Dana Bostick v. Herbalife International of America Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-02488-BRO-SH
District Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2018 at 8:24 PM DT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anita Vasko, Plaintiff
No Logo Beverly Molnar, Plaintiff
No Logo Chester Cote, Plaintiff
No Logo Dana Bostick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fabian & Clendenin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip D. Dracht +1 801 574 8900 +1 801 531 1716 pdracht@fabianlaw.com
Space Jason W. Hardin +1 801 531 8900 jhardin@fabianlaw.com
Space Scott M. Petersen +1 801 531 8900 spetersen@fabianlaw.com

Represented by Foley Bezek Behle & Curtis, LLP

No Logo Judi Trotter, Plaintiff
v.
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Defendant
Herbalife International Of America, Inc. Herbalife International Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Fields Kroetsch +1 212 474 1384 +1 212 474 3700 jkroetsch@bsfllp.com
Space William S. Ohlemeyer +1 914 749 8440 +1 914 749 8300 wohlemeyer@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan David Schiller +1 202 237 2727 +1 212 446 2350 jschiller@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Henry Sherman +1 202 237 9605 +1 202 237 6131 jsherman@bsfllp.com
Space David L Zifkin +1 310 395 5800 +1 510 874 1460 dzifkin@bsfllp.com
Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. Herbalife Nutrition Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Herbalife Ltd"
No Logo Elizabeth Correa, Objector
No Logo Elvia Acosta, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas M Brooks +1 781 424 6737 dmbrooks@brooks-law.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen McKeon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather M McKeon +1 213 413 6400 +1 213 403 6405 mckeon@cohenmckeon.com
No Logo Eric Rodensky, Objector
No Logo Felipe Colon, Objector
No Logo Jose G Garcia, Objector
No Logo Jose Tafoya, Objector
No Logo Juana Estala, Objector
No Logo Julio Ulloa, Objector
No Logo Maria Cutzal, Objector
No Logo Melchor Sanchez, Objector
No Logo Miguel Calderon, Objector
No Logo Olivia Torres, Objector
No Logo Palma Vallecillo, Objector
No Logo Rossina Martinez, Objector
No Logo Sabas Avila, Objector
No Logo Susana Perez, Objector
No Logo Valentina Leon, Objector
No Logo Yader A Pastran, Objector
No Logo National Consumers League, Inc., Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by The Sturdevant Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C Sturdevant +1 415 477 2410 jsturdevant@sturdevantlaw.com
No Logo Truth In Advertising, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L Petray +1 858 737 3100 +1 858 737 3101 apetray@ftblaw.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (194) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 175 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
            LREF
            Legal Document 174 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Notice of Withdrawal
            Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Sanctions, [169] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Dracht, Philip)
              LREF
              Legal Document 173 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Notice of Association of Counsel
              NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Aaron H. Darsky on behalf of Objector Elvia Acosta. Filed by Objector Elvia Acosta (Attorney Aaron Hillel Darsky added to party Elvia Acosta(pty:obj))(Darsky, Aaron)
                LREF
                Legal Document 172 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                Amended STIPULATION to Amended Stipulation to Continue HEaring Date and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion fo rSanctions Against Objectors filed by Objector Elvia Acosta. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohen, Michael)
                LREF
                Legal Document 171 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ONPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST OBJECTORS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue. [170] (rfi)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 170 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Stipulation to Continue
                  STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for SAnctions Against Objectors from 10/05/15 to 10/26/15 filed by Objector Miguel Calderon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohen, Michael)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 169 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015, Terminated: 9/30/2015 SanctionsCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Objectors filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum) (Dracht, Philip)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 168 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [157] by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Objectors' Motion for Reconsideration. Objectors have not offered any newly discovered evidence or identified any change in the law to warrant reconsideration. Nor have Objectors cited to controlling authority demonstrating that the Court clearly erred in its findings regarding the class notice, the availability of injunctive relief, or the value of the class's claims. The hearing scheduled for this matter on Monday, August 24, 2015, at 1:30 p.m., is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 167 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Reply
                    REPLY filed by Objector Elvia Acosta to for Reconsideration[157] Objectors' REply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration (Cohen, Michael)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 166 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER STRIKING REPLY MEMORANDUM by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The reply memorandum filed on August 10, 2015 is hereby STRICKEN from the docket. Moving parties shall file a reply brief in compliance with this Order and all other requirements set forth in Paragraph 5 of this Court's Standing Order by no later than Wednesday, August 12, 2015, at 12:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 165 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Declaration
