John Doe v. SEC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 11-17827

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 4:45 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARMANDO V ALONSO, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY DELUCA +1 702 873 5386 +1 702 975 6261 DelucaEcf@gmail.com
Nature of Suit 2850 - Securities Commodities Exchange
  Entries (630) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118
Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/02/2013 opinion). Date of service: 05/15/2013. [8630356] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117
    Filed order and amended opinion (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON). The opinion filed on April 22, 2013, and published at __ F.3d __, 2013 WL 1715422, is amended as follows: At slip opinion page 23, lines 17–19, replace with the following: Conflicted representation provides an independent ground for reversing the settlement. Cf. id. (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a)(4), (g)(4)). Because we reverse the settlement, we must also reverse the awards of attorneys’ fees and costs. See In re Bluetooth, 654 F.3d at 940. Additionally, we reverse the awards because the district court abused its discretion by not considering “whether class counsel has properly discharged its duty of loyalty to absent class members” in its award of attorneys’ fees and costs.5 Cf. Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 655. The text of footnote 5 is unchanged. At slip opinion page 23, line 24 to page 24, line 2, replace with the following: On remand, the district court should determine when the conflict arose and if the conflict continues under any future settlement agreement. Should the district court approve such an agreement, it may then exercise its discretion in deciding whether, and to what extent, class counsel are entitled to fees under the common-fund doctrine.6 See Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 657; Rodriguez I, 563 F.3d at 967–68. The call number for footnote 6 should be moved to follow , as shown above. At slip opinion page 24, footnote 6, replace the text of the footnote with the following: Because we reverse the settlement and the awards of fees and costs based on the conditional incentive awards, we do not reach the issue of whether the subset of class counsel who brought the Acosta and Pike suits, which were consolidated with this case, faced an independent conflict of interest because of the fee-sharing agreement they executed with the rest of class counsel. The district court should revisit that issue in light of our holding. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. In light of these amendments, any petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed within fourteen days from the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [8612814] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117
      Filed order and amended opinion (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON). The opinion filed on April 22, 2013, and published at __ F.3d __, 2013 WL 1715422, is amended as follows: At slip opinion page 23, lines 17–19, replace with the following: Conflicted representation provides an independent ground for reversing the settlement. Cf. id. (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a)(4), (g)(4)). Because we reverse the settlement, we must also reverse the awards of attorneys’ fees and costs. See In re Bluetooth, 654 F.3d at 940. Additionally, we reverse the awards because the district court abused its discretion by not considering “whether class counsel has properly discharged its duty of loyalty to absent class members” in its award of attorneys’ fees and costs.5 Cf. Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 655. The text of footnote 5 is unchanged. At slip opinion page 23, line 24 to page 24, line 2, replace with the following: On remand, the district court should determine when the conflict arose and if the conflict continues under any future settlement agreement. Should the district court approve such an agreement, it may then exercise its discretion in deciding whether, and to what extent, class counsel are entitled to fees under the common-fund doctrine.6 See Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 657; Rodriguez I, 563 F.3d at 967–68. The call number for footnote 6 should be moved to follow , as shown above. At slip opinion page 24, footnote 6, replace the text of the footnote with the following: Because we reverse the settlement and the awards of fees and costs based on the conditional incentive awards, we do not reach the issue of whether the subset of class counsel who brought the Acosta and Pike suits, which were consolidated with this case, faced an independent conflict of interest because of the fee-sharing agreement they executed with the rest of class counsel. The district court should revisit that issue in light of our holding. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. In light of these amendments, any petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed within fourteen days from the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [8612814] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Court Filing
        FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: RMG Authoring, Judge: SEH Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8597457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RP)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Court Filing
          FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: RMG Authoring, Judge: SEH Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8597457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RP)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115
            Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) Plaintiffs-Appellees’ Motion for Leave to File Post-Submission Brief is DENIED. The court will not entertain further briefing in this submitted case. [8551667] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115
              Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) Plaintiffs-Appellees’ Motion for Leave to File Post-Submission Brief is DENIED. The court will not entertain further briefing in this submitted case. [8551667] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114
                COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [113]. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by - Mr. Jose E. Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549999] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RY)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114
                  COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [113]. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by - Mr. Jose E. Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549999] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RY)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111
                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376, Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387, Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389, Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400, Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518468] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (GFC)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111
                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/02/2013 opinion). Date of service: 05/15/2013. [8630356] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111
                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/02/2013 opinion). Date of service: 05/15/2013. [8630356] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111
                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376, Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387, Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389, Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400, Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518468] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (GFC)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110
                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Charles M. Thompson, Esquire for - Thomas A. Carder in 11-56376. [8484326] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110
                              Filed order and amended opinion (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON). The opinion filed on April 22, 2013, and published at __ F.3d __, 2013 WL 1715422, is amended as follows: At slip opinion page 23, lines 17–19, replace with the following: Conflicted representation provides an independent ground for reversing the settlement. Cf. id. (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a)(4), (g)(4)). Because we reverse the settlement, we must also reverse the awards of attorneys’ fees and costs. See In re Bluetooth, 654 F.3d at 940. Additionally, we reverse the awards because the district court abused its discretion by not considering “whether class counsel has properly discharged its duty of loyalty to absent class members” in its award of attorneys’ fees and costs.5 Cf. Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 655. The text of footnote 5 is unchanged. At slip opinion page 23, line 24 to page 24, line 2, replace with the following: On remand, the district court should determine when the conflict arose and if the conflict continues under any future settlement agreement. Should the district court approve such an agreement, it may then exercise its discretion in deciding whether, and to what extent, class counsel are entitled to fees under the common-fund doctrine.6 See Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 657; Rodriguez I, 563 F.3d at 967–68. The call number for footnote 6 should be moved to follow , as shown above. At slip opinion page 24, footnote 6, replace the text of the footnote with the following: Because we reverse the settlement and the awards of fees and costs based on the conditional incentive awards, we do not reach the issue of whether the subset of class counsel who brought the Acosta and Pike suits, which were consolidated with this case, faced an independent conflict of interest because of the fee-sharing agreement they executed with the rest of class counsel. The district court should revisit that issue in light of our holding. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. In light of these amendments, any petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed within fourteen days from the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [8612814] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110
                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Charles M. Thompson, Esquire for - Thomas A. Carder in 11-56376. [8484326] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110
                                  Filed order and amended opinion (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON). The opinion filed on April 22, 2013, and published at __ F.3d __, 2013 WL 1715422, is amended as follows: At slip opinion page 23, lines 17–19, replace with the following: Conflicted representation provides an independent ground for reversing the settlement. Cf. id. (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a)(4), (g)(4)). Because we reverse the settlement, we must also reverse the awards of attorneys’ fees and costs. See In re Bluetooth, 654 F.3d at 940. Additionally, we reverse the awards because the district court abused its discretion by not considering “whether class counsel has properly discharged its duty of loyalty to absent class members” in its award of attorneys’ fees and costs.5 Cf. Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 655. The text of footnote 5 is unchanged. At slip opinion page 23, line 24 to page 24, line 2, replace with the following: On remand, the district court should determine when the conflict arose and if the conflict continues under any future settlement agreement. Should the district court approve such an agreement, it may then exercise its discretion in deciding whether, and to what extent, class counsel are entitled to fees under the common-fund doctrine.6 See Rodriguez II, 688 F.3d at 657; Rodriguez I, 563 F.3d at 967–68. The call number for footnote 6 should be moved to follow , as shown above. At slip opinion page 24, footnote 6, replace the text of the footnote with the following: Because we reverse the settlement and the awards of fees and costs based on the conditional incentive awards, we do not reach the issue of whether the subset of class counsel who brought the Acosta and Pike suits, which were consolidated with this case, faced an independent conflict of interest because of the fee-sharing agreement they executed with the rest of class counsel. The district court should revisit that issue in light of our holding. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. In light of these amendments, any petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed within fourteen days from the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. REVERSED AND REMANDED. [8612814] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Court Filing
                                    FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: RMG Authoring, Judge: SEH Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8597457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RP)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109
                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert Stephen Griffis for - Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56376. [8483393] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RSG)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Court Filing
                                        FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: RMG Authoring, Judge: SEH Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8597457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RP)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Court Filing
                                          FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: RMG Authoring, Judge: SEH Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8597457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RP)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109
                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert Stephen Griffis for - Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56376. [8483393] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RSG)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108
                                              Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) Plaintiffs-Appellees’ Motion for Leave to File Post-Submission Brief is DENIED. The court will not entertain further briefing in this submitted case. [8551667] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108
                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Mr. James Garrett Kendrick for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green and Charles Benjamin Nutley, Esquire for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in 11-56482. [8483113] [11-56482, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440] (JGK)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108
                                                  Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) Plaintiffs-Appellees’ Motion for Leave to File Post-Submission Brief is DENIED. The court will not entertain further briefing in this submitted case. [8551667] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108
                                                    Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and SAM E. HADDON) Plaintiffs-Appellees’ Motion for Leave to File Post-Submission Brief is DENIED. The court will not entertain further briefing in this submitted case. [8551667] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108
