Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. GlobalSCAPE, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00969
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 2:01 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Globalscape, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Globalscape, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims by Plaintiffs against Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice. All counterclaims by Defendant against Plaintiffs are DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
      ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** STIPULATION of Dismissal by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) Modified on 8/8/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 08/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Parke Latham; Matthew C Acosta and John M Jackson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/31/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert P. Latham, John M. Jackson, and Matthew C. Acosta by GlobalSCAPE, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dennis D Murrell on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4157773. (Murrell, Dennis) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James R Higgins, Jr on behalf of GlobalSCAPE, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4157493. (Higgins, James) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert J Theuerkauf on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4155394. (Theuerkauf, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of GlobalSCAPE, Inc. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to 28 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Amended Counterclaims of Defendant GlobalSCAPE, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by GlobalSCAPE, Inc..(Jackson, John) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 26 Amended Complaint.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against GlobalSCAPE, Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 23 Motion to File Amended Complaint within five business days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/25/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. re 11 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Request for Termination of ECF Notices (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant GlobalSCAPE, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant GlobalScape, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GlobalSCAPE, Inc. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by GlobalSCAPE, Inc..(Jackson, John) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Return of Service Executed as to GlobalSCAPE, Inc. on 1/7/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GlobalSCAPE, Inc..( Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GlobalSCAPE, Inc..( Jackson, John) Modified on 1/22/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of GlobalSCAPE, Inc. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of GlobalSCAPE, Inc. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Parke Latham on behalf of GlobalSCAPE, Inc. (Latham, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to GlobalSCAPE, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against GlobalSCAPE, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3927673.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,024,696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?