                        DECLARATION of Douglas M. Brooks re Reply (Motion related)[164] Second Declaration of Douglas M. Brooks in Support of Motion for Reconsideration filed by Objector Elvia Acosta. (Cohen, Michael)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 164 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                          [STRICKEN BY ORDER OF THE COURT] REPLY In Support of Motion for Reconsideration Objectors' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration filed by Objector Elvia Acosta. (Cohen, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2015 (jloz).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 163 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, ORDERING Letter re Petition Supporting Latino Immigrants submitted by Julie Contreras received on 7/30/2015 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No letters to judge. (jp)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 162 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Objectors' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 157) filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gopi K. Panchapakesan, # (2) Exhibit A to Panchapakesan Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Panchapakesan Declaration, # (4) Declaration of Eric Robin)(Drooks, Mark)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 161 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Objection
                              OBJECTIONS to Declaration, [159] (Evidentiary) filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Dracht, Philip)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 160 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Objectors' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt No. 157) filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Philip D. Dracht)(Dracht, Philip)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 159 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Declaration
                                DECLARATION of Douglas M. Brooks re Notice (Other)[157], Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support[158] Declaration of Douglas M. Brooks in Support of Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Cohen, Michael)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 158 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support
                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Objectors' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration Re: Notice (Other)[157] (Cohen, Michael)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 157 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015, Terminated: 8/18/2015 Motion for Reconsideration
                                  Objector's Motion For Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. Objector's Motion for Reconsideration (Cohen, Michael)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 156 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court
                                    NOTICE of Entry of FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, re: Amended Minutes,, [155], Judgment,, [154], filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Final Judgment)(Foley, Thomas)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 155 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Amended MinutesCourt Filing
                                    AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Pursuant to Sections 10.2 and 10.3 of the Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt No. 95 ), the Escrow Agent is AUTHORIZED and DIRECTED to pay the following amounts from the Cash Fund: (1) $4,900,000 for attorneys' fees to Class Counsel (2) $211,662.63 in expenses to Class Counsel (3) $10,000 to Dana Bostick (4) $5000 to Anita Vasko (5) $5000 to Judi Trotter (6) $5000 to Beverly Molnar (7) $5000 to Chester Cote. (rfi)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 154 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 JudgmentCourt Filing
                                      FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Pursuant to Sections 10.2 and 10.3 of the Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt No.[95]), the Escrow Agent is AUTHORIZED and DIRECTED to pay the following amounts from the Cash Fund: (1) $4,900,000 for attorneys' fees to Class Counsel (2) $211,662.63 in expenses to Class Counsel (3) $10,000 to Dana Bostick (4) $5000 to Anita Vasko (5) $5000 to Judi Trotter (6) $5000 to Beverly Molnar (7) $5000 to Chester Cote. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 153 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Supplemental Request for an Award of Expenses by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court therefore APPROVES these expenses and GRANTS counsel's request for reimbursement in the amount of $211,662.63. This Order amends and supercedes the Court's previous order to the extent it granted reimbursement in the lesser amount of $175,609.62. (jp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 152 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/11/2015 at 1:52 p.m. re Transcript [151] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Transcript (CV)
                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/11/2015 at 1:52 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015. (Ponce, Myra)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Notice of Lodging
                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Lodging, [146] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal)(Foley, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 149 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Declaration
                                              DECLARATION of Scott M. Petersen re Notice of Lodging, [147] in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Foley, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 148 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Declaration
                                              DECLARATION of Thomas G. Foley, Jr. re Notice of Lodging, [147] in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Foley, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 147 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Notice of Lodging
                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,, Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief,,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,,,, Order on Motion for Joinder,,,, [145] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Foley, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 146 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Notice of Lodging
                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,, Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief,,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,,,, Order on Motion for Joinder,,,, [145] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal)(Foley, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 SettlementCourt Filing