                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Mr. James Garrett Kendrick for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green and Charles Benjamin Nutley, Esquire for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in 11-56482. [8483113] [11-56482, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440] (JGK)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107
                                                        COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [8549720-2]. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by - Mr. Jose E. Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549999] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RY)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107
                                                          COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [106]. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by - Mr. Jose E. Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549999] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RY)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107
                                                            COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [106]. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by - Mr. Jose E. Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549999] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RY)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105
                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376, Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387, Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389, Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400, Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518468] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104
                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Charles M. Thompson, Esquire for - Thomas A. Carder in 11-56376. [8484326] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104
                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376, Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387, Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389, Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400, Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518468] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104
                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376, Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387, Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389, Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400, Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518468] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103
                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert Stephen Griffis for - Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56376. [8483393] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RSG)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103
                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Charles M. Thompson, Esquire for - Thomas A. Carder in 11-56376. [8484326] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103
                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Charles M. Thompson, Esquire for - Thomas A. Carder in 11-56376. [8484326] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102
                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Mr. James Garrett Kendrick for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green and Charles Benjamin Nutley, Esquire for Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in 11-56482. [8483113] [11-56482, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440] (JGK)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102
                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert Stephen Griffis for - Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56376. [8483393] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RSG)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102
                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert Stephen Griffis for - Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56376. [8483393] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RSG)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101
                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Steve A. Miller for - Steven C. Singer. [8482585]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11−56387, 11−56389, 11−56397, 11−56400, 11−56440, 11−56482. Resent NDA. 01/22/2013 by RY] (SAM)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Cindy D. Hanson for Appellee Equifax Information Services LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482. [8476487] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CDH)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99
                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by John W. Davis for Appellant Walter Ellingwood and Mr. Steven Franklyn Helfand for Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440. [8471328] [11-56440, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56482] (JWD)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Gregory Morgan, Esquire for Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376. [8471103] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MGM)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97
                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387. [8469748] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JDP)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96
                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Stephen J. Newman, Esquire for Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482. [8469642] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93
                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Allen Caddell for - Jose Hernandez, Robert Randall, Bertram Robison and Kathryn Pike in 11-56376, Attorney Mr. Michael Allen Caddell for Appellees Jose Hernandez, Robert Randall, Bertram Robison and Kathryn Pike in 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Attorney Mr. Michael Allen Caddell for Appellees Robert Randall, Bertram Robison, Kathryn Pike and Jose Hernandez in 11-56440, 11-56482. [8467536] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MAC)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92
                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Allen Caddell for - Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376, Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482. Date of service: 01/09/2013. [8467514] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MAC)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91
                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Mr. George F. Carpinello for Appellants Christy Driver, Ivonne Martinez, Kelly J. Porter, Lisa Brisbane, Brenda Melendez, Ralph Michael Porter, Chester Carter, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Clifton C. Seale, III, Maria Falcon and Robert Radcliffe and Mr. Adam R. Shaw for Appellants Christy Driver, Ivonne Martinez, Kelly J. Porter, Lisa Brisbane, Brenda Melendez, Ralph Michael Porter, Chester Carter, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Clifton C. Seale, III, Maria Falcon and Robert Radcliffe in 11-56376. [8465929] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90
                                                                                                    Notice of Oral Argument on MARCH Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8465159] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LN)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88
                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The reply brief [81] submitted by Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8333356] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87
                                                                                                        Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The opposed motion of appellants Robert Radcliffe, Chester Carter, Maria Falcon, Clifton C. Seale, III, Arnold Lovell, Jr. (“White Plaintiffs”) to file an oversized reply brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the reply brief submitted by electronic filing on August 27, 2012 (entry #87). (Pro Mo) [8333309] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85
                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440, 11-56482 Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Date of service: 09/06/2012 [8312001] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (KAR)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84
                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Errata to reply brief ([81]). Filed by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 09/06/2012 [8311756] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected entry to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 09/07/2012 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83
                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) - Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376, Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387, 11-56389 response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 09/05/2012. [8310752] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text 11-56482. Resent NDA. 09/05/2012 by RY] (MAC)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81
                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 08/27/2012. [8301626] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed parties from text, brief submitted by appellants only. Resent notice. 08/29/2012 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79
                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [78] submitted by Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8278267] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78
                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire. Date of service: 08/06/2012. [8277341]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-56376, 11-56440, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56400, 11-56482. Resent NDA. 08/07/2012 by RY] (GAB)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74
                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The motion of appellants Robert Radcliffe, Chester Carter, Maria Falcon, Clifton C. Seale, III, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Christy Driver, Ivonne Martinez, Kelly J. Porter, Lisa Brisbane, Brenda Melendez and Ralph Michael Porter for an extension of time to file the consolidated reply brief is granted. The consolidated reply brief is due August 27, 2012. This order was issued prior to the expiration of time within which a response may be filed. See Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). [8265628] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73
                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56482 response to motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 07/26/2012. [8265535] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MS)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72
                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 08/27/2012. Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8263276] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70
                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [62] submitted by Maria L. Borbon is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260722] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69
                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [55] submitted by Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260709] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68
                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The answering brief in 11-56387 [66] submitted by Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260689] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67
                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief in 11-56397 [65] submitted by Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8260672] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66
                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8224238] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-56482. Resent NDA. 07/24/2012 by RY] (MS)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65
                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56397. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8224228] [11-56397, 11-56376]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with correct version (submitted separately by csl, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW Edited: spread docket text to consolidated cases: 11-56440, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56400, 11-56482. Resent NDA. 07/24/2012 by RY] (MS)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64
                                                                                                                                        Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The opposed motion of appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall, and Bertram Robinson (hereinafter “Settling Plaintiffs”) to file an enlarged answering brief of 19,174 words is granted. The Clerk shall file the answering brief for Settling Plaintiffs submitted by electronic filing on June 21, 2012 (docket #63). The Clerk shall also file the answering briefs submitted by electronic filing on June 21, 2012 (docket #60 and #61). The opposed motion of appellants Robert Radcliffe, Chester Carter, Maria Falcon, Clifton C. Seale, III, and Arnold E. Lovell (hereinafter “White Objectors”) to strike Settling Plaintiffs’ extra answering briefs is denied. White Objectors’ unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the reply briefs is granted. The consolidated reply brief for White Objectors is due within 28 days after the date of this order. The rely brief for appellant Maria L. Borbon already received is ordered filed. (docket #70) The reply briefs for appellant Steven C. Signer and appellant Charles W. Juntikka are due within 14 days after the date of this order. (Pro Mo) [8258602] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) - Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56376, Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 response supporting motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion to extend time to file reply, ,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 07/09/2012. [8242915] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MS)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62
                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387. Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8239267] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61
                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 Motion to strike whole of Appellees' Extra Answering Briefs, Motion to extend time to file a reply brief until 07/19/2012 and Response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief, , ). Date of service: 07/03/2012. [8237353] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Changed text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 07/06/2012 by ASW] (GFC)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                FILED OPINION (ALEX KOZINSKI, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW and RICHARD A. PAEZ) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: AK Concurring, Judge: KMW Authoring, Judge: RAP Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8592857] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58
                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The parties may discuss at oral argument Makaeff’s requests for judicial notice. The panel will rule on those requests when it decides the merits. [8018858] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57
