Aloha Airlines, Inc. v. Mesa Air Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00007
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 3:28 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aloha Air Group, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Khan, Amjad M +1 213 485 1234
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Kim +1 213 485 1234
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Komeiji

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Arouh Hicks +1 619 236 1234 +1 619 696 7419 kimberly.hicks@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia G. Stringel +1 202 637 1304 +1 202 637 2201

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Choi & Verbrugge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Wagner +1 808 533 1877 +1 808 566 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by Watanabe Ing & Komeiji, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Kang +5448 544 544 8300 bkang@wik.com
v.
No Logo Charles D. Lauritsen, Defendant
No Logo Joe Bock, Defendant
No Logo Mesa Air Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc F. Feinstein +1 213 430 6000
TERMINATED: 07/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Noblin +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710

Toggle Switch Represented by Blecher and Collins PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maxwell M Blecher +1 213 622 4222 +1 213 622 1656 mblecher@blechercollins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Petrocelli +1 310 553 6700 +1 213 430 6407 dpetrocelli@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Price Okamoto Himeno & Lum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Marks ram@pohlhawaii.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren Price, III +5381 538 538 1113
No Logo Garfinkle & Wang LLC, Interested Party
No Logo GARFINKLE & WANG LLC dba GCW CONSULTING, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rush Moore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devon I. Peterson dpeterson@rmhawaii.com
No Logo Morris Garfinkle, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lissa H. Andrews landrews@caselombardi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rush Moore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason M. Tani +5248 524 524 8350 jtani@rmhawaii.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (169) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 12/16/2008. [Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and in accordance with the Settlement Agreement, the Action in its entirety is dismissed with prejudice effective February 27, 2009 (the "Dismissal"); provided, however, that if a petition for relief under 11 U.S.C. has been filed by or against Mesa on or prior to 5:00 p.m. Hawaii time on February 27, 2009, the Dismissal shall not be effective until the expiration of any statute of limitations for the avoidance and/or recovery of the payment by Mesa of $2,000,000 in cash and transfer by Mesa of 2,692,800 shares of Mesa common stock to Yucaipa (collectively, the "Consideration") pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. In the event Mesa or any entity acting through, on behalf of or in the name of Mesa or its estate seeks during any applicable statute of limitations to avoid and/or recover, and avoids and/or recovers, any of the Consideration, the Dismissal shall be deemed tohave never occurred. There are no remaining claims or parties.] (afc) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc. re 179 Stipulation and Order (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (afc) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        EO: Re Letter Briefs Submitted 10/20/2008 and 10/21/2008 - the court orders that the parties hold a face to face meeting to attempt to work out a mutually acceptable schedule. If parties continue to disagree, simultaneous Letter Briefs are to be submitted to the court by 4:30 p.m. on Thursday, October 23, 2008. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 10/21/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian A. Kang on behalf of Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kang, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION and AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - amending 160 (Discovery due by 3/27/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2009 09:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 5/22/2009 before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA.) Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (afc) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc. (Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Plaintiff's Seventh Request For Production Of Documents) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                EP: Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Further conference on call. (FTR-Ctrm Chambers, 10 - 12:10) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  EO: Further Status Conference set for 8/19/2008 @ 10 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren is terminated. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc. (re: Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Sixth Request for Production of Documents) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc. (re: Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Plaintiff's Fifth Request for Production of Documents) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS JOE BOCK AND CHARLES D. LAURITSEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 8/1/2008. related: 28 . Defendant Joe Bock and defendant Charles D. Lauritsen terminated. (afc) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Copy of 166 the ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Order will be re-served on August 1, 2008 via First Class Mail upon attorneys Jason Kim, Esq., Patricia G. Stringel, Esq., Amjad M. Khan, Esq. at address: Latham & Watkins/355 S. Grand Ave./Los Angeles CA. 90071-1560. (afc) (afc) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock re 167 Stipulation Dismissing All Claims Against Defendants Joe Bock and Charles D. Lauritsen Without Prejudice (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION Dismissing All Claims Against Defendants Joe Bock and Charles D. Lauritsen Without Prejudice by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 7/23/08. (afc) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: (1) Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Objections and Responses To Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Responses To Defendant Mesa Air Group Inc.'s Second Set of Requests For Production of Documents (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A settlement conference has been scheduled for August 14, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., in the above-entitled case. Lead counsel and representatives of the parties with full settlement authority shall be present. