Hindo, et al v. Growth & Income Fund, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-07765
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 11:55 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similalry situated Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Louis Gallotta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similalry situated Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Michael Feder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similalry situated Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Nada Hindo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similalry situated Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 pmclean@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo , Defendant
No Logo Acm Technology Hedge Fund, Defendant
No Logo ACM Technology Partners LLP, Defendant
No Logo Alliance Capital Management Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Alliance Capital Management Holdings L.P., Defendant
No Logo Alliance Capital Management LP, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein All-Asia Investment Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein All-Asia Investment Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Americas Government Income Trust, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Americas Government Income Trust, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Balanced Shares, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Balanced Shares, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Blended Style Series-U.S. Large Cap Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Corporate Bond Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Corporate Bond Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Quality Bond Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Quality Bond Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Bond Fund U.S. Government Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Bond Fund U.S. Government Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Inc./, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Emerging Market Debt Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Emerging Market Debt Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Global Small Cap Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Global Small Cap Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Global Strategic Income Trust, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Global Strategic Income Trust, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Global Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Global Value Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Greater China '97 Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Greater China '97 Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Growth & Income Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Growth & Income Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Growth Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Health Care Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Health Care Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein High Yield Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein High Yield Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Intermediate California Muni Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Intermediate California Muni Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Intermediate Diversified Muni Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Intermediate Diversified Muni Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Intermediate New York Muni Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Intermediate New York Muni Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein International Premier Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein International Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein International Value Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Mid-Cap Growth, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Mid-cap Growth, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Multi-Market Strategy Trust, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Multi-Market Strategy Trust, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Arizona Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Arizona Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund California Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund California Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Florida Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Florida Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured California Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured California Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured National Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured National Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Massachusetts Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Massachusetts Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Michigan Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Michigan Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Minnesota Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Minnesota Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund National Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund National Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New Jersey Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New Jersey Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New York Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New York Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Ohio Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Ohio Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Pennsylvania Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Virginia Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Virginia Portolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein New Europe Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein New Europe Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Premier Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Premier Growth Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Quasar Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Quasar Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Real Estate Investment Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Real Estate Investment Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Biotechnology Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Biotechnology Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Premier Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Premier Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Technology Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Technology Portfolio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Short Duration, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Short Duration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Small Cap Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Small Cap Value Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Technology Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Technology Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein U.S. Large Cap Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Utility Income Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Utility Income Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Value Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Worldwide Privatization Fund, Defendant