                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The Motion of the American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego & Imperial Counties for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief is granted. [8007916] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57
                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [53] submitted by Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8227915] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56
                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (U. Cal. Irvine School of Law, Robinson Court Rm, EDUC 1121, January 18, 2012). Filed by Attorney Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellant Tarla Makaeff. [8007352] (EAI)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55
                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (University of California Irvine, School of Law). Filed by Attorney Ms. Jill Ann Martin for Appellee Trump University, LLC. [8006362] (JAM)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55
                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Robert Randall and Bertram Robison in 11-56397. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8224252] [11-56397, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54
                                                                                                                                                              Revised Notice of Oral Argument on Wednesday, 01/18/2012 10:00 AM UC IRVINE Moot Courtroom. *Please Note 10:00 AM Starting Time*. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8005635] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54
                                                                                                                                                                Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 02/06/2013. Supreme Court Number 12-9017. [8539878] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54
                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE ISSUED.(SST, SRT and KTD) [8339327] [11-55706, 11-55674] (SW)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Filed order (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, ANDREW J. KLEINFELD and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) The panel has voted to deny the petition for rehearing. Judge Kleinfeld voted to grant the petition for rehearing. Judge Silverman voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc, and Judge Goodwin recommended denial. Judge Kleinfeld recommended granting the petition for rehearing en banc. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no active judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing is DENIED and the petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED. [8594345] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53
                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The Motion by the Consumer Attorneys of California for Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant-Appellant is granted. [8003934] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53
                                                                                                                                                                        Received letter from pro se re: request for assistance in filing Writ of Certiorari to USSC. (CASEFILES) [8426760] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          FILED ORDER AND OPINION (STEPHEN S. TROTT, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and KEVIN THOMAS DUFFY); REVERSED; VACATED; REMANDED Judge: SST Authoring,. The Opinion filed July 13, 2012, slip op. 8109, and appearing at 2012 WL 2870128 (9th Cir. 2012), is withdrawn. It may not be cited as precedent by or to this court or any district court of the Ninth Circuit. With the Opinion withdrawn, the Plaintiffs-Appellees’ petition for rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc are moot. The parties may file a petition for rehearing or a petition for rehearing en banc regarding the Opinion filed concurrently with this Order. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8308478] [11-55674, 11-55706] (DD)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53
                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440, 11-56482. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8223388] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: replaced PDF with correctly signed version, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW] (KAR)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (University of California Irvine School of Law, Robinson Court Room, EDUC 1121). Filed by Attorney Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellant Tarla Makaeff. [7996437] --[COURT UPDATE: Per counsel, replaced PDF of Notice. Resent NDA. 12/12/2011 by DB] (EAI)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE ISSUED. (MMS, SRT and BGS) [8413648] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz in 11-55674 petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 07/13/2012 opinion). Date of service: 07/27/2012. [8266422] [11-55674, 11-55706] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The motions of Objector-Appellant Walter Ellingwood in No. 11-56440, Objectors-Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in No. 11-56482, Objectors- Appellants Glenda W. Schilleci and Thomas A. Carder in No. 11-56389 (collectively, “Parties”) to reinstate appeals are granted. The Parties’ motions to reinstate are also construed as notices of joinder in the corrected opening brief filed March 2, 2012. The Parties are reminded, however, of the signature provisions of Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 32(d). The consolidated answering briefs remain due June 21, 2012. (Pro Mo) [8162534] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51
                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Nestle USA, Inc. petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 03/08/2013 memorandum). Date of service: 03/22/2013. [8561202] (CRZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (University of California Irvine, School of Law). Filed by Attorney Ms. Jill Ann Martin for Appellee Trump University, LLC. [7994581] (JAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51
                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) Mandeville-Anthony’s motion to file an amended petition for rehearing en banc is granted. The full court has been advised of the amended petition for rehearing en banc and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. See Fed. R. App. P. 35. Mandeville-Anthony’s amended petition for rehearing en banc is denied. No further filings will be entertained in this closed appeal. [8400270] (ME)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED OPINION (STEPHEN S. TROTT, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and KEVIN THOMAS DUFFY)REVERSED, JUDGMENT VACATED, and CASE REMANDED.. Judge: SST Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8249121] [11-55674, 11-55706] (RP)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51
                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Thomas A. Carder and Glenda W. Schilleci in 11-56389 Motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal. Date of service: 04/30/2012. [8157735] [11-56389, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (CMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50
                                                                                                                                                                                                Received letter from pro se re: follow up on pending petition for rehearing. [8390678] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Walter Ellingwood in 11-56440, Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green in 11-56482 Motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal. Date of service: 04/25/2012. [8153896] [11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JWD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED OPINION (RONALD M. GOULD, MARSHA S. BERZON and MILAN D. SMITH, JR.) REVERSED; VACATED; REMANDED. Judge: MSB Dissenting, Judge: MDS Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8629296] (RP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, ANDREW J. KLEINFELD and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) AFFIRMED IN PART; REVERSED IN PART; REMANDED. The parties shall bear their own costs. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8542743] (DD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received Appellant Jake Mandeville-Anthony notice regarding service of petition for rehearing and certificate of service. [8302177] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed amended clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): This order amends the April 25, 2012 order. The Court notes the following opening briefs for Objector-Appellant Walter Ellingwood in No. 11-56440, for Objector-Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in No. 11-56482, for Objectors-Appellants Glenda W. Schilleci and Thomas A. Carder in No. 11-56389 were due February 22, 2012. To date, no opening briefs or motions for extension of time to file the brief for appeal numbers 11- 56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 have been filed. Nos. 11-56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 only are therefore dismissed for lack of prosecution. A copy of this order served today on the district court shall become the mandate of this court. The joint motion of Defendants-Appellees Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC (collectively, “Defendants-Appellees”) and Plaintiffs-Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Bertram Robison and Robert Randall (collectively, “Plaintiffs-Appellees”) for a 45-day extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The consolidated answering briefs are due June 21, 2012. The consolidated optional reply briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and all objectors are due within 14 days after service of the last-served consolidated answering brief. The motion of Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees for an enlargement of words is denied. The denial is without prejudice to a renewed motion to submit an over-length answering brief accompanied by a single copy of the brief. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2. Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees are reminded of the provisions of Circuit Rule 28-4. [8152697] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/08/2013. [8543852] (DLW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin Correspondence: Letter to the Clerk of Court : Excerpts of Record. Date of service: 04/11/2013 [8586474] (MAG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Received Appellant Jake Mandeville-Anthony petition for rehearing en banc only. Number of pages 17. Deficient: Motion pending. Dated 08/02/2012, no certificate of service. (RESEARCH) [8289025] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Kenneth K. Lee for Appellee Kellog Company. [8201599]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to 11-55706, resent notice. 06/04/2012 by ASW] (KKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed order (Deputy Clerk: AMT) The Court notes the following opening briefs for Objector-Appellant Walter Ellingwood in No. 11-56440, for Objector-Appellants Marcia Green and Jimmy Green in No. 11-56482, for Objectors-Appellants Glenda W. Schilleci and Thomas A. Carder in No. 11-56389 were due February 22, 2012. To date, no opening briefs or motions for extension of time to file the brief for appeal numbers 11- 56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 have been filed. Nos. 11-56440, 11-56482, and 11-56389 only are therefore dismissed for lack of prosecution. A copy of this order served today on the district court shall become the mandate of this court. The joint motion of Defendants-Appellees Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC (collectively, “Defendants-Appellees”) and Plaintiffs-Appellees Jose Hernandez, Kathryn Pike, Bertram Robison and Robert Randall (collectively, “Plaintiffs-Appellees”) for a 45-day extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The consolidated answering briefs are due May 7, 2012. The consolidated optional reply briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and all objectors are due within 14 days after service of the last-served consolidated answering brief. The motion of Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees for an enlargement of words is denied. The denial is without prejudice to a renewed motion to submit an over-length answering brief accompanied by a single copy of the brief. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2. Defendants-Appellees and Plaintiffs-Appellees are reminded of the provisions of Circuit Rule 28-4. [8152554] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/03/2013. [8615415] [11-17369, 11-17460] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Theodore H. Frank and Kimberly Schratwieser citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/11/2013. [8471402] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Google, Inc.. Date of service: 04/20/2012. [8574761] (MHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed Appellant Jake Mandeville-Anthony motion to file amended petition for rehearing en banc. Served on 08/08/2012. [8289021] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Christopher Andres Bandas for Appellant Omar Rivero in 11-55706. [8201346] [11-55706, 11-55674] (CAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 06/21/2012. Date of service: 04/16/2012. [8141808] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE ISSUED.(DWN, RCF and MBC) [8466528] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/03/2013. [8614598] [11-17369, 11-17460]--[COURT UPDATE: replaced with searchable version. 05/03/2013 by SS] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/07/2013. [8464662] (DLW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8570593] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed Appellant Jake Mandeville-Anthony petition for rehearing en banc only Number of Pages 17. Dated 07/25/2012, no certificate of service. Deficiency: Late by 4 days. (RESEARCH) [8285539] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Stephanie Berg in 11-55674. [8200819] [11-55674, 11-55706] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order and amended opinion (DOROTHY W. NELSON, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN). Amending Disposition Opinion AFFIRMED;The opinion filed on October 12, 2012, and appearing at 696 F.3d 943, is amended as follows: On page 12258 of the slip opinion, replace the final two sentences of the third paragraph with the following language: Pursuant to the FCC ruling, prior express consent is consent to call a particular telephone number in connection with a particular debt that is given before the call in question is placed. Id. at 564–65. PRA did not show a single instance where express consent was given before the call was placed. Id. at 565. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. With this amendment, Judges Fisher and Christen vote to deny Appellant’s petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc, filed on October 26, 2012, and Judge Nelson so recommends. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc and no judge requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc is DENIED. No further petitions for en banc or panel rehearing shall be permitted. [8454624] (RP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2013. [8609203] [11-17369, 11-17460]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached cert of service, resent notice. 