Roland et al v. Green et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00224
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 5:51 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Daniel P Landry, Plaintiff
No Logo Deborah S Forbes, Plaintiff
No Logo G. Kendall Forbes, Plaintiff
No Logo James Roland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Preis Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter +1 225 387 0707 +1 225 344 0510 crystal@preislaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Charles Malcolm Gordon +1 225 387 0707 +1 225 344 0510 chuck@preislaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Caroline Dana Preis +1 225 387 0707 +1 225 344 0510 caroline@preislaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Phillip W. Preis +1 225 387 0707 +1 225 344 0510 phil@preislaw.com
No Logo Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Plaintiff
No Logo John Wade, Plaintiff
No Logo Lynn J Philippe, Plaintiff
No Logo M.D. Terence Beven, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael J Giambrone, Plaintiff
No Logo Ralph D D'Amore, Plaintiff
No Logo Rodney P Starkey, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald R Marston, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen R Wilson, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Roland, Plaintiff
No Logo T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas E Bowden, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas J. Moran, Plaintiff
No Logo William Bruce Johnson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ABC Bond Company, Defendant
No Logo Alvaro Trullenque, Defendant
No Logo At Lloyd's of London In Syndicates 2987, 1866, 1084, 1274, 4000 & 1183, Defendant

Represented by Phelps Dunbar LLP

No Logo Bernard Young, Defendant
No Logo Charles Jantzi, Defendant
No Logo Danny Bogar, Defendant
No Logo Dirk Harris, Defendant
No Logo Gary Haindel, Defendant
No Logo Grady Layfield, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Donna Garbarino Schwab +1 225 936 6452 dgschwab@hotmail.com
No Logo Hank Mills, Defendant
No Logo J. D. Perry, Defendant
No Logo Jack Bruno, Defendant
No Logo James Fontenot, Defendant
No Logo Jason Green, Defendant
No Logo Jay Comeaux, Defendant
No Logo Jim Weller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James M Reed +1 918 594 0462 +1 918 594 0505 jreed@hallestill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marionneaux, Kyle Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Kyle Christian Marionneaux +1 225 769 7473 +1 225 757 1709 kyle@kmxlaw.com
No Logo Joe Klingen, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Schwab, Defendant
No Logo Lena Stinson, Defendant
No Logo Rhonda Lear, Defendant
No Logo RST Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Russ Newton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newton, Russ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russ Newton +1 713 827 0545 txnewton@yahoo.com
No Logo SEI Investments Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Rachel Morgan +1 214 757 8023 +1 214 746 2211 rachel.morgan@att.com

Represented by Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. +1 215 963 4806 +1 215 963 5001 gordon.cooney@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Allyson Newton Ho +1 214 466 4180 +1 214 466 4001 allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
No Logo Stanford Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Newland, Defendant
No Logo Tiffany Angelle, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Parsons, Defendant
No Logo XYZ INSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo Zack Parrish, Defendant
No Logo Adams and Reese LLP, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
No Logo Bowen, Miclette & Britt, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Bradley W Foster +1 214 659 4400 +1 214 659 4401 bradfoster@andrewskurth.com
No Logo Edward Valdespino, Interested Party
No Logo John J Little, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gleboff Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Stephen G Gleboff +1 214 593 6458 sgleboff@gleboff-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Little, Pedersen, Fankhauser & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John J Little +1 214 573 2305 +1 214 573 2323 jlittle@lpf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Hoyt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing TTAB Attorney Placeholder mhoyt@pattonhoyt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Court Appointed Examiner Megan Dredla Hoyt +1 214 969 1454 +1 214 999 9158 megan.hoyt@tklaw.com
No Logo Anita Ellen Carter, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony Ventrella, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Arthur Ordoyne, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Arthur Waxley, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Bennie O'Rear, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Billie Ruth McMorris, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Bobby Nix, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Stegall, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Hart, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Massey, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Sanchez, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Charles White, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Claude Marquette, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Claudia O'Rear, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Clyde J Chisholm, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Darrell Courville, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Kirby, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Fred Demarest, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Gary Magee, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Gordon C Gill, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Gwen Fabre, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Ira Causey, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Jacqueline Milet, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo James Brown, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo James Robert Stegall, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Burris, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Joan Feucht, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo John Buscheme, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Chustz, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Julie Savoy, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Kathleen Mier, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Dougherty, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Wilkewitz, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Kerry Kling, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Perkins, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Bebe Stores, Inc, Consol Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Larry Smith"
