District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
  1. Case No. 12-1594
    Filed 5/11/2012
  2. Case No. 14-1596
    Filed 6/3/2014
United States Supreme Court

Greenspan v. Random House, Inc.,, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 12-1594

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2016 at 3:49 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Aaron Greenspan"
v.
No Logo Mezrich, Benjamin, Defendant
Officially listed as "Benjamin Mezrich"

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dustin F. Hecker +1 617 973 6100 +1 617 722 4927 dhecker@pbl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
No Logo Mezco, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
Random House, Inc. Random House, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
Nature of Suit 3820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106520256 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 04/15/2013. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [12-1594] (AS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 00106493971 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
    U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 01/28/2013 and assigned case number 12-965. [12-1594] (AS)
      LREF
      Legal Document 00106455237 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
      MANDATE issued. [12-1594] (AS)
        LREF
        Legal Document 00106450689 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER entered by Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge denying petition for panel rehearing filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. [12-1594] (CP)
          LREF
          Legal Document 00106446911 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
          PETITION for panel rehearing filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 10/22/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
            LREF
            Legal Document 00106444406 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            JUDGMENT entered by Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. 12-1594 Affirmed [12-1594] (AS)
              LREF
              Legal Document 00106442334 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
              REPLY filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan to response [5680835-2], response [5680767-2]. Certificate of service dated 10/10/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                LREF
                Legal Document 00106440940 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., to motion to take judicial notice [5677833-2]. [12-1594] (BMM)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 00106440818 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International to motion to take judicial notice [5677833-2]. [12-1594] (DFH)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 00106438959 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Marvin N. Cable for Aaron Greenspan. [12-1594] (AS)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 00106436049 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                      MOTION to take judicial notice filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 09/25/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 00106431867 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE issued. After 10/01/2012, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Marvin N. Cable for Aaron Greenspan. [12-1594] (AS)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 00106429854 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                          REPLY filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan to response [5673533-2], response and motion to take judicial notice [5673445-2]. Certificate of service dated 09/11/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 00106429124 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., to motion to take judicial notice [5670665-2]. [12-1594] (BMM)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 00106428969 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION to take judicial notice and RESPONSE to motion to take judicial notice [5670665-2] filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. [12-1594] (DFH)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 00106426088 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                CASE submitted. Panel: Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. [12-1594] (LM)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 00106425020 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to take judicial notice filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106406196 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                    REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/25/2012. [12-1594] (RL)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 00106406038 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                      BRIEF tendered by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 00106405262 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. Certificate of service dated 07/16/2012. [12-1594] (RL)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 00106405259 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                          APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. Certificate of service dated 07/16/2012. Reply brief due 08/02/2012 for appellant Aaron Greenspan. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/23/2012. [12-1594] (RL)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 00106405221 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. Certificate of service dated 07/16/2012. [12-1594] (DFH)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 00106405216 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF tendered by Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. Certificate of service dated 07/16/2012. [12-1594] (DFH)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 00106404680 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2012. [12-1594] (RL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 00106404676 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                  APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2012. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/20/2012. [12-1594] (RL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 00106404671 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEF tendered by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2012. [12-1594] (BMM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106391364 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                      APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2012. Brief due 07/16/2012 for appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International, Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/21/2012. [12-1594] (RL)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 00106391344 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                        BRIEF tendered by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 00106389555 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Stephen G. Contopulos for Appellees Random House, Inc.,, Mezco, Inc. and Benjamin Mezrich. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 00106389552 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Bradley H. Ellis for Appellees Random House, Inc.,, Mezco, Inc. and Benjamin Mezrich. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106383295 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Kevin T. Baine for Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2012. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106383289 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Megan A. Hughes for Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2012. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 00106382083 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., filed by Attorney Gordon P. Katz. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2012. [12-1594] (GPK)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 00106381860 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., filed by Attorney Benjamin M. McGovern. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2012. [12-1594] (BMM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 00106379864 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 02/16/2012, Scheduling Conf. Transcript(s) due 06/18/2012 from Court Reporter FTR - MA. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 00106379836 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [5642177-2] filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 00106379820 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2012. [12-1594] (AG)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 00106379717 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Columbia Pictures TV Industries International filed by Attorney Dustin F. Hecker. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2012. [12-1594] (DFH)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106378341 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/25/2012 for appellant Aaron Greenspan. Appendix due 06/25/2012 for appellant Aaron Greenspan. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106376286 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52) filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Fee due 05/25/2012.. [12-1594] (AS)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 344 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?