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 7/23/08. (afc) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Maxwell M. Blecher, Esq. and James Robert Noblin, Esq. for defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (afc) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        EP: Further Status Conference held. Further Status Conference set for 8/19/2008 @ 10 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Parties to select a date, time, and venue for a Settlement Conference and notify the court by the end of the week. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 10:44 - 11:11) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 2/10/2009. Motions due by 12/18/2008. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 7/16/08. (afc) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING MESA AIR GROUP, INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE. ( Status Conference set for 7/15/2008 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge BARRY M. KURREN.) Signed by Magistrate Judge BARRY M. KURREN on July 2, 2008. (bbb, ) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                              EO: re 154 Set Deadlines/Hearings. Please disregard minute order. Docketed in wrong case. (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, ) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                EO: Status Conference Re: Dispositive Motions Deadlines set for 7/7/2008 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, ) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 7/1/08. (afc) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    EP: Discovery Conference Re Letter Briefs Submitted on June 27, 2008 - held. Court issued a Protective Order as to the preservation of Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s computers. Mr. Petrocelli to prepare the Protective Order. Parties agreed to a briefing schedule as follows: Defendants to submit informal written discovery upon Plaintiffs by July 1, 2008. Plaintiffs' response due by early next week. Parties are required to confer by July 11, 2008 to attempt to reach an agreement as to the issues re Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s computers. If parties cannot reach an agreement, the Court will address this matter at the Status Conference set for 7/15//2008 @ 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Rescheduling Conference held. All dates/deadlines vacated. Counsel to confer and work out pretrial deadlines. Court to prepare amended scheduling order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2009 @ 09:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 4/7/2009 before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2009 @ 10:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Status Conference set for 7/15/2008 @ 10:30 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (C6-No Record; 9:05-9:35) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(tyk) 7/1/2008: Modified date-filed field from 7/1/2008 to 6/30/2008 (afc). (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. re 150 Notice of Change of Address (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian A. Kang on behalf of Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kang, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          EO: Letter briefs re the issues raised in Robert A. Marks' letter dated June 25, 2008 are due by Friday, June 27, 2008. Court to address issues at the Rescheduling Conference set for Monday, June 30, 2008 @ 9:00 a.m. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mesa Air Group, Inc. for proceedings held on 6/6/08 before Judge Barry M. Kurren.. (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              EP:Rescheduling Conference held on 6/19/2008. This matter continued to 6/30/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Court Reporter None.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(lls, ) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc. (re: Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s First Set Of Interrogatories To Plaintiff Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s Second Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents To Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. And Aloha Air Group, Inc.) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  EP: Rescheduling Conference continued to 6/19/2008 @ 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. June dates/deadlines are vacated. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 10:58 - 11:14) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    EO: Rescheduling Conference is set for 6/6/2008 11:00 AM Hawaii time before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      EP: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/30/2008. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, ) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN AS THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN THIS MATTER AND REFERRING TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO SET EXPEDITED DISCOVERY CALENDAR. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 5/30/08. Please reflect case number CV 07-00007DAE-BMK on all further pleadings. (afc) (Entered: 06/01/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. re 136 Response to Order to Show Cause (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Aloha Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kang, Brian) Modified on 5/28/2008:Order to Show Cause: document 134 (afc). (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/30/2008 01:30 PM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 4/30/08. (afc) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                EP: Status Conference held on 4/30/2008. (Court Reporter cynthia fazio.) (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  EO: Status Conference has been re-scheduled to 4/30/2008 09:45 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, ) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    AMENDED EO: : Court orders that all pretrial deadlines will be stayed for one week. Status Conference set for 4/29/2008 09:45 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      EO: Court orders that all pretrial deadlines will be stayed for one week. Status Conference set for 4/26/2005 09:45 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/21/08. (This matter is returned to the Chief Judge for reassignment.) (emt, ) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          EP: Status Conference held on 1/10/2008. Settlement Conference to be held in the ordinary course (7/2/08, 10:00am, Judge Chang).(C5 - no record, 11:00-11:10am.) (Judge JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            EO: Status Conference set for 1/10/2008 11:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. All counsel to participate by phone. Brian Kang and Robert Marks have been notified. (Judge JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, ) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc. (re: Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Plaintiff's Fourth Request For Production Of Documents) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                EO: Settlement Conference set 12/12/07 at 3:30pm before Judge Chang is hereby vacated. Counsel to confer and contact the court to reset Settlement Conference to sometime in January 2008. Brian Kang to notify all parties. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  EP: Status Conference held on 12/5/2007. Settlement Conference set 12/12/07, 3:30pm, Judge Chang. ( C5 - no record, 9:30-9:40am.) (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 31, 2007 re: 72 Motion for an Order to de-designate certain documents; hearing held before Judge Kevin S.C. Chang. Court Reporter: ESR; transcriber: Jessica B. Cahill. (SEALED) (afc) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ORIGINAL SIGNATURE submitted for re 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Petrocelli. (afc) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 118 Daniel M. Petrocelli's and 116 Mark F. Feinstein's Applications for Admission as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for defendants. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/03/07. (afc) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 241773 - Daniel M. Petrocelli, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 12/02/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION by Daniel M. Petrocelli, Esq. for Admission as Counsel Pro Hac Vice - filed by, and for, defendants Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (afc) (Entered: 12/02/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 241772 - Mark K. Feinstein, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 12/02/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION by Marc F. Feinstein, Esq. for Admission as Counsel Pro Hac Vice - filed by, and for, defendants Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (afc) (Entered: 12/02/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. re: Order Granting Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc.'s and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion for an Order to Unseal August 31, 2007 Hearing on Motion to De-designate Documents to Obtain Transcript (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. re 111 Ex Parte Motion and order, to Unseal August 31, 2007 Hearing on Motion to De-designate documents to Obtain Transcript (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      EO: Status Conference set for 12/5/2007 09:30 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Brian Kang and Robert Marks have been notified. Robert Crockett, Marc Feinstein and Daniel Petrocelli to participate by phone. Pro Hac Vice applications pending for Marc Feinstein and Daniel Petrocelli. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. re: Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Notice of Oral Deposition of Jonathan Ornstein (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for an order to unseal 97 August 31, 2007 hearing on Motion to de-designate certain documents to obtain transcript. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian A. Kang # 2 ORDER granting Ex Parte Motion - Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 11/20/07.) (afc) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 10/16/07. (ecs, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              EP: Status Conference Re: Scheduling of an Early Settlement Conference held on 10/12/2007. Counsel to confer further regarding settlement. At counsel's request, new trial date given. First Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued.Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 10/28/2008 before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2008 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 7/2/2008 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Discovery due by 8/29/2008. Motions due by 5/28/2008.(In Chambers - no record, 11:00-11:15am.) (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock (re: Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.'s Responses To Plaintiff's Third Request For Production Of Documents To Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc.) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Notice of Issuance of Subpoena For Production of Documents For Custodian of Records, GCW Consulting LLC (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    EO: re 98 In accordance with the Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents filed on September 14, 2007, the court has completed a review of the parties' joint submission of redacted documents and accepts the September 12, 2007 joint submission of the parties. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      EO: At counsel's request, Early Settlement Conference set 10/12/07 has been changed to a Status Conference Re: Scheduling of an early settlement conference set for 10/12/2007 11:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. All counsel have been notified. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        EO: Early Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2007 11:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due 10/5/07. Leighton Hara has notified all parties. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          EO: Status Conference Re: Settlement set 10/2/07 at 9:15am before Judge Chang is hereby vacated. Per phone conversation with Robert Marks, counsel to contact the court to reset this Status Conference. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            EO: The time for the Status Conference Re: Settlement set for 9:30am on 10/2/2007 has been moved to 9:15 AM on 10/2/2007 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. All counsel to be notified. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              EO: Discovery Dispute. Counsel have met and conferred. No agreement was reached. By agreement of counsel, letter briefs to be faxed to Judge Chang's chambers by close of business on 9/20/07. Brian Kang has notified all parties. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Correspondence received from 9CCA - UNCERTIFIED copy of USCA Order - ~ Petitioners have not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus...petition is denied ~ (afc) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Morris Garfinkle, Garfinkle & Wang LLC Notice of Withdrawal of 86 Non-Parties Garfinkle & Wang LLC DBA GCW Consulting and Morris Garfinkle's Motion to Quash Subpoena and/or for Protective Order filed on August 23, 2007; Certificate of Service Morris Garfinkle, Garfinkle & Wang LLC. (Tani, Jason) Modified on 9/14/2007 to include link to M/Quash (afc). (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 72 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO DE-DESIGNATE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 9/13/07. (SEALED) (afc) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2007 (afc). (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      EP: Motion Hearing held (SEALED HEARING) on 8/31/2007 re 72 . Motion for an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents. Motion granted. Motion terminated: 72 . Counsel to meet and confer no later than 9/10/07 to reach agreement as to redactions. If no agreement, proposed submissions to be submitted to the court by 9/14/07. Mr. Khan to prepare the order. Counsel agree to reschedule the 10/2/07 Settlement Conference and will contact the court after verifying their respective calendars. ( FTR C5 - 9:30-9:43:34am.) (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) Modified on 11/20/2007: 111 Order granting Ex Parte Motion to unseal this hearing filed. Modified 12/04/07 to clarify: Hearing unsealed so that transcript may be ordered, however, the transcript will be filed under seal. (afc). (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Submission of ORIGINAL DECLARATION of Robert D. Crockett in Support of 88 Opposition to Non-Party Morris Garfinkle's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing* on 86 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and/or for a protective order. [*Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing LODGED on 8/23/07] (SEALED) (afc) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (afc, ). (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garfinkle & Wang LLC Non-Parties Garfinkle & Wang LLC dba GCW Consulting and Rush Moore LLP's Objections to Plaintiff Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Subpoena for Documents to Rush Moore LLP (Tani, Jason) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Original Declaration of Robert D. Crockett In Support of Opposition To Non-Party Morris Garfinkle's Ex Parte Motion To Shorten Time For Hearing On Motion to Quash Subpoena and/or For A Protective Order (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morris Garfinkle, Garfinkle & Wang LLC re 86 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and/or for Protective Order; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Counsel; Certification of Attempt to Confer; Declaration of Morris Garfinkle; Exhibits "A"-"H" (Peterson, Devon) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Morris Garfinkle re 86 MOTION to Quash. (afc) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Notice of Oral Deposition of Morris R. Garfinkle (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 86 Non-Parties Garfinkle & Wang LLC dba GCW Consulting and Morris Garfinkle's Motion to Quash Subpoena and/or For Protective Order set for 10/2/2007 09:30 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (sna, ) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      EO: re 86 MOTION to Quash. The Court is in receipt of the Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time For Hearing on Non-Parties Garfinkle & Wang LLC dba GCW Consulting and Morris Garfinkles Motion to Quash Subpoena and/or For Protective Order. The Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time is DENIED. An Order to Show Cause hearing is set for September 10, 2007, in the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. United States District Judge Roger W. Titus has ordered Morris Garfinkle to appear on September 10, 2007, to show cause why he should not be punished for contempt of court for his failure to appear for his deposition of August 15, 2007, as required by a subpoena issued by the U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland. The Court will defer ruling on GCW's Motion to Quash Subpoena and/or for Protective Order until after the show cause hearing on September 10, 2007. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION filed by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. to Non-Party Morris Garfinkle's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing (Ex Parte Motion lodged on 8/23/07) on 86 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and/or for a Protective Order; Declaration of Brian A. Kang; Declaration of Robert D. Crockett; Exhibits 1-2; Certificate of Service. (SEALED) (afc) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2007 (afc). (Entered: 08/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT A to Ex Parte Motion to Shorten time for hearing on 86 non-parties Garfinkle & Wang LLC dba GCW Consulting and Morris Garfinkle's MOTION to Quash Subpoena and/or for Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service)(afc) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash by GARFINKLE & WANG LLC dba GCW CONSULTING. (Attachments: # 1 MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION# 2 DECLARATION OF COUNSEL# 3 CERTIFICATION OF ATTEMPT TO CONFER# 4 DECLARATION OF MORRIS GARFINKLE# 5 EXHIBIT "A"# 6 EXHIBIT "B"# 7 EXHIBIT "C"# 8 EXHIBIT "D"# 9 EXHIBIT "E"# 10 EXHIBIT "F"# 11 EXHIBIT "G"# 12 EXHIBIT "H"# 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Peterson, Devon) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. REPLY in Support of 72 MOTION For an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents; Certificate of Service. (cc: KSC) (SEALED) (afc) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2007 (afc). (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. RE: Notice of Oral Deposition of Keith Alan Denkler, M.D. (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. RE: Notice of Issuance of Subpoena for Production of Documents for Custodian of Records, Rush Moore LLP. (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding filing Exhibits and Briefs under SEAL with respect to 72 Aloha's MOTION to De-designate Certain Documents. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/16/07. (afc) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock re 80 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion For An Order To De-Designate Certain Documents (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 72 MOTION For an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents filed by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George Murnane III)(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ADOPTING 69 MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION (re: 18 Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs and Stay of Proceedings). Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 8/9/07. (afc) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Mail (Copy of document 69 F&R) sent to Kimberly A. Hicks, Esq. at address Latham & Watkins LLP/600 Broadway Ave. Suite 1800/San Diego, CA 92101, returned as "NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED". (afc) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              EO: re 75 SEALED HEARING: Motion for an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents 72 set 8/31/07 at 9:30am before Judge Chang. James Robert Noblin to participate by phone. Sheri from Robert Marks' office to notify all parties. (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, ) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GARFINKLE & WANG LLC dba GCW CONSULTING (Re: Non-parties Morris R. Garfinkle and Garfinkle & Wang LLC dba GCW Consulting's Objections to Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Subpoena to Morris R. Garfinkle and Exhibit A) (Peterson, Devon) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 72 Motion for an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents (sealed hearing) set for 8/31/2007 09:30 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (sna, ) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service on Subpoena Deloitte & Touche LLP was served on 07-20-2007 (Ikehara, Archie) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' REQUEST For Judicial Notice in Support of 72 Motion for an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents; Exhibits A-J; Certificate of Service (SEALED) (gab, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION For an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents by Plaintiffs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to De-Designate Certain Documents; Declaration of Amjad M. Khan; Exhibits 1-63; Certificate of Service (SEALED) (gab, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (gab, ). (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Questions; Written Questions; Exhibit "A" (Ikehara, Archie) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Archie T. Ikehara on behalf of Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. on behalf of Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ikehara, Archie) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO AWARD ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re 18 . ~ Court finds and recommends that Defendant be awarded total of $14,457.75. The Court, in its discretion under Rule 41(d), declines to grant a stay of proceedings ~ Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2007. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 7/20/07. (afc) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Amended Notice of Oral Deposition of Daniel J. Altobello (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock (Re: (1) Mesas Responses To Alohas First Set Of Interrogatories and (2) Mesas Responses To Alohas Second Request For Production Of Documents) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: (1)Amended Notice of Oral Deposition of Matthew S. Barton Pursuant to Deposition Subpoena; (2) Amended Notice of Oral Deposition of Chris Keen Pursuant To Deposition Subpoena; (3) Notice of Oral Deposition of George "Peter" Murnane III (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by NON-PARTIES Matthew S. Barton and Garfinkle & Wang LLC dba GCW Consulting's re: Objections to Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Subpoena to Matthew S. Barton and Exhibit A. (afc) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc.'s Notice of Oral Deposition