Lodsys Group, LLC v. The Walt Disney Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00256
District Judge Michael H. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 2:05 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
The Walt Disney Company, Inc. The Walt Disney Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Walt Disney Company"
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, TWDC Holdco 613 Corp.
Unknown Role, TFCF America, Inc
Unknown Role, TFCF Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/01/2013 Michael Scott Fuller +1 214 740 8601 +1 214 756 8601 sfuller@lockelord.com
TERMINATED: 08/01/2013 TTAB Attorney Placeholder cphipps@lockelord.com
No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/23/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/22/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER finding as moot 42 Motion to Stay in view of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/23/2014. (No document attached.) (rsp2) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Close Case by Apple Inc, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Disney Online, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 43 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Disney Online, Lodsys Group, LLC. Disney Online terminated. Attorney Charles Edward Phipps, Michael Scott Fuller, and Daniel G Nguyen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/3/14. (bas, ) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Disney Online, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Stay by Disney Online, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDERPROTECTIVE ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2014 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/11/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 39 Joint MOTION to Stay - This action is stayed as to all issues and dates between Plaintiff and Disney Online for a period of 30 days. If dismissal papers are not filed by April 2, 2014, counsel for the parties to the Motion shall appear before the Court for Status Conference set for 4/3/2014 11:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/05/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                      Joint MOTION to Stay by Disney Online, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Strike the New Allegations in Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Strike the New Allegations in Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaim Replies due by 2/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/14/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Strike the New Allegations in Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Strike the New Allegations in Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sanders Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Intervenor Apple Inc. shall have up to and including January 23, 2014 to respond to Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Motion, and that Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC shall have up to and including February 17, 2014 to respond to Intervenor Apple Inc.s opposition to the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/2/14. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Strike the New Allegations in Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, to Strike the New Allegations in Apple's Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                      APPLE INC.'S AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (The Walt Disney Company), COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc by Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Apple Inc INTERVENOR, APPLE INC.'S, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT SUBMISSION (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 28 Motion to Substitute Party. Disney Online added. The Walt Disney Company terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael A Goldfarb on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4244462. (Goldfarb, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kit W Roth on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4244055. (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC - Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC's Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Davis, William) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Scott Fuller on behalf of The Walt Disney Company (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Edward Phipps on behalf of The Walt Disney Company (Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel G Nguyen on behalf of The Walt Disney Company (Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel G Nguyen on behalf of The Walt Disney Company (Nguyen, Daniel) Modified on 7/2/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Walt Disney Company. (Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Walt Disney Company (Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by The Walt Disney Company.(Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      APPLE INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM IN INTERVENTION against Lodsys Group, LLC by Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Walt Disney Company. (Nguyen, Daniel) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Walt Disney Company.( Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 9 Motion to Intervene. Permits Apple to intervene in this action on the issues of license and patent exhaustion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/9/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. The Walt Disney Company served CMRR on 4/25/2013, answer due 5/16/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E Ostrow on behalf of Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4128420. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M Huck on behalf of Lodsys Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4108071. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to The Walt Disney Company. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/9/13. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/4/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against The Walt Disney Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4073671.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?