No Logo Laura Lee, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Leah Farr, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Boyd, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Lonnie Ordoyne, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Louis Mier, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Mamie Baumann, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Mamie Sanchez, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Marcel Dumestre, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Margaret Dumestre, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Margaret S Nix, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Martha Jean Witmer, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Merrill Laplante, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Monty Perkins, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Murphy Buell, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Gill, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Olivia Sue Warnock, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Feucht, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Bush, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Gildersleeve, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Schwendimann, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Smith, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald McMorris, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Valentine, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Witmer, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Terry Tarver, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Terry Tullis, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Slaughter, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Troy Lillie, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Virginia Buscheme, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Virginia McMorris, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Walter Stone, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Wanda Bevis, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo William Dawson, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo William Phillips, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Arlen Tiger Blackwell, Consol Defendant
No Logo Charles Rawl, Consol Defendant
No Logo James Keith Cox, Consol Defendant
No Logo Michael Word, Consol Defendant
No Logo Ron Clayton, Consol Defendant
No Logo Timothy E Parsons, Consol Defendant
No Logo Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Notice Only Party

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Karen L Hirschman +1 214 220 7795 + 214 220 7716 khirschman@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
No Logo P Mauricio Alvarado, Notice Only Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gerger & Clarke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David Gerger +1 713 224 4400 +1 713 224 5153 david@gergerclarke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B Gerger +1 713 224 4400 +1 713 224 5153 davidgerger@quinnemanuel.com
Proskauer Rose LLP Proskauer Rose LLP, Notice Only Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil Ross Burger +1 214 855 3076 +1 214 840 0120 nburger@ccsb.com
Space Bruce Collins +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 bcollins@ccsb.com
Space Fletcher L. Yarbrough, Jr. +1 214 855 3025 +1 214 855 1333 fyarbrough@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Neil Ross Burger +1 214 855 3076 +1 214 840 0120 nburger@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Bruce Collins +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 bcollins@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Fletcher L. Yarbrough, Jr. +1 214 855 3025 +1 214 855 1333 fyarbrough@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Rajesh S. James , +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3384 rajesh.james@davispolk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
No Logo Thomas V Sjoblom, Notice Only Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William B Mateja +1 214 747 5070 + 214 747 2091 mateja@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Joshua R. Hochberg +1 202 496 7691 +1 202 496 7756 jhochberg@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Mindy L Rattan +1 202 496 7691 mrattan@mckennalong.com
No Logo Official Stanford Investors Committee, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Butzel Long, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Peter D Morgenstern +1 212 818 1110 +1 212 818 0494 morgenstern@butzel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Castillo Snyder PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward C Snyder +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 esnyder@casnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strasburger & Price LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Andrew L Kerr +1 210 250 6015 +1 210 250 6100 andy.kerr@strasburger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward F Valdespino +1 210 250 6061 +1 210 250 6100 edward.valdespino@strasburger.com
No Logo Ralph S. Janvey, Receiver

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

No Logo Willis of Colorado, Inc., Notice Only
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 74 Notice of Appeal, filed by Virginia McMorris et al. Issued as Mandate: 4/27/12. (svc) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
    USCA5 Bill of Costs (svc) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
      Appeal Record Not Returned. Electronic copy of the record has been recycled (svc) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Filing of Bar Date Notice and Proof of Claim Form filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
          JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Virginia McMorris,et al. Case remanded to the district court for further proceedings. Issued as Mandate: 4/27/12. The electronic copy of the record has been recycled (svc) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 82 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
            Opinion of USCA (certified copy) in accordance with USCA judgment re 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Virginia McMorris,et al. The judgments are REVERSED. The Troice cases (3:10cv224) are remanded to the district court, and the Roland case is remanded to the State Court. (svc) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
