Irina Rutkovskaya
Bankruptcy Case New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1-13-41653
District Judge Jerome Feller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 2:57 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Plaintiff

Represented by Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Anaipakos, PC

Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

No Logo Irina Rutkovskaya, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Maximov & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maxim Maximov +1 718 395 3459 +1 718 408 9570 mmaximov@mmaximov.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ervin Simmons on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Simmons, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
          SUMMONS Issued as to Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd, Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Sansung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Samsung Telecommunication Am LLC, # 2 Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, # 3 Samsung Electronics Am LLC, # 4 Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, # 5 Research in Motion ltd)(ehs, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4047368.), filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - '580 Patent)(Jones, Miranda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2013: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?