie, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, A-1, B)(Gillespie, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ryan Davis. Responses due by 11/21/2013 (Gillespie, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE regarding discovery materials. (tkm ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Clerk of Court DIRECTED to modify the docket sheet to reflect the full name of Defendant Davis as highlighted in his Answer, Ryan Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/16/13. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions re Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies due by 10/18/2013, Pavey Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Discovery due by 3/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/16/13. (sgp) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER : All parties having been served pursuant to the Court's Order dated 3/22/2013, this case is now assigned a presumptive jury trial month of December 2014. The magistrate judge is DIRECTED to enter a scheduling and discovery order in accordance with this date. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 8/21/2013. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Davis.(Gillespie, Bradley) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (or other responsive pleading) filed by Davis. Davis answer due 8/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/7/2013. (mjh) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (or other responsive pleading) by Davis. (Gillespie, Bradley) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Davis waiver sent on 5/28/2013, answer due 7/29/2013. (tjk) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Davis on 5/28/2013. Waiver of Service due by 6/27/2013. (tjk) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Davis. (tjk) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/10/2013. (mjh) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Davis on 3/25/2013. Waiver of Service due by 4/24/2013. (tjk) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Defendants PFISTER, REDNOUR, and JOHNSON are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff has stated an Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant DAVIS. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall prepare for DEFENDANT DAVIS: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/22/2013. (tjk) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 43.92 received, receipt number 34625038708 (cds) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jamal Barghouti. (tkm ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jamal Barghouti. (tkm ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. 2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $43.92. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, P.O. Box 249, East St. Louis, Illinois 62202. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Stateville Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 12/17/2012. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number. (Attachments: # 1 Notice/Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge) (jaj) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamal Barghouti. (jaj) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Defendants PFISTER, REDNOUR, and JOHNSON are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff has stated an Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant DAVIS. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall prepare for DEFENDANT DAVIS: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/22/2013. (tjk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jamal Barghouti.(jaj) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?