              Received letter from USCA5 re: revised caption (svc) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                Record on Appeal for USCA5 11-10932 (related to 74 appeal): Record consisting of: 11 Volume(s) ECF electronic record((7 from 10cv224 and 4 from 10cv225), transmitted to USCA5. Shipped: Federal Express 296232215006231, 296232215006224 (svc) Modified on 1/18/2012 (svc). (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                  Received letter from USCA5 regarding removal of Mark Manela as an appellee. (svc) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                    Received letter from USCA5 re: Consolidation of appeals. (svc) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                      21-20 Declaration of Karyl Van Tassell from case 3:09cv721 filed per USCA5 ORDER granting motion to supplement the record on appeal. (svc) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                        Received letter from USCA5: The court has granted the appellants motion to supplement the record in this case (svc) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                          Transcript Order Form: re 74 Notice of Appeal transcript not requested (Preis, Phillip) Modified docket text on 9/29/2011 (jkm). (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 73 Judgment, 72 Order by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Dougherty, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, G. Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charles Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Billie Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Milet, Thomas J Moran, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Bennie O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J Philippe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Robert Stegall, Walter Stone, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen R Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-4137359. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Preis, Phillip) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ordered that the Plaintiffs take nothing by their claims against the Defendants and that those claims are dismissed with prejudice. Court costs are taxed against the Plaintiffs. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/31/2011) (skt) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: The Court dismisses this action with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/31/2011) (skt) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Amici Curiae filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Response Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                    Brief in Response to Amicus and Supplemental Submission Addressing SLUSA filed by SEI Investments Company re 67 Examiner's Brief, as Amicus Curiae, Addressing the Securities Litigation Uniform Standards Act, 64 Amicus Brief, 66 Amicus Curiae Brief Addressing the Securities Litigation Uniform Standards Act. (Morgan, Rachel) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/27/2011) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Response to Amicus and Supplemental Submissions re SLUSA filed by SEI Investments Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) (Morgan, Rachel) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                          Examiner's Brief, as Amicus Curiae, Addressing the Securities Litigation Uniform Standards Act filed by John J Little (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Dredla, Megan) Modified on 7/27/2011 (skt). (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                            Amicus Curiae Brief Addressing the Securities Litigation Uniform Standards Act filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee (Snyder, Edward) Modified on 7/27/2011 (skt). (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE: The Court takes judicial notice of the Declaration of Linda M. Yoder filed in SEC v. Stanford Intl Bank, Ltd, Civil Action No. 3:09-CV-298-N (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2011) (mfw) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                Amicus Brief filed by Ralph S. Janvey Regarding Applicability of SLUSA to Claims Concerning the Purchase or Sale of Stanford CD's (Sadler, Kevin) Modified on 7/25/2011 (skt). (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief Regarding Applicability of SLUSA to Claims Concerning the Purchase or Sale of Stanford CDs filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Amicus Brief) (Sadler, Kevin) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Edward Valdespino re 53 Order,,, (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE Letter to Judge Godbey regarding SLUSA issues in the Standord MDL proceeding filed by Bowen, Miclette & Britt, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C) (Foster, Bradley) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae addressing Securities Litigation Uniform Standards Act filed by John J Little (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Little, John) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) "A", # 2 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Supplemental NOTICE and Memorandum on SLUSA Issues by Roland Plaintiffs filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Dougherty, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, G. Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charles Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Billie Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Milet, Thomas J Moran, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Bennie O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J Philippe, William Phillips, Charles Rawl, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Robert Stegall, Walter Stone, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen R Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Preis, Phillip) Modified on 6/9/2011 (dnc). (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Filing in Other Action filed by Adams and Reese LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1). Party Adams & Reece LLP added. (Keltner, David) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Supplemental Document by Willis of Colorado, Inc. Letter to Court re SLUSA briefing. (Hartmann, Michelle) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Filing in Other Action filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:10cv0225 consolidated with lead case 3:10cv0224. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2011) (twd) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Any party that has briefed SLUSA issues in a case proceeding under this MDL may call the Court's attention to that briefing by filing an appropriate notice in Roland within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. It is unnecessary for the parties in Civil Action No. 3:09-CV-1600-N to provide such notice. Any other party desiring to apprise the Court of its views should file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, a motion for leave to file an amicus brief, together with a copy of such proposed brief not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Motions for leave should indicate how the partys legal position differs from those of the parties in Roland and Troice v. Proskauer. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/10/2011) (jkm) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/28/2011 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1351, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2011) (jkm) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          STATUS REPORT Examiner's Report No. 3 filed by John J Little. (jkm) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/23/2010 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX, 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Counsel is advised multiple NEFs may be received for this filing.