Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00226
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 12:17 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Goldfarb +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 goldfarb@kdg-law.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kit W Roth +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 roth@kdg-law.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

v.
SanDisk Corporation SanDisk Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Bryan Davis +1 214 220 3939 +1 214 969 5100 kbdavis@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Louis Lippetz +1 650 739 3939 +1 650 739 3900 glippetz@jonesday.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant SanDisk Corporations dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SanDisk Corporation by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sandisk Corporation.( Davis, Keith) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sandisk Corporation.( Davis, Keith) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandisk Corporation, filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(ch, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER - Lodsys claims against Defendant SanDisk Corporation shall be severed into a new case. Lodsys shall pay the appropriate filing fee within seven business days of entry of this Order (severed from case 2:12-cv-749 per order 29). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/21/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 172 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?