District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

In re: Application for Exemption
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 12-16373

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 9:46 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Nature of Suit 3190 - Contract: Other
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED.(DFO, ADH and LLP) [8832454] (RL)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    FILED OPINION (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, ANDREW D. HURWITZ and LAWRENCE L. PIERSOL) Gollan and Shifflet’s July 10, 2013 Motion to Supplement the Record is GRANTED. DISMISSED. Judge: DFO Co-authoring & concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8761215] (RP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett Motion to supplement record on appeal. Date of service: 07/10/2013. [8697697] (TRB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KKW):The Unopposed Motion for Leave to Present Oral Argument by Amicus Curiae Administrative Office of United States Courts is GRANTED. Up to fifteen minutes of oral argument time on June 10, 2013 in San Francisco, is hereby designated for use by the Administrative Office. Its argument will follow appellant’s opening argument and, should appellant reserve time, will come before appellant’s rebuttal. Consistent with this court’s prior order, appellant may argue for a total of fifteen minutes. [8651195] (KKW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Amici Curiae AOUSC and DOJ Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion For Leave To Present Oral Argument By Amicus Curiae]. Date of service: 05/31/2013. [8650096] (HB)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Amici Curiae AOUSC and DOJ citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/24/2013. [8603863] (HB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. H. Thomas Byron, III for Amici Curiae DOJ and AOUSC. [8587505] (HB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. Date of service: 10/22/2012. [8572035] (RLW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Rochelle Lyn Wilcox, Esquire for Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. [8572028] (RLW)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
            Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8570619] (SS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
              Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, June 10, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8569855] (RB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                Filed clerk order: The reply brief [30] submitted by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellants are ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8541543] (GV)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                  Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. Date of service: 03/07/2013. [8541094] (RLW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [24] submitted by AOUSC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, amicus curiae is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8484803] (GV)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus Brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae DOJ. Date of service: 01/22/2013. [8483172] (HB)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SVG): The court is in receipt of the response filed by the United States Department of Justice to the order issued October 24, 2012 in this appeal. The amicus curiae brief for the Administrative Office of the Courts is due January 22, 2013. Appellants may file a reply brief within 14 days of service of the amicus curiae brief. [8458323] (KKW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew M. Collette for Amicus Curiae DOJ. Date of service: 01/02/2013. [8457325] (MMC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Respondent DOJ response to Court order dated 11/14/2012). Date of service: 12/21/2012 [8450913]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected text and filing type, resent notice. 12/24/2012 by ASW] (HB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of H. Thomas Byron III for Respondent DOJ. Date of service: 12/21/2012. [8450890] (HB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SVG): The United States Department of Justice’s request for an extension of time to comply with the court’s October 24, 2012 order is granted. The Department of Justice is granted until December 21, 2012 to notify this court whether they will appear on behalf of the Judicial Conference and/or Administrative Office of the Courts through an appearance as amicus curiae or as an intervenor in this appeal. [8401651] (SM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                  Received letter dated 11/14/2012 re: The U.S. Department of Justice needs additional time to see if the government will participate in this appeal.. [8400485] (BY)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                    Filed order (RONALD M. GOULD, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and JAY S. BYBEE) This appeal challenges the district court’s order, entered in a miscellaneous docket, denying appellants’ application for exemption from district court PACER fees, which denial was based on the United States Judicial Conference official policy implementing the Electronic Public Access Fee Schedule set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1914. Because the district court’s order in this case was based on official Judicial Conference policy, it would be helpful to this court’s review of that order to have briefing from the Judicial Conference and/or the Administrative Office of the Courts with respect to: (1) whether this court has jurisdiction over this appeal; (2) whether the notice of appeal should be treated as a petition for writ of mandamus; and (3) the issue raised in the appeal, whether the Judicial Conference Policy does in fact prohibit exemptions for media even when they are employed by a non-profit organization. Consequently, the Clerk shall serve this order on the United States Attorney General, who is requested to notify the court within 28 days whether he will appear on behalf of the Judicial Conference and/or Administrative Office of the Courts through an appearance as amicus curiae or as an intervenor in this appeal. The Clerk shall also serve this order on the District Court. Appellate proceedings are stayed pending further order of the court. [8375411] (DEV)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [10] submitted by Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellants are ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8372191] (GV)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. Date of service: 10/22/2012. [8371129] (RLW)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett Correspondence: Notice of 9th Cir. R. 11-1.2.. Date of service: 10/01/2012 [8343803]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected filing to reflect content, resent notice. 10/02/2012 by ASW] (RLW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 8
                                            Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. Respondent has filed a statement of non-opposition to the motion to stay removal pending review. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit General Order 6.4(c), the temporary stay of removal continues in effect until issuance of the mandate or further order of the court. The certified administrative record has been filed. The opening brief is due April 9, 2013; the answering brief is due June 10, 2013; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. (MOATT) [8468227] (AF)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rochelle L. Wilcox for Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett. Date of service: 10/01/2012. [8343772] (RLW)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellant’s motion for an extension of time in which to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due October 22, 2012. Counsel is reminded of his obligation to contact the court reporter and court reporter supervisor in an effort to cause preparation of the court reporter transcripts and to describe such contacts in his notice. See 9th Cir. R. 11-1.2, amended July 1, 2006. Within 14 days after the date of this order, counsel shall file a Ninth Circuit Rule 11-1.2 notice. [8325403] (SM)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett Supplemental Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 10/22/2012. Date of service: 09/14/2012. [8324956] (TRB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 10/22/2012. Date of service: 09/13/2012. [8322282] (TRB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/20/2012. [8221343] (TRB)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND NO APPEARANCE BY APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Jennifer Gollan and Shane Shifflett opening brief due 09/20/2012. [8213978] (RT)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?