Lodsys Group, LLC v. The Jones Group Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00061
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 1:26 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

v.
No Logo The Jones Group Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - granting 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/5/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
      SUMMONS Issued as to The Jones Group Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against The Jones Group Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3975102.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 105 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?