No Logo Alliancebernstein Worldwide Privatization Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AXA Financial, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Canary Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Canary Capital Partners, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Canary Investment Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Charles Schaffran, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Edward J. Stern, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Malone, Defendant
No Logo Global & International Stock Funds, Defendant
No Logo Global & International Stock Funds, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony & Mary Sune, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Barry J. Feinberg, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Barry Ponder, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Ben Hilbun, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Bernard Schwimmer, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory M. Egelston +1 212 779 1414
LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld, Esq. +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@geller-rudman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Cheryl Ponder, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Cynthia Padnis, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Donald DeGroot, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Edward Padnis, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Eugene Glazer, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Evelyn Simon, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Gary J. Colevecchio, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sachs Sax Caplan, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley Peter Dyer +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 BPDyer@SSBNY.com
No Logo George Bookhout, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Chet Barry Waldman +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 CWaldman@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Gertrude Puchino, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Helen Bookhout, Movant
No Logo Henry C. Gross, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Hydac Technology Corp. 401k Plan, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477
No Logo Lori Weinrib, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine A. Torell +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 ctorell@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo Mario DiRosa, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Nancy L. Gibson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Pamela Gau, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Philip Erickson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Richard J. Abt, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Scott Waldman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Marian P. Rosner +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 mrosner@wolfpopper.com
Space Marian P. Rosner +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 mrosner@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Sr. Jon Crowell, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Terry Conner, Movant
No Logo The Estate of Gertrude Haskel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Todd Arnoldussen, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Trellis DiRosa, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Axa Financial, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003. Service was accepted by Bernard Braithwaite, SEnior Legal Asst. Document filed by Anthony Brown ; Michael Feder ; Louis Gallotta ; Nada Hindo. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alliance Capital Management Corporation served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliance Capital Management Holdings L.P. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliance Capital Management L.P. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein All-Asia Investment Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein All-Asia Investment Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Americas Government Income Trust served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Americas Government Income Trust, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Balanced Shares served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Balanced Shares, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Blended Style Series-U.S. Large Cap Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Corporate Bond Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Corporate Bond Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Quality Bond Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Bond Fund Quality Bond Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Bond Fund U.S. Government Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Bond Fund U.S. Government Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Disciplined Value Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Disciplined Value Fund, Inc./ served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Emerging Market Debt Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Emerging Market Debt Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Global Small Cap Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Global Small Cap Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Global Strategic Income Trust served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Global Strategic Income Trust, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Global Value Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Global Value Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Greater China '97 Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Greater China '97 Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Growth & Income Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Growth & Income Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Growth Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Growth Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Health Care Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Health Care Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein High Yield Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein High Yield Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Intermediate California Muni Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Intermediate California Muni Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Intermediate Diversified Muni Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Intermediate Diversified Muni Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Intermediate New York Muni Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Intermediate New York Muni Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein International Premier Growth Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein International Value Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein International Value Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Mid-Cap Growth served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Mid-cap Growth, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Multi-Market Strategy Trust served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Multi-Market Strategy Trust, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Arizona Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Arizona Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund California Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund California Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Florida Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Florida Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured California Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured California Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured National Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Insured National Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Massachusetts Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Massachusetts Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Michigan Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Michigan Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Minnesota Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Minnesota Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund National Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund National Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New Jersey Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New Jersey Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New York Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund New York Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Ohio Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Ohio Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Pennsylvania Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Virginia Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Muni Income Fund Virginia Portolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein New Europe Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein New Europe Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Premier Growth Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Premier Growth Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Quasar Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Quasar Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Real Estate Investment Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Real Estate Investment Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Biotechnology Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Biotechnology Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Biotechnology Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Premier Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Premier Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Technology Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Select Investor Series Technology Portfolio, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Short Duration served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Short Duration, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Small Cap Value Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Small Cap Value Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Technology Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Technology Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein U.S. Large Cap Portfolio served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Utility Income Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Utility Income Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Value Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Value Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Worldwide Privatization Fund served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003; Alliancebernstein Worldwide Privatization Fund, Inc. served on 10/3/2003, answer due 10/23/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Quinones, SEcretary to Colin Burke, Senior Vice President of Counsel. Document filed by Anthony. Brown ; Michael Feder ; Louis Gallotta ; Nada Hindo. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
      CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...sent certified copy of docket sheet only.(Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 2/20/4) (laq, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Canary Capital Partners, Ltd. served on 10/15/2003, answer due 11/4/2003. Service was accepted by Ron Bangs, CFO. Document filed by Anthony. Brown ; Michael Feder ; Louis Gallotta ; Nada Hindo. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Canary Investment Management, LLC served on 10/15/2003, answer due 11/4/2003. Service was accepted by Ron Bangs, CFO. Document filed by Michael Feder ; Louis Gallotta ; Nada Hindo. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Canary Capital Partners, LLC served on 10/15/2003, answer due 11/4/2003. Service was accepted by Ron Bangs, CFO. Document filed by Michael Feder ; Louis Gallotta ; Nada Hindo. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Edward J. Stern served on 10/15/2003, answer due 11/4/2003. Service was accepted by Ron Bangs, CFO. Document filed by Anthony. Brown ; Michael Feder ; Louis Gallotta ; Nada Hindo. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Kimba M. Wood no longer assigned to the case. (gf, ) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Related Actions: 03cv 7955, 03-cv-08008, 03cv8202, 03-cv-08274, 03-cv-08278, 03cv8282, 03-cv-08350, 03-cv-08372, 03-cv-08402, 03-cv-08466, 03-cv-08722, 03-cv-08915, 03-cv-08981, 03-cv-09197, 03-cv-09294, 03-cv-09497, 03-cv-09498) on behalf of Felicia Bernstein, Robert K. Finnell, Ira Newman, Jean Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Robert J. Saelens, Anthony Antoniello, Nancy Ann Antoniello, James W. Burns, Thomas C. Burns, Jean Iezza, Pat Iezza, Linda D. Ames-Weiner, and Simon J. Denenberg, non-parties specially appearing for the limited purpose of responding to the motion to consolidate and appoint lead plaintiff in the actions set forth above.