04/30/2013 by ASW] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED OPINION (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, STEPHEN S. TROTT and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) AFFIRMED; VACATED. Costs are awarded to Defendant. Judge: DFO , Judge: SST , Judge: RRC Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8622485] [11-16751, 11-16776] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MANDATE ISSUED.(AK, SST and KMW) [8470940] [11-56868, 11-56881] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, June 10, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8569799] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED MEMORANDUM (MARY M. SCHROEDER, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8257370] (ST)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Timothy G. Blood, Esquire for Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz in 11-55674. [8200772] [11-55674, 11-55706] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The opening brief [39] submitted by appellants in 11-56376 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8131345] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order (DOROTHY W. NELSON, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN): The American Financial Services Association and California Financial Services Association’s Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Rehearing Motion, filed on October 31, 2012, is GRANTED. The American Banker’s Association’s Motion For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant’s Petition for Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc, filed on November 2, 2012, is GRANTED. [8446864] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The Motion for Exemption from Rule 46-5 filed by Defendant-Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s of London is GRANTED. [8590209] [11-17369, 11-17460] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, STEPHEN S. TROTT and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) Nos. 11-16751 and 11-16776 were previously consolidated for oral argument. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 3(b)(2), we order these cases consolidated for decision. [8622480] [11-16751, 11-16776] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Samuel G. Liversidge for Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company. [8380590] (SGL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed order (Deputy Clerk: WL) The Securities and Exchange Commission’s motion to dismiss the appeal due to Doe’s failure to prosecute is granted and this appeal is dismissed. Circuit Rule 42-1. The copy of this order shall constitute the mandate of this court. [8754174] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (WL) [Entered: 08/23/2013 11:34 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin Correspondence: request update of status. Date of service: 01/24/2013 [8486474] (JCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellants’ unopposed motion for leave to file an oversized brief of 18,188 words is granted. Appellants’ unopposed motion to file a corrected opening brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief submitted by electronic filing on March 2, 2012. The answering briefs are due within 30 days after the date of this order. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. (Pro Mo) [8131185] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Jesse Meyer response opposing motion (,for panel and en banc rehearing,for panel and en banc rehearing (statistical entry)). Date of service: 11/29/2012. [8419272]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of response. Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. Resent NDA. 12/03/2012 by RY] (EP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460 Motion for 46-5 exemption. Date of service: 04/08/2013. [8581775] [11-17369, 11-17460] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Niall McCarthy for Appellees Nicklos Ciolino and Daniel Feder. [8380518] (NM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Omega S.A. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/10/2013. [8585209] (BRL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    revised Notice of Oral Argument on JUNE 7 2012 PASA Calendar. ** note ctrm change ** Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8200001] [11-55674, 11-55706] (AW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Transunion, LLC in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482 response to motion (,motion to file oversized brief, ,motion to file substitute or corrected brief). Date of service: 03/22/2012. [8113563] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SJN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (DOROTHY W. NELSON, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN): Appellee is directed to file a response to Appellant’s petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc filed on October 26, 2012. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the filed date of this order. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. [8396674] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Attorney Evan Tager Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London notice regarding Acknowledgment of Hearing Notice. [8579926] [11-17369, 11-17460] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WL): These two appeals are consolidated for oral argument. Plaintiff-Appellant is allotted a total of 20 minutes for argument for both cases. Defendants-Appellees are each allotted 10 minutes but may, if they agree, divide the total of 20 minutes differently. [8478784] [11-16751, 11-16776] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellant Kimberly Schratwieser and Party Theodore H. Frank. [8380379] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee USSEC in 11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834 Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Date of service: 08/13/2013. [8741501] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (Hancur, Sarah) [Entered: 08/13/2013 01:48 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Kenneth K. Lee for Appellee Kellog Company in 11-55674. [8185086] [11-55674, 11-55706] (KKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (DOROTHY W. NELSON, A. WALLACE TASHIMA and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8592798] (MM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Lee Hudson, Esquire for Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Attorney Mr. Thomas Lee Hudson, Esquire for Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460. [8545797] [11-17369, 11-17460] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Marc J. Randazza for Appellee Wayne Hoehn. [8444763] (MJR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Revised Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, 11/05/2012 - 2:30 PM - Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, California. *Note New Time* Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8380042] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee COST citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/29/2013. [8569509] (NHL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Melinda Hardy for Appellee USSEC in 11-17827. [8739834] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (Hardy, Melinda) [Entered: 08/12/2013 02:33 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The reply brief [40] submitted by Google Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8148821] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LA): The previous order, filed on March 2, 2012, was issued in error and is hereby vacated. Plaintiffs-Appellants' motion to file an enlarged brief, filed on February 22, 2012, and motion to file a corrected brief, filed on February 28, 2012, are still pending and will be addressed in a future order. [8087758] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, May 14, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8542771] [11-17369, 11-17460] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care. Date of service: 05/16/2012. [8619064] (CK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Erik Swen Syverson for Appellant Righthaven LLC. [8440889] (ESS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, October 17, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8732651] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (RB) [Entered: 08/06/2013 01:06 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Google Inc.. Date of service: 04/20/2012. [8148608] (MHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The respondent-intervenor’s motion to expedite calendaring is denied. 9th Cir. R. 27-12. These cases will be calendared in due course. [8210773] [11-73342, 11-73356] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kenneth Kiyul Lee for Appellee Kellog Company in 11-55674. Date of service: 05/18/2012. [8184070] [11-55674, 11-55706] (KKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The Corrected opening brief [39] submitted by the Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8087606] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/05/2013. [8578895] (RBK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460. Date of service: 05/30/2012. [8530177] [11-17369, 11-17460] (CJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Kevin Ferguson and Sandra L. Muniz. Date of service: 06/15/2012. [8618571] (FAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Oral Argument on FEBRUARY Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8439761] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Samuel G. Liversidge for Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company. [8323558] (SGL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The reply brief [36] submitted by Omega S.A. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8337035] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee USSEC in 11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834. Date of service: 05/07/2012. [8724331] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (Hancur, Sarah) [Entered: 07/31/2013 09:39 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Respondent-Intervenor Avenal Power Center in 11-73342 Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 05/30/2012. [8195368] [11-73342, 11-73356] (GTB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Richard Paul Steinken for Appellee Kellog Company in 11-55674. [8132437] [11-55674, 11-55706] (RPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COURT ENTERED FILING: Submitted (ECF) Opening brief (Corrected) for review. Submitted by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 02/28/2012. [8087364] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (TW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Bankers Association. Date of service: 11/02/2012. [8386395] (TP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 03/15/2013. Supreme Court Number 12-1139. [8580909] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460. Date of service: 02/13/2012. [8529318] [11-17369, 11-17460] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The court has received the appellant’s motion for leave to file an oversized reply brief and the appellant’s subsequently filed notice pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 28-4. The motion is granted. The Clerk shall file the reply brief. [8336933] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8710027] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (SYS) [Entered: 07/18/2013 05:35 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order (HARRY PREGERSON, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and M. MARGARET MCKEOWN) The parties are directed to submit supplemental briefs not to exceed 15 pages on the effect of the Supreme Court’s recent decision in Clapper v. Amnesty Int’l, No. 11-1025, on this appeal. The parties shall submit such supplemental briefs no later than April 26, 2013. [8550243] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Motion of Electronic Privacy Information Center ("EPIC") (ECF Filing) to become amicus is referred to panel. The amicus brief of EPIC and any other related filings are referred to the merits panel for consideration. Within seven days of the filing of this order, EPIC is ordered to file seven copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Any further motion to file amicus curiae briefs shall be treated in the same fashion. [8124603] [11-17483] (AT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Dean N. Panos, Esquire for Appellee Kellog Company in 11-55674. [8132315] [11-55674, 11-55706] (DNP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Financial Services Association, and California Financial Services Association. Date of service: 10/31/2012. [8383643] (JTC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The corrected answering brief [36] submitted by AT&T Mobility, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellee is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8570911] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE ISSUED.(BGS, RMG and MBC) [8467367] (TB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8528849] [11-17369, 11-17460] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8617664] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ronald D. Green for Appellee Wayne Hoehn. Date of service: 07/19/2012. [8255875] (RDG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Omega S.A. Correspondence (with notice of joint Reply brief attached). Date of service: 09/20/2012. [8331987]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice. Resent NDA. 09/20/2012 by RY--Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 09/21/2012 by RY] (BRL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): The court’s October 25, 2013 order granted appellant’s counsel leave to withdraw as counsel of record and further indicated that appellant is now representing himself. Within 14 days after the date of this order, appellant shall inform this court if he intend for the opening and reply briefs filed by counsel to be considered. Additionally, appellant shall inform this court if appellant intends to enter a new appearance of counsel. A copy of this order shall be mailed to appellant at the address provided to this court under seal. [8524407] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Gregory N. Karasik for Appellant Tyrone L. Robinson. [8562906] (GNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees CIA, James R. Clapper, Defense Intelligence Agency, DHS, FBI, National Security Agency and Barack Obama citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/13/2013. [8549796] (HCW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [36] submitted by petitioners is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8187307] [11-73342, 11-73356] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED PER CURIAM OPINION (HARRY PREGERSON, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and WILLIAM A. FLETCHER) We do, however, grant Boeing’s and BISS’s joint motion to strike the portions of Petersen’s reply brief that include new evidence or allege new facts not in the record before the district court. We have not relied on any of those additional facts or evidence, although we observe that it may be prudent for Petersen to submit this additional evidence and allege these additional facts on remand. REVERSED AND REMANDED; MOTION TO STRIKE GRANTED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8605875] (RP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Stephanie Berg in 11-55674. [8132164] [11-55674, 11-55706] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 10/12/2012 opinion). Date of service: 10/26/2012. [8377532] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, RONALD M. GOULD and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8441270] (DD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Adam Joseph Karr, Esquire for Appellee Bank of America, NA. [8562881] (AJK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN S. TROTT and KIM MCLANE WARDLAW) Oral argument will be Monday, December 10, 2012, in Pasadena, California. A time will be determined by separate order. For further information or special requests regarding scheduling, please contact Deputy