                                              MINUTES IN CHAMBERS: ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval, including the parties' second stipulation to amend the Settlement Agreement and Plaintiffs' Motion to Increase Awards. The Court also GRANTS in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees, as set forth below: 1. The Court approves class counsels request for attorneys fees in the amount of $4.9 million as fair and reasonable. 2. The Court approves class counsels request for reimbursement for costs and expenses in the amount of $175,609.62. 3. The Court approves class counsels request for incentive awards and directs payment of $10,000 to Mr. Bostick and $5,000 each to Ms. Vasko, Ms. Trotter, Ms. Molnar, and Mr. Cote.The parties shall file a proposed judgment in accordance with this order by no later than Friday, May 29, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. Should class counsel wish to file additional documentation regarding the denied expenses, these documents shall be filed by not later than the same date and time. [110] [114] [117] [125] [129] [131] (rfi)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 143 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] Supplemental Declaration of Eric Robin re: Claims Received filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTES OF MOTIONS HEARING held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on above motions and invites counsel, including the objectors, to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: 5/6/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                    DECLARATION of Julie Contreras Second Declaration of Julie Contreras MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Objector Sabas Avila. (Cohen, Michael)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: 5/6/2015 Response in Support of Motion
                                                      RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] Objectors' Response to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Julie Contrerase filed by Objector Elvia Acosta. (Cohen, Michael)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                        REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses[110] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                          Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Julie Contreras in support of re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Contreras Declaration)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                            REPLY in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Anita Vasko, # (2) Declaration of Beverly Molnar, # (3) Proposed Order Final Judgment and Order of Dismisal)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Response in Support of Motion
                                                              RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Joinder in MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] [131] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joseph F. Kroetsch, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                REPLY opposition MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Proposed Settlement[117] filed by Interested Party Truth In Advertising, Inc.. (Petray, Andrea)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                  DECLARATION of Douglas M. Brooks in support of opposition to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Objector Elvia Acosta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Cohen, Michael)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 134 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Objector Elvia Acosta. (Cohen, Michael)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015 Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [128] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement is permitted to exceed the 25-page limit and the Court permits Plaintiffs to file a 49 page brief. (rfi)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: 4/14/2015 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Joinder in MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] [131], MOTION for Order for Increase of Awards to Business Opportunity Claimants [125], MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129]. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jloz)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 JoinderCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Mark T. Drooks, # (2) Exhibit A to Mark T. Drooks Declaration)(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [129] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Philip D. Dracht, # (2) Exhibit A-F to the Declaration of Philip D. Dracht, # (3) Declaration of Thomas G. Foley, Jr., # (4) Exhibit G-I to the Declaration of Thomas G. Foley, Jr., # (5) Declaration of Eric Robin with Exhibits)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015, Terminated: 4/15/2015 Exceed Page LimitationCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                                                  Second STIPULATION to AMEND Stipulation for Settlement, [95] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief In Opposition To Proposed Settlement [114], MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Proposed Settlement[117] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Increase of Awards to Business Opportunity Claimants filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Increase Awards to Business Opportunity Claimants)(Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court is in receipt of an objection dated 3/23/2015, by Jeff Lokken. The Court will forward the objection to plaintiff's counsel for filing THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 ERRATA