(tp, ) (Entered: 01/07/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Chet B. Waldman in Support re: 27 MOTION to Appoint George Bookhout and Helen Bookhout to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser & Bern LLP and Straus & Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser & Bern LLP and Straus & Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by George Bookhout, Helen Bookhout. (sac, ) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 27 MOTION to Appoint George Bookhout and Helen Bookhout to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser & Bern LLP and Straus & Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser & Bern LLP and Straus & Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by George Bookhout, Helen Bookhout. (sac, ) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Consolidate.; to Appoint George Bookhout and Helen Bookhout to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser & Bern LLP and Straus & Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by George Bookhout, Helen Bookhout. (sac, ) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Scott Waldman to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser and Bern LLP, and Straus and Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser and Bern LLP, and Straus and Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by Scott Waldman. (sac, ) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Consolidation; to Appoint Scott Waldman to serve as lead plaintiff(s); to Approve Plaintiff's selection of Wolf Popper LLP, Napoli, Kaiser and Bern LLP, and Straus and Boies, LLP as Lead Counsel. Document filed by Scott Waldman. (sac, ) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Steven G. Schulman in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Ben Hilbun, Pamela Gau, Gertrude Puchino, Edward and Cynthia Padnis and Donald G. DeGroot to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981,1:03-cv9197, 1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981,1:03-cv9197, 1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981,1:03-cv9197, 1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498.. Document filed by Mario DiRosa, Pamela Gau, Ben Hilbun, Cynthia Padnis, Edward Padnis, Gertrude Puchino. (yv, ) Received in night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:12 p.m. Modified on 12/12/2003 (yv, ). (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Ben Hilbun, Pamela Gau, Gertrude Puchino, Edward and Cynthia Padnis and Donald G. DeGroot to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981,1:03-cv9197, 1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981,1:03-cv9197, 1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981,1:03-cv9197, 1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498.. Document filed by Donald DeGroot, Pamela Gau, Ben Hilburn, Cynthia Padnis, Edward Padnis, Gertrude Puchino. Received in night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:12 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for an Order Appointing Ben Hilbun, Pamela Gau, Gertrude Puchino, Edward and Cynthia Padnis and Donald G. DeGroot as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION Approving their selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP pursuant to the PSLRA, as lead counsel., MOTION Consolidating Cases 1:03-cv-7765,1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008,1:03-cv-8202,1:03-cv-8274,1:03-cv-8278,1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv-8372,1:03-cv8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv9197,1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv9497,1:03cv9498. Proposed Order attached. Document filed by Donald DeGroot, Pamela Gau, Ben Hilburn, Cynthia Padnis, Edward Padnis, Gertrude Puchino. Received in night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:12 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of Catherine A. Torell in Support of 19 MOTION to Appoint Lori Weinrib to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve Movant's selection of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8685, 1:03-cv-8722, 1:03-cv-8981, and 1:03-cv-8915. Document filed by Lori Weinrib. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 6:15 p.m. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 19 MOTION to Appoint Lori Weinrib to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve Movant's selection of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8685, 1:03-cv-8722, 1:03-cv-8981, and 1:03-cv-8915. Document filed by Lori Weinrib. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 6:15 p.m.(sb, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Appoint Lori Weinrib to serve as lead plaintiff, MOTION to Approve Movant's selection of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. as Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-7955,1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8685, 1:03-cv-8722, 1:03-cv-8981, and 1:03-cv-8915. Proposed Order attached. Document filed by Lori Weinrib. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 6:15 p.m. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Todd Arnoldussen, Philip Erickson, Eugene Glazer, Jon Crowell, Sr., and Anthony & Mary Sune to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg WEiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg WEiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg WEiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,.. Document filed by Todd Arnoldussen, Jon Crowell, Philip Erickson, Eugene Glazer, Anthony & Mary Sune. (cd, ) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Darren Check in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Todd Arnoldussen, Philip Erickson, Eugene Glazer, Jon Crowell, Sr., and Anthony & Mary Sune to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg WEiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg WEiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg WEiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,.. Document filed by Todd Arnoldussen, Jon Crowell, Philip Erickson, Eugene Glazer, Anthony & Mary Sune. (cd, ) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Appoint Todd Arnoldussen, Philip Erickson, Eugene Glazer, Jon Crowell, Sr., and Anthony & Mary Sune (THE ARNOLDUSSEN LEAD PLAINTIFF GROUP) to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as lead counsel and Milberg Weiss et al to serve as Liaison Counsel., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-7765, 03-7955, 03-8008, 03-8202, 03-8274, 03-8278, 03-8350, 03-8372, 03-4962, 03-8488, 03-8466, 03-8722, 03-8981, 03-9294,. Document filed by Todd Arnoldussen, Jon Crowell, Philip Erickson, Eugene Glazer, Anthony & Mary Sune. (cd, ) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Bradley P. Dyer in Support of 13 MOTION to Appoint Barry J. Feinberg, Barry Ponder, Cheryl Ponder, Henry C. Gross, Nancy L. Gibson, and Gary J. Colevecchio to serve as lead plaintiffs. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of Lead Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8981, and 1:03-cv-9197. Document filed by Gary J. Colevecchio, Barry J. Feinberg, Nancy L. Gibson, Henry C. Gross, Barry Ponder, Cheryl Ponder. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:09 p.m. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 13 MOTION to Appoint Barry J. Feinberg, Barry Ponder, Cheryl Ponder, Henry C. Gross, Nancy L. Gibson, and Gary J. Colevecchio to serve as lead plaintiffs. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of Lead Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8981, and 1:03-cv-9197. Document filed by Gary J. Colevecchio, Barry J. Feinberg, Nancy L. Gibson, Henry C. Gross, Barry Ponder, Cheryl Ponder. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:09 p.m. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Appoint Barry J. Feinberg, Barry Ponder, Cheryl Ponder, Henry C. Gross, Nancy L. Gibson, and Gary J. Colevecchio to serve as lead plaintiff(s), MOTION to Approve movants' selection of Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8722, 1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-8915, 1:03-cv-9197 and 1:03-cv-9294. Document filed by Gary J. Colevecchio, Nancy L. Gibson, Henry C. Gross, Cheryl Ponder, Barry Ponder, Barry J. Feinberg. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:03 p.m. Proposed Order attached. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Gregory M. Egleston in Support of 10 MOTION to Appoint Bernard Schwimmer to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve movant's selection of counsel for the Class. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197. Document filed by Bernard Schwimmer. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 7:02 p.m.(sb, ) Modified on 12/10/2003 (sb, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 10 MOTION to Appoint Bernard Schwimmer to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve movant's selection of counsel for the Class. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197. Document filed by Bernard Schwimmer. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Appoint Bernard Schwimmer to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve movant's selection of counsel for the Class. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-cv8-274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8350, 1:03-cv-8372, 1:03-cv-8402, 1:03-cv-8466, 1:03-cv-8981, and 1:03-cv-9197. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 7:02 p.m. Proposed order attached. Document filed by Bernard Schwimmer. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Hydac Technology Corp. 401k Plan, Richard J. Abt, The Estate of Gertrude Haskel, Mario and Trellis DiRosa and Evelyn Simon to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve of their selection of the law firm of Berger & Montague, P.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve of their selection of the law firm of Berger & Montague, P.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve of their selection of the law firm of Berger & Montague, P.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve of their selection of the law firm of Berger & Montague, P.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-7955, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv-8372,1:03-cv-8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197,1:03-cv9294,1:03-cv-94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-7955, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv-8372,1:03-cv-8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197,1:03-cv9294,1:03-cv-94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-7955, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv-8372,1:03-cv-8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197,1:03-cv9294,1:03-cv-94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-7955, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv-8372,1:03-cv-8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197,1:03-cv9294,1:03-cv-94. Document filed by Richard J. Abt, Mario DiRosa, Trellis DiRosa, Hydac Technology Corp. 401k Plan, Evelyn Simon, The Estate of Gertrude Haskel. Received in night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:10 p.m.(yv, ) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Gregory M. Egleston, Esq. in Support of 5 MOTION to Appoint Terry Conner to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve movant's choice of counsel, the law firms of Much, Shelist, Freed, Deneberg, Ament & Rubenstein P.C. and Spector, Roseman & Kodroff P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel and Bernstein, Liebard & Lifshitz as liaison counsel in the consolidated actions. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv7765, 03cv8008, 03cv8202, 03cv8274, 03cv8278, 03cv8350, 03cv8372, 03cv8402, 03cv8466, 03cv8981, and 03cv9197. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 6:59 p.m. Document filed by Terry Conner. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 5 MOTION to Appoint Terry Conner to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve movant's choice of counsel, the law firms of Much Shelist Freed Deneberg Ament & Rubenstein P.C. and Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel and Bernstein Liebard & Lifshitz as liaison counsel in the consolidated actions. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv7765, 03cv8008, 03cv8202, 03cv8274, 03cv8278, 03cv8350, 03cv8372, 03cv8402, 03cv8466, 03cv8981, and 03cv9197. Document filed by Terry Conner. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 6:59 p.m.(sb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for an Order Appointing Hydac Technology Corp. 401k Plan, Richard J. Abt, The Estate of Gertrude Haskel, Mario and Trellis DiRosa and Evelyn Simon as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve of their selection of the law firm of Berger & Montague, P.C. to serve as lead counsel., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-7765, 1:03-cv-8202, 1:03-cv-7955, 1:03-cv-8008, 1:03-cv-8274, 1:03-cv-8278, 1:03-cv-8282, 1:03-cv-8350,1:03-cv-8372,1:03-cv-8402,1:03-cv-8466,1:03-cv-8722,1:03-cv-8915,1:03-cv-8981, 1:03-cv-9197,1:03-cv-9294,1:03-cv-9497,1:03-cv-9498 for all purposes. Document filed by Richard J. Abt, Mario DiRosa, Trellis DiRosa, Hydac Technology Corp. 401k Plan, Evelyn Simon, The Estate of Gertrude Haskel. Proposed Order attached. Received in night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 11:11 p.m. (yv, ) Modified on 12/9/2003 (yv, ). (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Terry Conner to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve movant's choice of counsel, the law firms of Much Shelist Freed Deneberg Ament & Rubenstein P.C. and Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C. as Co-Lead Counsel and Bernstein Liebard & Lifshitz as liaison counsel in the consolidated actions. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv7765, 03cv8008, 03cv8202, 03cv8274, 03cv8278, 03cv8350, 03cv8372, 03cv8402, 03cv8466, 03cv8981, and 03cv9197. Document filed by Terry Conner. Proposed Order attached. Received in the night deposit box on 12/1/03 at 6:58 p.m. (sb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Case REASSIGNED to Judge Kimba M. Wood. Judge John E. Sprizzo no longer assigned to the case. (gf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER, that counsel without prejudice to the claims or defenses of any party, dfts in this action are not required to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint fiiled in this action and that plaintiffs will file an amended consolidated complaint no later than sixty days after the later of either the date that a lead plaintiff is appointed and lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel is approved in any multi district litigation in which this action is consolidated or the filing of the panel's decision on the last MDL motion involving this action. Dfts' response to the amended consolidated complait will be due therafter at such time as is agreed upon by the parties subject to court approval . ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (dle) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER, Defendants Alliance Capital Management Corp. and Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P.'s time to answer is enlarged to 30 days after the filing of an amended complaint as set forth in this document . ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (kw) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 487075. (gf) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?