Clerk Paul Keller at paul_keller@ca9.uscourts.gov or (415) 355-8026. [8361940] [11-56357, 11-56868, 11-56881] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (HARRY PREGERSON, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and M. MARGARET MCKEOWN) Argument in this case scheduled for June 1, 2012 in Pasadena, California, is vacated pending the Supreme Court’s decision in Clapper v. Amnesty Int’l, No. 11- 1025. The court may order supplemental briefing following the Supreme Court’s decision. Oral argument will be rescheduled. [8186663] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Electronic Privacy Information Center. Date of service: 03/30/2012. [8123338] (MR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Greenaction for Health and Environmental Justice and Sierra Club in 11-73342, Petitioner El Pueblo Para El Aire Y Agua Limpio in 11-73356. Date of service: 05/22/2012. [8187137] [11-73342, 11-73356] (GMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Received notice of change of address dated 01/04/2013 from Robin P. Petersen. Current new address: 301 S. Corder Road #118, Warner Robins, GA 31088. [8465219] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Timothy G. Blood, Esquire for Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz in 11-55674. [8131790] [11-55674, 11-55706] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 Motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Date of service: 02/28/2012. [8082457] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed brief [39]. Resent NDA. 03/01/2012 by TW] (GFC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED OPINION (DOROTHY W. NELSON, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) AFFIRMED., Judge: MBC Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8357647] (DD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review and filed Motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Submitted by Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. Date of service: 03/19/2013. [8556697] (RBK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Adam Adams and Town of Gilbert, Arizona response to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) ,Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) for rehearing by en banc only (all active, any interested senior judges), Order , Order to set response by any party to anything. Date of service: 04/05/2013. [8578310]. (KSA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460 Correspondence: Request for removal of Kevin Gregory Gill, Esq. from list of attorneys as counsel of record.. Date of service: 12/21/2012 [8450629] [11-17369, 11-17460] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care additional citations. Served on 11/07/2012. (records for merits panel) [8397184] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The reply brief [30] submitted by Righthaven LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8246856] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT-ENTERED FILING (removed brief from [35]). Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Omega S.A.. Date of service: 09/13/2012. [8323261] (ASW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): The court’s order dated October 11, 2012, directed appellant to submit to this court appellant’s complete address under seal. Court records do not reflect appellant has done or communicated to the court. Within 7 days after the date of this order, appellant’s former counsel shall serve a copy of this order on appellant or provide under seal appellant’s late known physical address. A copy of this order shall be mailed to Keith Scully 1201 Third Ave. Ste. 1600, Seattle, Washington 98101. Within 14 days after the date appellant shall comply with the court’s October 11, 2012 order. Failure to respond may result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal. 9th Cir. R. 42-1. A copy of the court’s October 11, 2012 order shall be provided to appellant along with this order. [8506020] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Rochelle Lyn Wilcox, Esquire for Appellee Bank of America, NA. [8546059] (RLW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Oral Argument on MAY 7, 2013 PASADENA Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8562391] (KS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Henry Charles Whitaker for Appellees FBI, National Security Agency, CIA, DHS, Barack Obama, Defense Intelligence Agency and James R. Clapper. [8176234] (HCW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Received Appellant Robin P. Petersen notice to file addendum/errata to response (doc. #33) and in opposition to appellees' motion to strike portions of appellant's reply brief and attachments (doc. #30). Served on 12/10/2012 [8441557] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Oral Argument on JUNE Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8128471] [11-55674, 11-55706] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/10/2012. [8316754] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order (CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, PAUL J. WATFORD and JAMES K. SINGLETON) Defendants-Appellees shall file a response to Paintiffs-Appellants’ Petiton for Rehearing En Banc. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of his order. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. [8553698] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Douglas Erickson for Appellant Arnoldo Zazueta-Miranda. [8360946] (DE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460 Correspondence: Notice of Change of Email Addresses. Date of service: 11/30/2012 [8420695] [11-17369, 11-17460] (CJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher John King for Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care. Date of service: 11/09/2012. [8397144]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached completed form. Resent NDA. 11/14/2012 by RY] (CK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (Appellate Commissioner)The appellant’s opposed motion to file the reply brief late is granted. The Clerk shall file the reply brief submitted on June 22, 2012. (Pro Mo) [8246601] (LRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Omega S.A. Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 09/13/2012. [8322978]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed brief, submitted sep on behalf of counsel in [36], resent notice. 09/13/2012 by ASW] (BRL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Received Appellant John Doe in 11-17827 letter dated 10/22/2012 re: response to 10/11/12 order - declaration that service was made on aplt of the 10/11/12 order.. [8377509] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (CW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Terry K. Davis for Appellant Pendar Fazeli. [8544179] (TKD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Shayana Devendra Kadidal for Appellants Center for Constitutional Rights, Tina M. Foster, Gitanjali S. Gutierrez, Seema Ahmad, Maria LaHood and Rachel Meeropol. [8143973] (SDK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The intervenor brief [32] submitted by Avenal Power Center is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8175729] [11-73342, 11-73356] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Boeing Company and Boeing International Support Systems Company, Saudi Arabia Limited reply to response (motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 07/16/2012. [8250981] (KBO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: el) Appellee's 7-day request for extension of time to file Petition for Rehearing is granted. Petition for Rehearing and/or Rehearing En Banc is due on or before May 3, 2013. [8601819] (EL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz in 11-55674 Correspondence: Change of Address. Date of service: 02/07/2012 [8059617] [11-55674, 11-55706] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/05/2012. [8311220] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Alexandra Serverance citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/22/2013. [8523267] (RDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Good New Community Church and Clyde Reed petition for rehearing en banc (from 02/08/2013 opinion). Date of service: 02/22/2013. [8522909] (JDT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Appellant’s Motion To Submit Appeal on the Briefs is GRANTED. This case shall be submitted on the briefs and record, without oral argument, on Wednesday, December 5, 2012, in San Francisco, California. Fed. R. App. P. 34(f). [8359752] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The joint motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Kilgore v. Keybank, N.A., No. 10-15934, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until May 13, 2013. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the parties shall file a status report and a motion for appropriate relief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [8511867] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Kevin Ferguson and Sandra L. Muniz citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/09/2012. [8396156] (AYC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Righthaven LLC Correspondence: Status report regarding appointment of receiver by District Court and developments related thereto. Date of service: 07/05/2012 [8239012] (ESS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Oral Argument on MAY Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8539952] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KKW): Appellee Bank of America, N.A.’s unopposed motion to reschedule oral argument is GRANTED. This case will now be heard on the May 7, 2013, Pasadena calendar. [8562281] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Oral Argument on JUNE Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8126450] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jahan C. Sagafi for Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 03/26/2012. [8116737] (JCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed Appellant Robin P. Petersen response to appellees' motion to strike portions of appellant's "reply brief" and argument. Served on 07/04/2012. [8242531] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The opening brief [32] submitted by Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire in 11-56397 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8081031] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Jesse Meyer Correspondence: Change of Address. Date of service: 08/07/2012. [8278090]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docke text to reflect content of filing. Resent NDA. 08/07/2012 by RY] (EP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Clifford Cantor for Appellant Alexandra Serverance. [8518145] (CC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED OPINION (CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, PAUL J. WATFORD and JAMES K. SINGLETON) AFFIRMED. Thus, a dismissal for mootness would allow Gilbert to continue to limit Good News’ speech without further judicial review. Accordingly, the motion to dismiss is denied. Judge: CMC Authoring, Judge: PJW Dissenting, . FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8505501] (RP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Jonell Lee Lucca, Esquire for Appellee USA. [8358048]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice. Resent NDA. 10/12/2012 by RY] (JLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The cross-appeal reply brief [32] submitted by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8301031] [11-17369, 11-17460] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Katie M. Weber for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank and California Reconveyance Company. [8561939] (KMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc. Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 02/04/2013. [8499389] (MDI)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Wayne Hoehn response to motion (,motion to file a late brief). Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8235569] (JMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Appellant’s counsel motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants is granted. Court records shall be amended to reflect that Keith Scully, Esq. and the Law Office of Newman Du Wors LLP is no longer counsel of record for appellant and appellant is representing himself. Within 14 days after the date of this order, counsel shall serve a copy of this order on appellant. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall provide a complete address to this court. The address may be provided under seal. Appellant shall inform the court whether he wishes to adapt the opening brief filed by counsel. [8356011] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Bank of America, NA Motion to reschedule oral argument. Date of service: 03/12/2013. [8548315]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of documents. Resent NDA. 03/13/2013 by RY] (AJK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (HARRY PREGERSON, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and M. MARGARET MCKEOWN) The motion to hold separate oral arguments for these two appeals is granted. For each of the appeals, each side will have 20 minutes. [8119967] [11-15468, 11-15535, 11-15956] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Intervenor brief for review. Submitted by Respondent-Intervenor Avenal Power Center in 11-73342. Date of service: 05/08/2012. [8170055] [11-73342, 11-73356]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct brief type. Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 05/11/2012 by RY] (GTB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellees’ motion to strike portions of appellant’s reply brief and attachments and any future related filings are referred for disposition to the panel that considers the merits of the case. [8242360] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc. Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 05/03/2013. Date of service: 04/23/2013. [8601638] (RLG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [31] submitted by the Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7945618] [11-55674, 11-55706] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Charles W. Juntikka, Esquire. Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8078244]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Filing spread to case numbers 11-56400, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56482, 11-56440, 11-56387. Resent NDA. 02/24/2012 by GD] (GAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/11/2012. [8246180] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Mr. Richard Brian Katskee for Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. [8505761] (RBK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Arnoldo Zazueta-Miranda Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Submit Appeal on the Briefs, or Alternatively, to Continue Oral Argument]. Date of service: 10/10/2012. [8354906] (DE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Cross-Appeal Reply Brief brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460. Date of service: 08/27/2012. [8299584] [11-17369, 11-17460] (CJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The joint motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Kilgore v. Keybank, N.A., No. 09-16703, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until February 4, 2013. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the parties shall file a status report and a motion for appropriate relief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice.[8390757] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant John Doe in 11-17827, 11-17830 Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 10/02/2012. [8344584] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (KPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Adam Joseph Karr, Esquire for Appellee Bank of America, NA. [8548307] (AJK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellees CIA, James R. Clapper, Defense Intelligence Agency, DHS, FBI, National Security Agency and Barack Obama in 11-15956, Appellants Keith B. Alexander, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, NSA, Barack H. Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control and Adam J. Szubin in 11-15468, Appellees Keith B. Alexander, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, NSA, Barack H. Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control and Adam J. Szubin in 11-15535 Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [motion to separate cases for purposes of oral argument]. Date of service: 03/22/2012. [8113908] [11-15956, 11-15468, 11-15535] (HCW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [30] submitted by Appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8116227] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received errata to reply brief (addendum exhibit "KO") from Appellant Robin P. Petersen, served on 06/28/2012. (To Records) [8238972] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Peter D. Navarro for Appellee Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 04/23/2013. [8601586] (PDN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Stephanie Berg in 11-55674, Appellant Omar Rivero in 11-55706. Date of service: 10/26/2011. [7943947] [11-55674, 11-55706] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/21/2012. [8223073] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Kim S. Alvarado, Esquire for Appellees Town of Gilbert, Arizona and Adam Adams. [8247524] (KSA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Wednesday, December 5, 2012 - 9:30 AM - Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8352168] [11-10433, 11-10434] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The unopposed motion of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s of London for a 30-day second extension of time to file the reply brief on crossappeal is granted. The reply brief on cross-appeal for defendant is due August 27, 2012. [8250975] [11-17369, 11-17460] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc. Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/05/2012. [8388802] (MDI)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received Appellees Kevin Ferguson and Sandra L. Muniz notice regarding substitution of counsel & firm name change. [8362816] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Allen Lichtenstein for Appellant Righthaven LLC. Date of service: 06/29/2012. [8233775] (AL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Gregory N. Karasik for Appellant Tyrone L. Robinson. [8541229] (GNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 03/23/2012. [8115927] (EJC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Boeing Company and Boeing International Support Systems Company, Saudi Arabia Limited Motion to strike portion of Plaintiff-Appellant's Reply Brief (Dkt 21) and attachments. Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8234789] (KBO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (ALEX KOZINSKI, SUSAN P. GRABER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8596001] (MM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED OPINION (JEROME FARRIS, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and N. RANDY SMITH) AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART AND REMANDED. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal. Judge: JF , Judge: SRT Authoring, Judge: NRS . FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8587628] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Received Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III notification of filing Volume 6 of Excerpts of Record UNDER SEAL, with DC protective order attached. [8080895] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Jesse Meyer Correspondence: Response to Docket No. 29-1 Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j). Date of service: 05/30/2012 [8195913] (AM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record in 2 volume(s). Submitted by Appellant Alexandra Serverance. Date of service: 03/23/2012. [8493684] (RDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Jeremy D. Tedesco for Appellants Clyde Reed and Good New Community Church. [8246684] (JDT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE ISSUED.(AK, BGS and JSR) [8607487] (CW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460 Stipulated Motion to extend time to file Cross-Appeal Reply Brief brief until 08/27/2012. Date of service: 07/12/2012. [8248811] [11-17369, 11-17460] (CJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katie M. Weber, Esq. for Appellees California Reconveyance Company and JPMorgan Chase Bank. Date of service: 03/21/2013. [8560329] (KMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The panel is of the unanimous opinion that the facts and legal argument are adequately presented in the record and briefs, and that the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2)(C). Accordingly, this case shall be submitted on the briefs, without oral argument, on Wednesday, May 15, 2013, in San Francisco, California. [8615054] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc.citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/15/2012 [8360505]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected filing type and text to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 10/15/2012 by ASW] (REB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file a late brief. Submitted by Appellant Righthaven LLC. Date of service: 06/22/2012. [8224986]--[COURT UPDATE: Added certificate of service, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW] (ESS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [28] submitted by John Doe is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8185145] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (SLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Oral Argument on MAY Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8539949] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order (HARRY PREGERSON, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and M. MARGARET MCKEOWN) Oral argument is scheduled for Friday, June 1, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. in Pasadena, California. These appeals are consolidated for the purposes of oral argument only. Each side will have 30 minutes and counsel shall coordinate as to the sharing of time for each side. [8077694] [11-15468, 11-15535, 11-15956] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellant’s response to the motion for reconsideration is construed as a motion for clarification. See Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). So construed, the motion is granted. The answering brief submitted for appellee Boeing Company is 1,981 words and the answering brief submitted for appellee Boeing International Support Systems Company, Saudi Arabia is 11,955 words. The combined amount of words for appellees’ answering briefs is within the 14,000-word type-volume limitation allowed for a principal brief, see Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B)(I), and the Court has exercised its discretion to allow two answering briefs to be filed. (Pro Mo) [8230763] (LRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [28] submitted by Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8078585] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/11/2012. [8175400] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record in 1 volume(s). Submitted by Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8493361] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Revised Notice of Oral Argument on Friday, August 10, 2012 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, California. *Note Revised Start Time* Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8238253] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED OPINION (ALEX KOZINSKI, BARRY G. SILVERMAN and JED S. RAKOFF) AFFIRMED., Judge: BGS Authoring,. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8536674] (DD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Received Appellant Norman Garand notice regarding acknowledgment of hearing notice. [8552965] (MT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) - Joseph Lombardi and Appellees Karen Brice, Carolyn Forbes, Jana Harper, Keith Harper, Annette Kahaly, John Mulea, Sean Murray, Tara Murray, Eben Paguirigan, Tracy Twyman, Maureen Van Meter and Louis M. Wilson citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/01/2012. [8343306] (JCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The reply brief [28] submitted by Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8253396] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant John Doe in 11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834. Date of service: 05/18/2012. [8184496] [11-17827, 11-17830, 11-17834] (KPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Pendar Fazeli. Date of service: 02/11/2013. [8509797]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached separately-submitted PDF files to this entry. Resent notice. 02/12/2013 by ASW] (TKD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage and Russell Carter Correspondence: 14 Day Oral Request for Extension Granted. Date of service: 03/07/2012 [8094313] (EJC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM):This case shall be submitted on the briefs and record, without oral argument, on April 17, 2013, in San Francisco, California, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 34(a)(2). [8528658] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Maria L. Borbon in 11-56387. Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8078234] [11-56387, 11-56376, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8491546] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Jeremy D. Tedesco for Appellants Clyde Reed and Good New Community Church. [8197479] (JDT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The third brief on cross-appeal [26] submitted by Zev Lagstein is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: yellow. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8244790] [11-17369, 11-17460] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees California Reconveyance Company and JPMorgan Chase Bank. Date of service: 06/20/2012. [8549719] (KFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. David S. Steuer, Esquire for Appellee International Game Technology. [8544810] (DSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care. Date of service: 07/16/2012. [8252243] (PWH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The appellant’s opposed motion to file the excerpts of record late is granted. The excerpts of record received on January 17, 2012 shall be filed. The appellee’s motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution is denied. (Pro Mo) [8191206] (LRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record in 1 volume(s). Submitted by Appellee Bank of America, NA. Date of service: 02/11/2013. [8508488] (RLW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Philip Byrnes, Esquire for Appellee City of Las Vegas. [8511393] (PB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (Stanford University). Filed by Attorney Joshua D. Buck for Appellants Jesse Busk and Laurie Castro. [8505203] (MRT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The answering brief [24] submitted by Kellog Company is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7929245] [11-55674, 11-55706] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376. Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8078078] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): We grant appellee’s request to take judicial notice of certain documents filed in Case No. 1156244. (Dkt. 13). We grant appellant’s request to take judicial notice of certain documents made publicly available by the Federal Reserve. (Dkt. 18). The documents are “not subject to reasonable dispute in that it is ... capable of accurate and ready determination by resort to sources whose accuracy cannot reasonably be questioned.” Fed. R. Evid. 201(b). [8132152] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed order (Deputy Clerk: PWS) Appellants’ motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [8532542] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/02/2013. [8457323] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Kim S. Alvarado, Esquire for Appellees Town of Gilbert, Arizona and Adam Adams. [8195514] (KSA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, BARRY G. SILVERMAN and JED S. RAKOFF) The Court unanimously finds this case suitable for decision without oral argument. This case shall be submitted on the briefs and record, without oral argument, on February 13, 2013 in Pasadena, California. Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2). [8498275] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460 Correspondence: Request for Oral Argument. Date of service: 07/09/2012 [8242199] [11-17369, 11-17460] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Norman Garand. Date of service: 05/21/2012. [8549476]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. Resent NDA. 03/20/2013 by RY] (KR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Wednesday, May 15, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8543043] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [26] submitted by In re DirecTV, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8313790] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Wayne Hoehn response to motion (,motion to extend time to file record on appeal). Date of service: 05/16/2012. [8181471] (JMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8507191] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Kirk Kennedy for Appellant Reginald Bingham. [8501331] (KK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (StanfordUniversity, School of Law). Filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Russell Thierman for Appellants Jesse Busk and Laurie Castro. [8448047] (MRT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [25] submitted by Harry Dennis & Jon Koz is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7928516] [11-55674, 11-55706]. [7928516] [11-55674, 11-55706] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The Court notes that the opening brief in No. 11-56400 for appellant Steve C. Signer was filed February 6, 2012. Appellants’ motion for reconsideration of the February 1, 2012 order is granted. The amended briefing schedule is as follows: the opening briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and objectors in No. 11-56376 and for the objectors in Nos. 11- 56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56440, and 11-56482 are due February 22, 2012. The answering briefs are due March 23, 2012. The reply briefs for the Radcliffe plaintiffs and all objectors are due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. In view of the complexity of the briefing schedule, no telephonic extensions of time in which to file briefs pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) will be granted. (Pro Mo) [8071773] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Azita Moradmand for Appellee Jesse Meyer. [8096555] (AM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Christopher Jones and Benton P. Zwart Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 02/27/2013. [8529896] (JW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Orange Countys Credit Union citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/17/2013. [8479234] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460. Date of service: 07/09/2012. [8242178] [11-17369, 11-17460] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Phillip Sprando. Date of service: 12/01/2011. [8542992] (MNB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc.. Date of service: 09/06/2012. [8313519] (MDI)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Corinthian Colleges, Inc.. The optional reply brief is due July 16, 2012. [8220582] (GS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record in 1 volume(s). Submitted by Appellee City of Las Vegas. Date of service: 07/16/2012. [8501247] (PB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco (Stanford Law School). Filed by Attorney Mr. Rick D. Roskelley, Esquire for Appellee Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc.. [8445904] (RDR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz. Date of service: 10/12/2011. [7925614] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to case nubmer 11-55706. Resent NDA. 10/14/2011 by DB] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher William Madel for Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. [8096243] (CWM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): On or before March 4, 2013, counsel for appellants shall provide a status report by email (Peter_Sherwood@ca9.uscourts.gov). [8480107] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [24] submitted by Alexandra Serverance is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8287246] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Anerio Ventura Altman, Esquire for Appellee Angie M. Garcia. [8457272]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with print to PDF version to resolve viewing issues, resent notice. 