Access For The Disabled Inc. v. CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:08-cv-61266
Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 3:32 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Access For The Disabled Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas B. Bacon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Bacon +1 954 478 7811 +1 954 237 1990 tbb@thomasbaconlaw.com
No Logo Bob Cohen, Plaintiff
No Logo Denise Payne, Plaintiff
No Logo Pat Kennedy, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo California State Teachers Retirement System, Defendant
Unknown Role, hhgregg, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Porpoise Evans +1 305 579 0500 +1 305 579 0717 evansp@gtlaw.com
CB Richard Ellis Group CB Richard Ellis Group, Defendant
Officially listed as "CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Stewart Fine +1 305 579 0500 +5790 579 579 0717 finer@gtlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alaine Susan Greenberg +1 954 768 8276 +7651 765 765 1477 greenberga@gtlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12182
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER DISMISSING Action With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 7/7/2009. (tas) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
    Clerks Notice to Filer re 42 Stipulation of Dismissal. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (tas) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
      JOINT NOTICE of Settlement by Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, California State Teachers' Retirement System, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy (see docket entry 42 for image) (tas) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by California State Teachers' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice, # 2 Memorandum In Support of Court Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Confidential Settlement Agreement)(Evans, D.) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          AGREED ORDER granting Defendant's 40 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents. On or before July 6, 2009, the parties shall finalize settlement and file the appropriate dismissal papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 6/22/09. (jse) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
            STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by California State Teachers' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers)(Evans, D.) Modified text on 6/19/2009 (tas). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting Defendant's 37 Unopposed Motion for Stay Pending Settlement. On or before June 22, 2009, the parties shall finalize settlement and file the appropriate dismissal papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 6/9/09. (lc2) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 35 Unopposed Motion to Stay, based upon Defendant's 36 Notice of Striking that motion and the filing of a subsequent 37 Unopposed Motion to Stay on this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 6/9/09. (lc2) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement by California State Teachers' Retirement System. Responses due by 6/26/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, D.) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Striking 35 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System by California State Teachers' Retirement System (Evans, D.) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement by California State Teachers' Retirement System. Responses due by 6/25/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Stay Pending Settlement)(Evans, D.) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2009 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Bench Trial specially set for 10/13/2009 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Discovery due by 7/1/2009. Mediation Deadline 7/15/2009. In Limine Motions due by 7/15/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2009. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/14/2009. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 9/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 4/10/09. (lc2) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton: Telephonic Status and Scheduling Conference held on 3/30/2009, (Bench Trial set for 10/13/2009 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2009 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton.). (Tape #09-FX-20-2686.) (aw) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by California State Teachers' Retirement System re 31 Order Setting Status Conference "Proposed Time Schedule" (Evans, D.) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Setting Telephonic Status and Scheduling Conference for Monday, March 30, 2009 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/9/09. (lc2) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/3/2009. (ail) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Administrative Order Closing Case as to Judge Ungaro's Docket Only. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/3/2009. (ail) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                    Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re 26 Status Report filed by California State Teachers' Retirement System. Error - Additional filer(s)wasn't selected ; Correction - Filer(s) added by the Clerk. Instruction to filer - In the future, please select the proper filer(s). It is not necessary to refile the document. (jc) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, California State Teachers' Retirement System, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy. (Evans, D.) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                        STATUS REPORT (Interim Joint) by California State Teachers' Retirement System and Bob Cohen, Denise Payne and Pat Kennedy. (Evans, D.) text Modified on 3/2/2009 (jc). (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting in part 24 Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines*SEE Order for Deadlines*. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/26/2009. (ail) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                            Defendant's MOTION to Continue (Stipulated) Trial and Pretrial Deadlines by California State Teachers' Retirement System. Responses due by 3/13/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Evans, D.) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER Re-Scheduling Mediation before Karen Evans Mediation Hearing set for 3/23/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/16/2009. (cqs) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Enter Order Re-Scheduling Mediation by Karen Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Karen) Modified on 1/20/2009 (ls). (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Karen Evans Mediation Hearing set for 3/26/2009. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/18/2008. (cqs) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Karen Evans selected. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation Conference)(Evans, D.) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER For pretrial Conference and Trial: Jury Trial set for 6/22/2009 before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 6/17/2008 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2009. Discovery due by 3/13/2009. Motions due by 4/10/2009. Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/8/2009.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/1/2008. (cqs) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/1/2008. (cqs) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Porpoise Evans on behalf of California State Teachers' Retirement System (Evans, D.) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by California State Teachers' Retirement System. (Evans, D.) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                              SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Scheduling Order))(Evans, D.) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file a timely Joint Planning and Scheduling Report. Show Cause Response due by 10/29/2008.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/27/2008. (ls) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by California State Teachers' Retirement System.(Fine, Robert) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy.(Bacon, Thomas) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      *ORDER re 9 DENYING Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/22/08. (lc2) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alaine Susan Greenberg on behalf of CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC (Greenberg, Alaine) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fine, Robert) Modified on to term motion 9/23/2008 (dm). (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 4 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond as to Complaint. Responses due by 9/22/2008. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/3/2008. (ls) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy (Bacon, Thomas) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel Of Interested Persons And Corporate Disclosure by Thomas B. Bacon on behalf of Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy (Bacon, Thomas) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under The ADA by Thomas B. Bacon on behalf of Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy (Bacon, Thomas) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fine, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Setting Initial Planning And Schedule Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2008 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/11/2008. (dm) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                        Summons Issued as to CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC. (rb) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against CB Richard Ellis Investors,LLC Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 543874, filed by Access For The Disabled Inc., Bob Cohen, Denise Payne, Pat Kennedy.(rb) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?