Lodsys Group, LLC v. General Motors, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00060
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 9:23 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff
v.
General Motors LLC General Motors LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/09/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L. Brann elizabethbrann@paulhastings.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Counts +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 tomcounts@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Motors, Inc."
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:12-cv-729. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A Counts on behalf of General Motors LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4248378. (Counts, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth L Brann on behalf of General Motors LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4248326. (Brann, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John M Guaragna terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/9/13. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John Guaragna by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC - Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC's Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of General Motors LLC (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by General Motors LLC. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors LLC (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by General Motors LLC.(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re General Motors LLC.( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. General Motors, LLC. served on 3/11/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (ehs, ) Modified on 3/28/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kit W Roth on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4031742. (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael A Goldfarb on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4029845. (Goldfarb, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M Huck on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4028970. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS REISSUED as to General Motors, Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against General Motors, Inc., filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078)(Davis, William) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. General Motors, Inc. served on 2/8/2013, answer due 3/1/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS Issued as to General Motors, Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against General Motors, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3975085.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?