BUMGARNER v. UNITED STATES
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-05245
District Judge Noel L. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2016 at 11:46 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LARRY BUMGARNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LARRY BUMGARNER +1 609 816 7974
No Logo APT F, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "STEPHEN P. WALLACE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN P. WALLACE +1 918 694 1870
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA"
v.
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "BEN BERNANKE"
No Logo Fdic, Defendant
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL RESERVE"
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "GOLDMAN SACHS"
No Logo HENRY PAULSON, Defendant
Dimon, Jamie Dimon, Jamie, Defendant
Officially listed as "JAMES DIMON"

Represented by Blank Rome LLP

JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP MORGAN CHASE & CO."
No Logo SHEILA BAIR, Defendant
No Logo Us Treasury, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL +1 856 757 5105 elizabeth.pascal@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 36 Motion. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/1/10. (js) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION to Vacate Memorandum Opinion & Order dated 1/28/10, Re: 34 Order; by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(js) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      AMENDED DOCUMENT Amendment to 33 Motion to Vacate Judgements obtained by Fraud and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Clerk's Note: page 2 of main document was omitted in error, see attached amendment to document 33 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Envelope)(gn ) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Denying 33 Motion to Vacate Judgments Obtained by Fraud and Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Brief in Support. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/28/10. (js) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION TO VACATE JUDGEMENTS OBTAINED BY FRAUD AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2010: # 1 Envelope) (js) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 21 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/10/09. (js) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 25 Motion to Strike and granting 26 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/4/09. (js) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Change of Address by JONATHAN M. KORN (KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                  BRIEF in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel filed by JAMES DIMON, GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                    SECOND OBJECTION TO THE INDIVIDUAL/CORPORATE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS/STRIKE PLAINTIFFS PLEADINGS PENDING COURT ORDERED BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SECOND EMERGENCY MOTION TO STRIKE ASSISTANT U.S. ATTORNEY E. PASCALS' FRAUDULENT REPRESENTATION OF INDIVIDUAL RICO PARTIES AS PLAINTIFFS NEVER CONSENTED TO HEARING MOTIONS BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P by Stephen P. Wallace. (js) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                      BRIEF in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel filed by HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, UNITED STATES, FDIC, FEDERAL RESERVE, U.S. TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint by HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, UNITED STATES, FDIC, FEDERAL RESERVE, U.S. TREASURY. Responses due by 3/23/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Strike 17 Amended Complaint by JAMES DIMON, GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                            Rule 7.1 Letter for extension of return date re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel filed by JAMES DIMON, GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                              Rule 7.1 Letter for extension of return date re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel filed by HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, UNITED STATES, JAMES DIMON, FDIC, FEDERAL RESERVE, U.S. TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                Letter from ELIZABETH A. PASCAL SEEKING EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO L.CIV.R. 7.1(d). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                  Emergency MOTION for Summary Judgment for Plaintiffs and, MOTION to Compel Defendant to Submit a Forensic Audit and Brief in Support by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (th, ) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                    OBJECTION TO THE re 15 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Emergency Motions to Strike Assistant U.S. Attorney Elizabeth Pascals Entry of Appearance for Private Rico Parties at U.S. Taxpayer Expense and for Continuance of 1/20/09 Hearing and Withdrawal of Larry Bumgarner as Co-Plaintiff with Brief in Support filed by LARRY BUMGARNER. (th, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                      Letter from Jonathan M. Korn regarding Second Amended Complaint. (KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                        Letter from Elizabeth Pascal re: Second Amended Complaint. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, JAMES DIMON, GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., filed by LARRY BUMGARNER.(th, ) Modified on 1/12/2009 (th, ). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss by GOLDMAN SACHS. Responses due by 1/20/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 4 Certificate of Service)(KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss by JAMES DIMON, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. Responses due by 1/20/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 4 Certificate of Service)(KORN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by LARRY BUMGARNER. HENRY PAULSON served on 12/3/2008, answer due 12/23/2008; BEN BERNANKE served on 12/4/2008, answer due 12/24/2008; SHEILA BAIR served on 12/4/2008, answer due 12/24/2008; UNITED STATES served on 12/2/2008, answer due 12/22/2008; JAMES DIMON served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/22/2008; GOLDMAN SACHS served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/22/2008; JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/22/2008. (js) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, UNITED STATES, FDIC, FEDERAL RESERVE, U.S. TREASURY. Responses due by 1/5/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Letter to the Clerk Filing the Motion)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTION OF ERRATA OF SUMMONS ISSUED IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON NOVEMBER 21, 2008 AS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND RELATED ENTITIES WERE WITHDRAWN AND SUBSTITUTED WITH THE CO-DEFENDANTS IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND CORPORATE CAPACITY AS A WHISTLE BLOWER ACTION BY CO-PLAINTIFFS by LARRY BUMGARNER (js) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Summons Issued as to GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., FDIC, FEDERAL RESERVE, U.S. TREASURY. Days Due - 20. (js) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                        Summons Issued as to HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, JAMES DIMON, GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. Days Due - 20. (js) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Request for Summons to be Issued by LARRY BUMGARNER (js) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against HENRY PAULSON, BEN BERNANKE, SHEILA BAIR, JAMES DIMON, GOLDMAN SACHS, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., FDIC, FEDERAL RESERVE, U.S. TREASURY, filed by STEPHEN P. WALLACE; LARRY BUMGARNER.(js) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Letter from Larry Bumgarner showing service of 3 motion to the AUSA. (js) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Letter from Elizabeth Pascal re: Ineffective Service. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter from Russell Conroy. (js) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying 3 Motion. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/12/08. (js) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION SEEKING TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FROM H.R. 1424. ALSO KNOWN AS "THE BAILOUT" by LARRY BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(tf, ) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                        Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General (Due - 60 days) (tf, ) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 308084.), filed by LARRY BUMGARNER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tf, ) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 231 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?