01/02/2013 by ASW] (AVA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460 Correspondence: Confirming 14-day extension of time to file third brief.. Date of service: 06/20/2012 [8221674] [11-17369, 11-17460] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, May 13, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8542536] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8528863] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Received Attorney Jeffrey Dickerson for Appellant Peter C. Hansen notice regarding Acknowledgment of Hearing Notice. [8549650] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Corinthian Colleges, Inc. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 07/16/2012. Date of service: 06/19/2012. [8219712] (PDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Righthaven LLC Motion to extend time to file record on appeal until 05/10/2012 at 10:00 am. Date of service: 05/09/2012. [8171254] (ESS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The opening brief [23] submitted by Google Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8063648] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Oral Argument on Wednesday, April 17, 2013 - 9:30 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, California. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8500807] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, February 12, 2013 - 12:45 PM - Moot Courtroom - Stanford University School of Law - Stanford, California. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8437093] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Kellog Company in 11-55674, 11-55706. Date of service: 10/12/2011. [7925832] [11-55674, 11-55706]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of brief (to include statement of related cases). Attached Certificate of Service. Resent NDA. 10/14/2011 by TW] (RPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440, 11-56482 Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Stephanie Mazepa as Counsel. Date of service: 02/14/2012. [8068813] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] --[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect the content of the filing. Resent NDA. 02/14/2012 by DB] (KAR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Oral Argument on MAY Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8096090] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): On or before January 8, 2013, counsel for appellants shall provide a status report by email (Peter_Sherwood@ca9.uscourts.gov). [8447655] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Alexandra Serverance. Date of service: 08/13/2012. [8285901] (RDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Joseph Marshall Welch for Appellant Orange Countys Credit Union. [8443614] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8528061] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Michael D. Jensen, Esquire for Appellees State of Nevada and Mark Malloy. [8545314] (MDJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file reply filed by Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc. The reply brief is due 9/6/12. [8274708] (GS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Google Inc.. Date of service: 02/08/2012. [8062181] (MHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record in 1 volume(s). Submitted by Appellant Reginald Bingham. Date of service: 05/29/2012. [8493999] (KK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz Correspondence: Extension to file Answering Brief. Date of service: 09/23/2011 [7904576] --[COURT UPDATE: Filing spread to case number 11-55706. Resent NDA. 09/23/2011 by DB] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Correspondence: Letter to Clerk of Court Regarding Multidistrict Litigation Transfer Order. Date of service: 02/13/2012 [8066147] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): On or before December 7, 2012, counsel for appellants shall provide a status report by email (Peter_Sherwood@ca9.uscourts.gov). [8394602] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Granting unopposed (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file the reply brief. The reply brief is due August 13, 2012. [8226423] [11-35871] (AT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on FEBRUARY Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8442569] (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [22] submitted by Phillip Sprando is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. [8074197] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Oral Argument on Friday, May 17, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8543741] (RB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [21] submitted by Appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8272792] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The answering brief [22] submitted by Kevin Ferguson and Sandra L. Muniz is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8217393] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Erik Swen Syverson for Appellant Righthaven LLC. Date of service: 04/16/2012. [8141001] (ESS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [8031374] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8490080] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/05/2012. [8129785] --[COURT UPDATE: Amended docket text to reflect the content of the filing. Resent NDA. 04/05/2012 by DB] (RLG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Kellog Company in 11-55706 Correspondence: Extension of time to file Answering Brief. Date of service: 09/23/2011 [7904627] [11-55674, 11-55706] (RPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): On or before November 5, 2012, counsel for appellants shall provide a status report by email (Peter_Sherwood@ca9.uscourts.gov). [8348966] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Alexandra Serverance Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 08/13/2012. Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8226244] (RDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [21] submitted by Norman Garand is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8237761] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Phillip Sprando. Date of service: 02/17/2012. [8073595] (MNB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc. Motion to extend time to file a reply until 09/06/2012. Date of service: 07/30/2012. [8269094] (SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Kevin Ferguson and Sandra L. Muniz. Date of service: 06/15/2012. [8217004] (FAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Google Inc. Correspondence: Confirmation of Extension of Time. Date of service: 01/11/2012 [8028887] (MHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Jesse Busk and Laurie Castro citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/27/2012. [8119044] (MRT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The opening brief [20] submitted by Steven C. Signer in 11-56400 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8058204] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): Due to a conflict that has arisen for the Circuit Mediator, the follow-up conference scheduled for August 30, 2012, is rescheduled to October 4, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the scheduled conference. [8304583] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The reply brief [20] submitted by Orange Countys Credit Union is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. [8035573] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The second brief on cross-appeal [20] submitted by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8196320] [11-17369, 11-17460] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Norman Garand. Date of service: 07/03/2012. [8237402] (KR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Phillip Sprando Correspondence: Communication to counsel for Appellee regarding extension of reply brief, pursuant to Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a). Date of service: 01/26/2012 [8045843] (KAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Peter C. Hansen. Date of service: 03/06/2013. [8539466]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached Volumes 3 and 4 of excerpts. Resent NDA. 03/08/2013 by RY] (JAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Karen Brice, Carolyn Forbes, Jana Harper, Keith Harper, Annette Kahaly, John Mulea, Sean Murray, Tara Murray, Eben Paguirigan, Tracy Twyman, Maureen Van Meter and Louis M. Wilson. Date of service: 07/24/2012. [8268131]--[COURT UPDATE: Changed filed date to 7/24/2012. 08/01/2012 by ASW] (JCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Steven C. Signer in 11-56400. Date of service: 02/05/2012. [8056849] [11-56400, 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [19] submitted by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7999172] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Second Brief on Cross-Appeal brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369, Appellant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17460. Date of service: 05/30/2012. [8194757] [11-17369, 11-17460] (CJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8528918] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on January 13, 2012, at 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time (4:00 p.m. Eastern Time). [8018268] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [18] submitted by Jesse Busk and Laurie Castro is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. [8065641] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Lisa Brisbane, Chester Carter, Christy Driver, Maria Falcon, Arnold Lovell, Jr., Ivonne Martinez, Brenda Melendez, Kelly J. Porter, Ralph Michael Porter, Robert Radcliffe and Clifton C. Seale, III in 11-56376 motion for reconsideration of non-dispositive Clerk Order of 02/01/2012. Date of service: 02/02/2012. [8055343] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (GFC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Date of service: 12/12/2011. [7997175] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brandon J. Stoker for Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company. Date of service: 08/10/2012. [8283884] (BHE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The answering brief [18] submitted by AT&T Mobility, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8218602] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The unopposed motion of Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s of London for a 30-day second extension of time to file the second brief on crossappeal is granted. The second brief on cross-appeal for defendant is due May 30, 2012. The third brief on cross-appeal for plaintiff is due June 29, 2012. The optional cross-appeal reply brief for defendant is due within 14 days after service of the third brief on cross-appeal. [8154223] [11-17369, 11-17460] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Karen Brice, Carolyn Forbes, Jana Harper, Keith Harper, Annette Kahaly, John Mulea, Sean Murray, Tara Murray, Eben Paguirigan, Tracy Twyman, Maureen Van Meter and Louis M. Wilson Correspondence: Notification of Filing Under Seal. Date of service: 07/24/2012. [8262081]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. Resent NDA. 07/25/2012 by RY] (JCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [18] submitted by Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8181292] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received Appellant Righthaven LLC's excerpts of record in 1 volume. Deficiencies: untimely, excerpts lack certificate of service. Notified counsel (See attached notice). [8033393] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order MEDIATION (MAC):The further conference, previously set for December 12, 2011, is rescheduled to December 14, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time (1:00 p.m. Eastern Time). [7998917] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Jesse Busk and Laurie Castro. Date of service: 02/10/2012. [8065438] (MRT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE ISSUED. (FFF, AWT and KMW) [8544460] (EL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellants’ unopposed motion to consolidate is granted. Nos. 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, and 11-56482 shall proceed as consolidated appeals. The opening brief for consolidated Nos. 11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11- 56397, and 11-56400 remains due February 6, 2012. Appellants are reminded that the motion has to demonstrate extraordinary circumstances before the granting of a written motion for a continuance after a telephonic request. The amended briefing schedule is as follows: the opening brief for consolidated Nos. 56440 and 56482 is due February 22, 2012. The consolidated answering brief is due March 23, 2012. The consolidated optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. [8052473] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56440, 11-56482] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 12/12/2011. [7997160] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): The court will initiate a further assessment conference by telephone on August 30, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the next scheduled conference. [8283434] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8218463] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE ISSUED. (FFF, AWT and KMW) [8550767] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Second Brief on Cross-Appeal brief until 05/30/2012. Date of service: 04/23/2012. [8150028] [11-17369, 11-17460] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The answering brief [17] submitted by California Reconveyance Company, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc., Reconstruct Company and WAMU Bank, F.A. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8222464] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [17] submitted by Peter C. Hansen is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8145422] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care. Date of service: 05/16/2012. [8181209] (PWH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The answering brief [17] submitted by Wayne Hoehn is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. [8031734] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The opening brief [16] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7876100] [11-55674, 11-55706] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED MEMORANDUM (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, A. WALLACE TASHIMA and KIM MCLANE WARDLAW) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8514183] (ME)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The appellants’ joint motion to consolidate case Nos. 11-56440 and 11-56482 and to amend the briefing schedule is granted. The cases are consolidated. The consolidated opening brief is due February 22, 2012. The answering briefs are due March 23, 2012. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [8050643] [11-56440, 11-56482] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Jesse Meyer Correspondence: Notice of Non-Opposition Re Motion for Judicial Notice. Date of service: 12/12/2011 [7997077] (AM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED MEMORANDUM (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, A. WALLACE TASHIMA and KIM MCLANE WARDLAW) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8517718] (ST)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Defendant’s unopposed motion for a 45-day extension of time to file the second brief on cross-appeal is granted. The second brief on cross-appeal for defendant is due April 30, 2012. The third brief on cross-appeal for plaintiff is due May 30, 2012. The optional cross-appeal reply brief for defendant is due within 14 days after service of the third brief on cross-appeal. Defendant’s counsel is reminded that all motions should be served on all parties and should be accompanied by proof of service. See Fed. R. App. P. 25(d). [8087841] [11-17369, 11-17460] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees California Reconveyance Company and JPMorgan Chase Bank. Date of service: 06/20/2012. [8222371] (KFL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Peter C. Hansen. Date of service: 04/18/2012. [8145413] (JAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jahan C. Sagafi for Appellees Karen Brice, Carolyn Forbes, Jana Harper, Keith Harper, Annette Kahaly, John Mulea, Sean Murray, Tara Murray, Eben Paguirigan, Tracy Twyman, Maureen Van Meter and Louis M. Wilson. Date of service: 07/23/2012. [8259634] (JCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Technology and Health Care and Heald Capital, LLC; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Technology and Health Care and Heald Capital, LLC Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care opening brief due 05/16/2012. Appellees Kevin Ferguson and Sandra L. Muniz answering brief due 06/15/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8126038] (GS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Wayne Hoehn. Date of service: 01/12/2012. [8030789]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 01/13/2012 by GD] (JMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mary Ann Giorno for Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 11/21/2011. [7973980] (MAG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The answering brief [15] submitted by Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. [8047976] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Stephanie Berg in 11-55674, Appellant Omar Rivero in 11-55706. Date of service: 08/29/2011. [7874878] [11-55674, 11-55706] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Jimmy Green and Marcia Green Motion to consolidate cases 11-56482 and 11-56440. Date of service: 01/17/2012. [8034562] (JGK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Evan M. Tager for Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8217717] (EMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed original and 7 copies of Appellants Dana Lynn Kennedy and Philip Frank Kennedy (Informal: No) reply brief of 20 pages. Excerpts of record in 1 volume. Served on 02/28/2012. [8089908] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London in 11-17369 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 04/30/2012. Date of service: 03/01/2012. [8086963] [11-17369, 11-17460] (JMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Granting unopposed (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file the reply brief. The reply brief is due May 9, 2012. [8124549] [11-17070] (AT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) - Joseph Lombardi and Appellees Karen Brice, Carolyn Forbes, Jana Harper, Keith Harper, Annette Kahaly, John Mulea, Sean Murray, Tara Murray, Eben Paguirigan, Tracy Twyman, Maureen Van Meter and Louis M. Wilson Correspondence: 14-day extension granted. Date of service: 06/29/2012 [8233631] (KLS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC and Technology and Health Care Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 05/16/2012. Date of service: 04/03/2012. [8125761]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct extension date. Resent NDA. 04/03/2012 by RY] (PDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): On November 18, 2011, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Margaret A. Corrigan. Michael H. Rubin, Esq. participated on behalf of appellant; Jeffrey L. Kodroff, Esq. and Daniel A. Small, Esq. participated on behalf of appellees. By December 2, 2011, counsel for appellees shall provide to appellant’s counsel and the Circuit Mediator the information discussed during the November 18, 2011 conference call. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on December 12, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time (2:00 p.m. Eastern Time). Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [7973902] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 01/27/2012. [8047680] (RLG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellants’ opposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs is granted in part. The opening brief is due August 29, 2011. Any further request for an extension of time to file the opening briefs are disfavored. The answering brief is due September 28, 2011. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7848687] [11-55674, 11-55706] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Terminated Shirin Nassi for Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56376, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56387, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56389, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56397, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56400, Experian Information Solutions Inc. in 11-56409, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56440 and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 11-56482 [7958277] [11-56376, 11-56387, 11-56389, 11-56397, 11-56400, 11-56409, 11-56440, 11-56482] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Appellant Motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Philip Frank Kennedy and Dana Lynn Kennedy; The reply brief is due March 16, 2012. [8087007] (GS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (SUSAN P. GRABER and N. RANDY SMITH) Appellant’s opposed motion to stay district court proceedings pending appeal is granted. See Winter v. Natural Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7 (2008); Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. [8102033] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Wayne Hoehn response opposing motion (,motion to become amicus). Date of service: 12/13/2011. [7999789] (JMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The parties’ joint motion to extend the briefing schedule is granted. The answering brief is due January 27, 2012. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8020245] (LBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz in 11-55674 response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 08/05/2011. [7846582] [11-55674, 11-55706] (PNS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The answering brief [12] submitted by Jesse Meyer is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7981658] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard B. Katskee for Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8217077] (RBK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed Appellants Dana Lynn Kennedy and Philip Frank Kennedy notice of motion and motion for an 14 day extension of time to file the reply brief. Served on 02/15/2012. [8078850] (JFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The first brief on cross-appeal [12] submitted by Zev Lagstein is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8068845] [11-17369, 11-17460] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Norman Garand Correspondence: certificate of service - Excerpts of Record. Date of service: 03/21/2012 [8192319] (KR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): The appellees’ opposed motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Kilgore, et al. v. Keybank, National Association, et al., No. 09-16703, is denied. The answering brief is due July 10, 2012. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8186399] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/08/2012. [8095631] (PDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Wayne Hoehn Correspondence: Correspondence to opposing counsel, clerk regarding 31-2.2(a) extension. Date of service: 12/13/2011 [7999736] (JMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian M. Willen for Appellant Google Inc.. Date of service: 11/17/2011. [7970883] (BMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc. Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 01/27/2012. Date of service: 12/30/2011. [8016057] (RLG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Stephanie Berg in 11-55674 Joint Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 09/22/2011. Date of service: 08/05/2011. [7846381] [11-55674, 11-55706] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katie Richardson for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956560] (KAR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Jesse Meyer Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 11/28/2011. [7981105] (DCP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Granting unopposed (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file the answering brief filed by Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC. The answering brief is due 06/18/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8140300] [11-35871] (AT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant In re DirecTV, Inc. response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 05/07/2012. [8167407] (MDI)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) Appellants’ opposed motion to expedite disposition of the motion to stay district court proceedings pending appeal is denied. The pending motion to stay district court proceedings pending appeal shall be addressed by the next regularly scheduled motions panel. The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. [8085232] (KD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): Appellants’ motion to consolidate is granted. Nos. 11-55674 and 11-55706 shall proceed as consolidated appeals. The briefing schedule in No. 11-55706 shall govern these appeals. The parties are encouraged to file one brief covering the consolidated appeals. Ninth Circuit Rule 28-4; Advisory Committee Note to Rule 28-4. If the parties wish to expedite these appeals, a motion to expedite should be filed pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 27-12. [7825225] [11-55674, 11-55706] (SM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [11] submitted by Sprint Nextel Corporation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8162386] (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [7932657] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Jesse Meyer. Date of service: 11/28/2011. [7981103] (DCP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 06/18/2012. Date of service: 04/13/2012. [8139855] (AAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) First Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellant Zev Lagstein in 11-17369, Appellee Zev Lagstein in 11-17460. Date of service: 02/13/2012. [8067001] [11-17369, 11-17460] --[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect the correct type of brief. Resent NDA. 02/14/2012 by DB] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [11] submitted by Norman Garand is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8187007] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellees Karen Brice, Carolyn Forbes, Jana Harper, Keith Harper, Annette Kahaly, John Mulea, Sean Murray, Tara Murray, Eben Paguirigan, Tracy Twyman, Maureen Van Meter and Louis M. Wilson Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 04/25/2012. [8153077] (KLS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/23/2012. [8079016] (PDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John A. Macoretta for Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 11/17/2011. [7970106] (JAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Harry Dennis and Jon Koz Motion to consolidate cases 11-55674 11-55706. Date of service: 07/18/2011. [7824044] (PNS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Sprint Nextel Corporation. Date of service: 05/02/2012. [8161735]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Edited docket text to reflect correct brief type. Resent NDA. 05/02/2012 by RY] (AJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order MEDIATION (VLS):This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform Roxane G. Ashe, Circuit Mediator, in writing, by fax at (415) 355-8566, of their clients’ views on whether: the case is appropriate for settlement discussions or mediation; the court can accommodate ongoing settlement discussions or otherwise facilitate settlement of the dispute; and/or the court should schedule a telephonic conference to discuss settlement. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. This communication shall not be served on the opposing party and shall not be filed with the court. For more detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures generally, please see Mediation Program web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [7920776] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Granting unopposed motion (ECF Filing) to extend time to file the first cross-appeal brief filed by plaintiff Zev Lagstein. The first cross-appeal brief for plaintiff Zev Lagstein is due 02/13/2012. The second brief on cross-appeal for defendant is due 03/14/2012. The third brief on cross-appeal for plaintiff is due April 13, 2012. The optional cross-appeal reply brief for defendant is due within 14 days after service of the third brief on cross-appeal on cross-appeal. [8003984] [11-17369, 11-17460] (AT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Norman Garand. Date of service: 03/21/2012. [8186150] (KR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Terminated Sarah P. Weber for Patricia Wilson, Louis M. Wilson, David Ward, Maureen Van Meter, Tracy Twyman, Eben Paguirigan, Tara Murray, Sean Murray, John Mulea, Hoyt McBroom, Annette Kahaly, Dorothy Jones, Keith Harper, Jana Harper, Carolyn Forbes, Joshua Folkerth, Renato Cappuccitti, Paul Cannon, Jack E. Brode, Alice M. Brode, Paul Brice, Karen Brice, Gary Smith, Christine Slakans, Christine Schuessler, Roberta Pifer, Edward Pifer, Kathleen O'Brien, Joseph Lombardi, Sandra Johannes and Ira Boshnack in 10-56602 and Carolyn Forbes, Louis M. Wilson, Maureen Van Meter, Tracy Twyman, Eben Paguirigan, Tara Murray, Sean Murray, John Mulea, Annette Kahaly, Keith Harper, Jana Harper and Karen Brice in 11-56752 [8142797] [10-56602, 11-56752] (PH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Corinthian Colleges, Inc., Heald Capital, LLC, Heald College, LLC and Technology and Health Care reply to response (, ,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 02/15/2012. [8071399] (PDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) is referred to panel., Motion (ECF Filing) is referred to panel.; Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. Association of American Publishers and Recording Industry Association of America and any other related filings are referred to the merits panel for consideration. Within seven days of the filing of this order, Association of American Publishers and Recording Industry Association of America is ordered to file seven copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Any further motion to file amicus curiae briefs shall be treated in the same fashion. [7990762] (GS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 396 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?