Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Altair Engineering, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00806
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 7:26 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDole & Williams, P C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Z. Duffy +1 214 979 1122 +1 214 979 1123 zduffy@kcwfirm.com
Space Kenneth P Kula +1 214 979 1122 +1 214 979 1123 kkula@mcdolewilliams.com
Space Steven N Williams +1 214 979 1122 +1 214 979 1123 swilliams@kcwfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
Space Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
Space Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 806 3818 +1 817 377 3485 coneill@nbclaw.net
Space Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Altium, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Slickedit, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Altair Engineering, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Basile Hanlon & MacFarlane, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher G. Darrow +1 248 649 3333 litigation@ybpc.com
Space MARSHALL G. MACFARLANE +1 734 662 0270 macfarlane@youngbasile.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Altera Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Morgan & Amerson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K Buss +1 713 934 4087 +1 713 934 7011 bbuss@wmalaw.com
Space Jaison Chorikavumkal John +1 713 934 4060 +1 713 934 7011 jjohn@wmalaw.com
Space David Wynne Morehan +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 dmorehan@wmalaw.com
Space Danny L. Williams +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 dwilliams@wmalaw.com
No Logo Altium, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor Dunham, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cabrach J. Connor cconnor@taylordunham.com
Space David E. Dunham +1 512 473 2257 +1 512 478 4409 ddunham@taylordunham.com
Space Miguel Sergio Rodriguez +1 512 473 2257 +1 512 478 4409 mrodriguez@taylordunham.com
Space Jennifer Ann Tatum +1 512 473 2257 +1 512 478 4409 jtatum@taylordunham.com
No Logo Dassault Systemes Solidworks Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlos A. Rodriguez +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 carlosrodriguez@quinnmanuel.com
Space Claude Michael Stern +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 claudestern@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath +1 650 335 7614 +1 650 938 5200 rranganath@fenwick.com
Space Michael John Sacksteder +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 msacksteder@fenwick.com
Space Lauren Estelle Whittemore +1 650 988 8500 +1 415 281 1350 lwhittemore@fenwick.com
Space Darryl Michael Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@fenwick.com
No Logo Minitab, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
Space Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 audrey.lo@klgates.com
Space Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
Space Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com
No Logo Originlab Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willi Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Norman Willi +1 512 288 3200 +1 512 288 3202 jwilli@willilawfirm.com
Space Tracy Jill Willi +1 512 288 3200 +1 512 288 3202 twilli@willilawfsirm.com
No Logo Parametric Technology Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E Murawski +1 617 248 4996 +1 617 502 4996 mmurawski@choate.com
Space Daniel C. Winston +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 4000 DWinston@choate.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Slickedit, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Collin Michael Maloney +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071

Toggle Switch Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth S Coburn +1 207 253 4482 +1 207 774 7499 sscoburn@verrilldana.com
Space Timothy R Shannon tshannon@verrilldana.com
No Logo Softech, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo System Development, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conley, Rose & Tayon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Loren Maag +1 713 238 8040 +1 713 238 8008 gmaag@conleyrose.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens Love

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd Y. Brandt todd@stevenslove.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dotson Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darrell Glyn Dotson +1 903 212 3113 +1 903 757 2387 darrell@dotsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Waterloo Maple Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (201) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/23/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 199 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Altair Engineering Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Altair Engineering, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 196 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Altair Engineering Inc are hereby stayed to 6-17-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Altair Engineering, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
              First Amended ANSWER to 71 Amended Complaint, by Altair Engineering, Inc..(MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 190 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Withdraw of Serving Its Supplemental Infringement Contentions (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION Fourth Amended Docket Control Order by Altair Engineering, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER denying the petition for a writ of mandamus. Circuit Judges: Lourie, Dyk, and Reyna. (dlc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 189 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 184 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs shall provide supplementations to their infringement contentions by 4-30-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/21/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 184 Emergency MOTION to Compel by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 187 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,.. (Williams, Steven) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 Emergency MOTION to Compel Uniloc's Supplemental Rule 3-1(c) Disclosures and Responsive Answers to Altair's Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Duffy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 (March 27, 2014 Email), # 3 Exhibit 2 (March 26, 2014 Depo. Ntc.), # 4 Exhibit 3 (January 17, 2014 Depo. Ntc.), # 5 Exhibit 4 (Source Prints Email), # 6 Exhibit 5 (Source Code Prints Meet & Confer Email), # 7 Exhibit 6 (Williams February 2, 2014 Email), # 8 Exhibit 7 (Kula January 21, 2014 Email), # 9 Exhibit 8 (Kula February 14, 2014 Email), # 10 Exhibit 9 (Request for Source Code Prints), # 11 Exhibit 10 (Mustafa April 8, 2014 Email))(Williams, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2014: # 12 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION Regarding Use of HyperMesh as Example Product by Altair Engineering, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                    Emergency MOTION to Compel by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- 3-1 & 3-2 Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit B- Email Chain, # 3 Exhibit C- Email Chain, # 4 Exhibit D- Email Chain, # 5 Exhibit E- Plaintiffs' Objections, # 6 Exhibit F- Email Chain, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 182 Motion to Withdraw 178 Emergency MOTION to Compel Altair to Produce Documents. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/17/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 178 Emergency MOTION to Compel Altair to Produce Documents by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 178 Emergency MOTION to Compel Altair to Produce Documents : Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel (Williams, Steven) Modified on 3/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER re 178 Emergency MOTION to Compel Altair to Produce Documents filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule: Defendant Altair Engineering, Inc.'s response is due by 3-17-2014; Uniloc's reply is due by 3-21-2014; and Altair's sur-reply is due by 3-24-2014. The parties are encouraged to meet and confer on the need to amend the deposition schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Kerr, Peter) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 183 *** Emergency MOTION to Compel Altair to Produce Documents by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (UNIL 1-29-14 RFP), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Counsel Email String), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Path to Email Production), # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Relief Sought in Motion)(Williams, Steven) Modified on 3/17/2014 (gsg). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 170 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by SlickEdit Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant SlickEdit Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 168 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Altium Inc are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                        JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct 126 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint Motion for Third Amended Docket Control Order by Altair Engineering, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Modifying Docket Control Order Dates)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on February 13, 2014 before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham/Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (clb, ) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Court Instructed Post-Markman Hearing Briefing on Disputed Terms CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.; (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Marshall G. MacFarlane, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Silberschatz Excerpt, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Tanenbaum Excerpt)(MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant SlickEdit, Inc. by SlickEdit Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 166 Motion to Stay. All deadlines specific to Altium Inc. in the above-captioned action are hereby stayed to and including 2-27-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice as to Plaintiffs and Defendant Altium Only by Altium, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Dismissal With Prejudice)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Markman Hearing held on 2/13/2014. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham and Tonya Jackson.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Specific to Uniloc and Altium Pending Final Settlement by Altium, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE of Docketing. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-Federal Circuit Case No. 14-120. (dlc, ) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AGREED ORDER AMENDING THE PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/22/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 103 Protective Order as it Pertains to Source Code by Altair Engineering, Inc., Altium, Inc., SlickEdit Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amending Protective Order)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. The Court REFERS this case for claim construction only to United States Magistrate Judge Nicole Mitchell for disposition. The undersigned will continue to oversee all other matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying 149 Motion to Strike; granting 150 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants' Sur-reply Claim Construction brief 148 will be considered by the Court as filed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by Altium, Inc. (DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER TO SUBMIT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS TO TECHNICAL ADVISOR) (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Collin Michael Maloney terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 149 Opposed MOTION to Strike 148 Reply to Claim Construction Brief [Dkt. 148 Sur-Reply] filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 149 Opposed MOTION to Strike 148 Reply to Claim Construction Brief [Dkt. 148 Sur-Reply] (JOINT) filed by Altium, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Altair Engineering, Inc., Altium, Inc., SlickEdit Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Pursuant to Court Order 126 Regarding P.R. 4-5(d) Submission of the Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 150 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Altium, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Sur-Reply Markman Brief)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Strike 148 Reply to Claim Construction Brief [Dkt. 148 Sur-Reply] by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to 121 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Altium, Inc.. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit their claim construction chart is extended to 12-16-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART PURSUANT TO PATENT RULE 4.5(d) by Altium, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER dismissing the petition for a writ of mandamus upon consideration of petitioners' reply stating their petition for writ of mandamus is now moot. Entered on 12/12/13. (dlc, ) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 143 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric H. Findlay and Brian Craft by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 110 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 79 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Altair Engineering, Inc., Altium, Inc., SlickEdit Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 126 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Second Amended Docket Control Order Regarding Notice of Claim Construction Hearing (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to 121 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 126 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Second Amended Docket Control Order Regarding Tutorial Concerning Patent Technology (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER APPOINTING TCHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER directing Uniloc USA, Inc and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. to respond by December 9, 2013. Re: Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, seeking to direct USDC ED/TX to vacate its 4/30/13, docket control order and rule on their pending motions to transfer venue. Signed on 11/27/13. (dlc, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 130 Motion to Withdraw; granting 131 Motion to Withdraw; granting 132 Motion to Withdraw; granting 133 Motion to Withdraw; granting 134 Motion to Withdraw. ORDERED that Barry J. Bumgardner, Edward E. Casto, Jr., Steven W. Hartsell, Jaime K. Olin, and R. Casey ONeill are withdrawn as counsel for Uniloc in the above-styled cases. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth P Kula on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Kula, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Zachary Duffy on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Duffy, William) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Nelson Williams on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Second Amended Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE of Docketing, USCA Case No 14-105. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 and 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 and 5, # 5 Exhibit 6)(dlc, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to 121 Claim Construction Brief, filed by SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy R. Shannon in Support of Defendants Joint Responsive Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Patent-In-Suit), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Assignment History), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Patent), # 5 Exhibit 4 (Programmer's Manual), # 6 Exhibit 5 (Computer Glossary), # 7 Exhibit 6 (UNIX Network Programming), # 8 Exhibit 7 (UNIX Dictionary), # 9 Exhibit 8 (Operating System Concepts), # 10 Exhibit 9 (Modern Operating Systems), # 11 Exhibit 10 (Computer Dictionary), # 12 Exhibit 11 (Dictionary of Computing), # 13 Exhibit 12 (CV of Scott M. Nettles), # 14 Affidavit Declaration of Scott M. Nettles in Support of Defendants Joint Responsive Claim Construction Brief)(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Seth S Coburn on behalf of SlickEdit Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4393808. (Coburn, Seth) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jaime K. Olin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Altair Engineering, Inc., SlickEdit Inc. re 110 MOTION to Stay Notice of No Reply and Complete Briefing (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Stay filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W. Spangler terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Agreement Regarding Proposed Technical Advisor (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James A Fussell, III terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay by Altair Engineering, Inc., SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Constructions)(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cabrach John Connor on behalf of Altium, Inc. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Altair Engineering, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Altair Engineering, Inc. (Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SlickEdit Inc. (Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Altair Engineering, Inc. (MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by SlickEdit Inc. regarding Disclosures (Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Altium, Inc. (Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Altair Engineering, Inc. of Compliance (Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraph 1 of the Court's Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marshall G MacFarlane on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (MacFarlane, Marshall) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan Plaintiffs' Sur-reply in Support of their Response in Opposition to Altair Engineering, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan CORRECTED filed by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan filed by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 85 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to Amended Counterclaims of Defendant SlickEdit Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 5/13/2014. Jury Selection set for 6/1/2015 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 2/13/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control Order and Amend Deadline for Dispositive Motions by Altium, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order First Amended Docket Control Order)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 86 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Kowalec, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of O'Neill)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendand SlickEdit's Amended ANSWER to 73 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM (previously filed under Docket No. 6:12-814) against All Plaintiffs by SlickEdit Inc..(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 71 Amended Complaint, as it Pertains to Altair Engineering, Inc. by Altair Engineering, Inc..(Fussell, James) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Amended Counterclaims of Defendant Altium, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and E-Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan by Altair Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order(Darrow, Christopher) (Attachment 6 title revised to show it is proposed order not exhibit E on 4/11/2013) (sm, ). Modified on 4/11/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Altium, Inc.'s ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Altium, Inc..(Dunham, David) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement for SlickEdit Inc. against SlickEdit Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement as it Pertains to Altium, Inc. against Altium, Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement as it Pertains to Altair Engineering, Inc. against Altair Engineering, Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 65 Motion to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant Altair Engineering, Inc. within five business days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 63 Motion to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant SlickEdit Inc. within five business days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 61 Motion to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant Altium, Inc. within five business days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc. Of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Woo, Darryl) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant Altair Engineering, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Altera Corporation OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (John, Jaison) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant SlickEdit Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Minitab, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant Altium, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltfs against deft Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation are dismissed with prejudice; deft's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 49 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltfs against deft System Development Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 48 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltfs against deft Altera Corporation are dismissed with prejudice; deft's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 47 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft Parametric Technology Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft Minitab Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft SoftTech Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. re 14 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Request for Termincation of ECF Notices (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft OriginLab Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims against deft Waterloo Maple Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dassault Systemes Solidworks Corporation With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant System Development, Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Altera Corporation With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant PTC Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Minitab, Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant SofTech, Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Originlab Corporation With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Waterloo Maple Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 40 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Uniloc's deadline to respond to Defendant Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation's Motion to Change Venue 24 is extended to 3-29-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/13. cc:attys 3-14-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule Unopposed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf) Modified on 2/28/2013 to correct file date(rlf). (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Parametric Technology Corporation (Notice of Name Change) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 36 Motion to modify briefing schedule. ORDERED that Unilocs deadline to respond to Defendant Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporations Motion to Change Venue is extended to March 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan J Sinclair on behalf of Minitab, Inc. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 32 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/13. cc:attys 2-19-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Certain Disclosure Deadlines by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Tatum Lee on behalf of Altium, Inc. (Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miguel Sergio Rodriguez on behalf of Altium, Inc. (Rodriguez, Miguel) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 16 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Reply to Counterclaims of Defendant Parametric Technology Corporation's Counterclaims filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 16 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Reply to Counterclaims of Defendant Altium, Inc,'s Counterclaims filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Murawski on behalf of Parametric Technology Corporation (Murawski, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravi R Ranganath on behalf of Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/25/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/06/13. cc:attys 2-07-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of Altera Corporation (Buss, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Wynne Morehan on behalf of Altera Corporation (Morehan, David) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaison Chorikavumkal John on behalf of Altera Corporation (John, Jaison) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Altair Engineering, Inc. (Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Altair Engineering, Inc..(Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher G Darrow on behalf of Altair Engineering, Inc. (Darrow, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Altair Engineering, Inc..( Fussell, James) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Altair Engineering, Inc. on 11/1/2012, by service on Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 11/22/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Altair Engineering, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Altair Engineering, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847381.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 517 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?