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Objectors Elvia Acosta, Sabas Avila, Miguel Calderon, Felipe Colon, Elizabeth Correa, Maria Cutzal, Juana Estala, Jose G Garcia, Valentina Leon, Rossina Martinez, Yader A Pastran, Susana Perez, Eric Rodensky, Melchor Sanchez, Jose Tafoya, Olivia Torres, Julio Ulloa, Palma Vallecillo. correcting Supplement[120], Supplement[119], Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, [121], First APPLICATION for attorney Douglas M. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15427414 paid.)[118] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Cohen, Michael)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [118] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas M. Brooks on behalf of Objectors Elvia Acosta, Sabas Avila, Miguel Calderon, Felipe Colon, Elizabeth Correa, Maria Cutzal, Juana Estala, Jose G Garcia, Valentina Leon, Rossina Martinez, Yader A Pastran, Susana Perez, Eric Rodensky, Melchor Sanchez, Jose Tafoya, Olivia Torres, Julio Ulloa and for Palma Vallecillo, designating Heather Mason-Mckeon as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 118 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas M. Brooks on behalf of Objectors Elvia Acosta, Sabas Avila, Miguel Calderon, Felipe Colon, Elizabeth Correa, Maria Cutzal, Juana Estala, Jose G Garcia, Valentina Leon, Rossina Martinez, Yader A Pastran, Susana Perez, Eric Rodensky, Melchor Sanchez, Jose Tafoya, Olivia Torres, Julio Ulloa and for Palma Vallecillo, designating Heather Mason-Mckeon as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                Objection Objections to Class Action Settlment and Notice of Intent to Appear at Final Approval Hearing re: MOTION for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief In Opposition To Proposed Settlement [114] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-R To the Objections To Class Action Settlement, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Douglas M. Brooks In Support of Objections to Class Action Settlment, # (3) Exhibit Exhibits to the Declaration of Douglas M Brooks In Support of Ojections to Class Action Settlement)(Cohen, Michael)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to First APPLICATION for attorney Douglas M. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15427414 paid.)[118] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Cohen, Michael)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 119 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Cohen, Michael)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015, Terminated: 3/25/2015 Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    First APPLICATION for attorney Douglas M. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15427414 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attorney Michael L Cohen added to party Dana Bostick(pty:pla))(Cohen, Michael)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Amicus Brief (Leave to File)Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Proposed Settlement filed by amicus National Consumers League Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum amicus brief)(Attorney James C Sturdevant added to party National Consumers League Inc.(pty:am))(Sturdevant, James)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court is in receipt of an objection received on 3/20/2015, by Konstance Armstrong. The Court will forward the objection to plaintiff's counsel for filing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court is in receipt of an objection dated 3/10/2015, by Wyman Jong. The Court will forward the objection to plaintiff's counsel for filing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief In Opposition To Proposed Settlement filed by Interested Party Truth In Advertising, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Brief, # (2) Exhibit Notice to Appear)(Attorney Andrea L Petray added to party Truth In Advertising, Inc.(pty:ip))(Petray, Andrea)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Notice of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses[110] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Scott Petersen in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses[110] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B to the Declaration of Scott Petersen)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses 110 filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Foley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas G. Foley, Jr. in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses[110] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F to the Declaration of Thomas G. Foley, Jr.)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Scott Petersen in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses 110 filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B to the Declaration of Scott Petersen)(Foley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Thomas G. Foley, Jr. in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses 110 filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F to the Declaration of Thomas G. Foley, Jr.)(Foley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct.[108] The Court may approve the Stipulation with such modifications as may be agreed to by the Parties, if appropriate, without further notice to Class Members, the Amendment to stipulation of Settlement is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rfi)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Foley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Amend Stipulation for Settlement, [95] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Amendment)(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/1/2014 at 1:57 p.m. re Transcript [106] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/1/2014 at 1:57 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Ponce, Myra)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, PROVIDING FOR NOTICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: [90] The Final Approval hearing is set for May 11, 2015 at 1:30 pm. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: RE: JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 10/31/2014) [90]. Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on above motion and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Court will issue a separate order. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd Court Reporter. Court will contact Lisa Lambrix at lak@birdmarella.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Testimony of: Joint Mtn for Preliminary Approval of Class Action 12/1/14. Other: 12/1/14. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: RE: JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (filed 10/31/2014) 90 . Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on above motion and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Court will issue a separate order. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Pending Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement [100] by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that the action is STAYED until the Court rules on the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (jp)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Pending Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement 100 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that the action is STAYED until the Court rules on the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (jp) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd, served on November 7, 2014. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kroetsch, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation, [91] IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties Memorandum in Support ofClass Settlement is permitted to exceed the 25-page limit and the Court permits the parties to file a 41 page brief. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Mediator, Hon. Daniel H. Weinstein (Ret.) In Support of Joint MOTION to Certify Class Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Preliminary)[90] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Stephen Brobeck, Consumer Federation of America In Support of Joint MOTION to Certify Class Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Preliminary)[90] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Declaration (Motion related)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas G. Foley, Jr. and Scott M. Petersen In Support of Joint MOTION to Certify Class Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Preliminary)[90] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Decl of Judge Larson, # (2) Exhibit B-Decl of Dana Bostick, # (3) Exhibit C-Decl of Anita Vasko, # (4) Exhibit D-Decl of Chester Cole, # (5) Exhibit E-Decl of Judi Trotter, # (6) Exhibit F-Decl of Beverly Molnar)(Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Stipulation for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-Proposed Class Notice, # (2) Exhibit 2-Proposed Summary Notice, # (3) Exhibit 3-Claims Protocol, # (4) Exhibit 4-Proposed Claim Form, # (5) Exhibit 5-Proposed Opt-Out Form, # (6) Exhibit 6-Claims Administrator Notice Program)(Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of Joint MOTION to Certify Class Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Preliminary)[90] filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. correcting Joint MOTION to Certify Class Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Preliminary)[90] (Petersen, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of the Class filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014, Terminated: 12/2/2014 SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Certify Class ( Motion set for hearing on 12/1/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell.), Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action (Preliminary) filed by Plaintiffs Dana Bostick, Chester Cote, Beverly Molnar, Judi Trotter, Anita Vasko. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum (Plaintiffs'), # (2) Declaration of Thomas G. Foley, Jr., and Scott M. Petersen, # (3) Exhibit A-F to the Joint Declaration, # (4) Declaration of the Hon. Daniel Weinstein (Ret.), # (5) Appendix Stipulation of Settlement, # (6) Exhibit 1-6 to the Stipulation of Settlement, # (7) Declaration of Stephen Brobeck, # (8) Proposed Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky to Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV13-02488 BRO (SJx). (mg) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky to Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV13-02488 BRO (SJx). (mg)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mitchell A Kamin on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd (Attorney Mitchell A Kamin added to party Herbalife International Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell A Kamin added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell A Kamin added to party Herbalife Ltd(pty:dft))(Kamin, Mitchell)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark T Drooks on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd (Attorney Mark T Drooks added to party Herbalife International Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mark T Drooks added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mark T Drooks added to party Herbalife Ltd(pty:dft))(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney A Howard Matz on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd (Attorney A Howard Matz added to party Herbalife International Inc(pty:dft), Attorney A Howard Matz added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney A Howard Matz added to party Herbalife Ltd(pty:dft))(Matz, A)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gopi K Panchapakesan on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd (Attorney Gopi K Panchapakesan added to party Herbalife International Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Gopi K Panchapakesan added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Gopi K Panchapakesan added to party Herbalife Ltd(pty:dft))(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING FOURTH STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue, [84] Last Day for Hearing onMotion for Class Certification is 12/22/2014 at 1:30 p.m. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Of Jason W. Hardin & Joseph F. Kroetsch On Behalf Of All Parties In Support Of Fourth Request For A Stipulated Order To Continue Certain Pretrial Dates, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Fourth Stipulation To Continue Certain Pretrial Dates)(Kroetsch, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell GRANTING Third Stipulation to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates [82]. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Continue Certain PreTrial Dates filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Joint Declaration of J. Hardin & J. Kroestch on Behalf of All Parties in Support of Request for a Stipulated Order to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Dates)(Kroetsch, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response [80]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the last day forDefendants to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is August 18, 2014. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Amended APPLICATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [71] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick, set for hearing on 7/21/2014, is MOOT (see [76] and [78]). The hearing is hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),,,, [1], filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, part 1 of 2, # (4) Exhibit C, part 2 of 2, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [75] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Kroetsch on behalf of defendants, designating David Zifkin as local counsel. (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Dana Bostick is granted leave to amend to file his First Amended Complaint, a copy of which is attached as Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Lodging First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint no later than July 7, 2014. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014, Terminated: 7/2/2014 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Joseph F. Kroetsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14051499 paid.) filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed First Amended Complaint re Stipulation to Amend/Correct[73] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - P-First Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit A to P-FAC, # (3) Exhibit B to P-FAC, # (4) Exhibit C, pt 1, to P-FAC, # (5) Exhibit C, pt 2, to P-FAC, # (6) Exhibit C, pt 3, to P-FAC, # (7) Exhibit C, pt 4, to P-FAC, # (8) Exhibit D to P-FAC, # (9) Exhibit E to P-FAC, # (10) Exhibit F to P-FAC, # (11) Exhibit G to P-FAC, # (12) Exhibit H to P-FAC, # (13) Exhibit I to P-FAC, # (14) Exhibit J to P-FAC, # (15) Exhibit K to P-FAC, # (16) Exhibit L to P-FAC)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery),,,, [1] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014, Terminated: 6/9/2014 Application to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Withdraw APPLICATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [70] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014, Terminated: 7/9/2014 Application for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended APPLICATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. Application set for hearing on 7/21/2014 at 01:39 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Philip D. Dracht, # (2) Declaration A to Dracht Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit 1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, # (5) Exhibit A to Proposed FAC -- 2008-2011 SAGC, # (6) Exhibit B to Proposed FAC -- 2012 SAGC, # (7) Exhibit C to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book 4 part 1 of 2, # (8) Exhibit C to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book 4 part 2 of 2, # (9) Exhibit D to Proposed FAC -- Internet Business Starter Pack, # (10) Exhibit E to Proposed FAC -- Video Slides, # (11) Exhibit F to Proposed FAC -- IBP Live the Good Life Herbalife, # (12) Exhibit G to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book 1 Your Business Basics, # (13) Exhibit H to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book Building Your Business, # (14) Exhibit I to Proposed FAC -- Distributor Agreement, # (15) Exhibit J to Proposed FAC -- 2010 MH Bonus Rules, # (16) Exhibit K to Proposed FAC -- Success Stories, # (17) Exhibit L to Proposed FAC -- Herbalife Today)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014, Terminated: 6/9/2014 Application for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. Application set for hearing on 6/30/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Philip D. Dracht, # (2) Exhibit A to Dracht Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Dracht Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, # (5) Exhibit A to Proposed FAC -- 2008-2011 SAGC, # (6) Exhibit B to Proposed FAC -- 2012 SAGC, # (7) Exhibit C to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book 4 part 1 of 2, # (8) Exhibit C to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book 4 part 2 of 2, # (9) Exhibit D to Proposed FAC -- Internet Business Starter Pack, # (10) Exhibit E to Proposed FAC -- Video Slides, # (11) Exhibit F to Proposed FAC -- IBP Live the Good Life Herbalife, # (12) Exhibit G to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book 1 Your Business Basics, # (13) Exhibit H to Proposed FAC -- IBP Book Building Your Business, # (14) Exhibit I to Proposed FAC -- Distributor Agreement, # (15) Exhibit J to Proposed FAC -- 2010 MH Bonus Rules, # (16) Exhibit K to Proposed FAC -- Success Stories, # (17) Exhibit L to Proposed FAC -- Herbalife Today)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue. [68] IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that certain dates in this Courts December 9, 2014 Amended Minutes and Scheduling Order [Dkt 51, 53] and March 3, 2014 Order Granting Stipulation Requesting to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates [Dkt 65] are extended by 63 days, and are reset to new dates as set forth in the order. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Joint Declaration of Jason W. Hardin and Jonathan Sherman in Support of Stipulation, # (2) Proposed Order)(Hardin, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING DESIGNATION AND HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. Re Notice of Lodging [66]. (NOTE: CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THE PROPOSED ORDER) (ib)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: 4/8/2014 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Stipulated Order re Order[61] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials, # (2) Exhibit re Acknowledgement and Agreement to be Bound)(Sherman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue, [64] IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that certain dates in this Court's December 9, 2014 Amended Minutes and Scheduling Order [Dkt 51, 53] are extended by 50 days, and are reset to new dates as set forth below: Last date to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties, 5/26/2014; Last date for class certification discovery, 5/26/2014; Last Day for Plaintiff to File Motion for Class Certification, 6/24/2014; AND,Last Day for Hearing on Motion for Class Certification 8/5/2014. ALL OTHER DATES REMAIN THE SAME. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Continue Certain PreTrial Dates filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan Sherman In Support of Stipulation, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sherman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DATES by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue, [62] Before this Court is the Parties' joint Stipulation to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates (the Stipulation). The Court DENIES the Stipulation, for failure to provide good cause. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates from multiple dates as requested in stipulation to multiple dates as requested in stipulation Re: Scheduling Conference,, [50] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of Thomas G. Foley, Jr.)