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/20/2010) (jkm) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allyson N Ho for Rachel Morgan on behalf of SEI Investments Company. (Ho, Allyson) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allyson N Ho on behalf of SEI Investments Company. (Ho, Allyson) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James M Reed on behalf of Jim Weller.. Party James Weller added. (Reed, James) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Caroline D. Preis (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 38236) filed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. (klm) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Crystal D. Burkhalter (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 38326) filed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. (klm) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles M. Gordon, Jr. (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 38326) filed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. (klm) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Phillip W. Preis (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 38326) filed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. (klm) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:09-cv-00676. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order Transferring Case to MDL Court. Electronic letter sent....Northern District of Texas (LSM, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter from the MDL Panel (Not Certified) dated 3/3/2010 from Clerk, MDL Panel to Clerk of Court. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION to USMJ: 28 MOTION to Remand in Response to Notice of Removal by SEI and Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 11/24/2009. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Sanctions, 28 MOTION to Remand in Response to Notice of Removal by SEI and Motion for Sanctions filed by SEI Investments Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings for deft Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/9/2009. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, At Lloyd's of London In Syndicates 2987, 1866, 1084, 1274, 4000 & 1183, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duplantis, Heather) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Jay Comeaux of Receivership Stay (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Amended Order Appointing Receiver)(Sexton, Raymond) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Petition for Deft Jim Weller. Responsive pleadings/answer extended until the later date of 15 days after the Court rules on the remand motion or 11/23/2009, which is 20 days from the present deadline for filing responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/4/2009. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jim Weller. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Marionneaux, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand in Response to Notice of Removal by SEI and Motion for Sanctions by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand in Response to Notice of Removal by SEI, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEI Investments Company. (Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Rhonda Lear waiver sent on 9/29/2009, answer due 11/30/2009. (Burkhalter, Crystal) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Petition (Notice of Removal) by Russ Newton. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Jim Weller waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. J. D. Perry waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Deborah S Forbes. Zack Parrish waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Deborah S Forbes. Russ Newton waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Thomas Newland waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Deborah S Forbes. Hank Mills waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Grady Layfield waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Joe Klingen waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Charles Jantzi waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Dirk Harris waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. James Fontenot waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Jay Comeaux waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Bruce Johnson, Terence Beven, Thomas J Moran, Ralph D D'Amore, James Roland, Daniel P Landry, Ronald R Marston, Rodney P Starkey, Stephen R Wilson, Michael J Giambrone, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, John Wade, Lynn J Philippe, Thomas E Bowden, T. E. Bowden Sr. Ret. Trust, G. Kendall Forbes, Susan Roland, Deborah S Forbes. Jack Bruno waiver sent on 9/16/2009, answer due 11/16/2009. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: CA #09-676-A is transferred from Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger to Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby and the 4 MOTION to Remand is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dalby for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/15/2009. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 10-14-09 from Duris L. Holmes to Judges Parker and Brady. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 4 MOTION to Remand filed by SEI Investments Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 6 Motion for J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/08/2009. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Case with 3:09 CV 678 JVP-DLD by SEI Investments Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $40.00, Receipt Number 053N0000000000496255) by SEI Investments Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit J. Gordon Cooney, Jr., # 2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Attachment Oath, # 4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Consent to Removal and Notice Setting Forth Independent Basis for Removal by SEI Investments Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 E)(Holmes, Duris) Modified on 10/8/2009 to correct title of document (JDL, ). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Pleading; Order, # 6 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memo, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Memo, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit C to Memo, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit D to Memo)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION to Transfer Case to Pursuant to Local Rule 3.1 by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case Pursuant to Local Rule 3.1, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to MDL Panel notifying panel of possible MDL case (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court of east Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 581479. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053N0000000000481165), filed by Grady Layfield, Hank Mills, John Schwab. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Schwab, Donna) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/5/2010.] (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?