Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Altium, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00808
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 9, 2016 at 3:24 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

No Logo Altium, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Altium, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor Dunham, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Dunham +1 512 473 2257 +1 512 478 4409 ddunham@taylordunham.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw; granting 25 Motion to Withdraw; granting 26 Motion to Withdraw; granting 27 Motion to Withdraw; granting 28 Motion to Withdraw. ORDERED that Barry J. Bumgardner, Edward E. Casto, Jr., Steven W. Hartsell, Jaime K. Olin, and R. Casey ONeill are withdrawn as counsel for Uniloc in the above-styled cases. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth P Kula on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Kula, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Zachary Duffy on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Duffy, William) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Nelson Williams on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Altium, Inc. (Dunham, David) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Altium, Inc..(Dunham, David) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Altium, Inc..( Dunham, David) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS REISSUED as to Altium, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                        Return of Service Executed as to Altium, Inc. on 11/1/2012, by service on the Texas Secretary of State. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                          Letter from CT Corporation that deft Altium Inc is an inactive entity on the records of the State of Delaware; service returned unexecuted. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Altium, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against Altium, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847461.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 197 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?