of Daniel J. Altobello (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GARFINKLE & WANG LLC dba GCW CONSULTING, CHRIS KEEN (NON-PARTIES CHRIS KEEN AND GARFINKLE & WANG LLC dba GCW CONSULTING'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. AND ALOHA AIR GROUP, INC.'S SUBPOENA TO CHRIS KEEN, c/o GCW CONSULTING and EXHIBIT A) (Tani, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock (re: Mesa's Responses To Aloha's First Request For Production Of Documents) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. RE: Oral Deposition Notice of Chris Keen (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. Re: Oral Deposition Notice of Matthew S. Barton (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. RE: Oral Deposition of Morris R. Garfinkle (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents To Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc. dated 6/13/07 (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. Re: Plaintiff's First Request For Answers To Interrogatories To Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc. dated 6/13/07 (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge BARRY M. KURREN recused. Referral judge assignment reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG for all further proceedings. Case reassigned to Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG for all further proceedings. Please reflect case number CV 07-00007DAE-KSC on all further proceedings. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 6/1/07. (afc) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING 45 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 5/31/07. (afc) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc. RE: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT MESA AIR GROUP, INC. DATED 5/23/07 (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 45 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Defendants' Motion To Certify A Ruling For Interlocutory Appeal) MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Defendants' Motion To Certify A Ruling For Interlocutory Appeal), 51 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C.§ 1292(b) by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service)(Kang, Brian) Modified on 5/8/2007: Motion to Certify Order: docket entry 45 ; Response in Opposition: docket entry 51 (afc). (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C.§ 1292(b) filed by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kang, Brian) Modified on 5/8/2007: Motion to Certify Order: docket entry 45 (afc). (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc.,Aloha Air Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Consent of John T. Komeiji # 2 Declaration of Amjad M. Khan # 3 Declaration of Patricia G. Stringel # 4 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice applications - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/27/07. # 5 Certificate of Service) Attorney Amjad M. Khan and Attorney Patricia G. Stringel added for plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc.; Aloha Air Group, Inc. (afc) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 239245 - attorney Amjad M. Kahn, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 239244 - attorney Patricia G. Stringel, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the Protection of Confidential Information. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(afc) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Defendants' Motion To Certify A Ruling For Interlocutory Appeal) by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service)(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/10/07. (ecs, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 4/9/2007. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 4/22/2008 before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2008 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Status Conference set for 10/2/2007 09:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Motions due by 11/21/2007. Discovery due by 2/22/2008. (FTR-Ctrm C6 no record, 11:30 - 11:40) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock re 40 Answer to Complaint (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock re 38 Supplement (re: Defendants' Supplemental Report On Rule 26(f) Conference) (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock.(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2007 at 9:00 AM is moved to 11:00 AM the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT re 34 Report of Planning Meeting filed by Aloha Air Group, Inc., Aloha Airlines, Inc. by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT ON RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 4/2/07. [Amending: 32 Order re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss] (afc) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Airlines, Inc. re 35 Scheduling Conference Statement (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Conference Statement (JOINT) by Aloha Airlines, Inc.. (Kang, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Planning Meeting re: Parties' Discovery Plan Conference Held Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kang, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY re 21 Order, 18 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs And Stay of Proceedings filed by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 19 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 3/19/07. (afc) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2007 re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Joe Bock, Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen. Oral Arguments heard. Motion taken under advisement; Court to issue order. John T. Komeiji, Esq.; Robert D. Crockett, Esq.; Brian Kang;, Esq.; Maxwell M. Blecher, Esq.; and Robert Marks present. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio; Time: 10:30-11:00 a.m.) (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA ) (afc) Additional attachment added on 3/14/2007 (afc). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2007 re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Joe Bock, Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Motions Taken Under Advisement: 19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(tl, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs And Stay of Proceedings filed by Aloha Airlines, Inc., Aloha Air Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert D. Crockett# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service)(Kang, Brian) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and PROPOSED Order dismissing defendants Charles D. Lauritsen and Joe Back without Prejudice - filed by defendants Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (cc: DAE, TL) (afc) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Consultation re 18 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs And Stay of Proceedings filed by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Marks, Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORIGINAL SIGNATURE submitted by and for 24 plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to 19 defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (afc) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 19 defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Certificates of Service. [Please note: Memorandum is not signed; filing party has been notified] (afc) Modified on 2/26/2007 - changing filed date from 2/23/2007 to 2/22/2007 (bbb, ). (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs And Stay of Proceedings (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert A. Marks# 2 Declaration of James Robert Noblin# 3 Exhibit J# 4 Exhibit K# 5 Exhibit L# 6 Exhibit M# 7 Exhibit N# 8 Certificate of Service)(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Boc Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2007 10:30 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (tl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 18 Defendant's MOTION for Award of Costs And Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 2/1/07. (Briefing schedule ordered by the court). (afc) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents and Authorities# 2 Memorandum of Law# 3 Certificate of Service)(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs And Stay of Proceedings by Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, Joe Bock. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Declaration of James Robert Noblin# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D part 1# 7 Exhibit D part 2# 8 Exhibit D part 3# 9 Exhibit E# 10 Exhibit F# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Declaration of Robert A. Marks# 15 Certificate of Service)(Marks, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 238198 - James Robert Noblin, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 238197 - Maxwell M. Blecher, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 14 Maxwell M. Blecher and James Robert Noblin APPLICATION for Admission as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for defendants. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/29/07. (afc) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION by Maxwell M. Blecher and James Robert Noblin for Admission as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for defendants Mesa Air Group, Inc., Charles D. Lauritsen, and Joe Bock. (afc) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JASON KIM - filed by plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Consent of John T. Komeiji # 2 Declaration of Jason Kim # 3 ORDER granting PHV Admission - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/18/07. # 4 Certificate of Service)(afc) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KIMBERLY A. HICKS - filed by plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Consent of John T. Komeiji # 2 Declaration of Kimberly A. Hicks # 3 ORDER granting PHV Admission - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/18/07. # 4 Certificate of Service)(afc) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of ROBERT D. CROCKETT - filed by plaintiffs Aloha Airlines, Inc. and Aloha Air Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Consent of John T. Komeiji # 2 Declaration of Robert D. Crockett # 3 ORDER granting PHV Admission - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 1/18/07. # 4 Certificate of Service)(afc) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 238123 - Kimberly A. Hicks, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 238124 - Robert D. Crockett, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 225.00, receipt number 238125 - Jason Kim, Esq. (afc) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service - service of COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Executed - Defendant Mesa Air Group, Inc. served on 1/9/2007, answer due 1/29/2007; Defendant Charles D. Lauritsen served on 1/9/2007, answer due 1/29/2007; Defendant. Joe Bock served on 1/9/2007, answer due 1/29/2007. Defendants served by and thru their attorney, ROBERT A. MARKS, ESQ. (afc) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI recused. Referral judge assignment reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge BARRY M. KURREN for all further proceedings. Please reflect case number CV 07-00007DAE-BMK on all further proceedings. Signed by Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 1/16/07. (afc) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement; Certificate of Service - by Aloha Air Group, Inc. (afc) (cc: DAE, LEK) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement; Certificate of Service - by Aloha Airlines, Inc. (afc) (cc: DAE, LEK) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 237963 (afc) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 4/9/2007 before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI - by Judge HELEN GILLMOR.(afc) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against all defendants FOR ATTEMPTED MONOPOLIZATION; BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; AND FRAUD - filed by plaintiff Aloha Airlines, Inc.; plaintiff Aloha Air Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) (Attachments: # 1 Demand for Jury Trial # 2 Summons in a Civil Action)(afc) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?