Variant Holdings LLC v. Yelp!, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00209
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated October 18, 2017 at 9:00 PM EDT (7.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Variant Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Charles van Cleef, Attorney at Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Van Cleef +1 903 248 8244 +1 903 248 8249 charles@vancleef.net

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

v.
Yelp! Inc. Yelp! Inc., Defendant

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Withdraw. Andrew W. Spangler, James A. Fussell, III, and Spangler & Fussell P.C. be allowed to withdraw and is withdrawn as an attorney of records. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/16/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Variant Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 THIRD Amended Complaint by Yelp!, Inc..(ch, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yelp!, Inc., filed by Variant Holdings LLC.(ch, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - the clerk is directed to SEVER the claims against Nextag and Yelp into individual causes of actions. Such severed actions are hereby ORDERED transferred to the Northern District of California. This Order only applies to Nextag and Yelp. (severed from case 2:11-cv-290 per order). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 85 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?