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. Re Notice (Other)[60]. (See document for details). (ib)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Lodging [Proposed] Stipulated Order Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Order Governing the Designation and Handling of Confidential Materials, # (2) Exhibit A re Acknowledgement and Agreement to Be Bound)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corrected NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Gamarnik on behalf of Plaintiff Dana Bostick (Attorney Kevin D Gamarnik added to party Dana Bostick(pty:pla))(Gamarnik, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aaron Lee Arndt on behalf of Plaintiff Dana Bostick (Arndt, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aaron Lee Arndt on behalf of Plaintiff Dana Bostick (Attorney Aaron Lee Arndt added to party Dana Bostick(pty:pla))(Arndt, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/9/2013; 1:36 p.m. re Transcript [55] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/9/2013; 1:36 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, phone number (213) 894-2305 or myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2014. (Ponce, Myra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd Court Reporter. Court will contact Lisa Cajigas at lcajigas@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling conference hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL JURY TRIAL ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Trial Estimate: 10 days.Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2014. Discovery cut-off is 2/2/2015. Motions in Limine to be filed by 3/16/2015. Last date for hearing on motions is 2/9/2015 at 1:30 pm. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2015. Hearing on Motions in Limine set 4/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2015 at 3:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Jury Trial set for 4/21/2015 at 8:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/23/2015. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Amended MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell re: Scheduling Conference,, [50] The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed no later than February 23, 2015***. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-14 is Private Mediation. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed no later than February 23, 2014. Civil Jury Trial Order to follow. Last Day for Hearing on Motion for ClassCertification is 6/16/2014. Last Day for Plaintiff to File Motion for Class Certification is 5/5/2014. The Court will bifurcate discovery in this matter. Last date for class certification discovery is April 5, 2014 Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10, filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order A)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Reschedule, [47] The Court GRANTS the stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the date of the Scheduling Conference shall be advanced from December 23, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. to December 9, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Stipulation to Reschedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Advance Scheduling Conference)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [43] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott M. Petersen on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Thomas G. Foley, Jr. as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [44] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason W. Hardin on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Thomas G. Foley, Jr. as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Jason W. Hardin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12992348 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Scott M. Petersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12992280 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND JOINT REPORT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Scheduling Conference set for 12/23/2013 at 1:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,, [1] Answer filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd.(Ohlemeyer, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss. [22] (pj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, 7/29/2013; 3:05 p.m. re Transcript [38] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, 7/29/2013; 3:05 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, phone number (213) 894-2305 or myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/11/2013. (Ponce, Myra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd Court Reporter. Court will contact Elena Colle at ecolle@bsfllp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss July 29, 2013. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8, 9(b) AND 12(b)(6) (filed 5/30/2013) [22] Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on above motion and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick to Response in Opposition to Motion, [32] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A -- Tuttle v. Sky Bell Asset Management, # (2) Exhibit B -- In Re: Brican America LLC Equipment Lease Litigation)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [33] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan D. Schiller on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc and for Herbalife International of America Inc, designating David L. Zifkin as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013, Terminated: 7/25/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan D. Schiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12451617 paid.) filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Leave to to File Sur-Reply [31] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of David Zifkin in Support of Opposition)(Ohlemeyer, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013, Terminated: 10/31/2013 Request for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for Leave to to File Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. Request set for hearing on 7/29/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Sur-Reply, # (2) Proposed Order)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Case [22] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Ohlemeyer, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. correcting Complaint - (Discovery),,,, [1] (Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at BRO_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Case [22] filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Penal Code Section 327 Legislative History)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney David L Zifkin counsel for Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Changing address to 401 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 850, Santa Monica, California 90401. Filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International of America, Inc., Herbalife International, Inc., Herbalife Ltd.. (Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is continued by Stipulation of counsel and ORDER of this court to 7/29/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from July 1, 2013 to July 29, 2013 filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Philip D. Dracht, # (2) Proposed Order)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013, Terminated: 10/11/2013 Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 8, 9(b) and 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of David L. Zifkin in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of David L. Zifkin in Support, # (3) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Ohlemeyer, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Herbalife International of America Inc. (Ohlemeyer, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [19] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Sherman on behalf of Defendant, designating David L. Zifkin as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: 5/21/2013, Terminated: 5/22/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan Henry Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12150935 paid.) filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Attachment A to G-64 Form, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (NY), # (3) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # (4) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that the Court will set the deadline for Plaintiff to file its motion for certification that the action is maintainable as a class action in its Scheduling Order. The parties shall meet and confer and present the Court with a proposal on that deadline and the briefing schedule for class certification in their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) written report [17]. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dracht, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Prentice-Hall Corp. System - Reg. Agent, by serving Frances Gutierrez, Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. **Corrected POS on Defendant Herbalife International, Inc., excludes Summons (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick, upon Defendant Herbalife Ltd served on 5/9/2013, answer due 5/30/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David L. Zifkin, Esq., and David I. Michael, Esq., attorneys for Herbalife Ltd, pursuant to Stipulation and Order, case docket entries 8 and 9 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons returned. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick, upon Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 5/30/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service - Registered Agent, by Serving Becky DeGeorge Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick, upon Defendant Herbalife International Inc served on 4/9/2013, answer due 5/30/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Herbalife International, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting [10] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William S. Ohlemeyer on behalf of Defendant, designating David L. Zifkin as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013, Terminated: 5/8/2013 (TERMED) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney William S. Ohlemeyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-12057820 paid.) filed by Defendant(s) Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Chief District Judge Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#13-067) approved by Chief Judge George H. King. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, this case is transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-02488 BRO(RZx). (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND TO SET INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [8], Defendants Herbalife International Inc answer due 5/30/2013; Herbalife International of America Inc answer due 5/30/2013; Herbalife Ltd answer due 5/30/2013 by Judge Percy Anderson (bp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response To Complaint, To Extend Time To File Motion For Class Certification, And To Set Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Zifkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Gary A. Feess, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 07-02529 GAF(FMOx) (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick, re Order[4] Notice of Service of Court's Standing Order served on April 11, 2013. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Judge Anderson's Standing Order)(Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Thomas Foley counsel for Plaintiff Dana Bostick. Adding Justin P. Karczag as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff Dana Bostick for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gary Bostick (Foley, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/10/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (pso)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dana Bostick (car) (mg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Complaint - (Discovery)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Dana Bostick.(car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2013: # (1) Exhibit A-B, # (2) Exhibit C Page 1-19, # (3) Exhibit C Pg 20-35, # (4) Exhibit C Pg 36-50) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2013: # (5) Exhibit C Pg 51-65, # (6) Exhibit C Pgs 66-80, # (7) Declaration C Pgs 81-95, # (8) Exhibit C Pg 96-110, # (9) Exhibit C Pg 111-127, # (10) Exhibit D Pg 1-9, # (11) Exhibit D Pg 10-18) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2013: # (12) Exhibit E, # (13) Exhibit F, # (14) Exhibit G, # (15) Exhibit H, # (16) Exhibit I, # (17) Exhibit J) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2013: # (18) Exhibit K, # (19) Exhibit L, # (20) Notice of Assignment, # (21) Summons, # (22) Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). (Attachment 22 replaced on 4/25/2013) (mg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] as to Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2,741 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?