Mathis et al v. Darden Restaurants, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-61742
Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 23, 2019 at 10:41 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alaine Peters, Plaintiff
No Logo Alison Asa, Plaintiff
No Logo Amanda Emerson, Plaintiff
No Logo Amanda Mathis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann & Knopf, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Pearlman , +1 201 845 9600 +1 201 845 9423 psp@njlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex Pisarevsky +1 201 845 9600 ap@njlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Higer Lichter & Givner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Lichter +1 305 933 9970 +1 305 933 0998 dlichter@hlglawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trief and Olk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stan Gutgarts +1 212 486 6060 sgutgarts@triefandolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara E. Olk +1 212 486 6060 bolk@triefandolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ted E. Trief +1 212 486 6060 +1 212 317 2946 ttrief@triefandolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Wojtkowiak +1 212 486 6060 mwojtkowiak@triefandolk.com
No Logo Antonio Wilson, Plaintiff
No Logo Belinda Lacey Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Brad Henry, Plaintiff
No Logo Brenda Lawson, Plaintiff
No Logo Brigett Nichols, Plaintiff
No Logo Christina Cardenas, Plaintiff
No Logo Christina Polk, Plaintiff
No Logo Crystal Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Cynthia Lambert Ice, Plaintiff
No Logo Darlene Hamilton, Plaintiff
No Logo David Juhasz, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Zilkey, Plaintiff
No Logo Elisa Byrne, Plaintiff
No Logo Faye Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Felicia Andrews, Plaintiff
No Logo Heath Vincent, Plaintiff
No Logo Jaclyn Cirillo, Plaintiff
No Logo James Hamilton, Plaintiff
No Logo James Rogers, Plaintiff
No Logo Jamie Kerr, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeanine Redmon, Plaintiff
No Logo Jennifer McDonald, Plaintiff
No Logo Jodie Pendley, Plaintiff
No Logo Jonathan McDougal, Plaintiff
No Logo Kathleen Phares, Plaintiff
No Logo Kimberly Palchick, Plaintiff
No Logo Lashawn Edmonds, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Foster, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Long, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Gillespie, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Matthew Bogart, Plaintiff
No Logo Nakeysha Robertson, Plaintiff
No Logo Natalie Vaccaro, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole Alequin, Plaintiff
No Logo Nikita Patrick, Plaintiff
No Logo Penny Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Princess Heard, Plaintiff
No Logo Ralph Ragsdale, Plaintiff
No Logo Raylene Carlson, Plaintiff
No Logo Rebecca Phillips, Plaintiff
No Logo Rebeccah Moon, Plaintiff
No Logo Reginia Yolton, Plaintiff
No Logo Samantha Medina, Plaintiff
No Logo Sarina Unangst, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Canteen, Plaintiff
No Logo Stasha White, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Doneth, Plaintiff
No Logo Teshiure Amos, Plaintiff
No Logo Tiffany Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Troy Vincent, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Defendant
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Darden Restaurants, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/29/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Marie Estevez +1 305 415 3330 +1 305 415 3001 annemarie.estevez@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/01/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nick David Companario +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 ncampanario@seyfarth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew James Gagnon +1 312 460 5237 +1 312 460 7237 mgagnon@seyfarth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 gmaatman@seyfarth.com
No Logo Darden SW LLC, Defendant
No Logo Florida SE, Inc., Defendant
No Logo GMRI, Inc., Defendant
No Logo N and D Restaurants, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rare Hospitality International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rare Hospitality Management, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 203
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (1030) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Party
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Set Aside
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Administrative Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Withdraw Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [982] Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                              Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Paul Weiner. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 85477. (ksa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 9/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting [994] Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aaron D. Crews terminated Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Aaron Crews. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/28/2014. (gp)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [953] Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support (Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Opinions Of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William Cutler [D.E. 953]) filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Morrow v. Flowers Food, Inc., 3:07-cv-617-MHT (M.D. Ala. Apr. 27, 2009), # (2) Exhibit 2 - Morales v. Greater Omaha Packing Co., 8:08-CV-88, 8:08-CV-161 (D. Neb.))(Reed, Aaron)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re [957] MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for the Court to Determine that Defendants Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D)(Lichter, David)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re [988] Response in Opposition to Motion, Amended Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Amended Report, # (2) Appendix 1, # (3) Appendix 2, # (4) Appendix 3) (Lichter, David)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [982] Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 9/2/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-G)(Lichter, David)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authority re [974] Order on Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re [990] Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 3 Replacement) (Lichter, David)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 988 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Filing Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Appendix 1, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Appendix 3) (Lichter, David) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 957 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court to Determine that Defendnats Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8/Declarations and Deposition Excerpts)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2014 re 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Argument heard. Written Order to enter. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov (kc) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING 982 Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/8/2014. (yha) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1:Table & exhbits A-O, # 2 Exhibit 2-15: Deposition excerpts & exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 16-25: Deposition excerpts & exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 26-36: Declaration of Amy Ramsey; Deposition excerpts)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 922 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Darden's Expert Report of Ali Saad, Ph.D. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1)Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike the Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Amy Ramsey)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1)Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 8/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 970 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/28/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 956 Motion for Extension of Time. Re: 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/24/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 967 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 960 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE ORAL ARGUMENT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/24/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 960 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action to Coincide with Oral Argument on Other Outstanding Motions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Tracking Form, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(mg) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 960 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action to Coincide with Oral Argument on Other Outstanding Motions filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Replies due by 8/4/2014. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 921 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Filing Declaration/Supplemental Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (Lichter, David) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 954 Motion for Hearing. Re: 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/18/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION for Hearing re 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support /Defs' Request for Oral Argument on Their Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, Expert Rep. of Dr. Madansky, Excerpts of Madansky Dep., Expert Report of Cutler, Excerpts of Cutler Dep., Decl. of Wm. Cutler)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 951 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/16/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's MOTION for Hearing /Defendants' Request for Oral Argument on Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Ali Saad by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE/REPLY to 922 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Ali Saad by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Part 1 Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ali Saad, # 2 Exhibit 1-Part 2 Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ali Saad, # 3 Exhibit 2-16/Expert Rep Dr. Madansky, Excerpts of Dep of Caswell, Morocco, Hohman, Decl. of Iaciofoli, Cancio, Keenan, Mannion, Andrews Answers to Defs' First Set of Interr., Sandefer Answers to Defs' First Set of Interr., Ruth's Answers to Defs' First Set of Interr., Excerpts of Dep of Ruth, Ex. 59 to Caswell Dep, Decl. of Corbett, Gervasi)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiff Jason Hutches (DE 651 and DE 652) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint (Third Amended Collective Action Complaint) by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part 945 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/3/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING re 944 Order on Motion for Hearing Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/3/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 942 Motion for Hearing on Motion to Decertify Collective Action Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/2/2014. (yha) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Produce Witness held on 5/28/2014 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-38 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 954-769-5488 / Carl_Schanzleh@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law, 941 Notice (Other),, /Defendants' Request for Oral Argument on Its Motion to Decertify Collective Action by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. re 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law /Notice of Filing Additional Exhibits to D.E. 940 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61-80/Dep Excerpts Middleton, Woernle, Spangler, Phillips, Steele, Pratt, Corren, Scott, Swenson, Fortner, Iavecchia, Breum, Nelson, Taplin, Foose, Dean, Gonzales, Makki, Chadwich, Beal, # 2 Exhibit 81/Declaration of Saad, # 3 Exhibit 82-84/Cutler Report, Cutler Declaration, Cutler Dep, # 4 Exhibit 85/Declaration of Ramsey, # 5 Exhibit 86-88/Madansky Report, Madansky Dep, Declaration of Williams, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-22/Declarations Burrowes, Iaciofoli, Kiernan, Norberg, Wilkerson, Babitt, O'Keefe, McCarty, Babitt (1st), Dep Excerpts Wilson, Livrieri, Wilkerson, Williams, Kiernan, Edwards, Iaciofoli, Norberg, Psaras, Clement, Davis, Sorensen, Cooper, # 2 Exhibit 23/Declaration of Gathers, # 3 Exhibit 24-32/Declarations Psaras, Willings, Defs' Objections, Dep Excerpts Gufford, Anderson, Hohman, Gathers, Willings, Caswell, # 4 Exhibit 33-42/In Sample WHISARD, Out of Sample WHISARD, Dep ExcerptsRabeneau, Serra, Andrews, Tigney, Bullerman, Dedeaux, Jones, Oikle, # 5 Exhibit 43-60/Dep Excerpts Stokes, Emerson, Long, Doneth, McNutt, Roberson, Rogers, Vaccaro, White, Stone, Mathis, Henry, Zilkey, Berg, Butler, Herrera, McCready, McDougal)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY granting 938 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law. Replies due by 8/5/2014. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/23/2014. (yha) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 936 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lichter, David) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OMNIBUS ORDER denying as moot 896 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 904 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; granting 922 Motion to Seal ; granting 930 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs are authorized to file Motion 923 including exhibits under Seal, shall remain Sealed until futher order. Defendants may file response to Motion to Stike on or before 7/15/2014. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/17/2014. (jmd) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part 934 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/16/2014. (yha) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION To Exceed Page Limitation For Motion To Decertify Collective Action by Darden Restaurants, Inc., Darden SW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) Modified text on 6/16/2014 (jua). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 929 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/13/2014. (ail) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part Unopposed Motion to Align Court's Scheduling Order of May 21, 2014 with Court's Amended Scheduling Order of April 25, 2014 re 926 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery due by 10/1/2014. In Limine Motions due by 1/16/2015. Motions due by 10/9/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/16/2015. Calendar Call set for 1/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2015 at 9:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/13/2014. (ail) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8/2/13 Letter)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Darden's Expert Report of Ali Saad, PHD. by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing for Caitlin Duffy. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5305. (ksa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 922 MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 924 Motion to Retain Magistrate Judge Seltzer. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/6/2014. (yha) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 911 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Judge,,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 912 Order Joint Notice of Filing of Agreement on Mediator (Lichter, David) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's MOTION Motion to Retain Magistrate Judge Seltzer Defendants' Motion to Retain Magistrate Judge Seltzer by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION to File under Seal Motion to Strike Darden's Expert Report of Ali Saad, Ph.D. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(tpl) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 917 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/30/2014. (yha) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting in Part 892 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witnesses. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/28/2014. (ccy) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2014 re 892 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. Telephonic hearing not sealed. Order to follow. (Digital 10:08:13.) (dd) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing for Erika R. Piccirillo. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5239. (ksa) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 246 Defendants' Motion to Drop Parties Under Rule 21, or in the Alternative to Either Defer Named Plaintiff's Depositions Until After Decertification, or Expand Deposition Limits to Include the Remaining Named Plaintiff. The Alternative Relief sought (deferring the depositions) was subsequently addressed by the Court in Paragraph G of the Discovery Plan and Order(DE 830). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/27/2014. (kas) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of August 15 - August 30, 2014 (Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of August 15 - August 30, 2014 (Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting 894 Defendant's Request for Hearing. The undersigned Magistrate Judge will conduct a telephonic hearing on 892 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Produce Witness on May 28, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendants shall contact the undersigned chambers to arrange for the telephonic hearing. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/21/2014. (kas) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/21/2014. (yha) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/8/2014 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 12/5/2014 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2014., Discovery due by 8/13/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2014., In Limine Motions due by 11/21/2014., Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2014., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/21/2014.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/20/2014. (yha) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of June 30-July 10, 2014 (Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to Administrative Order 2014-48. Case reassigned to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas for all further proceedings. Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum no longer assigned to case. (mb) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 903 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ronald J. Hedges is terminated from this matter. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/19/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 891 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT /AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Darden Restaurants, Inc. (DeBlasio, Patrick) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 160 Amended Complaint,,,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ronald J. Hedges. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Amy Ramsey, # 2 Exhibit 2-Deposition Transcript of Albert Madansky Ph.D, # 3 Exhibit 3-Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky, # 4 Exhibit 4-Excerpts of Declaration of Ali Saad, Ph.D)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 900 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendants' Expert Report. Plaintiffs may file their Motion to Strike on or before June 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/13/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Report of Ali Saad, PH.D. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/30/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER requiring that on or before May 13, 2014, counsel for the parties shall confer in person or by telephone and attempt in good faith to resolve all matters raised by 892 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. On or before May 15, 2014, the parties shall file a status report identifying the matters, if any, that remain for the Court's consideration and providing the Court with several potential dates for a hearing on the Motion. Defendant's time for filing a reply to Plaintiff's response to the Motion, if necessary, is extended until May 17, 2014. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/8/2014. (kas) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 891 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Replies due by 5/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 2 and 3)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. re 896 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky Notice of Plaintiffs' Consent to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky [D.E. 896] (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part 894 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. Defendants shall file their response on or before 4:00 p.m. on May 8, 2014, and if Plaintiffs wish to file a reply thereto, they shall do so on or before 4:00 p.m. on May 13, 2014; defering ruling on 894 Defendants' Request for Hearing until such time as the Court has reviewed Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 4/30/2014. (kas) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANTS AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS, AND REQUEST FOR HEARING by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reed, Aaron). Added MOTION for Hearing on 4/29/2014 (yha). (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 891 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Temporarily File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 4/28/2014. (ccy) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Temporarily File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mg) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part 880 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/12/2014. Expert Discovery due by 10/1/2014. Fact Discovery due by 9/22/2014. Mediation Deadline 10/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2014. In Limine Motions due by 11/10/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/22/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2015 before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/22/2014. (yha) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 880 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 880 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Replies due by 4/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Ramsey Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2- Crews Declaration)(Reed, Aaron) Modified Text on 4/18/2014 (ls). (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 886 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/17/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jennifer Schilling, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 77434. (ksa) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 884 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Dardano, Aimee James, Mitchell Jordan, Jillian McConnaughy and Nathalie Walsh. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 882 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/11/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kevin Little, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 77055. (ksa) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER Expediting Response to 880 Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order on or before April 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/11/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 877 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/3/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 876 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/3/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Elizabeth Tempio Clement. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76508. (ksa) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leigh Ann Bigley, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76509. (ksa) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiff Michael Shuhart (DE 328 and DE 330) and Shawn Aceves (DE 334 and DE 335) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER overruling 841 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/2/2014. (yha) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 870 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 869 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 868 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Addmission of Breanne M. Sheetz, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76120. (ksa) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Melissa L. McDonagh, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76121. (ksa) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephen B. Rotter, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76060. (ksa) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 866 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/26/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Holly E. Rich. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75966. (ksa) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 864 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/20/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Carlos Jimenez, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75740. (ksa) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 862 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/19/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Catherine S. Lindemann, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75656. (ksa) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Jessica Spoto (D.E. 748 and D.E. 749), Mike Sipich (D.E. 748 and D.E. 749), and Barbara Perry (D.E. 732 and D.E. 734) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 859 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/18/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anne M. Mellen, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75606. (ksa) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 857 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/18/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of E. Ashley Sims, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75534. (ksa) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/REPLY to 830 Order Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Objections to the Discovery Plan and Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 854 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/5/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing for David Adelsberg. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 4890. (ksa) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Request for Withdrawal of Plaintiff Maureen McGlynn (DE 358 and DE 359) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE/REPLY /DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DISCOVERY PLAN AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE SELTZER by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Hearing Transcript 12/17/13, # 2 Exhibit 2-Hearing Transcript 10/28/13)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 850 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Eric Solivan and Robert Sparks. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 848 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Crystal Bunggay and Josh Taylor Walters. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 846 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carnarri Cofield and Emily Derra. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 844 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christopher Babine, Kelsey Elrod, Eldon Fancher, III, Aaren Tinnen and Erik Woxland. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 842 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Madeleine Hale-Crane, Erin Reilly, Brittany Rondeau, Jamie Scarmack, Alisha Sellingham, Anthony Simmons and Eddie Williams. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 830 Order to District Court (Lichter, David) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting 838 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Conor Crowley terminated from the case. Notice of Termination delivered by U.S. Mail to Conor Crowley. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/12/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 837 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Wojtkowiak terminated from the case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Matthew Wojtkowiak. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/12/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Conor Crowley. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matt Wojtkowiak. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 835 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Melissa Curd and Amanda Sheron. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 833 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Beth Brugger, Barbara Bruker, Michael Capers, Jeremy Caplinger, Tracey Frazier, Brandy Greene, Christopher Grunfelder, Stacy Halverson, Daniel Harclerode, Daniel Hopcus, James Mcbride, Shannon Ontiveros, Joshua Rainey, Ventura Rangel, Diane Rossi, Mary Rothwell, Kirk Stewart, Shannon Sweeney, Willie Vaughn and Kiera Wagner. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 831 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/4/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shelly L. Friedland. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 4774. (ksa) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY PLAN AND ORDER. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 1/31/2014. (ccy) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. of Proposed Discovery Plans and Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order, # 2 Exhibit 2: Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order, # 3 Exhibit 3: Transcript of December 17, 2013 Hearing)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 827 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kenneth Barnett, Mary Bokenhagen, Michael Boyce, Clifford Boyd, Sandra Boykin, Lionel Brewer, Tanya Cagle, Emily Cain, Dian Clarke, Ladonna Coley, Susan Fields, Diana Fry, Kellie Hickenbottom, Zanita Holliman, Jonathan Jones, Wouseline Joseph, Michael Judd, Minden Luke, Douglas Magnusson, Latasha Mcclure, Brad Mccormack, Richelle Merrill, John Persons, Allison Rakay, Hamed Ranjbar, Alejandro Roldan, Joseph Russo-Tiesse, Jr., Dominique Schaffer, Barbara Steele, Autumn Strickland, Chris Teague and Michael Zach. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiff Elena Stock (DE 560 and DE 561) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 824 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Victor Ayala, Keith Biancalana, John Bickelmann, Eric Blumhardt, Aspen Boyd, Chris Bucalo, Tabatha Casner, Bruce Chatenka, Gregory Cirillo, Jermaine Coleman, Steven Coleman, Jack Cooper, Mary Corona, Neil Cozart, Lisa Decola, Neva Eyres, Victoria Filshill, David Fischbach, Kari Gover, John Grace, Jeremy Grammer, Nicole Haas, Allison Hamilton, Dawnemarie Hansen-Rowe, Wayne Henderson, Charles Hewitt, Kendra Hilley, Quinten Hizey, Amanda Hoover, Christine Hueppchen, Eric Hulbert, Filomena Ilaria, Mitchell Jordan, Jillian Kallenbach, Timothy Kaufman, Phillip Matthew Kelley, Kathie Koester, Jean Kohn, Valerie Kouba, Stacey Kowalski, Dionne Lee, Kathleen Mack, Gina Mazzant, Katie Mechanick, Merrie Moore, Angie Morrow, Irene Munoz, Wayne Mutscheller, Israel Myers, Austyn Pace, Jaclyn Pari, Nathaniel Patton, Rachel Peown, Nick Perdomo, Richard Poole, Jarrett Pruitt, Stacy Rein, Daniel Rivera, Ernesto Rivera, Samantha Rodriguez, Jon Rohde, Meredith Rouse-Reilly, Ashleigh Sager, Kelly Sargeant, Robert Scarola, Brianna Shider, Kathryn Sigler, Heather Smith, Janiqua Smith, Eric Solivan, Robert Sparks, Kendrick Stennis, Deanna Supernor, Kelly Thompson, Katherine Torres, Sandra Tucker, Jennifer Tymula, Carla Waterston, Natalie Watkins, Lenell Watson, Erika Weisensel and Rasha Wyndsong. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 822 Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs a Ten-Day Grace Period to Process and File Additional Consents Returned Within the Second Opt-In Period. The Plaintiffs shall file with the Court on or before March 3, 2013, any Consent Forms postmarked no later than February 20, 2014, and authorized by 778 The Court's Order Granting Additional Notice and Opt-In Period. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/14/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Process and File Additional Consents Returned Within the Second Opt-In Period (Ten Day Grace Period) re 778 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/31/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Michael Dickstein. Mediation Hearing set for 6/25/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/10/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 820 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re 816 Order, Joint Notice of Mediation Location and Amended Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Toni Graham (DE 699 & DE 700) and Trishia Kibling (DE 481 & DE 484) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 756 Request for Oral Argument, in light of entry of 817 Order Overruling Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer, and Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/6/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER overruling 751 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court; and AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part and denying in part 752 Motion to Amend/Correct ( Discovery due by 5/12/2014., Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2014., Fact Discovery due by 8/21/2014., Mediation Deadline 9/12/2014., Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2014., In Limine Motions due by 10/9/2014., Motions due by 5/27/2014., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/21/2014., Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum.). Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/3/2014. (yha) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to notify the Court on or before January 10, 2014, of the location and address of the mediation conference that the parties propose in 815 the Proposed Order Scheduling Meidation. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/3/2014. (jsh) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 420 Scheduling Order,, Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Joint Motion for In-Person Conference held on 12/17/2013 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-102 pages, Court Reporter: Jerald M. Meyers, 954-431-4757 / crjm@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting 812 Joint Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Expert Witness Summaries. Plaintiffs shall serve their expert witness summaries and reports on or before March 28, 2014. Defendants shall serve their expert witness summaries and reports on or before April 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/31/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time In Which To Serve Expert Witness Summaries re 420 Scheduling Order,, 810 Response to Motion, 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/13/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Stacie Nelson (D.E. 558 and D.E. 559), Nicole Blanchard (D.E. 693 and D.E. 694), and Ashley Blanchard (D.E. 272 and D.E. 273) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed Defendants' Supplemental/Revised Response to Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [dkt. 752] filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/30/2013. (Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting 806 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limits. Plaintiffs may file a Reply in Support of their Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order that is up to 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/19/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and for Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2013 re 795 Joint MOTION FOR IN-PERSON CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SELTZER filed by All Plaintiffs. Counsel for the plaintiffs David H. Lichter and Peter S. Pearlman present in court. Counsel for the defendants John A. Ybarra and Michael J. Lehet present in court. Oral argument heard from both sides. Order to follow. (Digital 14:07:01Thru 15:46:19 Recalled 15:58:12 Thru 16:28:13.) (at) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Teliah Gienger (DE 538 & DE 539) and Abbigail Schneider (DE 598 & DE 599) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 799 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing Second Declaration of Stephen Schneider in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of: In Support of Defendnats' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re 801 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit B)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 799 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Declaration of Stephen Schneider in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 797 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Natalie Engle, Emily Falls, Lorraine Jones, Kristi Karkut, Lee Lukaszewski, Anthony Mosley, Jacqueline Muse, Stephanie Williams and Jose Zuniga. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting hearing on December 17, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. At the hearing, the Court will hear argument on the appropriate size of the opt-in discovery sample and the methodology to be employed for the sample's selection. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/12/2013. (kas) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION FOR IN-PERSON CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SELTZER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [D.E. 752] filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendan Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Kelly A. Davis (DE 564 & 565) and Alexandra Llanos (DE 554 & 555) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting 790 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file a response to 751 Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of the Magistrate Judge that is up to 35 pages in length, not including the caption, document title, tables, signature pages, certificates, or exhibits. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/5/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defs' Unopposed Mt. to Exceed Page Limitation for Response to PLs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying PLs' Mt. to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief, and Incorporated Memornadum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 788 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sheerice Alston, Miguel Bailey, Chris Barber, Kenzi Burnett, Brian Carney, Wilburn Chandler, Susan Durant, Stefanie Erschen, Allison Ferrara, Kymberly Gast, Amberly George, Michael Goodwin, William Granfield, Hayley Grohar, Kristal Gurgone, Gelinda Heller, Sheila Jeffcoat-Murray, Sharday Johnson, Ryan Leger, Sumer Leger, Elizabeth Martinez, Keisha Mcsween, Nicol Mellville, Christian Mendoza, Sauda Muhammad, Hannah Nicholas, Henry Oviedo, Lora Penn-Varga, Leonettza Powell, Anna Pulido, Catherine Reusser, Sara Senn, Christian Serafino, Kimberly Shapley, Sherman Sleuth, Erica Smith, Tiffany Webb and Abby Zehe. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 420 Scheduling Order,, Joint Notice of Filing of Agreement on Mediator (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 750 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limits for Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and for Related Relief. Plaintiffs' Objections may be up to 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 11/25/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 781 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Segand Alamdar, Kappotolia Anderson, Breana Baker, Staci Berry, Christina Bowley, Sheri Bradshaw, Judi Bragg, Melanie Cook, Chad D'aigle, William Dane, Kathryn Davies, Christopher Decker, Michael Delgado, Meave Deppeler, Cory Doucette, Karlyn Dozier, Manolo Espinoza, Sarah Falkner, Margie Flynn, Tiffany Garcia, Kimberly Gonzales, Rabije Hajdini, Cole Hancock, Christine Hayden, Michelle Holden, Kimberly Holt, Julie Humphrey, Erin Jessup, Rachel Johnson, Brittany Jordan, William Kloppe, Melinda Knerem, Kelley Lind, Uriel Lopez, Christina Maretich, Christine Martin, Sarah McKinstry, Carren Mccoy, Julia Mosley, Katie Myron, Deborah Oakes, Roshonda Poole, Kristen Poore, Erika Purdy, Maygin Rittinger, Sandra Salazar-Diaz, Leon Sam, Barbara Seltenreich, Dennis Shockley, Amanda Small, Hadassah Smuda, Emily Snyder, Rebecca Spencer, Latisha Spicer, Vicki Tryon, Diana Villegas, William Walker, Kimberly Wehrenberg, Percy White, Bryan Williams, Valarie Williams, Jennifer Worth, Terri Wright and Erin Zimmer. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 783 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Apel, Kimberly Beckus, Tiffani Breeding, Muriel Butcher, Elizabeth Campbell, Rachel Carr, Sarah Carr, Rose Conforti, Shawn Cooper, Amanda DeMartino, Calli Fronk, Brittani Hooks-Royster, Michael Lewandowski, Brandee Lockhart, Marquis Lytch, Kasey Miller, Yanet Perez, Porsche Recknor, Porsche Recknor, Denae Reed, Christina Snyder, Laura Snyder, Kari Brice Strack, Jennifer Tobias, Brenda Williams and Anthony Wright. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 780 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Evan Belote, Danyl Broomfield, Sana Brown Jackson, Kele Cancilla, Barbara Chalkley, Kevin Choiniere, Shamequa Collins, Lawren Dampeer, Toni-Ann Darby, Ashdon Floyd, Ephrem Gebrekidan, Zack Goldrick, Hugo Gutierrez, Katherine Haley, Johannah Harman, Tionda Harrison-Hendrix, Kimberly Hirsch, Jennifer Holborn, Tiffany Johnson, Robyn Jones, Kolandria Joyner, Sam Kearney, Lascia Kelly, Cristian Lozano, Martin Mendoza, Lekendra Myles, Shayna Nesbit, Michael Ogden, Tanya Przybylski and Jose Vela. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 776 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ahmad Al-Zear, Sogand Alamdar, Paul Amos, Mallorie Barshaw, Juanita Bell, Lisa Bell, Nicole Boleman-Ziemolozynski, Tandrine Bray, Erin Caplinger, Tich Chadyiwa, Brittany Cornell, Elizabeth Csiki, Michael Dale, Ashley Dunagin, Wesley Dyar, Jenny Ewalt, Philinese Fairley, Jacqueline Ferguson, Ilene Flores, Stephen Forbes, Kelly Fortel-Jaggie, Kevin Foster, Thomasene Goldman, Cristan Haynes, Cole Henry, Deborah Henry, Crystal Holton, Jacqueline Jolicoeur, Kristy Kohler, Jacob Korn, Miriam Krugliak, Maria Lane, Christy Laroche, Leslie Leonard, Angelique Levell, Sabrina Mccollum, Luz Melecio, Celia Crosby Moffett, Meghan Morris, Diego Ochoa, Somnuek Peterson, Holly Petta, Lananh Pham, Carlos Pizarro, Dale Poe, Kimberly Rickert, Rachael Riebe, Rashawn Robinson, Angelito Salazar, Ashley Schaffner-Mcnatt, Jacqueline Schmidt, Gina Seery, Gloria Sippel, Yvonne Smith, Michael Sudduth, Melissa Thompson, Sau Thong, Josie Turgean, Monica Vega, Lynda Victor, Mary Denise Weber, Thomas White, Tracie Williams and Tara Yuengert. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 769 Joint Motion for Additional Notice and Opt-In Period. Plaintiffs may send Notice, in the form previously approved, to the 1,586 individuals inadvertently omitted from Defendant's list of putative class members. Plaintiffs shall file any Opt-In Consent Forms from these 1,586 individuals on or before February 20, 2014. This Order does not affect the filing deadline for consent forms from putative class members who were not among the 1,586 individuals inadvertently omitted from Defendant's list, nor does this Order affect any other deadline in the matter. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 11/22/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 775 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shannon Allen, Deark Bailey, Yassir Bennani, Andrea Bosley, Renee Case, Miguel Casillas, Drisel Clatterbuck, Jessica Cupp, Andrew Cypher, Cody Daigle, Shannon Debauch, Kevin Dignan, Kathryn Duffy, Cathy Eicher, Erin Emanuel, Chonsydne Fields, Ashley Gee, Amory Gerhard, Kwmane Gorins, Tanisha Hamlett, Tomiko Han-Suhara, Benisha Hill, Alicia Hoefler, Micholyn Holmes, Jasmine Houston, Kathleen Hurban, Elizabeth Keller, Christina Knouse, Carol Koester, Kimberly Lacey, Melissa Lauer, Aletha Laux, Courtney Lockley, Kent Mckee, Glenda Menefee, Tiffany Mezzanotti, Michael Milito, Emily Archer Miller, Chantell Mims-Penland, Brandi Owens, Staci Pearsall, Janet Phillips, Denise Prawl-Harrison, Bridget Prenatt, Bridget Ranney, Dana Reed, Jacqueline Rivera, Jazmin Rodriguez, Lolita Russell, Tricia Santiago, Bonnie Schrum, Maggie Schuler, Melissa Sewell, Kira Singh, Chrissy Spadaro, Gwendolyn Sterling, Cara Sweet, Terrie Trettenero, Jayna Trokey, Ethan Truitt, Chelsea Tutko, Jason Webb, Troyann Hobdy Wilkerson, Christine Wills, Zach Yanoff and Jacqueline Yoder. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 772 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sonya Adams, Deborah Ajagbe, Michael Alford, Catherine Ammon, Andrew Annello, Delmarcus Boddie, Corey Bowling, Anna Boyd, Farren Brenner, Kari Curotto, Adrienne Darden, Jennifer Doan, Keisha Esteph, Jesus Garcia, Deavera Hicks, Elizabeth Hipol, Angela Hodge, Jeremy Marcus, Roberto Mendiola, Tierra Moore, Michael Morgan, Blake Moya, Jacob Newell, Aaron Ozment, James Peluso, Ryan Poore, Stephanie Puente, Katherine Ramirez, Dalia Roldan-Corral, Erika Ruiz, Jody Russell, Paul Schleicher, Karen Schrager, Gina Seery, Charles Sherman, Sonya Smith, Kelly Stancil, Toki Swan, Matthew Szaro, Dennisha Toliver, Zivorad Trbojevic, Karen Vansaghi, Michael Visconti and John Wolf. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 770 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kaleigh Anderson-Brown, Brittany Andres-Cabuno, Hector Aracena, Lisa Baker, Rachel Banks, Joni Baptiste, Rashad Boone, Sherrise Brandenburg, Causaundra Brooks, Katie Bykowski, Christopher Camino, Aimee Campbell, Juan Chambers, Wilburn Chandler, Jolee Chioe, Brenda Davis, Robin Demore, Nicholas Donchess, Shannon Douglas, Danielle Dowling, Christy Dufrene, Amy Euler, Erica Fairfield, Jessica Fine, Kristen Foor, Cheryl Fry-Banales, Brett Geoffrey, Leobardo Gonzalez, Sasha Green, Virginia Herbert, Alessandro Hernandez, Magdalena Hernandez-Rangel, Angela Hick, Emily Holbrook, Randa Hunt, James Hurtt, Thomas Irwin, Jennifer Justice, Sreikompearck Keat, Gary Kitchen, Ryan Leger, Sumer Leger, Kathryn Lindsey, Jaimie Long, Ashley Lour, Jaime Magana, Amanda Mason, Karen Mayer, Luiz Nunes, Rachel Oquinn, Chelsea Perkins, Amanda Pleshakov, Genesis Ramos, Rita Reasy, Tavaris Rowry, Liliana Salinas, Jennifer Scott, Stephen Short, Betty Springer, Sara Stein, Elvin Stewart, Roman Trejo, Cathy West and Dominique Williams. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 768 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christian Aldana, Lorena Ambriz, Ashley Archuleta, Deanna Arnold Amos, Jamica Banks, Brittany Barnett, Denise Bellardi, Paula Brown, Jodie Cardenas, Ruby Carter, Pamela Coleman, Danilo Dacanay, Patrick Debose, Marcanthony Dejesus, Cynthia Delatorre, Rachel Diaz, Samantha Duffy, Diane Ferraro, Karen Foote, Stacey Frisco, Pepa Gocheva, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Jaz Gray, Kee'shaun Haymon, Janice Helm, Deanna Hernandez, Hakimah Jabbar, Roger Jacobsen, Kevin Jaklich, Ashley Johnson, Michael Karabinus, Linda Khamsone, Laurie Kubelka, Raquel Ledford, Todd Lewis, Christy Long, Karen Lorgus, Juan Carlos Losoya, Swanzetta Mazetta Andrews, Katrina Mccartney, Roberto Mendoza, Katie Miller, Charter Moore, Jason Neal, Deborah Owen, Latisha Revell, Chelsey Rittgers-Rake, Trecha Robinson, Gissel Rodriguez, Alexander Rogers, Joshua Sachs, Justine Schember, Dionne Simpson, Michelle Solomon, Andrew Sparks, Marcia Spayer, Sawanda Stephenson, Joel Studer, Maricarmen Torres, Joseph Tucker, Diane Vera, Neshaun Walker, Brittney Westbrook and Earthalene Williams. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 769 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION Additional Notice and Opt-In Period re 211 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Clarification,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,, Order on Sealed Motion, 228 Order by Darden Restaurants, Inc., Darden SW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 766 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kenneth Barnett, Clifford Boyd, Sandra Boykin, Kenzi Burnett, Christian Domingue-Harris, Lisa Fabiano, Kamberly George, Andre Griffin, Kellie Hickenbottom, Aimee James, Sharday Johnson, Michael Karabinus, Anna Manning, Kristin Mikula, Jessie Odonnell, Catherine Reusser and Bobbie Walker. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 764 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ashley Barnes, Andrew Jackson, Jared Jezierski, Katie Jezierski, Carl Johns, Joshua Johnson, Aaron Joray, Ryan Karson, Samantha Kelly, Sarai Killby, Brianne Kingsbury, Chris Kopp, Veronica Kopronica, Kim Macko, Monica Malone, Christina Marzullo-Gonzalez, Courtney Massey, Monica Massey, Elisa Mccabe, Shawndra Mccracken, William Mcduffy, Jennifer Mcneely, Richard Mettke, Dwala Mosley, Correy Murchison, Jennifer Murray, Katherine Myers, Moises Nava, Jamaal Neal, Katherine Negley, Alisa Payton, Jill Petrosky, Martin Pineda, Sandra Pizano, Christina Pointinger, Bianca Ray, Chelsea Reedy, Victoria Ridella, Kelly Rodkey, Shane Rodkey, Alejandro Roldan, Teresa Rose, Margaret Roth, Kelly Rowe, Nicole Russo, Roxanne Sanders, Sandra Linger Santos, Matthew Seaman, Sarah Sendy, Katie Shepherd, Colin Simon, Juliana Solano, Donna Spagnolo, Matt Spanne, Jenna Springer, Bryan Taylor, Jazmine Tero, Julie Thomas, Heather Trevaskis, Kevin Udenberg, Desiree Ufford, Andrei Vass, Linnea Walstead, Kimberly Weaver, Kristy Wenner, Justin Wetzel, Mckenzee Wilkins, Ashley Williams, Sean Winkelmann, Tonia Yates and Dennis Yazdanpanah. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 762 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): La Erika Albritton, Jennifer Alicea, Jennifer Anderson, Jordan Anderson, Christian Banquera, Catherine Barnes, Rudy Bartolome, Marweda Belcher, Kristin Billich, Brittany Boat, Makita Bond, Erika Boozer, Patricia Boutell, Robin Brown, Jamie Calhoun, Cathy Caprio, Adrian Carroll, Shahnaz Chaudhry, Sean Clark, Monica Clay, Amanda Coates, Susan Cochran, Katherine Conlon, Alexandra Crook, Kevin Crook, Aislinn Currie Clapp, Christopher Darosa, Dante Davis, Lourdes De Leon, Maya De Leon, Brian Deskus, Justin Dickerson, Linda Diehl, Nicholas Dimodugno, Anthony Doerrer, Sarah Dolphin, Jones Douglas II, Michelle Dunlap, John Durnin, Larry Ellis II, Linda Farris, Susan Fields, Michael Flores, Glenda Garcia, Nathaniel Gerald, Siea Glover, Shakia Gross, Melissa Hall, Sandra Hangsleben, Linda Harding, Jamie Hayes, Alison Heidler, Komteria Herndon, Judy Hines, Barbara Hood, Letitia Jackson, Veronica James, Jeffrey Knapp, Katie Oslica Holt, Tekeyla Pennington, Rachel Stevens, Shauna Tinker, Krystal Williams, Rebecca Wilson, Vanessa Windsor, Courtney Wolf, Rose Wolfson, Cara York, Michael Zack, Christina Zarate, Jose Zarate, Jerry Zeigler and Mario A Zuniga. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 760 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Briana Marie Serio, Frank Mulvena IV, Jennifer Murray, Misty Norman, Debra Nunez, Devin Ortega, Ondie Otto, Leila Parisi, Corinne Patti, Aimee Pellitteri, Anjanette Perez, Mark Pezzuto, Nicole Phillips, Mike Pierson, Maria Policastro, Leslie Poole, Troy Reed, Phillip Regas, Amanda Rex, Stephanie Ricardi, Meghan Richardson, Brittany Roberts, Harvey Robertson, Barby Rodriguez, Syndol Rodriguez, Corina Rosales, Gary Roznowski Jr, Jennika Russell, Daniel Schepers Jr, Katelyn Scherer, Joe Schuelke, Lori Schuna, Destine Scott, Latanya Session-Lovett, Michael Shaw, Wilson Sheffield, Shannon Shelley, Shauna Shepard, Sonya Shirley, Deanna Shissias, Carmeleda Simmons, Nolanda Smiley, Robert J Smith, Sheila Spangler, Mary Spicer, Barbara Steele, Tim Stillman, Isaias Suarez, Julie Thomas, Ruth Thompson, Archie Thompson III, Elisa Vance, Tyler Veit, Jessica Velasquez, Miguel Vera, Yelena Walden, Matthew Wallace, Nathalie Walsh, Amy Jo Warsham, Ryan Wells, Leslie Wilkins, Tommy Wilkins, Marla Williams and Phoenicia Williams. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 758 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kelly Foster, Fernanda Franco, Shavon Fulton, Jennifer Ganz, Kaitlyn Gephart, Susan Giermann, John F Ginthner III, Oscar Gonzalez, Sara Gonzalez, Marshe Goodman, Angela Gordon, Angela Grguric, Samantha Guerrero, Chris Gundlach, Emily Gustafson, Danielle Gyles, Carolyn Haithcock, Matthew Hartwiger, Tahri Hatcher, Richard Hawkins, Andrea Hemminger, Joni Hice, Sumer Hill, Rachel Hoffpauir, Tracy Hubieres, Diane Hunt, Andrew Hunter, Elizabeth Immerman, Ashley Johnson, Eric Johnson, Nancy Johnson, Jillisa Jones, Kateri Jones, Wouseline Joseph, Brittany Kale, Shawn Kamp, Kelsey Keagle, Michael Kimble, Michael Klein, Sara Knieriem, Tiffany Knight-Bowers, Tara Kusky, Maureen Leonard, Andres Lesmes Reyes, Jessica Lewis, Annmarie Limon, Shelli Liverpool, Lemuel Luckett, Douglas Magnusson, Ronda Mahone, Cheryl Mahugh, Katie Malachinski, Bethany Marcum, Queen Martin, Latasha Mcclure, Brad Mccormack, John Mcdonald, Meeka Mcgee, Angela Melton, Rosetta Miller-Dobson, Tsvetomir Mitev, Cara Mizansky, Tiffany Monday, Daniel Moore and Jonathan Morrison. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 755 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kimberly Aguirre, Terrecco Arline II, Debra Atfield, Stephanie Austin, Amanda Avitable, Ashley Barnes, Janice Bennett, Kayla Benson, Gregory Bethea, Kerry Birner, Jennifer Blake, Keith Blanc, Phil Bochman, Sharon Bochman, Aliya Bond, Donald Bowers, Mike Boyce, Jaime Boyer, Brittany Boykin, Thomas Brady, Toots Brewer, Jasmyn Brinklin, Bianca Brown, Marion Bruno, Ian Buckman, Kristin Buhlert, Ricardo Burgos, Chelsey Cagle, Courtney Caisse, Efrain Cardona, Brittany Champ, Nicole Chipps, Jehremi Clavareza, Ethan Cline, Constance Collins, Erin Cooper, Taranita Costales, Leandrea Craig, Julie Crawford, Heidi Critchfield-Shelgrove, Eric Cuevas, Zachary Cunningham, Bruce Custer II, Monika Denner, Victoria Dettman, Annie Devlin, Matthew Duke, Roberto Duran, Heather Dutton, Mfon Edohoukhwa, Deanna Ellison, Joseph Ennis, Ekarette Etuk, April Fellinger, Luke Felsentreger, Joseph Fenton, Jessica Fitzgerald, Joseph Swickard, Lauren Thompson, Chanel Thorpe, Gustavo Urquieta, Russell Vanderlois, Ricky Vong, Mary Wardell and Danielle Wunstell. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendan, 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 753 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joseph Amaradio, David Aveline, Christina Balke, Diane Beckley, Jason Berdik, Robin Bergens, Kerri Borstelmann, Heather Bourgoin, Mackenzie Bradley, Annmarie Cairns, Erica Canfield, Elaine Carr, James Chiaro, Erica Collins-Zamora, Lisa Coomer, Angela Crawford, Darin Creed, Alyse Deluca, Crystal Duarte-Allen, Ashleigh Dydo, Temia Eaton, Lori Eshelman, Justine Esquivel, Desiree Fitch, Jamie Fosdick, Breaunna Friels, Diana Fry, Amber Gardner, Ashley Guerra, Rebekah Gwynn, Margaret Harris, Kristina Heredia, Jesse Hernandez, Morgan Hilts, Laura Hinton, Nicole Jarvis, Britani Jaye, Carrie Johnson, Dustin Johnson, Paisley Johnson, Elizabeth Kirstein, David Kneeream, Jason Lacy, Shannon Lopez-Rosas, Trevor Manes, Eric Manuel, Arthur Melendez, Heather Meriedeth, Richelle Merrill, Shirley Morgan-Jordan, Robert Morton, Hanna Murrell, Jessica Neumann, Jennifer Paradise, Hector Prado, Francis Puglisi, Kelsey Quinnell, Holli Ragan, Julia Rascon, Becky Sawyers, Ken Schoendorf, Dyanne Schroeder, Sharen Simmons, Juliana Stevenson and Kevin Stone. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/9/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit AA, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit BB, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit CC, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit DD, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit EE, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit FF, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit GG, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit HH, # 17 Exhibit I, # 18 Exhibit II, # 19 Exhibit J, # 20 Exhibit JJ, # 21 Exhibit K, # 22 Exhibit KK, # 23 Exhibit L, # 24 Exhibit M, # 25 Exhibit N, # 26 Exhibit O, # 27 Exhibit P, # 28 Exhibit Q, # 29 Exhibit R, # 30 Exhibit S, # 31 Exhibit T, # 32 Exhibit U, # 33 Exhibit V, # 34 Exhibit W, # 35 Exhibit X, # 36 Exhibit Y, # 37 Exhibit Z)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and For Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Page Limit Motion Objections - Appeal)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 748 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Maria Garcia, Nicholas Hefling, Anthony Imburgia, Jesse Kadoun, Linda Marie Laurenzi-Lorenz, Jim Lewis, Kristin Lukasiak, Rachel Martin, Jennifer Martinez, Ryan McKenzie, Marshall Murdock, Iowa Pietrakiejew, Scott Powell, Michelle Quirk, Plezena Radford, Daniela Rocha, John P. Rosegay, Maria Ruiz, Christopher Sagan, Alicia Sage, Linda Ann Sanchez, Sara Sanchez, Choneteria Sanders, Ghazala Sanders, Cathy Sarosinski, Nina Sawhney, Brantley Sazera, Candace Schuetz, Diana Shields, Caitlyn Shoppell, Mike Sipich, Donnette Slattery, Ashlee Smith, Ryan Snodgrass, Toshia Snyder, Jessica Spoto, Jessica Statham, Renee Stephens, Samuel Stubbins, Diana Suarez, Collin Svereika, Brett Swinford, Jared Sykes, Randy Tarpley, Lucas Tate, Vanessa Tate, Antonio Tedeschi, Lynn Tedeschi-Burdack, Toni Therrell, Matthew Thomas, Donna Thompson, Keiko Tsuruda, Rafael Velarde, Reginald Walden, Roderick Walker, Sarah Wassil, Austin Welsch, Whitney White, Daniel Wilkens Jr, Donna Williamson, Bryan Wills, Walter Wilson and Shahnaz Zubair Ali. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 746 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachael Heaton, Chance Hendershot, Ian Higginson, Brittany Higson, Holly Hill, Pearlette Hodge, Alisa Hogan, Isis Holloway, Kyle Hughes, Angela Hunter, Kimberly Insana, David Israel, Kendra Jackson, Nichole Jackson-White, Christine Jean-Baptiste, Susan Jensen, Carrie Johnson, Sarafino Jones, Michael Judd, Brian Kaplan, Cassandra Koster, Anthony Laino, Luke Livigni, Elizabeth Lorentz, Nicholas Luechtefeld, Brenda Lynch, Marianne Lynch-Henne, Shelah Mahan, Jacqueline Martin, Susan Martin-Anderson, Deana Martinez, Jamie Matera-Klettke, Gina Mattioli, Shawn Mcardle, Joshua Mcdade, Kevin Mcquitty, Samantha Meaux, Ashley Miller, Laneisha Miller, Ashley Mills, Laura Muro, Craig Noll, Jenna Oconnell, Theresa Ogrady, Sharon Orszulak, Taylor Owens, Marilynn Paine, Karen Palmer, Przemyslaw Panfil, Joseph Perry, James Plaster, Patricia Porter, Deanna Postlewaite Vaughn, Kayla Proffer, Charmaine Purnell, Kelly Regulski, Aiden Reidy, Sharon Richards, Jason Rinard, Nicole Ritza, Christopher Robertson, Alex Rodriguez, Carissa Rodriguez, Camille Rogers and Malina Rome. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 744 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jennifer Adams, Afsar Ahmed, Kelly Amundson, Jenna Antilla, Kimberli Applewhaite, Benjamin Baecher, Cheryl Bailey, Mary Bakhsheshe, Diana Baney, Gay Barbiaux, Sylvia Batten, Patricia Bazemore, Kacie Beagen, Ashley Bellerive, Christopher Bellin, Anthony Berkitt, Steven Bigger, Kaitlyn Black, Patricia Bojorquez, Germaine Brown, Michael Brown, Robert Burger, Ciera Burton, Monique Cadeau, Samuel Chatam Jr, Daniel Clausnitzer, Christopher Conn, Aeriel Conner, Amelia Cook, Jessica Coskrey, Shawne Cyphert, Jolynn Darling, Robert Davis, Geraldine Dawson, Jd Defranco, Nichole Dickstein, Neka Doe, Austin Dunston, Nancy Equitz, Candice Ezell, Patricia Fiedler, Kristy Firn, Teresa Flippen-Fultz, Alicia Foltz, Rieko Fratus-Rosenthal, Brenda Freeman, Edward Freid, Jessica Frick, Jacquelynn Friend, Karen Fuller, Temesgen Gebrekidan, Amanda Gerlach, Matt Gianini, Juan Gomez, Stephen Graf, Digna Grant, Demarcus Graves, Desiree Gray, Sarah Gress, Laurie Haas, Nicole Hall, Beth Hamilton, Joshua Hamilton, Jaslyn Hanson and Scott Hayashi. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 738 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Victor Romero Ortega, Carla Reid, Jeanette Renteria, Taneka Reynolds, James Rice, Lauren Richards-Turner, Tashiba Ricketts, Dennis Rico, Brandis Riggins, Kayla Riley, Lindsey Riley, Michelle Riley, Cliff Rivers, Rosalie Rivers, Brian Roakes, Nadrika Robertson, Debbie Robinson, Brandon Roccomckeel, Jillian Rodgers, Pierre Rodriguez, Marcy Rogers, Tabatha Ross, Jeanne-Marie Roush-Mayo, Ione Rousseau, Miranda Rovou, Mark Rush, Veronica Rushton, Clayton Russell, Duwan Russell, Susan Russo, Shelby Sacco, Brandon Salm, Michael Salter, George San Nicolas III, Ross Sandlas, Brittaney Santillo, Siobhan Sattora, Scott Schlusler, Julie Schroeder, Chanel Secreto, Emily Seeley, Elena Segura, Barbara Seltenreich, Alyssa Serrano, Richard Settles, Kimberly Shapley, Jonathon Sharg, Barbara Shaw, Matthew Sheehan, Joshua Shenigo, Dean Sheperd, Alisha Shepherd, Alisha Shepherd, Dean Shepherd, Winston Shepherd, Russell Siary, Russell Siary, Martima Sims, Martima Sims, Tramine Sims, Tramine Sims, Michelle Singer, Michelle Singer, Victoria Skarbinski, Victoria Skarbinski, Brent Smith, Brent Smith, Callista Smith, Callista Smith, Deaunte Smith, Deaunte Smith and jorge rivera. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 741 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Snedden, Melanie Snyder, Aaron Solis, Perla Soriano, Melissa Soto, William Sowers, Grant Sparkes, Brooke Spotti, Justin Staker, Laura Stam, Michael Stamm, Steve Stampoulos, Michael Starace, Judy Starkey, Stephanie Stathis, Brittany Staub, Nick Stires, Jordan Strah, Jennifer Stupak, Stephanie Suggs, Michelle Sutton, Mandy Swagler, Lonnie Swift, Rodrigo Tasca, Megan Tate, Monica Tejeiro, Erika Testa, Jennifer Thibodeau, Jennifer Thomas, Ryan Thomas, Julie Thompson, Kadeidra Thompson, Lawrence Thompson, Melissa Thompson, Tracy Thornton, Michelle Tontlewicz, Tobey Torres, Christopher Tottser, Donielle Tourville-Lemm, Carrie Trefethen, Cindy Trotman, Wendy Truesdell, Jennifer Trujillo, Asa Ture, Jaimie Turner, Jennifer Turner, Melanie Turner, Drew Tyler, Justin Tyler, Tiffany Tyler, Shaka Tzul, Jose Valle, Ashley Van Leuven, Taylor Vaughan, Angela Vaughn, Jason Vaughn, Dahilil Vazquez, Adrian Vela, Ivon Vitela, Amanda Vokolek, Ken Vroman, Donna Walcott, Ryan Walker, Ashley Wall and Maranda Waller. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 739 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lawrence Abeyta, Veronica Andrews, Heather Anthony, Kristy Antoine, Joseph Appello, Jose Areguin, Cheryl Austin, Shelby Bakersmall, Angela Beavers, Jennifer Becerril-Albino, Catherine Bernal, Joseph Biddle, Cher Bland, Reegan Blunt, Rudy Boston, Megan Bottoms, Christina Bowley, Austin Bradford, Anita Bradley, Matthew Brooks, Barbara Brown, Kateri Buccigrossi, Jason Burghorn, Matthew Campbell, Joanna Camper, Angela Cannon, Tracy Carpenter, Keisha Carter, Donny Carter Jr, Leton Cheatham, Michael Delgado, Jared Fidler, Bryan Hudson, Timothy Roy and Reginald Walden. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 735 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christine Martin, Sarah Walters, Kate Wanke, Nicole Warren, Jennifer Watters, Amanda Weaver, Jessica Webster, Barry Welch, Carol Wells, Austin Welsch, Anthony Welsh, Kristianna Werner, Kevin West, Tara Whitaker, Adam White, Percy White, Amy Whitehouse, Ashli Whitley, Crystal Whitt, Brian Wilcken, Lyndsey Wilde, Delona Wiley III, Haley Willard, Amber Williams, Ginette Williams, Lynnette Williams, Sakaiya Williams, Toni Williams, Felecia Winchester, Lazarus Windham, Latora Wise, Crystal Wolfe, Daniel Wolfe, Gabby Wolosik, Tashayla Woodson, Holly Woolsey, Megan Wortman, Lisa Wynn, Joseph Wynne, Ashley Yachimski-Hnatyshak, Nathan Yardley, Lorrie Young, Nakita Young, Emily Yount, Jana Younts-Hinton, Natalie Yoviene, David Zallis, Tiffany Zaragoza, Ruth Zayas, Lawrence Zock, Derek Zumbrunnen and Jose Zuniga. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 733 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Emily Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Sheena Johnson, Ashley N. Jones, Ebonie Jones, Jonathan Jones, Kimberly Jones, Lorraine Jones, Maya Jones, Timothy Jones, Robert Jordan, Jr, Kristi Karkut, Joshua Karmecy, Veronica Kasper, Jordan Kaufman, Rachel Kelly, Hannah Kemmerer-Master, John Kerr, Dennis Kief, Michael Kilian, Bonnie Kilmer, Jessica Kite, Andrea Knight, Viviane Kobty, Elaine Koch, Melissa Koepke, Natalia Krajas, Aaron Krall, Gabrielle Krause, Kathleen Krewenka, Jamie Kuhn, Sohail Lakhani, Araceli Landeros, Orus Lane, Steven Lang, Steven Lang, Joann Lange, Cheryl Leclair, Cassandra Ledvina, Matthew Lemen, Luana Lemus, Robert Levesque, Tresa Lewis, Brianne Lilienthal, Shauna Linder-Noll, Orlan Lingad, Ebshonae Littleton, Josette Long, Lorell Lopez, Iris Love, Justin Love, Lindsay Lowe, Marja Lowery, Vicki Lowery, Jabari Luckett, Lacey Luker and Jessica Lutz. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 732 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Phillip Mulder, Gilbert Muro, Jessica Murray, Jacqueline Muse, Lindsey Muse, Rebecca Nedeau, Heather Nelson, Tara Nelson, Brigette Newby, Cleophas Newton, Diana Nichols, Ryan Nicolai, Jonathan Noa, Rachael Noa, Lauren Nunn, Timothy Nydegger, Ann Obryan, Kandace Odom, Austin Olsen, Janina Oneil-Wilson, Lisa Ordaz, Edith Oregon, Tristan Ortiz, Morayo Ositelu, Emily Otero, Judy Overstreet, Juliana Pace, Ryan Pacheco, Marilane Palacios, Christoper Parks, Jessica Parnello, Jessica Parrish, Kristi Patterson, Wyatt Pawlik, Marta Pedrabissi, Alice Pel, Lora Penn-Varga, Kristen Pennington, Brooke Perdue, Selena Pereda, Juan Perez Jr, Barbara Perry, Sarah Pettiford, Ryan Phillips, Brennen Pickett, Rhonda Pigg, Lakieu Pinnick, John Plummer, Andrea Pollack, Margaret Porter, Naomi Porter, Samuel Porter, Leonettza Powell, Steve Pruett, Rachon Pulliam, Mac Quartarone, Courtney Rachal, Mary Raffauf, Allison Rakay, Khadejah Rawlings, Herman Ray, Mirda Raymond, Jessica Reep and Darian Reese. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 728 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Meredith Hausele, Chrissy Hawkins, Yolanda Hayden, Jennifer Hayes, Nicole Hayes, Harmony Hedger, Christina Helfer, Donna Hellmann, Brandon Herbert, Emiliano Hernandez, Lee Hicks, Tonya Hicks, John Hicks, III, Samuel Higdon, Denisha Hill, Heather Hill, Michelle A. Hill, Celeste Hilliker, Emily Hinson, Dawn Hitt, Sara Hoch, Amanda Hodges, Brittnie Hollis, Lori Hong, Ebony Horn, Richard Horn, Andrew Hornibrook, Amanda Horrocks, Neathasha Houghton, Richard House, Charles Howard, Ruba Hsen, Cheryl Hudson, Charlotte Huelsman, Hector Huerta, Michael Hull, Keishandria Humphreys-Diakite, Denise Hupp, Jessica Hupp, Sara Hypes, Linda Ignatius, Brandon Ikan, Erik Ingle, Jazzmine Ingram, Tiffany Inman-Brummett, Rocky Jablonowski, Corrina Jackson, Gene Jackson, Janet Jackson, Marion Jager, Katrina James, Kevin James, Jammie Janis, Danielle Jemison, Brittney Jenkins, Laura Jenkins, Elizabeth Jerome, Andrew Johnson, Candace Johnson and Janet Johnson. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 729 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Robin Lyle, Bobby Lynch, Karen Macionski, Kim Madia, Kaitan Mahbubani, Dorothy Maher, Kathleen Maher, Ann Major, Jessica Malkin, Joanne Mangiamele, Charlene Marlow, David Marquez, Jami Marshall, Terry Martin, Juan Martin Del Campo, Carlos Martinez, Jonathan Martinez, Julie Martinez, Raylene Martinez, Pam Maslana, Brian Maxwell, Guendolyn May, Sean May, Serena Mcdermott, Celina Mchenry, Natalie Mckibben, Juliette Mckie, Cynthia Mcnelis, Keisha Mcsween, Daniel Mcvay, Luke Melillo, Lacey Melton, Victoria Mendoza, Daniel Meneses, Samuel Mentzer, Josh Mickley, Lula Middleton, Maria Mier, Joseph Mikuszewski, Alyse Milanowski-Howell, Caroline Millen, Aaron Miller, Jenna Miller, Steven Miller, Nathaniel Mills, Brian Mirth, Michelle Misinay, Goldie Mobley, Kalico Moffet, Christina Mongold, Mara Montague, Crystal Montanez, Nicolas Montemayor, Starlyn Montoya, Samantha Montuoro, Richard Moore, Keesha Moorer, Nancy Morales, Rebecca Morelos, Eduviges Moreno, Anna Morrice, Penny Moss, Lisa Mott and Jodi Mueller. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 725 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amanda Fry-Smith, Sonia Fuentes, Teresa Furlow, Johnnie Gabel, Andre Gage, Beatrice Galindo, Stephen Gannon, Dayshima Gantt, David Garcia, David Garcia, Ines Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Karla Garcia, Noe Garcia, Alejandro Garibay, Geralyn Garner, Christina Garrett, Janelle Gauss, Albert Gayotin, Jason Giamanco, Melissa Gillmore, Jason Gilman, Claire Gilmore, Bennie Gipson, Teresa Gipson, Jon Gist, Deborah Glosser, Frederick Goeppinger, Angel Golden, Carlos Gomez, Joseph Gonzalez, Christopher Gordon, Jason Gordon, Mary Ruth Gose, Jennifer Gowen, Kerri Grafton, Angela Grant, Shannon Graves, Brittany Green, Cynthia Green, Dana Greenwood, Paul Griego, David Griswold, Miguel Guevara, Jonnie Gummo, Tahirah Gurley, Juan Guzman, Candice Hagan, Czarina Hagedorn, Kelley Haigh, Wendy Hall, Christine Halloran, Kyron Hamblet, Ivy Hamilton, Ada Hamilton-Taylor, Madison Hanson, Kelly Hardy, Rose Hardy, Susee Harkins, Emma-Leigh Harrington, William Harris, Cassie Harris-Mohr and Gary Harrison. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 723 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Patrick Carroll, William Carson, Cynthia Carter, Lori Carter, Viviana Casalles, Adam Casas, Angelica Casas, Nancy Castano, Brandon Castillo, Pattie Cervantes, Eric Chacon, Kayla Chambers, Johnny Chan, Samantha Chan, Melody Chapman, Tarah Chapman, Paul Chartier, Carolyn Chavez, Leton Cheatham, Jeremy Chesser, Benjamin Childs, Vickie Chlystun, Marie Cilius, Lorrie Clark, Aidan Clemente, Anastasha Coachman, Marisol Cole, Blake Collier, Chris Comrie, Adia Conliffe, Derek Connolly, John Connor, Sharon Connor, Kimberly Cooper, Carly Cope, Daisy Correa, Megan Coscia, Michaela Courson, Vireen Couser, Robert Couturier, Brandon Cox, Denise Crain, Jennifer Crawford, Kimberly Cunnungham, Lindsay Dahl, Tammy Dailey, Lam Dang, Benjamin Daniel, Victoria Daniels, Tonya Dantzler, Sarah Daugherty, Christopher Davila, Christi Davis, Gloria Davis, Lincoln Davis, Tabatha Davis, Shernette Davis-Davelus, Cathy Lyn Deguzman, Nicholas Delgiudice, Andreina Desousa, Dawn Dias, Alicia Dill and Lauren Dillon. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 721 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alyssa Diorio-Daniel, Paul Dobbs, Denise Dohm, Ann Donelson, Daniel Donlick II, Alison Donovan, Rolena Dotson, Ashley Dove, Lindsay Dow, Shannon Downar, Nicole Drucker, Candra Dufek, Orlandriana Dumas, Susan Durant, Amy Dwyer, Kina Eager, Susan Eckhardt, Michrisha Eddins, Micia Eddins, Denise Edwards, Dolores Edwards, Jimmie Edwards, Sarah Ehlers-Hernandez, Eden Ellis, Jessica Enright, Brittney Ericksen, Sandra Erickson, John Ericson, Debra Escobar, Tina Espinoza, Johnny Esposito, Nina Evans, Tamara Evans, Haddy Faal, Linda Faith, Latricia Falconer, Emily Falls, Stephanie Falls, Christine Farmer, Kenniesha Farquharson, Nancy Fehr, Damaris Felix, Elyssa Fernandes, Gabriel Fernandez, Allison Ferrara, Stacie Fesler, Veronica Figueroa Velazquez, Paul Fiorello, Danielle Flager, David Flores, Juan Flores, Janet Flores-Anticona, Ryan Forbes, Joshua Forbis, Kaleigh Ford, Rachael Fors, Christian Foster, Heather Foster, Sherman Foster, Robert Fouke, Rachel Franco, Tina Frederick, Claudia Fredriks and Melissa Froelick. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 720 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Zailyn Acevedo, Kathryn Adair, Amanda Adams, Jeannine Albano, Cynthia Albro, Catherine Alexander, Ramses Ali, Sharelle Allen, Desirae Alvarez, Efa Amamouche, Erin An, Michael Anzalone, Michael Ray Arizmendi, Matthew Arnold, Justin Arzoian, Chrystal Atkins, James Averett, Miguel Bailey, Anthony Baker, Danielle Baker, Sarah Ball, Mallory Barr, Mollee Barr, Juana Barrera, Christopher Bawa, Cassandra Bayes, Cynthia Beck, Karissa Bell, Tia Bennett, Erica Benson, Jeffery Benton, Staci Berry, Blake Biller, Danielle Birchler, Jennifer Bogausch, Laura Bonham, Bionca Boyd, Zachary Brandt, Emilee Branning, Lionel Brewer, Jaclyn Briand, Danyl Broomfield, Kelley Brown, Terri Brown, Kristie Buchert, Raven Buck, Rick Buckner, Matt Bujanowski, Shelby Bunch, Teresa Bunker, Shaola Burch, Chadd Burnside, Kevin Bush, Sandy Butler, Shauntay Bynum, Jeff Byrd, Kelli Cabuno, Shaute Caldwell, Javier Callejas, Bernardo Camacho, Paul Cano, Victor Cantu and Veronica Carlan-Mcmahon. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Angela Tortorice (DE 558 & DE 559), Paul Jordan (DE 538 & DE 539), and Cindy Castillo (DE 554 & DE 555) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 227 Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation and Request for Scheduling and Discovery Conference. The undersigned Magistrate Judge conducted a Scheudling Conference on September 26, 2013, and the District Judge subsequently entered an Amended Scheduling Order (DE 420). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/18/2013. (kas) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 245 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order as Defendants subsequently filed an Amended Motion for Protective Order [DE 625]; denying as moot 304 Defendants' Motion to Compel as Defendants subsequently filed an Amended Motion to Compel [DE 626]; denying as moot the following motions to the extent not otherwise addressed by this Order: 250 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Withdrawal of Defendants' 30(b)(6) Objections; 608 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of ESI by Defendants and Related Relief; 623 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief; 626 Defendants' Amended Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production and to Answer Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories. If the parties believe any issues raised by these motions are not moot, after meeting and conferring in a good faith effort to resolve them, the parties may renew their motions with respect to these issues. Please see Order for additional details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/18/2013. (kas) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 715 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Anglea Edleman. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 713 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Bonnie Gadsby, Brandon Harris, Katrina Miller, Brandi Powell, Amber Robinson, Christopher Slade, Amattalla Sloan, Desmond Smith, Kaylie Smith, Barry Smoot Jr, Ryan Snodgrass, Teresa Sparks, Natika Spaulding, Renee Stephens, Enrique Tabares, Diana Tabarez, Amanda Tapper, Tatiana Terzich, Taylor Vaughan, Joseph Vidaurri, Nicole Vokes, Donna Walcott, Danielle Walker, Yolanda Walker, Cody Weeks, Lisa Wholean, Chris Williams, Philip Williams, Alice Wilson, Wilton Wynn and Kelsie Yax. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 711 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Osama Afifi, Lorraine Anneken, Matthew Anneken, Sean Barthelmes, Angella Beavers, David Benton, David Bienkowski, Adam Blackwell, Kathryn Blais, Vojislav Brasnovic, Brandon Briggs, Adam Broome, Branden Brown, Stephanie Brown, Sana Brown Jackson, Ebonie Bullard, Moises Champo, Jaclyn Chopelas, Latoya Clark, Orlando Cobos, Trisha Cosper, Leonora Costello, Crystal Courtney, Valerie Cousino, Kimberly Davis, Jeff De Dios, Tammy Del Santo, Seminar Dixon-Thompson, Erin K. Donnelly, Azeema Ervin, Nelson Esquivel, Katherine Fredlund, Amber Galloway, Meron Gashu, Diane Gonzalez, Kiana Gray, Kirstin Grazulis, Joel Halstead, Seth Hardy, Gary Harrison, Sherry Haywood, Sheila Hess, Jennifer Hooper, Jayne Hulec, Michael Jewett, Eldica John, Cerra Johnson, Rachel Johnson, Scott Johnson, Matthew Jones, Joseph Keeton, Donna Kennon, Linda Laurenzi-Lorenz, Cameron Lewis, Christopher Macgibbon, Monika Marcum, Rachel Martin, Jennifer Martinez, Jesus Martinez, Xavier Martinez Jr, Elizabeth Mateo, Kelly Mcgrath, Lacey Mclear, Alan Mendoza, Matthew Meppiel, Andrea Moe, Marshall Murdock, Ashley Murphy, Kimberly Nixon, Kyle Oshea, Kyle Ostapiej, Jacob Pacheco, Emily Park, Casey Pennington, Rebecca Pennington, Paschelle Perryman, Alyse Petti, Anita Phillips, Iwona Pietrakiejew, Leonettza Powell, Scott Powell, Jessica Pysz, Debbie Quarles, Anthony Quezada, Taylor Quigley, Plezena Radford, Michael Randolph, Leslie Rietveld, Augustine Rodero, John Rosegay, Justin Ross, Anita Safo, Michael Salter, Tonya Samudio, Brianna Sanchez, Paul Sanders, Stephen Scheele, Sharon Scott, Rachael Searle and Rachel Seay. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 709 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jamaar Blanchard, Elizabeth Bowyer, Jessica Britton, Erick Hodges, Dana Hutzel, Donna McAlister, David Rubio, Hannah Saffle and Katie Wilbur. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 707 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Allison, Kimberly Anderson, Steve Ayala, Danyl Broomfield, Ashley Brown, Jessica Brown, Patricia Brown, Kele Cancilla, William Dane, Patricia Davis, James Jones, Brandon King, Chris Lash, Karen Lorgus, John Martin, Kimberly Martin, Amber Miller, Jessica Miller, Katie Miller, Michael Miller, Jennifer Moore, Jessica Peterson, Adam Scott, Andrea Simmons, Michelle Smith, Robert Temples, Emily Thompson, Jose Vela, Michael Vice, Tamara Walker, Ashley Weaver, Jennifer Webb, Erica White and Tina White. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 705 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carmel Mendoza, Mitch Weedn, Diamond Williams, Melody Williams, Robert Wilson, Randi Wittman, Samantha Wolf, Andrew Wood, Teresa Woodward, Porscha Wright, Aimee Yamabe, Francisca Yebesi, Linda York, Shaney Young and Karen Zgunda. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 703 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shana Jones, Misael Juarez, Deangelo Kelly, Shaughn Kennedy, Melissa King, Carrey Knox, John Kusumi, Amber Lavail, Barbara Lewis, Jose Limon, Kathy Lister, Steven Macnulty, Clayton Martin, Elizabeth Martinez, Venus Mccary, Dot Mccombie, Shirley Mccoy-Melton, Alex Mcgrath, Laura Medina, Gloria Mervis, Ann Marie Middleton, Brandi Miller-Montgomery, Donna Mitteer, William Moffitt, Saren Moore, Dawn Morris, Lisa Mosconi, Doug Mueller, Jennifer Muir, Kevin Mullin, April Nelson, Brittany Nelson, Holly Nevala, Georgianna Nicolas, Idania Nomikos, Joann Nouri, Bobby Nutter, Stephanie Olson, Sharon Ouderkirk, Julie Palenscar, Shirley Pannucci, Laura Parks, Crystal Passmore, Benjamin Pedersen, Thanh Pham, Vachkianna Pierre, Athena Portwood, Katharine Quellette, Sergio Ramirez, Christine Rebmann, James Redmond, Gabrielle Reffuge, Richard Riddle, Garth Robillard, Tamara Robinson, Cristian Rodriguez, Natasha Rodriguez, Mirta Rosello, Nathan Russell, Marylou Sandefer, Tara Sargente, Alex Schultz, Christian Serafino, Roland Shanks, Alicia Silva, Jacob Snead, Jancarlos Soto, Lesly Soto, Dustin Stacy, Allison Stangel, Beverly Stapleton, Liz Steelman, Corinne Stein, Christopher Stewart, Helen Stewart, Sabrina Suaste, Bryson Taylor, Meghan Taylor, Shawn Taylor, Edward Tharp, Darius Todd, Jennifer Tonetti, Charlotte Tope, Kristen Tucker, Cindy Tumi, Judith Tyson-Miller, Lara Vanevery, Jessica Vlcek, Jeremy Wakefield, Caleb Washington, Aaron Watkins and Suzanna Watson. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 701 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lorinne Adrineda, Adefemi Akingbade, Kristen Alshanski, Kelsey Anderson, Cory Arleth, Stacey Armenta, Christopher Arnold, Nuria Barajas, Melissa Berry, Suzanne Bevins, Martin Bockhold, Jennifer Border, Sausha Boyd, Tiffany Boyko, Alexander Bradford, Cassandra Branch, Curtis Brimer, Jacob Brinchi, Jeffrey Brink, Andrea Burris, Amber Butch, Brittany Carver, Carina Cedrechi, Miranda Chrastil, Dominique Christmas, James Cisneros, Matt Cobb, Guadalupe Correa, Robert Crowther, Melissa Curd, Nicole Dallman, Ashley Dargan, Leslie Deleon, Ashlee Denson-Holmes, Joni Devries-Missmer, Vivian Drescher, James Dunbar, Joshua Dupuy, Jaron Eaton, Ashley Elmore, David Evans, Jacqueline Evans, Kelly Fagundes, Christina Fitzgerald, Randi Flora, Mary Floyd, Lesley Forneron, Alecia Foster, April Frazier, Brian Freitag, Mandie Frias, Alaina Fugo, Melissa Gainer, Jerusha Garcia, Leticia Garcia, David Gehret, Michael Geraci, William Gile, Jamill Gilliam, Franklin Glen, Cynthia Gonsalez, Heather Greenblatt, Staci Grenz, Katherine Grey, Hayley Grohar, Jason Gunn, Kristal Gurgone, Katherine Gutierrez, Mayra Gutierrez, Renee Hale, Rachel Hardy, Joseph Harrington, Tara Hartso, Hillary Hatch, Craig Herbst, Ashley Hodge, Sean Holmes, Danielle Hough, Emmanuel Howell, Bobbie Howle, Amy Huang, Rosemary Hunt, Padhraig Hutchison, Pamela Iahn, Amindi Imoh, Jason Inouye, Hakimah Jabbar, Jessica Jackson, Kevin Jaklich, Charles Jerome, Ranelle Jerome, Chassie Johanson-Laval, Alex Johnson, Andrea Johnson, Stephanie Johnson and Coleen Jones. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 699 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Eric Feinberg, Shantell Ferguson, Kim Ferrari, Andrew Floren, Pablo Flores, Shelden Flowers, Brandon Forte, Summer Francois, Toni Galeti, Lindsay Galusha, Jennifer Gamble, Maria Garcia, Tiffany Geiger, Chelsey Gisler, Maureen Goodell, Lalaenya Grace, Toni Graham, Leah Granwehr, Melissa Gray, Rocio Guerrero, David Guillory, Cory Gullatt, Zyteal Harmon, Brian Hartwell, Kristie Hawkins, Karen Hawley, Amanda Hayden, Amanda Henri, Sarah Hentges, Katelin Hess, Bryan Hill, Kimberly Hodges, Lauren Hopkins, Angela Horadam, Linda Hoskins, Tessio Howell, Jennifer Hulett, Gregory Jackson, Linex Jackson, Mohamed Jalloh, Quinci Jenkins, Kayla Johnson-Stubbs, Victoria Juillerat, Malissa Kane, Tiffany Kelemen, Cristina Kemp, Kathy Kessel, Deborah Key, Karen Kimmich, Joyce Klochaney, Virginia Knuth, Victoria LaCourse, Mary Langendorfer, Amanda Lastort, Alicia Lee, Erica Lee, Margaret Lewis, Jessica Lilley, Todd Lilley, Hilary Linderman, Juan Lopez, Connie Lungaro, Jaime Madewell, Tyrone Maloney, John Marszal, Jessica Martin, Leona Martin, Nima Mashhoon, Susan Matthews, Katherine Maul, Byron Mayo, Michael McClellan, Andrew McGowan, Colleen McHugh, Mary Jo McIntyre, Michelle McNew, Miriam Meyer, Casey Meyers, Ryan Minnix, Danielle Moeser, Denise Mohelnitzky, Jonathon Monroe, Jami Montgomery, Bruno Moore, Cindy Moore, Danny Morales, Pamela Mosbarger, Kaleemah Mott, Sarah Mungia, Angelica Munoz, Mandi Neal, Tabatha Newton, Quyen Nguyen, Meghan Nieznanski, Jack Oakes, Angela Oates, Maria Obugene, Elaine Ortez, Lisa Overholser and Van Overton. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 697 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lee Lukaszewski. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 695 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Margaret Bonilla, Nicole Bradbury-Nascimento, Donald Brandon, Julie Budke, Danielle Butler, Christina Carrano, Patricia Chan-Miller, Arianna Dorf, Derrick Dowling, Jacquelyn Esry, Kymberly Gast, Erika Goudeau, Cynthia Groves, Edward Hanania, Gary Jones, Guy Jones, Susan Kidd-Bodres, Benjamin Kill, Jacqueline Larson, Stephen Mackey, David Malek, Kym Marchell-Spurgin, Charles Mccarley, Brittney Montgomery, Scott Musser, Hannah Nicholas, Sierra Rank, Donielle Sandoval, Connie Sotomayor, Christina Stansberry, Judas Villanueva, Justin Walker, Amanda Watkins, Matthew S Williams and Katie Yohnke. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 693 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Denise Ashcraft, Jose Balandrano, Patrick Baxter Jr, Angela Blakney, Nicole Blanchard, Craig Bloomfield, Tammy Bonnell, Lisa Boulet, Isaac Brooks, Stacie Brooks, Kristina Brown, Brandi Brown-Houston, Lorissa Busico Neuroth, Alissa Calderon, Nicholas Calicchia, Rhory Carlson, Mikhail Chalov, Kimberly Conner, Kayla Cooner, Amanda Coplan, Kelly Cotton, Jonathan Crowley, Spencer Cuffman, Tamara Dallas, Crystal Deguire, Guy Elmine, Erik Flores-Alatorre, Anitra Freeman, Ladona Frink, Jeffery Gaines, Ashlee Garcia, Laura Gay, Crystal Gerber-Parker, Christian Gomez, Jasmine Gray, Amy Greene, Kelly Grennan, Kathy Hains, Dustin Henry, Steven Henry, Karah Hitchcock, Matthew Hofbauer, Anita Huber Scott, Kate R Hunter, Sharika Ja'londa Cherry, Brittany Jackson, Roger Jacobsen, Chris Johnson, Diane Kennedy, Donielle Maki, Tayler Marshall, Rachal Mercurio, Sauda Muhammad, Daniel Ness, Ciara Norris, Deborah Oakes, Alexandria Obrien, Nathaniel Parker, Zachary Payne, Ashley Picard-Wentz, Cody Porter, Kathleen Puwal, Andrea Rawson, Latricia Reid, Tracy Rink, Anna Rodisel, Bernardo Rosas, Athena Rowe, Niklas Sauer, Blair Savage, Michael Shimko, Islom Shoev, Stephanie Slater, Alisha Smith, Carmen Smith, Jennifer Smith, Natasha Smith, Tinica Smith, Carylyn Smith Miles, Bridgett Smith-Applin, Diana Soehngen, Joseph Stone, Lauren Swails, Steven Thompson, Diana Thruman, David Vanek, Lauren Walker-Akins, Patricia Wetzel, Alyson Wilk, Larry Williams, Kathleen Wolsic, Jon Wright and Ashley Zander-Mcdonell. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 691 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tia Sokol, Octavio Vigil, Jesus Vitocruz, Aaron Webb, Scott Wetzstein, Destiny Wheeler, Amy Yarger and Tara Yates. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 689 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amy Adams, Phil Agard, Sheerice Alston, Jennifer Amos, Ashley Archuleta, Erin Bachini, Celverjohn Baino, Anel Ballesteros, Martha Bareis, Kimberly Boboris, Adriana Borbon, Charles Austin Bradley, Aisha Bradley Mahdi, Kelle Brenneman, Sean Breum, Garett Brown, Tara Browning, Roxanne Bustamante, Cynthia Carelli, Paris Carr, Suzanne Casale, Mandy Caudill, Courtney Cunningham, Pamela Dehoyos, Markeita Dillard-Holley, Shayna Domingo, Sean Durbin, Amanda Edmands, Gautham Elango, Fernando Farfan, Christina Finan, Scott Fraley, Kenira Franklin, Glenda Gamble Ramirez, Natalie Garcia, Janessa Garrido, Jovonis Gore, John Graves III, Daryl Griffin, Alison Groves, Christopher Hall, Chris Harless, Jordan Hawkins, Oriel Henry, Blake Hill, Richard Hunter Jr, Surayya Ibrahim, Shannon Jackson, Brittney Jones, Joann Jones, Theresa Jones, Melody Karch-Zotovich, Tyler Kayton, Afzol Kazi, Alex Kelley, Suzanne Kerrigan, Ara Klyce-Curtis, Susan Kroswek-Gillette, Kelly Laluz, Ruth Lesse, Daniel Livingston, Norman Mackinnon, Desiree Marlett, Maureen Martz, Kevin Mccarthy, Cherice Mcclain, Kellie Mckissick, Andrew Mendez, Katherine Messier, Sara Michalski, Jorge Mujica, Patric Nelson, Jennifer Nichols, Lacie Norris, Crystal Omogrosso, Monica Oseguera, Katie Parvey, James Price, Janine Rapka, Jordan Rodriguez, Jacqueline Ross, Jessica Rossi, Peter Ruccius, Heather Sandfort, Brittany Scardino, Brandi Schaeffer, Melanie Shipp-Landry, Quansa Thompson, John Tiet, Patricia Toland, Joshua Torres, Norma Torres, Soleil Totchum, Gabriela Towns, Angela Tubbs, Joanna Velasco and Darryl Verhey. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 687 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rosanne Bialecki-Zakrewski, Megan D. Brown, Michael Sullivan, Linda Swanson, Michelle Thew, Shantel Thilman, Amy Thompson, Kara Thorn, Breanna Tomlinson, Kimberly Trueblood, Samantha Vahldick, Nadia Valladares, Tracey Vance, Benjamin Volen, Darryl Watson, Michael Wheeler, Juronda White, Kassandra Willey, Jennifer Wilson, Quinn Winsheimer, Charles Wolfe, Jaye Wright, Brittney Wright-Watson, Diana Young, Richard Zamarron, Patsy Zamudio and Nicole Zevgolis. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 685 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rebecca Johnson, Leslie Jones, Megan Jones, Caryl Jones-Duck, Jackie Kasztelan, Christine Kelly, James Kelly, Samantha Kiepprien, Troy Kirkpatrick, Dillon Krenz, Anna Kuc, Doreen Kudla, Justin Labruzzo, Catherine Lafferty, Jade Lambert, Sharon Langlois-Turner, Aaron Lappe, Sarah Latham, Bernadette Lester, Brandon Leyva, Julie Liberty, Melanie Lipman, Cortney Lukehart, Dawn Lyle, Kayla Makepeace, Joseph Manetta, Zachary Manor, Jenn Martin, Claudia Mayol, Teri McGreevy, Lucas McGuffin, Nate Mckenzie, Courteney Medina, Gena Mendez, Chris Merritt, Cheryl L. Miller, Marly Miller-Sherbutt, Debbie Mitchell, Priscilla Molina, Aleida Montes De Oca, Leonard Moody, Robert Morrison, Bryan Nails, Charlie Nguyen, Bridget Null, Brandon Ousley, Kayla Owens, Collyn Pankratz, Ashley Parker, Seaton Parker, Alexis Parsons, Virginia Paul, Steven Pointdexter, Candace Pomtree-Young, Jessica Presley, Mary Price, Anna Pulido, Amanda Ramon, Patty Ransom, Ciera Rash, Laurie Reese, Karri Repak, Ashley Rice, Robert Rodriguez, Henry Romero, Summer Rose-Burruss, Amy Ross, Michelle Rowe, Lori Ruiz, Radis Russeau, Apollo Russell, Alejandra Sanchez, Cajsa Savard, Breanna Sieloff, Michele Sivard, William Sizer III, Laura Slanaker, Timothy Smallwood, Elizabeth Smith, Judith Smith, Leslie Smith, William Smith, Armando Soto, Elaine Southerland, Barbara Spano, Armeda Spencer-Kuntz, Michele Stepter and Nicholas Story. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 683 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sean Ables, Stephanie Agius, Shanna Aldrich, Angela Alexander, Jared Allman, Theresa Anguiano, Darrell Archie, Alexandria Ard, Heriberto Arraut, Tiffany Arvest, Sonia Averett, Tayrone Avila, Brenda Aviles, Johnathon Balogh, Clara Batten, Brian Beemer, Shane Bell, Alicia Beltsios, Denise Bergmeier, Amy Bevis, Jenna Blaya, George Bolovis, Brittani Booker, Rachel Brewer, Childs Brian, Marcia Briscoe, Kristine Brown, Kevin Bunetic, Julie Burke, Melissa Burleson, Jeremy Burnett, Stacy Burnett, June Burrage, Kayleigh Bush, Mary Carter, Caitlin Casar, Brittany Casey, Lakeyva Catala, Freddy Challo, Christie Chatman, Dani Cleaves, Angela Coddington, Juan Cruz, Amy Dalton, Lawren Dampeer, Amanda Daoud, Tanya Delahoussaye, Kelly Denoon, David Diaz, Rachel Diaz, Jessica Dickerson, Beth Dockery, Debra Dvorcek, Amber Federschnieder, Lorraine Feltman, Jacqueline Ferguson, Patricia Figueroa, Linda Fitts, Ana Flores, Kendra Foster, Michael Friedman, Dina Gaines, Ryan Gallmann, Adrian Garcia, Elliot Garner, Dorothea Garrett, Stephanie Geidel, Rohnald Genot, Haeli Gerardy, Tiffany Gipson, Kelsey Glaser, Kimberly Gonzales, Marina Gonzales, Vanessa Gonzales, Sarah Goodin, Sarah Goodnough, Chelsea Gottleib, Tommy Grubaugh, Enjoli Hall, Michael Harper, Lori Harris, Janet Hart, Claudia Hennebry, Jose Holder, Tina Holguin, Shatavia Holmes, Rachael Huff-Ellison, Darrell Hunt, Cheryl Hunter, Bryan Hurdle, Jasmine Ingram, Khalil Issa and Katie Ivins. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 681 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ebony Lawrence, Jennifer Marshall, Christopher Martin, Nenada Maslovaric, Kayleigh Mast, Lisa Maue, Stephanie Mayne, Saralynne Mcgrogan, Holly Mcomber, Sandra Merritt, Jeffrey Miller, Lela Mitchell, Sheryl Morgan, Michele Mott, Jaime Murillo, Aeriale Myers, Kassandra Neisen, Christoph Niver, Meagan Osman, Eileen Otwell, Macy Paladino, Antionette Papucci, Katie Paquette, Makalah Percell, Ronald Perez, Judith Peterson, Twalla Phillips, Sara Ponemon, Karen Postula, James Pyle, Ryan Raitzyk, Gregory Reina, Amberlyn Reisenauer, Katherine Richardson, Richard Rivera, Teresa Rodriguez, Denise Roll, Adriana Rubio, Ryan Sant, Kelly Santen, Gail Santos, Nicholas Sardoni, Jocelyne Schneider, Lauren Schuler, Sylvia Seideman, Jacqueline Semeniuk, Heather Shermer, Kiel Shuey, Konstantino Simotas, Erica Smith, Renee Smith, Sarah L Smith, Shazli Smith, William Smith, Chad Stewart, Brandon Stumpf, Amanda Taft, Desiree Tesoriero, Cherita Thomas-Mcelveen, Donna Thorsey, Tiffany Webb, Amy Webster, Julie Wells, Jolanda Wesley, Angela White, Mallory Windham, Toni Yannarilli, Walter Young, Milen Zemiceal and Lilah Zohar. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 679 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carla Alexander, Justin Allred, Aurora Andrews, Shanera Andrews, Stephanie Armstrong, Blanchie Asberry, Jamaal Banks, Kim Barella, Dominic Barilla, Dahlia Bates, Doris Baxter, Justin Beukemann, Lindsay Boggs, Shaderick Boggs, Mark Bricker, Erica Bridges, Scott Budach, Jorge Calderon, Kayla Canfield-Stevenson, Michael Cardamone, Vincent Carranco, Natalie Casimir, Scott Catrone, Amy Cerulli, Alex Chen, Megan Contino, Shannon Couey, Beth Coultas, Mandy Curtis, Terrilyn Cwiok, Cassandra Dahman, Kelsea Dance, Jessica Davis, Seth Davis, Harmonie Davis-Brown, Kristi Debrincat, Brandi Derby, William Diggs IV, Lucia Dipasquale, Marley Donner, Bridget Downing, Bernard Eafrati, Sara Early, Aren Ehrhart, Julia Ek-Howard, Tiffany Evans, Robert Fortner, Robert Frantz, Ashlee Gagnon, Michael Galluzzo, Dustin Gann, Adam Garcia, Monique Garcia, Rebecca Garrett, Danielle Gerald, Stephen Gizzi, Jeramie Grattenthaler, Duane Gross, Scott Hand, Daphne Hanse, Wendy Haucke, Jessica Hawk, Phuong Hoang, Michelle Hoeft, John Hoeft II, Sierra Holmes, Warren Holmes, Alexander Hoyt, Gavin Huling, Ross Hurley, Angelica Ibarra, Michael Iwabuchi, Princess Johnson, Crystal Jones, Owen Joseph, Ebone Joyner, Korey Kelly, Jordan Kendrick, Alan Kerber, Breyshawn King, Danielle Knight, Patrick Landis, Edward Ledesma II, Amanda Lentz, Erin Leon, Arielle Levy, Bonnie Lillis, Heather Lobello, Quadrair Long, Emily Manning, Rebecca Mares and Ashlie Marler. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. Of Proposed Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 676 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Patrick Driscoll, Tiffany Garcia, Michael Goodwin, Stephanie Gray, Ashley Jones, Ronald Kubicki, Sarah Matthews, Briana Mcfadgen, Marina Mcgourty, Theresa Mcguire, Molly Mckinney, Amanda Moore, Alese Mueller, Keith R Murray, Charles Oconnor III, Thomas Pare, Victoria Patti, Norka Perdomo, Dina Perez, Tanya Pettite, Allison Pezzuto, Darby Poynter, Corri Priebe, Alejandra Puertas, Katherine Ramirez, Taran Ramtahal, Joelyne Rapos, Justin Rice, Brittany Robinson, Joshua Robinson, Devon Robson, Crystal Ruffino, Flora Russell, Brett Sanders, Lisa Santiago, John Schoenbeck, Brian Schwarz, Adam Showers, Ashley Sirmon, Anne Marie Sirois, Angela Sisson, Stephanie Skrant, Jan Slatton, Lakeisha Smith, John Smyers, Angela Studer-Mcdonald, Corey Sullivan, Erika Sykes, Antron Taylor, Charlotte Thompson, Tomislav Tomov, Lisa Turner, Sams Uddin, Kerri Unger-Gibson, Marcelo Vargas-Fernandez, Amber Walker, Bryce Wall, Malerie Walters, Chris Watford, Jennifer Welter, Christopher West, Brittney White, Hillarie Whitehorn, Nicole Williams, Kirsten Witsman, Beverly Workman and Tiffany Yerkes. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 674 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amy Adair, Elizabeth Adair, Antonia Adams, Jessica Adams, Maria Isabel Alcantara, Shanita Allen, Janett Amare, Jeffrey Angsman, Sara Angsman, Maureen Arbuthnot, Laura Atkinson, Heather Austin, Livy Bales, Bernadine Balko, Michael Barber, Stephen Barton, Pamela Battaglia, Lauren Baumbach, Lauren Benjamin, Jessica Berry, Tiffany Boyle, Ivan Bravo, Christina Brunck, Colby Bruton, Lance Bubash, Laura Cardello, Leesha Chaffin, Ly Chamberland, Autumn Chapoff, Kariim Chiles, Ashley Chudzik, Cynthia Cicero, Brenda Cimbaljevich, Angela Clark, Julianne Clopp, Brittany Collantes, Dana Conzo, Martin Cortez, Mika Crawford, Toni-Ann Darby, Elasia Dean, Caley Degroote, Jessica Depontbriand, Eddy Derosier, Chris Doerr, Kathryn Doty, Jayne Edwards, Tara Elnitski, Shonta Evans, Amanda Felker, Amy Fisher, Catina Fisher, William Flax, Leilani Foerster, Dena Fortner, Danielle Foster, Morgann Freeman, Megan Frye, Rebecca Frye, Monica Gallegos, Lorie Garza-Debaca, Arthur Gelly, Lauren George, Heather Giuliano, Nefertiti Gomaa, Allen Gooden Iv, Christina Grigsby, Brandon Gunsaules, Tamara Gwynn, Kassie Haberlog, Michelle Hagenbaugh, Victoria Holoka, Bethany Howard, Hannah Hurla, Jessica Jackson-Denman, Jill Jiovanazzo, Melissa Kerns, Andrea Kimball, Michelle Knievel, Nancy Knight, Kym Knoxson, Jill Kurpenski, Adrian Lara, Jennifer Lauer, John Leone, Ebony Lomax, Ngoua Lor, Nou Lor, Ashley Ludwick, Kimberly Mahony, Rhonda Makki, Lisa Martens, Ryan Matchey and Hunter Matlock. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 672 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Gayle Barron, Jasmine Houston, Jeremy Marcus, Wilfredo Rivera, Cassandra Robles, Jenna Rush, Kathleen Ruttan-Hyde, Sandra Santiago, Christine Sass, Tara Sassani, Alicia Scarborge, Kimberly Serros, Alyssa Shoemaker, Katie Shoemaker, Nikolas Slattery, Jacob Smith, Karen Smith, Aline Souza, Brianna Spanier, Thomas Sparks, Travis Stoner, Jennifer Strovilas, Phillip Stuart, Wendy Swanson, Mark Talbert, Deanna Towe, Aimee Tu, Jeff Varney, Monica Vergato, Bianca Villarini, John Wallace, Christy Walther, M Walther, April Watkins, Jerrod Williams and Samantha York. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 670 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joseph Banks, Jodie Beasley, Nisha Blackford, Bret Bonner, Curtis Borns, Erin Brett, Marchelle Brown, Stephanie Brown, Dakota Bryant, Emily Cain, Penny Cardiff, Stephen Carter, Jesse Chapnick, Cynthia Charriez, Douglas Cheung, Michael Choquette, Kira Copley, Myron Cowen, Elisha Cripe, Andrew Dahl, Jonathan Davis, Marcanthony Dejesus, Jennifer Doan, Ryan Domek-Hernandez, Erin Donnelly, Beverly Eskridge, Jose Felix, Patricia Fesperman, Matthew Fields, Allison Fisher-Smiley, Lorena Flores, Tina Foxx, Allison Garcia, Kelly Gause, Stephanie Giza, Amanda Gotshall, Nancy Grant, Karen Green, Kevin Gribble, Laura Habisreitinger, Laura Haire, Brittany Hall, Rebecca Hall, Ian Halseth, Bridget Hartman, Rhonda Hathaway, Nicole Havill, Kathleen Heishman, Heidi Hernandez, Mitchell Heurtelou, Christina Hoolahan, Donna Houston, Corey Howery, Shawn Hughes, Julia Hunter, Terry Hunter-Traice, Raymond Hyde, Perla Ibarra, Amanda Iglesias, Joseph Jackson, Aaron Jamison, Amanda Kelley, Carol Kumbier, Tanya Legg, Alycia Lewis, Jason Linder, Cassandra Locke, Elizabeth Logsdon, Jonathon Looney, Tony Lowe, Sylvarius Luke, Mimi Luna, Jennifer Mahn, Lauren Marz, Jodi Mashak, Leslie Mayberry, Jeynelle Mc Gann, Michael Mcdade, Nicole Mctiernan, Cheyenne Menking-Hoggatt, Nancy Middleton, Arnita Mitchell, Lamar Munze-Long, Katie Myron, Julie Nowell-Brazee, Zizika Odukwe, John Oliver, Leah Olsieski, Megan Pawlowski, Rita Pennington, Dawn Perkins, Kevin Pikkel, Shalini Randall, Jenna Reasons and Michael Reed. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 668 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Hall, Becca Lanahan, Kathleen Lasinski, Rebecca Martin, Isaac Porter, Brandon Rodriquez and Benjamin Smith. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 666 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Bianca Bogdan, Mary Bokenhagen, Christina Bowley, Angela Carnaggio, Kathleen Heishman, Sam Kearney, Gary Kitchen, Regis Morris, Adrienne Newton, Brenda Oden, Laquana Perry, Betty Pierce, Teairra Portis, Megan Rojas, Rebecca Spencer, Kelly Stancil, Toki Swan and Diane Vera. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 664 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Heather Hartless, Nicole Sommmers, Aarion Sorrells, Erica Starnes, Adam Swindell, Deborah Thompson, Joey Thompson, Philip Todt, Chadwick Tripp, Sade Vargas, Aaron Villegas, Paul Vonbernewitz, Taylor Weaver, Tiffany Williams, James Williams III, Anibal Zapata and Ericka Zaremba. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 662 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alexis Abushawareb, Christopher Aguirre, Andrea Alsawi, Tara Amaral, Pamela Anderson, Christina Andoloro, Tiffany Ard, David Aronstam, Erin Averill, Thomas Avila, Pamela Baeza, Carol Beauchamp-Randolph, Sharleisha Bolton, Joe Bonomo, Samantha Botnick, Jeffery Bozzelli, Laurel Brewer, Beth Broadnax, Angelia Brown, Jordan Bruns, Eliner Carrasquillo-Rivera, Jade Choyce, Steven Conrad, Timmyra Daniel, Elizabeth Davenport, Maria Dibartolo, Cassandra Dorantes, Blake Doud, Katherine Dueno, Stephanie Ellenberg, Jared Evaneski, Dianne Finke, Jessica Formica, Nicole Garitano, Katherine Gill-Nunes, Christian Graham, Sandra Han, Reinhold Heinrich, Jessica Herbert, Cheyenne Hill, Toni Jackson, Christine Jenkins, Desmond Johnson, Suter Johnson, Dennis Kelehar, Devin Kemp, Erica Kinkaid, Annie Klark, Daniel Klark, Caryl Kornek, Soraya Kranwinkel, Rebecca Kremer, Jane Kuhlman, Amy Kwasniewski, Eric Lamar, Aletha Laux, Elizabeth Lipsey, Abigail Lodes, Daphne Lowery, Kim Mahler, Jasmine Massingill, Darin Maund, Kyle Mccarthy, Crystal Mcclure, Laura Mcginty, Tara Mead, Michael Medina, Natalie Middleton, Mary Mosqueda, Clarissa Neil, Kelly Norton, Brian Pachin, Aaron Paradie, William Pass, Arthur Phelan, Amber Plummer, Samantha Pospisil, Tiayahakia Presley, Theresa Pressley, Maria Repetti, Kcee Richardson, Lindsey Robinson-Smith, Leticia Rodriguez, Justin Roman, Ronique Rose, Karessa Ruffu, Kristina Rutjes, Leaundra Singleton-Rudow, Melanie Smiley, Brandy Smith, Cynthia Smith and Kimberly Smith. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 660 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Irene Duncan, Lisa Johnson, Nicole Merrel, Danielle Mitchell, Victoria Mitchell, Danielle Monteleone, Kristine Moran, Adam Muehl, Megan Munoz, Scott Murdock, Ingrid Nesti-Baker, Cheryl Newton, Nicole Newton, Jennifer Nowak, Roberto Nunez, William Ogle, Rory Oxton, Ulato Page, Tiffany Patterson, Manuel Perez, Isaac Porter, Carmen Prather, Holly Prescott, Juliana Quiroz, Kathleen Reardon, Stephanie Rechtorovic, Vicky Reha, Shelby Ridner, Heather Rios, Julian Rodriguez Ortiz, Jill Rossi, Dee Sanchez, Dwight Saylor, Kathleen Schmidt, Stephanie Scholtes-Pederson, Samantha Schweihofer, Laura Scott, Kimberley Selert, Susan Sharples-Zito, Kyle Shipley, Shakiscia Short, Marlene Skinner, Ashley Slaughter, Jeffrey Smith, Latisha Spicer, Tristan Stone, Angela Strickland, Michael Sulik, Cherish Lakin Tate, Francisco Tello Torres, Lauren Theobald, Elisheva Throgmorton, Taniqua Tobias, Brianna Vinson-Allen, Alex Vonfeldt, Peter Vottis, Megan Wager, Alejandra Wang-Jinright, Halle Weber, Victoria Weems, Ashley Weimer, Jamie West, William White, Natalie Williams, Andre Wilson, Jennifer Worth and Evan Wright. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 658 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachel Adame - Avila, Lynn Adelson, Rita Aguilera, Yousef Al-Haymi, Ludivina Alaniz, Lorena Ambriz, Tiffany Amory, Kathleen Annis, Michael Arnold, Ashle Baker, Emily Baker, William Baltz, Denise Bellardi, Donnell Berry, Alicia Billings, Paul Bitts, Darci Blake, Devon Bourne, Carissa Bower, Dallas Bower, Devin Braud, Rachel Brewer-Slabaugh, Angela Bricks, Kimberly Brown, Mary Burke, Jamie Callison, Shawn Campbell, Travis Church, Lindsey Collins-Smith, Kristine Conyers, Matthew Corsaro, Kelly Coville, Toni Crain, Crystal Davis, Mwaurayeni Davis, Karen Delage, Sally Dunkin, Lisa Dyer, Barbara Earls, Yvonne Ehrhardt, Kali Engster, Barbara Espinosa, Danyell Fabre, Ryan Fell, Kathryn Finnegan, Mark Fontan, Elliot Fox, Katheryn Friesen, Justin Fulks, Midori Fuller, Katelyn Gadzia, Ephrem Gebrekidan, Ileah Glenn, Molly Godfrey, Michael Goodwin, Blane Gordon Jr, Joseph Grantham, Kristina Grigutis, Denelle Hale, Melinda Hammalian, Jamie Hans, Ron Harlan Lewallen, Kenneth Harvey Jr, Ronnie Hayford, Bruce Head Jr, Tonie Hernandez, Raquel Hindsman-Isabell, Travis Holland, Monique Jackson, Robin James, Jesse Jenkins, Ashleigh Joesten, Kaitlin Johnson, Jessica Kelley, Marci Kiczan, Jennifer Knightly, Nicole Kustkova, Brittney Kyle, Jessica Lafave, Kathleen Lasinski, Marsha Lay, Richard Le Blanc, Kierstan Leather-Rice, Thomas Legacy, Erica Lepak-Delong, David Lingle, Devin Lloyd, Heather Long, Victoria Lyell, Cassandra Mack, Natasha Malone, Lakrista-Shonte Marshall, Shaday Martin, Nancy Martin-Kindler and Christopher Mcneill. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference & Discovery Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2013 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-140 pages, Court Reporter: Jerald M. Meyers, 954-431-4757 / crjm@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 655 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Emily Archer-Miller, Jamaal Jordan, Christopher Mills, Jacqueline Schmidt, Daniel Weiss, Warren Wells, Diana West, Brittney Westbrook, Lauren Wethers, Aleshia White, Kedaga White, Chris Wideman, Jacob Wilson, Zachary Wilson, John Windley, Cynthia Wiskus, Tanya Woods, Tres Wright, Michelle Wyatt and Sasha Zwetzig. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 653 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kelly Musshafen, Salvador Navarroa, Kathy New, Jessica Nowack, Lavina Oltman, Haley Orthel, Jasmine Ortiz, Mollie Owen, Shae Owens, Andrew Ozbun, Jennifer Page, Samuel Page, Brenda Paniagua, Patricia Parrino, Amy Parsons-Gentile, Joseph Peeler, Vanessa Penalba, Danielle Perlin, Krista Perry, Marissa Peters, Tommie Peterson, Nada Petrovic, Joshua Pickett, Melody Plastow, Rebecca Pollard, Destiny Portillo, Alex Potale, Phillip Poulakis, Anne Prather, Barbara Prescott, Clare Prichard, Mistie Priddy, Valerie Provine, Jennifer Puckett, David Ramos, Thomas Rapp, Helen Ravelo, Michelle Reeder, Rebecca Reidlinger, Heather Revels, Shelley Reynolds, Samantha Rhoads, Melinda Riff, Brezy Rivas, Nakima Rivas, Jeanine Rivituso, Latoshia Robinson, Matthew Rodiek, Kimberly Rodriguez, Shannon Roe, Lindsey Rollins, Franklin Rosario, Avery Roundtree, Enrico Roybal, Irma Rubio-Laughary, Jody Russell, Kirsten Ryel-Cohen, Chameira Salcedo, Ryan Salinas, Dawn Sapp, Lauren Scarpiello, Karen Schrager, Kristin Schramel, Megan Schroeder, Kristine Sepe, Zahirah Sharif, Dana Shea, Megan Short-Lee, Jewel Sidberry, Karan Sluhocki, Elisa Smul, Rene Sotuyo, Jarrod Squires, Gina Steele, Patrick Stevens, Syrina Stradley, Stephanie Sutherland, Brandie Szymanski, Kellinah Thomas, Kinyonna Tilmon, Jorge Tiscareno, Kristin Todd, Kevin Tracy, Marty Tracy, Lauren Turnquist, Ross Tweedie, Suzanne Upchurch, Bryan Valdez, Lizeth Valencia, Amber Van Houten, Clayton Vanderwal, Corey Vandeweg, Anne Vandongen, Michael Visconti, Drew Vogel, Courtney Vonderohe-Wollam and Stephanie Vore. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 651 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Brady Floyd, Laura Fortune, Joel Fralick Jr, Stephanie Frame, Marlena Frazier, Diego Garcia, Kerri Garcia, Andrew Gardineer, Laura Garza, Alicia Gasparini, Abby George, William Georgen, Leobardo Gonzalez, Scott Green, Audrey Guinn, Susan Hanger, Delayna Harden, Laura Harper, Roxanne Harris, Kareem Harrison, Joanna Hartzog, Lauren Heberer, Nancy Herrera, Chadwick Hill, Gabrielle Hills, Seth Hite, Angela Hodge, Jackie Holland, Nicole Holmquist, Jessica Horton, Kaitlyn Hudd, Savannah Huffman, Jason Hutches, Leo Hutton, Leah Jai, Elizabeth Jewell, Quentin Jiles, Merary Jimenez, Crystal Jimerson, Reginald Johnson, Yvette Johnson, Devon Jones, Jeffery Jones, Lisa Kalish, Mark Keffer, Kim Kepner, Caitlin Kingsley, Candace Klein, Elizabeth Kotul, Joanne Lacrete, Merritt Lambert, Becca Lanahan, Hope Lattof, Shelby Lawrence, Leticia Leigh, Jiran Lindsay, Brittany Lokar, Brannon Luscombe, Cacia Lyon, Matthew Maddox, Kimberly Maddox-Smith, Chad Mallard, Jessica Mantegna, Mariah Manuel, Jeniffer Marcus, Alexander Marley, Alexander Marshall, Melissa Martinez, Omar Martinez, Zachary Mayfield, Cindy Mcclimans, Alex Mccutcheon, Rhea Mcgibbon, Elizabeth Mcinnish, Kelly Mckay, Robin Mckinstry, Christina Mcmaster, Mark Mcmurdie, Melissa Meider, Stephanie Meier, Alissa Mercado, Jared Milaskey, Robert J. Miller, Karmen Miller-Mackey, Ashley Milliner, Katherine Mills, Rosario Miranda, Desmond Mitchell, Rhula Mitcheltree, Nicole Mobley, Kahlie Mooney, Jill Moore, Regis Morris and Jamie Munger-Trost. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 649 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Stephen Adams, Tissy Adwell, Aaron Albert, Nicholas Allen, Kris Allred, Amanda Angerbrandt, Fariba Arabghani, Miriam Arriaga, John Ashley, Peter Augustyniak, Tiffany Bachand, Melissa Baggett, Michelle Bane, Valencia Bankston, Austin Barker, Melinda Barnhart, James Barnwell, Humberto Barroso Jr, Kaitlin Beasley, Robbyn Beck, Mariah Becker, Laura Benavides, Derek Berkheiser, Christopher Bertrand, Amber Bettes, Brandi Bilderback, Mindy Bloomfield, Jordan Bonner, Suzanne Borchek Edwards, Tami Boys, Roderick Bradley, Chelsea Braeseker, Erin Brager, Jason Briggs, Linda Brooks, Matt Browder, Chandra Brown, Justin Bryant, Aleisha Bullock, Eric Burnett, Jared Burns-Martin, Aubrie Bynum, Katrice Byrd, Jorge Caceres, Jamie Carioggia, Troy Carpenter, Kasheim Castillo, Christine Castro, Emily Celichowski, Briana Chute, Dwight Clark, Tamara Clark, Michelle Clarke, Danielle Clifton, Sarah Cochran, Anda Coggins, Anthony Colavita, Sonya Collins, Krista Colon, Jeremiah Conley, Nataly Conners, Meghan Cook, Jessica Cooley, Shannon Corder, Joel Covey, Chelsea Crain, Shirley Crane, Michael Crockett, Michaela Crooke, Charles Cruz, Matthew Cuffe, Diana Curry, Lashanda Dailey, Michael De-Santiago, Alessandra Dejesus, Rashyda Dejesus, Chistrian Delgado, Allison Deruyter, Kris Dewer, Wanda Dixon, Monica Drexel, Sean Dreyer, Kathryn Dunn, Janice Ellixson, Michael Emerson, Andres Enriquez, Gabriela Escalante, Nicole Esdaile, Candy Evans, Jennifer Evans, Sara Ezinne-Ramsey, Jakki Fargnoli, Schaela Fleming, Ben Flowers and Tarvaris Flowers. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 647 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Virginia Herbert, Karah Hitchcock, Cristian Lozano, Erik Mckee, Stephen Mckee, Samantha Mckinney-Mech, Cynthia Meister, Chad Antonio Michaels, Linda Miller, Evelyn Moore-Breedy, Roman Moreno, John Morosky II, Joshua Moton, Mary Mudd, Emily Myers, Frank Nelldell, Ashley Nelson, Kelsie Norcross, Brittany Nordick, Ciara Norris, Gabrielle Nuriddin, Letitia Oakley, Tatashi Oates, Melody Olinger, Lauren Otto, Holly Palmer, Carlos Paz, Jorge Peraza, Alicia Perez, Michele Peterson, Theodore Prassinos, Robin Prather, Annique Pratt, Ruth Rinne, Ashley Ritzert, Janine Robinson, Diana Rodriguez, Mandy Rolstad, Torie Sandland, Kimberly Semetis, George Sherman, Lisa Skinner, Miranda Slobecheski, Tiffany Smith, Charles Snyder, Jeffrey Snyder, Jessica Spaid, Lacey Stefenel, Kimberli Stilson, Shawn Styles, Stephanie Tate, Bianca Tesauro, Justin Truesell, Tracey Waddy, Liz Whitt-Rich, Cody Wilcox, Laurie Wiley, Tiara Williams, Wendie Willner, Brian Woods and Aida Xhomara. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 645 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Regina Ani, Nick Asprooth, Christina Atkins, Bryan Barrar, Cannie Belgrave, Christina Benedetti, Michelle Bieren, Nichole Bondy, Myra Boykins, Antwennette Brady, Erika Brenkus, Lauren Bridges, Michelle Broeker, Jonathan Buchtel, Ian Byerly, Roxana Callejas, Rick Carl, Sarah Chandler, Shawna Chavez, Jaquiela Chester, Natasha Christian, Amanda Clark, Alia Clay, Carole Comeaux, Eriesha Coney, Laura Cooper, Elizabeth Coqueran, Leandra Cordova-Long, Jennifer Cortina, Daphne Crawford, Elise Cruz, Melissa Dahud, Amber Dalton, Jennifer Davies, Bronson Dickerson, Anna Donelson-Nuby, Romulo Dos Santos, Tiffini Dowdell, Ashton Dunn, El Lana Edwards, Shannan Eifort, Sasha Elliot, Chelsea Engel, Stefanie Erschen, Katie Fahrenbruch, Hazel Figueroa, Marta Fish, Elizabeth Flora, Nicole Flowerdew, Rodney Foxworth-Hill, Kimberly Frech, Pete Frech, Marnie Frechette, Racquel Fritz, Stephanie Gentry, Tamara George, Amber Golembiewski, Marlon Gutierrez, Judy Haynes-Wadley, Alicia Henderson, Tosha Henderson, Aaron Henry, Alexandra Hernandez, Krizia Hernandez-Rodriguez, Joshua Hinckley, Vincent Huynh, Amanda Hyde, Rachel Jacobs-Kellenberger, Alanda Johnson, Shirhonda Jones, Maritza Juarez, Carmen Karasch, Eenyie Ken-Piaro, Aaron Kennedy, Josh Klink, Kimberlee Kracke, Kayla Kreklau, Penny Kreklau, Deborah Krupp, Nathan Kunst, Veronique Larue-Shelly, Lauren Laws, Charles Lee, Silvia Lemos, Juan Lerma, Sabrina Levin, Nikisha Limbachia, Louis Lopez, Joann Lusetich, Justine Luzzi, Larissa Macchesney-Carmon, Jillian Malbrough, Jennifer Marcus, Jennifer Marozas-Boyce and Julia Martinez. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 642 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/28/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Scheduling Conference and Discovery Motions held on 10/28/2013. Oral Argument heard from both sides. Order to follow. (Digital 10:01:47-12:10:32 recalled 12:30:23-13:21:40.) (at) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Conor Cowley. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 449. (ksa) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 640 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Huy Nguyen, Franklin Njogu, Kayla Norman, Alicia Ofelt, Lauri Paul, Gillian Peterson, Kristin Pett, Warren Phillips, Judith Pierce, Andrew Plotz, Danielle Rachal-Dormand, Zachary Repp, Herbert Rock, Jessica Rodriguez, Roxana Rojo-Cruz Gonzalez, Harrison Ross, Joshua Sachs, James Salisbury III, Daniel Santos, Daniela Saunders, Victoria Scheer-Mathers, Colin Schulte, Kari Seams, Kirk Searcy, Ashley Shaver, Thomas Snyder, Olga Solodkaya, Cassie Sweet, Brittany Sweetin-Hess, Jessa Taylor, Corie Tinnon, Kimberly Trepte, Eithen Valdes, Consuelo Valdez, Elizabeth Van Wormer, Joseph Vereen, Raveon Walker, Elizabeth Walters, Theresa Wehrman, Shannon Wieczorek, Christopher Wiley, Denise Williams, Kimberly Wright and Rachelle Young. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 638 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joel Adame, Steven Adams, Deborah Allen, Brittany Andres-Cabuno, Khrister-Nikka Aquino, Dawn Arkinson, Ricardo Azambuja, Holly Bachmeier, Chris Barber, Gibioola Barero Gaitan, Leslie Barton, Joyce Bassel, James Bellman, Stacie Berberich, Agnes Bilecki, Justin Bollman, Travis Breese, Connie Bryant, Ester Cancho, Jay Cantor, Michael Castillo, Tiara Chambers, Melissa Chevres, Brittany Christopher, Amy Clemmer, Jhante Coburn, Kaden Coil, Elizabeth Conn, Jenifer Cooey, Lisa Cooper, Kristina Crossen, Sara Cummings, Collin Cushing, Cassie Dahlquist, Kimberly Daniels, Jamie Davidson, Falonn Delacruz, Ryan Dexter, Kimberly Duncan, Christina Eaton, Cynthia Esmundo, Breanna Fields, Ricardo Fierro, Lenard Fisher, Christopher Fleegle, Eric Floyhar, Ashley Frey, Michelle Fridley, Donald Garhart, Laura Geter, Lauder Gonzalez, Megan Gregory, Alexander Hahn, Erica Hamm, Frances Hargadon, Cody Hoke, Jefferson Horwath, Amy Howard, Samantha Hoyos, Jeniffer Huitron, Lawson Hyles, Katie Iannuzzi, Jackie Jackson, Latasha Jamison, Reanna Jefferson, Natalie Johnell, Greg Joseph, Lori Kearnes, Blake Kimzey, Courtney Kline, Amanda Lamb-Senecal, Tamsie Lamoreaux, Jared Lane, Tori Lawther, Adam Leonard, Connor Levy, Darren Levy, Alice Lively, Shaun Long, Talia Love, Eric Lover II, Shante Lyerly, Cynthia Mallas, Marci Mallis, Jacqueline Maloney, Shelly Marquis, Susan Mayer, Zachery Meade, Nicol Mellville, Julius Merchant IV, Lydia Montgomery, Tammy Mooney, Dion Moore, Ryan Moore, Ashley Multon, Marcus Mundy, Barbara Muscarella and Gabrielle Myers. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 636 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kyle Adriance, Jennifer Bonesteel, Kaneisha Bragg, Kristy Brooks, Nancy Bryant, Lisa Bush, Sarah Busson-Engle, Nicole Cadena-Ruebenson, Victoria Carter, Olivia Castaneda, Stephanie Centeno, Rachael Cooper, Jasmine Crawford, Patricia Downing, Natalie Engle, Patricia Estey, Ana Estrada, Linda Everington, Christopher Iglehart, Tarik Jackson, Mohamad Jomaa, Tessa Kinser-Williams, Casey Kirkpatrick, Samantha Mckenzie, Adriana Medina, Donnel Mercer III, Robert Miller, Susan Navalle, Robin Noto, Michael Paluch, Linda Snyder, Amber Solberg, Jessica Taylor and Shani Varghese. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 634 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Macylane Becker, Kelly Fortel-Jaggie, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Jessica Thomas, Shatara Todd-Williamson, Kimberly Toyas, David Trollinger, Amanda Turowski, Severa Tuthill, Valentine Valdez, Heather Valvona, Karen Vannaman-Sorge, Claudia Velez, Natalia Velez, Sarah Vigliotti, Jezekiel Vitaliz, Elissa Walker, Essence Walker, Monique Washington, Jason Webb, Aaron Webster, Marvin Webster, Heather Whitaker, Joshua Whitaker, Britney White, Kimberley White, Nathandra White, Sheneisha White, Monique Wickenhagen, Gloria Williams, Elizabeth Wolfe, Michael Woods, Ashley Yancey-Carter, Sean Yost, Angela Zimmerman and Samuel Zozaya III. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 632 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Neysa Nerich, Starla Nevins, Sierra Niemann-Hoskins, Sarah Noel, William Norris, Jake Norwood, Britny Novacek, Luiz Nunes, Jhonnatan Ocampo, Kimberly Oldfield, Elizabeth Palazzolo, Michael Perkins, Danielle Pestka, Michael Pickett, Heather Pierce, Magen Pinette, Kendra Pittman, Clinton Plenert, Danielle Pomeroy, Nakieta Porter, Michca Provencio-Dailey, Krystle Putnam, Lisa Quenzler, Alexander Radusin, Michael Rand, Robert Randall, Andrew Ratliff, Brandi Reed, Jamie Reynolds, Shanna Rhoades, Bridget Rich, Calvin Richter, Jeremy Riley, Michelle Roche, Sade Rochester, Kimberly Rochette, Jennifer Rodriguez-Shoaf, Brandy Rogers, Tina Rosenberger, Sarah Rossey, Yasmine Ruffin, Grace Ruggiero-Burton, Michelle Dennielle Ruiz, Jeffrey Russell, Maryna Ryklina, Gino Saada, Nicole Sadowski-Shradnick, Ernesto Salazar, Connie Salimabadi, Elizabeth Sanborn, Stephanie Sanchez, Shaketa Sanders, Jennifer Sangrey, Cesar Santizo, Gabrielle Santora, Deborah Sauer, Karen Saunders, Kristi Scheible, Lacey Schneider, Michelle Schniepp, Frank Schoenfuss Jr, Gina Sciongay, Pamela Scott, Jeremy Scurlock, Jamie Seawright, Lydia Seekings, Jennifer Seevers, Jason Settlecowski, Alex Sforza, Yvonne Sheffield, Tiffany Shifflett, Matthew Shine, Christopher Shoaf, Alla Sibirtseva, Monica Sierra, Kevin Skinner, Melissa Small, Danielle Smallwood, Beverly Smith, Bonnie Smith, Dana Smith, Delores Smith, Leasha Smith, Curley Sneed, Debbie Sparks, Martin Spurlock, Jeffrey Stein, Sawanda Stephenson, Davaughn Stewert, Rebecca Strack, James Suer, Elizabeth Sweetman, Matthew Szaro, Kristen Tesoriero, Allen Thomas and Maria Thomas. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 628 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Michael Hogwood, Richard Holland, Ashley Holmes, Jason Horsley, Alicia Hubmaster, Elizabeth Hughes, Amanda Hutchinson, Thomas Irwin, Beatriz Izquierdo, Mary Jacobs, Jason Jarrell, Naomi Johnson, Stephen Jones, Therese Jones, Briana Jourgensen, Brandon Julien, Hanna Kahhat, Alex Kahn, Tammy Kapla, Megan Kendall, Erika King, Randy Kirk, Dorothy Kline, Valbona Kokoshi, Josh Kolarski, Ryan Kutzner, Adrian Lamb, Candice Lamb, Erin Lancaster, Benjamin Landes, Rachel Lashinsky, Felicia Lastra, Deborah Lauer, Sherry Laughlin, Angela Lauro, Katherine Lebard, Carl Lee, Dustin Lemasters, Stephanie Leonard, Benjamin Lerma, Carol Lewis, Darlene Limberis, Ebonie Linder-Johnson, Jaime Linney, Jimmie Little, Kathryn Lloyd, Mary Lomeli, Lorraine Loren, Deanna Lorenzo, Andrea Love-Sumbry, Brandy Lowery, Alisia Lowry-Engelhard, Ranada Lucas-Hankins, Anastasia Lucero-Appelt, Nikolas Lunsford, Holly Lykens, Joseph Lynch, Natalie Lynch, Clorista Lytle, Jackilyn Lytle-Biggs, Melissa Lytton, Kellie Macdonald-Evoy, Dianne Macmorris-Coffin, Desiree Malave, Ashley Malcomson, Anna Maldonado, Wilberto Maldonado, Ginger Marks, Samantha Marx, Nicole Massey, Nicholas Matheu, Genevieve Mattson, Cara Maxwell, Megan Mc Intosh, Alithia Mcdaniel, Christopher Mcintosh, Christine Mcintyre, Kelly Mcmahon, Carolyn Mcnabb, Anna Mekeel, Courtney Mierez, Tara Milano-Wickers, Annie Miller, Jill Miller, Jamal Mills, Santerio Mitchell, Darlene Montani, Damon Moore, Todd Moore, Lia Morell, Eneida Moreno, Gail Morris, Beverly Morton, Mary Moss and Lekendra Myles. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice 244 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Complete Written Responses to Their First Requests for Production and to Produce All Responsive Documents in Proper Form. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/25/2013. (kas) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice 243 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/25/2013. (kas) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 624 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): John Dell, Ann Marie Depierro-Olson, Lauren Devries, Adam Dimuzio, Brittany Dishman, Kristin Donnelly, Katie Dostal, Brianna Dotson, Matthew Douglas, Brittany Draper-Thorpe, Deborah Drescher, Beckie Dryer, Ashley Dull, Lara Dye, Tara Dymond, Kyera Edmondson, Matthew Edwards, Kristine Eisler, Patryce Ely, Susan Engel, Patricia Erdman, Michael Fagan, Olivia Farmer-Farris, Kelly Fasig, Jessica Feliciano, Karen Ferguson, Andrew Fisher, Josue Flanquin, Julie Flick, Erika Flores, Fabian Flores, Michelle Fontinell, Bethany Forsythe, Ryon Frank, Elke Froehlich, Jacob Fry, Miranda Fuentes, Robin Fuller, Zantavius Fuller, Tiara Gaither, Guillermo Galvan, Taylor Gammon, Danielle Garcia, Kennie Garcia, Kayla Gardner, Emily Gaudier, Lisa Gaume, Justin Gensimore, Brandy Gilbo, Ryan Gilley, Sasha Gipson, Cedric Gladney, Barbara Glenn, Crystal Goering, Adam Goodvin, Omar Goswami, Cameron Grant, Kellie Grant, Mary Gregg, Thomas Grigsby, Amanda Grisenti, Kandi Gross, Kelly Gross, Teri Gugliero, Timothy Gunnell, Samantha Gust, Kelly Guthrie, Daric Gutierrez, Chelsea Haines-Lebron, Lindsay Halko, Kara Hamilton-Jones, Autumn Hammer, Erica Hancock, Virginia Hanna, Courtney Harms, Tatiana Harper, Donshae Harris, Edmond Harrison III, David Hart, Desna Hart, Mark Hayden, Donna Hayes, Taylor Hayes, Alexis Haywood, Rachel Head, Erin Heaney-Adkins, Lee Hefter, Chad Heilemn, Henry Henson, Stacie Hentschel, David Hernandez, Jessica Hernandez, Jillian Hill, Tona Hill, Matthew Hislop, Lauren Hodge, Nicholas Hodson and Justin Hoffman. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's AMENDED Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production and to Answer Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 11/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lehet Decl., # 2 Affidavit Exhibits to Lehet Decl.)(Reed, Aaron) Modified relief and text on 10/28/2013 (yha). (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's AMENDED Motion for Protective Order in Connection with Plaintiffs' First SEt of Requests for Production, Second Set of Requests for Production, First Set of Interrogatories, and Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition Notice by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 11/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lehet Decl., # 2 Affidavit Exhibits to Lehet Decl., # 3 Affidavit McCarty Decl.)(Reed, Aaron) Modified relief and text on 10/28/2013 (yha). (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 621 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kimberly Abner, Heather Adair, Carlos Aguilar, Cordero Agwuh, Leonela Alberto, Shelly Alexander, Henderson Alleyne, Lauren Ames, Danika Andrews, Annie Aranda, Laura Ashley, Cami Asman, Peter Averill, Judith Avrilien, Brenda Babcock, Halley Badeaux, Jessica Baisa, Edward Ball, Kimberly Bamba, Gabrielle Bastion, Jesse Bastion, Larry Bates, Anne Battaglia, Dwayne Bayne, April Bean, Rebecca Behr, Evan Belote, Eddie Bennett, Kristina Berrig, Korinda Berry, Devaughn Best, Gerard Bingham II, Delmarcus Boddie, Tristessa Boggus, Danielle Bookter, Tara Bowers, Beth Bowser, Deanna Boyer, Seth Brahin, Anna Brandi-Hutton, April Brandin, Myrtle Brosious, Ashley Brown, Kalee Brown, Melani Brown, Roslynn Brown, Swannice Brown, William Bryant, Elmo Buchanan, Michelle Buhrandt, Jessica Bundy-Vangel, Crystal Burgess, Tiffany Burke, Philip Burnett, Marie Burns, Elizabeth Burrill, Ashley Butler, Brian Buzard, Sanja Calic, Lisa Campbell, Lisa Campbell, Nathan Campbell, Michael Campinell, Ericka Cannon, Joshua Carothers, Andres Carrion, Grant Casler, Terry Cave, Suzane Chaves, Robert Christensen, Nadia Christenson, Richard Clark, Kheshon Cochran, Victoria Cochrane, Gail Coker, Belinda Coleman, Shannon Coleman, Brooke Collins-Schnorr, Victoria Cortez, Viridiana Coss Yleon, Robert Cotter, Frances Couch, Brandon Cox, Jaleesa Cox, Jennifer Cox, William Croissant, Taylor Cronin, Julia Cruz, Winfred Curtis II, Robbie Cushing, Danilo Dacanay, Nicole Dascoli, Amy Davis, Jessica Davis, Jeremy Dayton, Robert Deaton, Kiersten Degraff and Luis Dejesus. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 619 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tracy Murray, Darryl Myers, Angela Myers, Elia Najera, Lyndsey Nelson, Michael Nelson, Kathryn Neville, Barbara Newhouse, Deborah Nunnally, Carissa Owens, Kathy Oxner, Aaron Padgett, Edwin Pangilinan, Susan Pensack-Skae, Chantelle Perez, Angela Perrone, Angela Peska-Blankenship, Sharon Petrick, Solyana Phillips, Ryan Pickett, Ryan Picone, Serina Pinon, Oscar Price, Christopher Pyawasit, Brandy Queen, Brittney Ramsey, Jennifer Raposo, Alisha Reams-Smallwood, Dexter Reaves, Stephanie Richards, Matthew Roberts, Ebonny Robinson, Kelly Robinson, Suwanant Roehrich, Mallory Rossi, Nicole Ruiz, Melissa Sabo, Vanessa Sanchez, Carolyn Schaeffer, Elizabeth Schlueter, Sandy Scruggs, Samantha Semenkow, Ariel Sequeira, Lori Shadduck, Philip Sheward, Ralana Shrader, Desiree Siebert, Donny Simpson, Roy Smith, Lauren Smith-Steffy, Robertta Soares, Denise Squires, David Steele, Melissa Steinke, James Stevenson, Casandra Story, Wesley Swartout, Amanda Sweed-Marionneaux, Victoria Tasker, Julie Taverna, William Thoma, Shavomeishia Thompson, Shelley Thompson, Amber Tippy, Brandon Todd, Geoffrey Travis, Christopher Trimble, Alexis Vanderberg, Michael Venters, James Walker III, Jennifer Walton, Jacqueline Watkins, Kelly Weiland, Chris Wells, Jessica Wells, Stacey Westfahl, Garth Whitaker, Sandra White, Latoya Whitfield, Amy Wilkins, Jennifer Willette, Shawn Willis, Carol Wilson, Angela Wilson, Angel Wimperis, Stephanie Wright, Valarie Williams, Ashley Newman-Warren, Michael Parker, Michael Johnson, Rachel Johnson, Patrick Jackson Sr and Trisha Anway. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 617 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Mark Gilbert, Shari Gilley, Pepa Gocheva, David Gonzalez, Christina Gorchos, Connie Gotway, Zach Grabot, Erin Greeley, Amanda Grennell-Thomas, Chelsea Griffith, Toby Grimm, Josie Grogg, Refugio Guevera, Howard Dewayne Gunn, Latoya Gwess-Coats, Samantha Hallberg-Whippo, Robin Hamilton, Jeffrey Hamilton, Lyndsie Harris, Kevin Harvey, Marsha Haughton, Sara Hayes, Brandon Haynes, Jon-Michael Helms, Roxanne Henderson, Derrick Henning, Deanna Hernandez, Shawn Hettesheimer, Dan Heyen, Lauren Hicks, James Hicks, John Hicks, Jennifer Holborn, Mark Holden, Jerry Hopper Jr, Lori Howard, Lamont Howard, Kara Howard, R Hubbell, Tosha Huffman, Kenneth Hurt, Michael A. James, Gina Jenkins, Abraham Jimenez, Patrick Johnson, Sandra Johnston, Rashawna Jones, Emily Joswiak, Evelyn Kallas, Austin Kasper, Sivan Katz, Iryna Kavalskaya, Sagan King, Samuel Kistner, Grace Knight, Amy Krugler, Ivonne Kruse, Kord Laughlin, Katharine Law, Ji Lee, Kerry Littreal, Karenann Lollis, Jaimie Long, Monica Lopez, Carol Love, Jena Luttrell, Kyle Mackay, Jeffrey Madsen, Steven Maffucci, Jennifer Malaga, Alex Malkin, Tasha Mallory, Whitney Mann, Melanie Martin, Kristi Martin, Larry Martin, Erica Martinez, Deirdre Max Varliere, Dayvea Mays, Ashly Mccants, Brittney Mcdowell Chance, Kirsten Mcelmurry, Brian Mclanahan, Kylie Mclane, Christen Mcnew, Holly Mcphail, Aneeta Merritt, Kenneth Miles, April Minette, Lindsey Mirmina, Cheryl Monette, Jeremy Montemayor, Bathundria Morris, Dekescia Moss, Katherine Mueller and Ramon Munoz. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 615 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Cassandra Addington, Anthony Aguilar, Deborah Ajagbe, Luis Alcocer, Jered Almeida, Mary Archuleta, Becky Arguello-Morales, Andrea Arvin, Cameron Ashe, Teresa Asher, Ashley Aughton, Rachel Axelrod, Diane Bailey, Angel Banda, Nadine Bannard, Roger Beahm III, William Beard, Colin Beauregard, Beth Beckett, Daytina Begay, Heather Bell, Curtis Bendler, Thomas Bias, Kristina Bird, Howard Bivens Jr, Jessica Blaszak, Ladank Boley, Amanda Borders, Jacqui Boswell, Brent Boyd, Jennifer Brabham, Anne Bradshaw, Kevin Breeding, Candice Brierley, Stacie Brodsky, Jody Brooks, Briana Bulinski, Rachel Burdette, Asheena Burke, Crystal-Lynn Byrd, Lena Byrd, Raul Cabral, Princess Caldwell-Warren, Erin Campbell, Geraldine Cancel, David Capone, Jenneffer Carrillo, Rebecca Cason, Alicia Caver, Beatrice Chavez, Melissa Chinnici, Jolee Chioe, Alexandria Chowdhury, Ashley Cicoria, Danielle Clarke, Hailey Cochran-Avila, Melonie Coley, Brian Colon, Pamela Conrey, Nickolas Contreras, Amber Cornell, Charles Crnkovic III, Karen Crouch, Ryan Cruice, Laura Dalpini, Brandi Danford, Lindsay Danoian, Racheal Davis, Angelo Davis, Alex Deatrick, Carly Demoss, Donna Dodge, Misty Dolla Laboy, Charles Douglas, Dastassia Dowdell-Bailey, Cahla Downs, Jesse Duke, Tanya Duren, Sandra Eaglin, Andrew Eickhof, Angela Eskew, Alejandro Esparza, Manolo Espinoza, Jeff Farmer, Jennifer Field, Sherri Finkbeiner, Nina Forst, Barry Fraley, Amanda Frische, Alexis Gant, Elisa Garcia, Michael Geiger, Rachel Gershon, Jason Ghan and Kelsy Gibbs. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 613 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Karen Olinger, Lenisha Oliver, Tonya Opalka, Kimberly Oravec, Brandon Orgill, Jennifer Ortega, Cynthia Otis, Jesse Otts, Sarah Ines Overeen, James Page, Leslie Palmer, Krischiann Paschal, Toni Pasion, Josh Passiotti, Christine Pawelak, Michael Pechacek, Jenniferlee Pelech, Jessica Penny, Regina Perez, Nicole Perrot, Briana Perry, Karen Phillips, Jamaine Pike, Amanda Pilkington, Stanley Pinkney, Jr., Mekesha Pittman, Phoebe Plummer-Bener, Jennifer Plunk-Turner, David Poe, Mycha Poling-Kolar, Christen Powell, Melissa Poynter, Heather Prince, Andrea Pun, Samantha Puruczky, Precious Putnam, Jennifer Quattrone, Rachel Ques, Adam Rafferty, Karen Rans, Marcie Ray, Samantha Ray-Matarosk-Komar, Kenneth Redelman, Pearl Reed, Trenda Renegar, Keelan Rich, Althea Rios, Juan Rivera, Angel Rivere-Diaz, Renee Roberts, Jamie Roman, Elizabeth Rosenberg-Marleot, Brandon Ross, Joe Rossi, Donalda Rowe, Justin Ruiz, Caleb Ryan, Sharika Ryan, Leon Sam, Lucero Sanchez, Randall Sansom, Lisa Schaefer, Kim Schnell, Dawn Schwartz, Steven Scofield, Brianne Scott, Martina Scott, Cheyenne Scott, Kassandra Seylar, Hilary Shaffer, Phyllis Shankle, Nicole Sharp, Teresa Sharp-Miller, Benjamin Sherman, Ravshan Shukurov, Borislava Shull, Joey Simmons, Danielle Simons, Michael Simonson, Shaila Sisler, Carole Slayter, Johnell Smalls, Beth Smith, Jaci Smith, Tasha Smith, Jaida Smith, Chrystle Snider-Fleck, Lakisha Snipes-Bowne, James Spears, Sean Spence, Ashley Stabile and Vanessa Stephens. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 611 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shane Kennedy, Sylvia Killie-Peters, Debbie Kimball, Brandi Kimmett, Mandi Kimsey, Desiree Kindley-Walczak, Crystal King, Sabrina King, Franklin Kirk, Jane Klungvedt, Cameron Knaebel, Jeffrey Kneipp, Christine Koehler, Jaime Korwin, Margaret Kramer, Brittany Kramer, Tracee Kranen, Michelle Krause, Thomas Kruth, Joseph Laboy, Megan Lane, John Larrahona, Denise Lavoie, Kenneth Lear, Christopher Lee, Debray Legrand, Michael Leslie, Jameson Lewis, Aleshia Lewis, Brandan Lewis, Jesse Lippi, Steven Livasy, Jose Lopez, III, Bihla Lopezhaya, Jason Lorenzen, Brandi Lorrey, Brandy Lott, Eddie Lovato, Floyd Lucas, Michael Luciani, Zachary Luhr, Andrea Luttrell-Hendricks, Tracy Lyle, Timothy Lynch, Rebecca Mallonee, Greg Maloney, Gillian Marchan, Jeremy Martin, Johnnie Martin, Rebecca Maston, Crystal Maxwell-Simmons, Cheba Mboma, Lisa McKenna, Charis McArthur-Barrins, Carren McCoy, Lakeidah McCurry, Lindsey McDowell, Amanda McFarland, Kelly McIntyre, Joshua McLain, Dan McNally, Teresa Medlen, Timothy Mendoza, Valika Memendez, Amanda Menzel, Kayla Messer, Richard Mick, Cheryl Miller, Melinda Miller, Florence Ann Millhouse, Micah Millis, Kelly Mirra, Sandra Mitchell, Pasha Mitchell, Chaustine Mokosak, Sonya Montcastle, Leah Moore-Agee, Tianne Morre, Amanda Morrison, Jacob Morrow, Nicholas Mueller, Lisa Muir, Stephanie Mullinux, Shannon Murphy, Cherish Murphy, Kateri Murray-Solberg, Colleen Murtagh, David Nathanson, Lucas Nelson, Reskey Neth, Christine Nguyen, Michelle Nguyen, Nancy Norman, Ryan Norris, Courtney Odonnell and Andrew Okabe. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 609 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Victoria Gatica, Jeremy Gaunt, Crystal Gay-Binnell, Brett Geoffrey, Liza George, Kelley Gerritsen, Matthew Gettinger, Anya Gill, Brad Gilmore, Sheila Givens, Chris Golden, Maryann Golubski, Rafael Gomez, Wendy Gordon, Kwmane Gorins, Oscar Granados, Sheila Graves, Carol Gray, Jessica Gray, Joshua Green, Ryan Gregg, Timothy Griffin, Almi Grishaj, Tamara Guillen, Stephanie Guillen, Nicholas Gullo, Andrew Gunia, Jason Gunnoe, Hugo Gutierrez, Vanessa Gutierrez, Maggie Guy, Tierra Gwaltney, Kayla Hass, Rachael Hagan, Michael Hamilton, Jeff Hamilton, Keith Hamilton, Leslie Harbin, Lauren Hatchcock, Tara Hawkins, Katherine Hayes, Mary A Hayes, Nathan Head, John Healey, Andrew Herendeen, Brittany Herman, Alessandro Hernandez, Francis Herrera, Jacinta Herrera, Melissa Hetrick, Deavera Hicks, Rebecca Hill, Robert Hilton, Elizabeth Hipol, Emily Holbrook, Grace Holmes, Rahnesha Holmes, Melissa Holmes, Brian Homer, Michael Howlett, Joseph Hroch, Janiece Hubbard, Raisa Hudak, Brian Humphrey, Johnston Hurd, Joseph Huskey, Brittany Husnander, Affiong Hyacinthe, Monique Iverson, Jasmine Jacks, Lesley Jackson, Kristen Jackson, Heidi Jackson, Brian Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Beverly Jacobson, Michael James, Brian Janz, Luc Jean-Philippe, Tracie Johnson, Jerry Johnson, James Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Derrick Jones, Linda Jones, Brandy Jones, Kristi Jones, Shonda Jones, Melinda Jordan, Seygbai Kai, Brian Kalar, Anna Karcher, Kimberly Keenan and Penelope Kellogg. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of ESI by Defendant's and for Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/8/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 606 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Peter Steszewski, Rhonda Stevens-Kerns, Shayne Storey, Janice Stretz, Karen Sybert, Adam Tarvin, Larissa Taylor, Candace Taylor, Jonathan Taylor, Daria Terrell, Kara Thomas, Jacob Thompson, Heidi Tiihonen, Temika Tinson, Skai Tower, Jena Townes, Sean Townsend, Kristin Trammell, Nghi Tran, Justine Traver, Migdalia Vaca-Torres, Guillermo Valencia, Rachel Valint, Veronica Vanlandingham, Roberto Vasquez, Adrian Vasquez, Jose Velazquez, Erika Vickers, Bambi Vigil, Virginia Villar Paredes, Amanda Viney, Julie Wall, Jody Wallene, Katherine Walsh, Brandy Warner, Deborah Watts, Maegan Webb, Chris Weister, Nequitta Wesley, Tracy West, Kenya Weston-Beale, Jessica Wheeler, Ann White, Anna Wiesenberg, Ishimaur Wilkes, Delaney Wilkinson, Conan Williams, Cassidy Williams, Devon Williams, Jade Wilson, Brett Windecker, Sascha Winter, Candace Wood, Cheryl Woods, Deneen Wortham, Sadot Yescas, Christine York, Ariel Yost, Cassie Young, Briana Young, Roel Zamora, Susan Zeitler and Malory Zertche. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 604 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kadie Rowe, Cienna Sajady, Collin Schlicht, Laura Schlobach-Pomponio, Melanie Sexton, Joshua Sexton, Tyler Shuman, Sally Stebbins, Rachel Steenbergen-Jones, Mary Takemura, Tim Tanner, Kyle Teevens, Heather Tolson, Christopher Toolis, Joseph Tucker, Nick Varesi, Jonathan Vavala, Elyse Wachendorf, Donna Wafford, Caleb Webb, Jaime Weidner, Michael Westcott, Nicole White and Mustafa Yasin. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 600 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Chris Clarner, Drisel Clatterbuck, Gregory Cohen, Colleen Colbert, Stephanie Cole, Ashley Cole, Ashley Cole, Ladonna Coley, Orathai Compton, Rachel Conti-Fiedler, Christina Conway, Dana Cook, Deborah Cooney, Darrie Cooper, Katrina Cooper, Hailey Cooper-Kislinger, Terianne Cox, Louise Cox, Martin Cox, Brennan Cox, Leigh Crawford, Chelsea Crespo-Primeau, Kasie Cripe, Ann Crouch, Shontalee Cruz, Jarel Culley, Jason Cumming, Terrell Curry, Marc Daigneault, Nicole Dardano, Adrienne Darden, Elana Davis, Ovida Davis, Martin De La Torre, Kimberly Degrandpre-Tweet, Eric Deleon, Kaitlin Delk, Cory Despain, Omayra Di Russo, Molly Dietz, Thomas Docter, Melissa Dolan, Casron Donnard, Cory Doucette, Melissa Dowgal, Jeffrey Downs, Melody Draeger, Robin Drake Wilson, Daphne Draughon, Tina Drobilek, Cassie Dube-Fostun, Trisha Duey, Kathryn Duffy, Alison Duggan, Jenny Duong, Whitney Duran, Steven Durso, Syble Edgett, Tracey Edmonds, Brendon Edwards, Brittany Edwards, Jaclyn Eichas-Ralbovsky, Molly Elliott, Anais Elliott, Toby Elliott, Jesse Ells, Victoria Elmer, Adrienne Englund, Anne Erdelen, Susana Esquivel, Citlally Esquivel, Julia Luz Estrada, Keenan Eudy, Osayuwame Eweka, Jason Farrell, Maria Fatemi-Wittenberger, Carmen Fernandez, Reinaldo Fernandez, Alison Finch, Amin Finch, Bryan Fishburne, Rory Fleck, Sabrina Ford, Alyssa Forde, Melanie Forster-Wood, Anne Fowler, Ronald Frates, Jennifer Fratto, Kimberly Fryling, Elizabeth Fuentes, James Gabenski, Jessie Gallet, Jessica Gamel, Kaylie Gannon, Priscyla Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Elsa Garcia and Jennifer Garcowski. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 601 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Dianna Allen, Sarah Amundsen, Rebekah Aungst, Erin Baker, Selamawit Baraki, Daniel Bazan, Laura Benoit, April Bensinger, Laura Berger, Debbie Berry, Katherine Boes-Chojnacki, Brittany Butler, Chadd Carr, Lisa Cash-Anderson, Keung Chan, Joseph Chojnacki, Brittany Christopherson, Stephanie Clemons, Loretta Coaty, Catherine Cosentino, Cherrie Cox, Monique Cross, Nicole Cruz, Carolina Cuellar, Erica Czerniejewski, Danielle Dagit, Caitlin Davis, Elizabeth Davis-Lench, Chelsea Deaver, Amanda Dennler, Kristi Desantis, Jessica Diaz, Teresa Dobson, Ashley Durham, Danielle Elkin, Cristina Fallen, Omar Feliciano, Steven Felton, Nadine Ferrin, Sam Francis, Roel Garza Jr, Allison Gill, Yamil Girald, Jaime Green, Tony Grisham, Cally Guyer, Ashley Harper-Rix, Mary E Higgs, Michelle Hill, Elizabeth Holl, April Howerton, Yotam Israeli, Donna Chamanne Jackson, Miguel Jimenez, Mario Juarez, Nickolas Kallas, Stephanie Kallner, Kelly King, Patti Larson-Rios, Alicia Love, Taissa Lytchenko, Kasha Malone, Melissa Mann, Heather Marr, Kassandra Martinez, April Matthews, Jasmine Mayes, William McDougall, Meighan Mcdonough, Jodi Mcmurtry, Jessica Meyer-Gilroy, Amanda Moore-Hall, Alma Morgan, Andrea Morris, Dekoven Myers Jr, Matthew Myhan, Justin Nakamura, Kylie Norwood, Kathryn Oberbroeckling, Patrick Okeeffe, Nina Ortore, Johnathan Padilla, Christopher Palmer, Brandon Peir, Beckie Pelton, Benjamin Perez, Christine Phillips-Wilson, Stephen Pierce, Megan Prestebak, Dalila Ramee, Amanda Ransford, Kevin Reeves, Jennifer Rischling, Julia Roberto and Lavonne Roberts. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 598 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tasha Butler, David Cabanas, Michelle Conoyer, Daniel Davis, Demetrius Dixon, Kimberly Engelman, Eric Fajardo, Kristie Falls, John Fincannon, Katie Fry, Brittney General, Elisha Gibson, Horacio Gonzalez, Margaret Katherine Heath, Evan Holmes, Kydriana Hunter, Barry Johnson, Tara Jones Remley, Rachel Karshner, Stephanie Knight, Lauren Lavine, Jordan Long, Alexander Marin, Che Mays, Ryan Neuendorff, Mitchell Niemi, Margaret Provenzano, Caleb Ritter, Stephanie Russell, Jennifer Scott, Craig Sherman, Shelley Short, Jennifer Siegel, Brock Snider, Jeffrey Tinsley, Jesse Wakefield, Farrel Zotto-Davis, Tanisha Hamlett, Chelsea Perkins, Tiffany Johnson, Matthew Williams, Elizabeth Keller, Paul Rodriguez, Benett Coker, Ashleigh Prather and Kevin Dignan. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 596 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachell Acevedo, Lindsay Adams, Mindy Aiken, Brandie Albert, Elke Alexander, Jennifer Allard, Taisha Allen, Laura Allen, Renae Anderson, Lauren Anderson, Michele Anderson, Darlene Antal, Leonard Aragon, Jessica Arceo, Gerardo Arguello, J Sacramento Arvizu, Angel Assi, Kalani Austin, Erin Austin, Carrie Baca-Gjevre, India Bailey, Jessica Baker, Amanda Ball, Adrian Banda, Lidia Banda, Joni Baptiste, Anthony Barker, Jonathan Barnes, Kimberly Barton, Maria Basilio, Randy Bates, Sarah Bauer, Carlos Bautista, Ann Bazemore, Kevin Beakes, Kelli Becki, Kayla Beckner Post, Evan Bekasi, Loren Belton, Rebecca Berry, Herbert Bethay, Carl Bienz, Timothy Billings, Michel Bishop, June Blackwell, Lynne Blankenship, Dya Bono, Donna Bonomi, Andrea Bosley, Timothy Boston, Jeffery Bowen, Angela Boyd, Calvin Boyd, Anna Boyd, Jullian Breyley, Justin Bridges, Danielle Briscoe, Petersen Brody, Maurice Brooks, Paula Brown, Joantae Brown, Keenan Browne, Greg Bryant, Blair Brzana, Susan Bulova, Erick Burrel, Sandra Bush, Lauren Bush-Simmons, Katie Bykowski, Nora Cacho, Tanisha Cain, Brian Calhoun, Crystal Calvert-Bienz, Terry Cameron, Lamorvielle Campbell, Candice Canalda, Freddie Cannon Jr, Amanda Caputo, Phyliss Carbone, Chad Carnes, Saira Carpenter, Charles Carrocetto, Amy Carson, James Casey, Tia Ceesay, Derek Chambers, Christina Chancey, Wilburn Chandler, Mikaela Chandler, Isaiah Chavan, Daniel Chavez, Sarah Cheers, Randy Cheng, Jasmine Christian, Heather Cladas-Wyatt and 96. Karminque Clark. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 594 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Stiles, Betty Stratton Cuddeford, Angela Stults, Joshua Swanson, Stephen Sweet, Alicia Swinton, Antoine Taliaferro, Ariana Taylor, Kenna Teiberis, Ariel Tester-Starke, Tah-Nee Thompson, Nicole Thompson, James Thompson, Laurie Tintle, Cristal Torres, Anthony Tran, Megan Trevino, Ricardo Turbay, Deborah Turner, Pamela Vangyija, Glenn Vazquez, Vanessa Vega, Rafael Ventura, Gertrude Villaverde, Anissa Walker, Valerie Walker, Kadiann Walker, Tiffany Wallace, Jennifer Warner, Jeffery Weber, Jennifer Weister, Steve Welch, Talisha Wesley, Eva Whorley, Tyronda Wilkerson, Amy Williams, Jeremiah Willies, Tara Wilson, Nanci Wilt, Maria Wolfe, Mistilynn Woolsey, Thomas Wooten, Herman Wrenn, Mary Yarborough and Brandelyn Zuber. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 592 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amanda Newman, Peter Nguyen, Anna Nguyenvo, Asmar Nixon, Kellie Noble-Anys, Mikala Norgaard, Lindsey Norris, Jonathan Oberbeck, Cynthia Oconnell, Sam Oechslin, Jillian Ortiz, Karen Osullivan, Eunice Padilla, Jessica Palmer, Rebbeca Palmer, Jessica Paul, Rachael Peck, Josh Pendley, Roxanne Perez, Bonnie Phifer, Christopher Phillips, Lacie Pidgeon, Cherryl Pierce, Eileen Pierson, Wendy Pippin, Courtney Poe, Kristen Poe, Miguel Ponguta, Taylor Porter, Linda Porter, Kimberly Powell, Jill Predragovich-Stromeyer, Adam Prenatt, Erica Price, Krista Pronge, Fernanda Pulliam, Nicole Puntini, Megan Raile, Cristina Ramos, Eric Ramsey, Jaclyn Randolph, Mary Rapp, Lindsay Rash, Amanda Rempe, Monica Rhoades, Rebecca Rhodes-Weinreich, Nikki Ricci, John Rice, Whitney Rice, Trena Riggs, Laura Rivera, Julia Rivers, Domenica Rodriguez, Sean Rowser, Melissa Roy, Whitney Rozzano, Sharon Rud, Susan Runnels, Jessica Rusk, Kristin Russell, Melanie Russell, Angela Russell, Brisa Sainz Rodriguez, Geanita Saley, Jeana Santos, Krystal Sauve, Lacey Schichi, Mona Schmersal Wirebaugh, Eric Schmidt, Gary Schneider, Jennifer Schroader, Scott Schwartz, Keli Scott, Amanda Seibert, Jennie Shaffer Friedel, Randall Sharp, Deanna Shelton, Jacob Shepard, Allison Siglock, Dale Silver, Amber Simmers, Rochelle Simpson, Sarah Skie, James Smith, Georgette Smith, Tyrone Smith, Shawn Smith, Sarina Stacho, Sable Stallworth, Craig Stephan, Bradly Stephens, Amanda Stevens, Crystal Stewart and Garrett Stewart. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 590 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kimberly Foster-Chatman, Jena Fox, Joseph Frimpong, Seth Gallagher, Carlos Garcia, Maria Garin, Tiffany Gillette, Noland Gipe, Anthony Gomez, Joelle Gonzales, Keith Grace, Edward Hajek, Shawna Hansberry, Nicholas Hansen, Theresa Helseth, Tammera Henderson, Angela Hick, Kenneth Hicks, Mark Hill, Toy Himes, Sheila Hodge, Leshawna Howard, Twila Howard, Dacey Hughes, Rodney Hughley, James Hultberg, Tina Hulvey-Kendall, Richard Hunter, Nicholos Hurlock, Sheree Ingelido-Key, Desmond Ishola, Brandy Jacoby, Valerie Jacyno, Shannon Jennings, Courtney Jensen, Rachael Jeter, Alden Johnson, Joey Johnson, Pamela Jolly, Melissa Jones, Heather Junkins-Bartol, James Kaiser, Keena Kang, Danica Kelley, Robert Kerns, Kaleb Keter, Amanda Kirby, Jamie Kirk, Levi Kohavi, Audrey Lamb, Alex Latorre, Cameron Leach, Ileen Leau, Melissa Leverknight, Lakeysha Levert, Deborah Levi, Anthony Lewis, Jeffrey Liskey, Jay Lofland, Donald Long, Jacqueline Loonsfoot, Jejorne Lowe, Steven Lowrance, Amy Luitze, Katie Maggio, Jenifer Maher, Tiffani Markey, Wendy Masur, Patricia Matos, Shamica Mcallister, Lindsey Mccrady, Samuel Mcfarlane, Jessica Mcghee, Stephanie Mcintosh, Andrew Mcintyre, Alma Janie Mcwhirter, Kristina Meiners, Melody Miller, Yailen Miranda, Kelly Mohr, Nicole Montanaro, Emmett Moore, Maria Morgan, Jamie Morgan Csezak, Tasha Moseley, Ariel Mosley, Giveus Mudau, Shane Muller, Ashley Mullins, Samuel Murray, Brittanie Myers and William Neely. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 588 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Angel Abrahamson, Courtney Achimon, Louis Adam, Jennifer Agro, William Aichholz, Robin Akers, Kazi Akhter, Jerad Akin, Sennie Allen, Waikiki Alston, Rachelle Arnold, Kathryne Bailey, Rachel Bailey, Ammber Bancroft, Kristin Bane Huntley, Christie Banyas, Heather Barber, Christopher Baroulette, Nichole Batts Benson, Kristine Beattie, Laine Benthall, Jacob Beuchert, Elton Binkley, Jody Blake, Krista Bordeaux-Graham Payton, Paul Boren, Lauren Bourgeois, Sheri Bradshaw, Kim Brechler, Chris Browning, Brenda Buentello, Angela Burciaga-Rogers, Brooke Burden-Joyce, Anissa Burgess, Shavonne Burks, Brandon Burleson, Alyssa Burney, Elizabeth Burnfield, Deborah Burnham, Edward Burnside, Kelly Burr, Karissa Byrd, Jessica Callahan, Heather Campbell, Cameron Carletti, Pollyanna Carrico, Rodrigo Cesar, Jamie Chambliss, Candace Chapman, Carlos Chatman, Steve Chuchvara, Aubrey Chynoweth Evans, Lauren Ciccarella, Sean Ciccione, Shaletha Clair, Craig Clark, David Clay, Vanessa Cobb, Nicholas Cocchetto, Jessica Cohen, Courtney Coleman, Tabitha Conner, Lyndon Copeland, Tiffany Cordova, Sean Craven, Bart Croker, Brandon Cuffe, Craig Curry II, Isis Dailey Pounds, David Dausch, Eric Davis, Alyssa Deandrade, Brock Deland, Isha Desbin, Lori Desmarteau, Velentino Diaz, Emily Dibb, Pamela Duncan, Kazi Duza, Evelyn Ellefsen, Cathy Elliott, Arnuld Encinia, Stacy Ennis, Jakob Enzminger, Miyoko Esco, Amy Euler, Alyssa Evans, Zachary Evans, Julita Everly Moorman, Ashley Falco, Dustin Farberg, Aimee Feagin, Olga Feige, Holly Felmlee, Tabbatha Felton, Sean Fitzsimons, Allison Flippin and Tracy Fonville. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 586 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Hadassah Smuda, Emily Snyder, Cameron Snyder-Mitchell, Katie Suggs, Holly Sullivan, Allen Taylor, Joseph Urbina, Arlab Veracruz, Diana Villegas, Malissa Walker, William Walker, Carolyn Washington, Michael Weber, Kimberly Wehrenberg, Keith Weller, Bryan Williams, Terri Wright, Erin Zimmer, Dominique Williams, London Miller and Ryan Wright. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 584 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Matthew Allgood, Michael Angelo Jr, Ashley Archuleta, Jessica Atristain, Breana Baker, Deanna Beddingfield, Tara Binetti, Michael Bloom, Justine Booker, Farren Brenner, Stacey Brin, Kevin Burks, Heather Cain, Gregory Callaway, Michael Carter, Terra Christ, Sierra Claybaker, Hailey Cochran, Dominique Crumidy, Bruce Custer, Laura Elaine Dabney, Chad D'aigle, Sarah Daniel, Debora Dasilva, Elizabeth Daubenmire, Kathryn Davies, Heather Davies, Christopher Decker, Christina Delaney, Michael Delgado, William Diggs, Samantha Duffy, Spencer Ely, Daniel Epstein, Demian Finkle, Jacinda Fleming, Gina Flores, Stephanie Freedman, Stacey Garland, Whitney Gast, Jonathan Guarracino, Rabije Hajdini, Nykeara Hakeem, Katherine Haley, Cole Hancock, Christine Hayden, Petra Hernandez, Erin Hobson Jessup, Tara Hoffmaster, Michelle Holden, Brittany Jordan, Kolandria Joyner, William Kloppe, Carla Kurczewski, Sulema Limon, Monica Lindsay, Kathryn Lindsey, Olanrewaju Litan, Amanda Loconsole, Brittany Lynch, Michael Marciante, Christina Maretich, Diana Marquez, Amber Mcbride, Melodie Mccracken, Kristina Mcmichael, Brooke Miller, Alyxandria Montoya, Tabitha Moreno, Yashika Morris, Julia Mosley, Jeffrey Nicholson, Lauren Ogrosky, Janina O'neil, Stefanie Osborn, Henry Oviedo, Anthony Palombo, James Peluso, Leticia Penha, Jordan Pickens, Roshonda Poole, Shekenya Power, Maygin Rittinger, Kyle Rodewald, Megan Rojas, Tavaris Rowry, Dorothy Sanders, Deena Schwoeppe, Jason Scott, Briana Sementilli, Patrick Shamy, Elizabeth Shaw, Dennis Shockley, Walter Simmons, Amanda Small and Phillip Smith. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 10/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 582 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tiana Hawkins, Matthew Heck, Kathleen Hlinka, Ceana Hoburn, Kelly Hoit, Pamela Holland-Knowles, Jamie Hoy, Nicholas Humphrey, Aretha Huskey, Nicholas Jacinto, Aaron Jackson, Mandi Jackson, Lisa Jarvis, Kevin Jones, Shawn Jones, Ashley Kares, Brianna Kehoe Chandler, Brenda Kelehar, Russell Kemp, Nicholas Kirby, Victoria Klauer, Adam Klorer, Alla Kovalenko, Barbara Lance, Lisa Lanning, Jeffrey Latimore, Sophia Lawson, Melinda Leach, Nathan Leazer, Allen Lee, Barett Lee, Brianna Lennert-Morales, Meilin Leong, Ana Leos, Katie Licharowicz-Taylor, Michael Lipka, Michelle Liposky, Shelby Lloyd, Ashley Loree, Shawnda Lucas, Destiny Lutz, Troy Maertz, Jennifer Maes, Miranda Malbrough, Stephanie Malbrough-Parisi, Jennifer Maples, Anthony Margo, Kendra Marshall, Pamela Martin, Chanda Martin, Robert Mattscheck, Megan Mbadugha, Shanice Mcclendon, Rapheal Mccoy, Aaron Mccracken, Sherry Mccune, Samantha Mendlen, Christen Miles, Katherine Miller, Samantha Minarcik, Jasmine Mitchell, Christina Mitchell, Joy Monroe, Roberta Moore, Whitney Moore, Andrea Morales, Jaclyn Morehead, Hendrix Moss, Marie-Claire Muhimpundu, Natthanicha Napier-Chimphanao, Jessica Negron, Zoe Newland, Jennifer Noel, Lindsey Noyes, Omotayo Olowolayemo, Kendra Omark, Charles Onwuegbusi, Deborah Orlandi, Lauren Oswalt, Renee Owens, Jason Paquette, Brittany Parbs, Charlene Perez, Lydia Pinaire, Ronald Pittman, Abbigale Porter, Jamilah Presley, Lori Prince, Krista Proffit, Michelle Quarles, Jennifer Ramirez and Shae Reid. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 10/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 580 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachel Allison, Francisco Anguiano, Deanna Arnold Amos, Bertha Arroyo, Aida Askarynasab, Lindsay Audin, Jacklyn Bajc, Holly Baker, Rosemary Banos, Jeffery Bartlett, Crystal Becker, Josh Belbot, Christie Blair, Jessica Blais, Christine Blier Charleson, Jamie Boinski, Britni Bolden, Shavontia Bolden, Jennifer Bononno, Chris Borger, Randall Bracewell, Adrienne Braudis, Joseph Brooks, Kathryn Brown, Shuron Brown, Carmen Burkhead, Paula Burns, Carmon Burton, Jason Bussiere, Stephanie Calhoun, Desiree Carr, Robert Carter, Alejandra Casillas, Nakia Celistan, Diane Chapman, Angela Childress, Jenna Cizmar, Caprisa Clowney, Joshua Clowney, Danielle Condon, Kathy Conner, Sarah Cook, Shelley Cottrill, Sarah Cowart, Robert Cowels, Pansy Cress, Jessica Croft, Andre Cunningham, Crystal Curto, Danyell Dagostino, Michael D'amico, Annamarie Deloyd-Corfey, Brittany Deplitch, Courtney Desmarais, Meghan Devlin, Daniel Diliberto, Janice Dillard, Thomas Dilley, Aaron Dixon, Shelby Dolan, Ashley Downing, Cheryl Drangstveit, Denise Eadie, Cortets Edwards, Laurie Egglezos, Cassandra Egler Ridge, Tiffany Enbody, Jarrod Estabrooks, Wendy Evans, Wendi Fernandez-Solomon, Martin Fishkind, Morgan Forbes, Wendy Fore-Bowman, Taylor Formico, Tabitha Fox, Lori Gallman, Ashley Gamble, Exor Garcia, Aislinn Gibson, Jessica Gibson, Jana Gibson, Jacob Gill, Tonia Gilmore, Zack Goldrick, Nicole Gomes, Alec Gonzalez, Marin Grover, Ashley Guest, Carolyn Guth-Hudspeth, Renee Hackett, Eric Halprin, Erica Hanks, Kimberly Hardiman, Brett Harmeling, Michael Harris, Antione Harris and Autumn Hart. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 578 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Stephen Rice, Jason Rich, Meagan Richard, Thomas Richardson, Robin Riel-Hayward, Michael Rini, Sylvia Ritter, Lucia Roberts, Dena Roberts, Melissa Roe, Nicole Rozier, Sean Rudge, Victoria Rugen, Ronald Russeau, Kristina Saeger, Erica Sams, Joshua Sawaya, Lindsey Schultz, Andrea Schyljuk, Denise Scraggs, Travis Shane, Charles Shepardson, Nataliya Shkinder, Ashley Shumpert, John Simpson, Kira Singh, Stephanie Smith, Rastafari Smith, Miranda Smith, Heather Smith, Joshua Snyder, Meghan Sorrentino, Susan Southern, Kayla Speakman, Adam Steglich, Chris Suarez, Adele Takesky-Fogle, Summer Tate, Nathaniel Taylor, Julianne Taylor, Lisa Teece, Dan Thompson, Teresa Timmerman, Matthew Tomasone, Maxi Torrey, April Trevino, Samantha Tucker, Samantha Turman-Baker, Saturn Turner-Moriarty, Ashley Uhlman, Kimberly Vail, Kevin Vanry, Britney Vela, Mike Ventrello, Marisa Villescas, Sarah Waltz, Nicholas Waltz, Lisa Wang, Sky Webb, Kristen Wellman, Christopher Whitney, Megan Williams, Marla Williams, Darin Williams, Seth Williams, Melinda Wilson, Stromi Winters, Melissa Wood, Sherri Wyatt-Welch, Arthur Yanez, Darcy Yliniemi, Julianne Zuniga and Kristin Frisby. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 576 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sara Landy, John Lane, Brittany Lebo, Doenika Lilienthal, Yolanda Lopez, Teresa Lund, Jamia Madden, Debra Mancini, Gary Marble, Anita Marguriet, Fransisco Marquez, Caroline Marra, Brian Martin, Collyn Mashek, Danielle Matthews, Brianne Mcadam, Robert Mcbride, Charee Mccain, Alissa Merchie, Kelly Mesaros, Allan Meza, Delvin Miller, Kristi Miller-Pencille, Aaron Mills, Michael Molina, Joseph Molina, Jameka Monroe, Crystal Montgomery, Jalyn Moore, Dolly Mott, Megan Moyer, Catherine Murphy, Derrick Myers, Jaclyn Natale, Spencer Nelson, Justin Newark, Racheall Newman, Kamesha Newton, Kristen Nunnally, Jessica O Hern, Lindsey Oevermeyer, Lindsay Okenka, Araceli Olivas, Nathan Olsen, Sarah Olson, Miranda Olson, Jennifer Osborne, Jodi Osborne, Vanessa Osorio, Alyssa Palmer, Sarah Parke-Haidle, Pamela Parra, Anastasia Pena, Travis Pencille, Maria Perez, Jorge Perez, Shallece Peters, Cindy Pierce, Lisa Pierce, Brittney Ping, Rachida Porter, Nicole Potucek, Dante Raines, Tammy Reynolds, Tajoun Richardson, Matthew Richerson, Morgan Roach, Desiree Rosa, Jason Rosenthal, Whitney Ruffin, David Salinas, July Sanchez-Sadowski, Ladarrius Sanders, Scott Sanders, Nicole Sargent, Jason Scheffer, Michael Schoiber, Stephanie Schumann, Leeann Seger-Steele, Lindsey Semonski, John Servey, Trinity Sharpe, Casey Shelton, William Shrader, Kasandra Simon, Ryan Sked, Shawnice Smith, Deborah Solen, John Soto, Crystal Spear, Jack Stanton, Jenna Steen, Theresa Stewart, Shelby Strickland, Sandra Tatum-Durso, Lakitha Thomas and Jasmin Torres. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 573 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lanston Fennell, Danielle Gartley-San Miguel, Adam Shields, Donnis Moore, Sara Emerling, Ashley Mason, Tracy Williams, Gail Davis, Linda Williams, Michael Williams, Gina Roberts, Danielle Morgan, Jennifer Martin, Kimberly Johnson, Michael Jones, Brandi Rogers, William White, Tiffany Jones, Kimberly Anderson, Tammy Greer, Michael Hill, Michael Parker, Melissa Allen, Jasmine Clark, Jennifer Kuhn, Jeremy Cook, Crystal Carter, Courtney Craft, Brandon Davis, Jennifer Gonzalez, Danielle Walker, Jennifer Edwards, Bethany Gray, Jessica Hall, Stephanie Roberts, Jamie Ross, Jessica Morgan, Jake Richmond, Eric Sorensen, Rebecca Smith, Jessica Smith, Rebecca Phillips, Michael Myers, Ryan Miller, Christopher Scott, Erin Smith, Valerie Jones, Jessica Jones, Jennifer Jones, Amy Harris, Amy Wilson, Shana Smith, Shannon Smith, Amanda Thompson, Jeff Turner, Michelle Smith, Jessica Collins, Heather Silva, Jennifer Poe, Lisa Myers, Samantha Johnson, Sarah Tucker, Russell Smith, Jessica Smith, Ashley Smith, Brandon Davis, Michelle Smith, Danielle Walker, Amanda Smith, Benjamin Smith, Brandi Smith, Mary Smith, Kimberly Weaver, Jeremy Cook, Latonya Davis, Amber Hall, Alex Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Jennifer Moore, Tina Miller, Sophia Smith, Lauren Smith, Jonathan Smith, Jennifer Smith, Jessica Bailey, Monica Anderson, Kimberly Johnson, Cynthia Jackson, Jennifer Hernandez, Tammy Thomas, Jonathan Wilson, Ashley Moore, Sarah Morris, Josh White, Ashley Wilson, Nicole Johnson, Julie Smith, James Berry, Kevin Kelly and Jose Balandrano. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 570 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carolyn Alexander, Jarrett Anderson, Chelsie Apker, Jennifer Avery, Caio Azevedo, Angelique Badgett, Elizabeth Barriento, Alan Bermudez, Tanisha Billy, Anne Blossick, Victor Bohlman, Shanda Bowser, Corey Brooks, Nelson Brooks, Jr., Lewis Brown, Carla Brown, Glenda Bunner, Dianne Burton, Messina Byers, Tammy Calabrese, Colleen Campbell, Joanne Cardin, Sabrina Carmichael, Jennifer Case, Sarah Cazares, Kiersten Carminara, Dena Chappell, Christopher Charizopoulos, Allison Clark, Lakisha Coleman, Kayla Connor, Teresa Cook, Hurann Cooper, Zundria Crawford, Tara Crozier-Rodda, Tim Cunningham, Felicia Cusic, Melissa Davis, Hashim Davis, Alan Delmastro, Jacqueline Devries, Jena Dines, Nicole Dixon, Megan Donahue-Owens, Jessie Dupre, Christiane Ebert, Heather Eicher, Lauren Elder, Michael Ellard, Christy Embry-Corbett, John Ennis, Courtney Everett, Kathleen Farah, April Farris, Garrett Foster, Tameka Fox, Reisha Fregoe, Brandy Fritz, Heather Gagnon, Erika Garcia, Aglacia Gardner, Kwame Gardour, Genevieve Gibson, Christa Gilmore, Justin Godfrey, Kristin Gorsuch, Blair Gosche, Michaela Greene, Marsha Griego, Tiffany Grimm, Aaron Grunwald, Franklin Hafner, Matthew Hanline, Colin Hayes, Carrie Hensley, Joan Hess, Amelia Hirrschoff, Marianne Holzkamper, Kenneth Hunter, Jr., Mary Hurd, Mallory Jaremko, Enyinnah Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Dana Johnson, Corey Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Benjamin Jordan, Gabriel Kaminsky, Jamie Kammer, Jacquelyn Kearney, Anthony Kelly, Cindy Kendra, Stan Kenny, Stacey Kenny, Elizabeth Kern, Barbara Knecht, Kimberly Krause and Cymande Lackland. (Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 571 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christopher Trani, Brett Urban, Yamaris Vaillant, Marci Valenzuala, Mary Wallace, Kara Walz, Dorotheia Webb, Angela Weber, Christina Weldy, Lauren Welker, Amanda Widman, Randi Williams, Holly Williams, Raysean Williams, Kodiak Winesette, Niesha Winfield, Jon Wisch, Shamya Wright, Latasha Wright, Abel Zamora, Abby Zehe, Tiffanie Zingrebe, Michael Jones, Lauren Walker-Akins, Alejandra Lamardo, Ronika Hickey, John Conley, Melody Easterling, Jennifer Field, Mike Simms, Jody Walls, Brittney Brown, Jennifer Call, Donielle Sandoval, James Mallen, Ryan Parker Minor, Miriam Alger, Crystal Hitchcock, Karen Witham, David Brad Smith, Tracy Snead and Susan Bodros. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 568 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Rama, Joshua Raymond, Anthony Re, Miguel Rico, Lilia Robles, Jose Rodriguez, Janine Ryans, Denise Salinas, Christine Sarmiento, Jessica Sawders, Mallory Schweitzer, Richard Scott, Alicia Shaver, Joe Shaver Jr, Stephanie Sherman, Susan Shulthise, Michelle Solomon, Sondra Stacey, Stacy Stallworth, Tricia Stedner, Christen Stout, John Strickland, Rayna Tam, Kylie Jo Taylor, Leeann Thacker, Sau Thong, Tonya Todd, Samantha Upshaw-Maxey, Robert Van Orden, Benjamin VanWart, Franky Vassor, Shaena Waasdorp, Kathryn Wallis-Bradshaw, Shindena Widby, Sean Woodward, Rosa Wright and Tracy Wyman. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 566 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Felix Amato, Terrell Anderson, Michelle Armenteros, Charmaine Banayat, Micheal Barbera, Bryan Barker, Sarah Barker, Marie Becker, Andrea Belasco, Alex Binek, Sarah Blackerby, William Blair, Justin Boswell, Renita Boylan, Daniel Brake Jr, Ashley Brannan, Heather Brooks, Nicole Buffone, Anna Cantore, Jessica Cantway, Deanna Celaya, Lindsey Check, Michael Chuba, Katherine Clark, Grant Cloud, Justin Crowell, Heather Cupp, Paul Cupp, Reva Dallo, Timothy Davis, Dessiree DeLaFe, Erin Doherty, Briana Domke, Ellen Eckert, Nivian Edwards, Robert Elkins, Lilia Espinoza, Nancy Freligh, Amanda Gonzalez, Patricia Gorbet, Alyssa Gouvea, David Guyton II, Taisha Harewood, Carmen Harper, Vida Harper, Christopher Hartley, Samantha Harvey, James Hawley, Marena Heine, Cassandra Hickson, Luke Holt, Tobias Hubbard, Bernard Hudgins, Dawn Hudspeth, Brenda Ingram, Erica Jackson, Rebecca Jackson, Michelle Jerve, Katie Johnson, Felina Johnson, Shannon Jonas, Kathy Jones, Carly Kemper, Katie Kilmartin, Kyle King, Jeremy Kovacs, Jennifer Kullen, Casie Langlois, Buffy Larson, Maggie Lavelle, Taneshia Lawrence, Leila Lent, Megan Lilja, Jacquelyn Lopez, Minden Luke, Beth Lutz, Pamela Marcellino, Kyle Margentina, Samantha Mayle, Sara Mcguire, Marquita Mcswain, Julia Messercola, Noelle Miller, Danielle Miller, Sunny Millett-Collins, Ashlee Mingo, Keri Missigman, Walter Glenn Mueller, Amanda Murphy, Adena Newbery, Kaitlyn Odonnell, Alicia Pallotta, Brittany Patterson, Julie Patterson, David Petersen, Sarah Pleshakov and Amber Poma. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 564 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Elizabeth Csiki, Cody Daigle, Mirella Demma, Lucy Diaz, Jean Eckert, Karen Foote, Kevin Foster, Joyce Frommert, Dawit Gebrekidan, Amory Gerhard, Jacqueline Hock-Yoder, Ruby Hollie, Glenda Jones, Lashonda Kennedy, Kristopher Kozusko, Maureen Larocca, Raquel Ledford, Melanie Matta, Karen Mayer, Kent Mckee, Todd Mclean, Angela Perales, Jennifer Perez, Rita Reasy, Dalia Roldan-Corral, Joseph Schmitt, Lorraine Seekford, Jaime Solorzano, Marcia Spayer, Cara Sweet, Megan Thrift, Devin Wiggins, Nancy Wingate, Rashad Boone, Amanda Garabato-Ruiz, Kofi Jenkins, Jacilyn Pierce, Pamela Primaky, Scotty Stout, Lawrence Shoot, Shameika Taylor, Tyler Williams, Andrew Annello, Ayanna Casey, Nicolas Duff, Zachary Husek, Lizzett Landa, Marina Melachrinos, Kristin Poore, Johnathan Rodriguez, Justine Schember, Annette White, Jolynn Yurcho, Nelly Bueso, Melanie Cook, Danielle Dowling, Lori Flowers, Ryan Leger, Sumer Leger, Katrina Mccartney, Krystal Mitchell, Bridget Prenatt, Michael Thibedeau, Matthew Tyska, Lorena Williams, Sergio Lopez, Amber Hayes, Suzanne Hager, Alexandra Jones, Danielle Mccalla, Kelly Davis, Amanda Sheron, Benjamin Chilmonik and Jordan Julian. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 562 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shannon Johnson, Sarah Falkner, Stacey Frisco, Christopher Camino, Armando Cardenas, Rhonda Carter-Brigman, Miguel Casillas, Stacey Cherney, Luis Chillogalli, Tsedonia Abay, Christopher Addison, Rene Arroyo, Renee Balqar, Mallorie Barshaw, Ashlen Battistelli, Cindy Bekkach, Gloria Sippel, Sherman Sleuth, Betty Springer, Kristina Teague, Troy Tenace Jr, Roman Trejo, Hassan Tyler, Amy Washington, Carlos Pizarro, Erika Purdy, Lucy Ramirez, Joseph Russo-Tiesse Jr, Richard Sackse, Susette Sengilla-Enright, John Hall, Tionda Harrison-Hendrix, Leann Havlik, Colby Hawley, Cathy Hillyer, Micholyn Holmes, Kimberly Holt, James Hurtt, Pierre Julien Iteprat, Sogand Alamdar, Levi Almonte, Sonia Avera, Lisa Baker, Vanessa Barrera, Lourdes Boehm, Ayashia Duckworth, Jenny Ewalt, Jacqueline Ferguson, Ashdon Floyd, Cruz A Gatica, Kaleb Gibson, Thomasene Goldman, Chris Medley, Roberto Mendoza, Jacob Newell, Adali Nolasco-Barrera, Rachel Oquinn, Linda Khamsone, Kristy Kohler, John Lampkin, Sarah Law, Amanda Marchese, Jillian Mcconnaughy, Aimee Campbell, Roxanne Centera, Dasira Cook-Jackson, Margarita Degollado-Flores, Jayne Adams, Jessica Cupp, Kari Curotto, Miroslava Dimitrova, Alisha Gallardo, Danielle Hicks, Meagan Holcomb, Aj Kendall, Christina Knouse, Shayna Nesbit, Michael Ogden, Noel Pangilinan, Rebecca Rainville, Sandra Salazar-Diaz, Andrew Sparks, Stephanie Wimberly, Joel Studer, Jason Turner, Xiaoyu Wang, Krystal Williams, Kappotolia Anderson, Christy Dufrene, Philinese Fairley, Chonsydne Fields, Erik Hooper, Adrian Lopez, Tiffany Alberty, Ameara Alleyne, Hector Aracena, Yassir Bennani, Maryn Bradbury, Nicole Clark and Carole Cremeans. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 560 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tran Ly, Elliot Maldonado, Alissa Abitante, Rita Adamo, Kaleigh Anderson-Brown, Heather Anderson, Lauren Aucoin, Stephanie Barba, Xavier Barba, Brittany Barnett, Terri Blume, Corey Bowling, Tanya Cagle, Victoria Carter- Seymore, Ihisha Cherenfant, Tyler Clark, Katoya Collier, Dion Fulwood, Kelsey Galloway, Tracey Golden, Grisel Guijarro, Suzanne Hager, Emily Hall, Amy Hargrove, Johannah Harman, James Helmig, Cindy Henry, Tamario Holland, Malaivan Hollingsworth, Falon Ortman-Palmer, Heather Pappas, John Persons, Janet Phillips, Porcha Pigadiotis, Ashley Purvis, Iris Reynoso, Jacqueline Rivera, Gissel Rodriguez, Odis Ross, Erika Ruiz, Gerarda Santiago, Bonnie Schrum, Gina Seery, Sara Senn, Melissa Sewell, Elizabeth Seymour, Stephen Short, Gennifer Silva, Dionne Simpson, Jarett Snyder, Nicole Spahn, Margaret Steger, Elena Stock, Cameron Traeger, Terrie Trettenero, Gena Tucker, Maria Tugultschinow, Tiffany Ward, Pam Willingham, Sharde Wilson, Zach Yanoff, Cody Bonham, Jamie Bratcher, Joshua Buck, Rebecca Croghan, Robin Demore, Andrea Ekis, Lori Kline, Carol Koester, Laurie Kubelka, Edward Laing, Christy Laroche, Melissa Lauer, Regina Givi, Kristal Gocmez, Anita Gonzalez, Lindsy Harris, Crystal Hayden, Cristan Haynes, Gelinda Heller, Janice Helm, Gesenia Llorentis, Katie Maccallum, Melissa Mccauley, Tonya Mckee, Brian Mckinnell, Shanna Meller, Charter Moore, Blake Moya, Kaitlyn Nikodem, Dahlia Oliver, Julia Oliver, Katja Hodnett, Alicia Hoefler, Zanita Holliman, Randa Hunt, Kathleen Hurban, Kelton Ireland, Sheila Jeffcoat-Murray and Lisa Jett. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 558 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Anny Le, Katherine Lobb, Uriel Lopez, Ashley Lour, Anthony Lowe, Jaime Magana, Evette Marroquin, Anna Lauren Masangcay, Brooke Mastroluca-Birdsall, Lisa Matolka, Keren Mendez, Martin Mendoza, Selena Mercer, Katie Miller, Byron Mills, Michael Morgan, Andrea Niotta, Erika Nunez, Stacie Nelson, Aaron Ozment, Gary Pochette, Kristal Poore, Terri Riker, Gilbert Samaniego, Tricia Santiago, Scott Schoonover, Robert Schramm, Tamara Schwab, Malinda Seamons, Laura Staunton, Gwendolyn Sterling, Michelle Stoelton, Shayna Strumph, Chelsea Tutko, Jayna Trokey, Angela Tortorice, Maricarmen Torres, Melissa Thompson, Carla Teixeira, Jessica Duke, Julie Ehrhart, Diane Ferraro, Stephen Forbes, Mark Franklin, Juan Frias, Scorpio Martinez, Roberto Mendiola, Michael Milito, Lawrence Mouton, Brittany Pike, Amanda Pleshakov, Denise Prawl-Harrison, Latisha Revell, Kimberly Rickert, Brooke Riley, Michael Rocha, Jazmin Rodriguez, Tammy Rouse-Yoder, Sonya Smith, John Stanley, Nicole Staton, Ruth Stefanidis, Deneca Stewart, Na Toya Stone, Karma Stroup, Heather Theard, Ethan Truitt, Carol Valentine, Mina Vargas, Monica Vega, Lynda Victor, Jessica Viramontez, Harvey Whatley, Brittany Word, Janae Worden-Jackson, Jason Crawford, Camerlee Crokaerts, Brittany Davis-Somes, Dawn Davis, Shannon Debauch, Benette Devera, Mary Kay Dicecca, Allyson Rush, Angelito Salazar, Valerie Serna, Amanda Shepherd, Kelly Shipley, Diego Ochoa, Carlos Olvera, Rosario Palacios, Holly Petta, Stacey James, Michelle Kandt, Kimberly Kelly, Kaitlyn Klinzing, Allecia Kruser, Maria Lane, Donald Lee, Les Leonard and Courtney Lockley. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 556 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Magdalena Hernandez-Rangel, Matt Callaghan, Michael Alford, Michelle Albertson, Nathalie Ramirez, Nicole Boleman, Nicole Rode, Paul Amos, Porfirio Anaya, Randy Bauer, Robyn Jones, Ryan Poore, Sabrina Mccollum, Sade Jordan, Seth Hefner, Shawn Rogers, Sherrise Brandenburg, Sonya Adams, Sora Matsunaga, Sreikompearck Keat, Stacy Firks, Stephanie Duffy, Stephanie Puente, Stephanie Shaw, Tauhid Price, Terri Smith, Tich Chadyiwa, Tierra Moore, Tina Charles, Todd Lewis, Tomiko Han-Suhara, Zulma Hertzog, Michele Soniat, Chrissy Spadaro, Megan Stowell, Joshua Szpyrka, Vicki Tryon, Zivorad Trbojevic, John Wolf, Lori Winkelholz, Thema Wilson, Christine Wills, Megan Watkins, Tara Yuengert, Samantha Zalewski, Earthalene Williams, Mary Denise Weber, Bertune Vireus, Karen Vansaghi, Michael Allen, Shannon Allen, Jade Antonelli, Phyllis Antonelli, Elia Apodaca, Shyllorie Ard, Adrienne Ash, Rachel Banks, Stephanie Bauer, Patricia Blankenburg, Vickie Bonior, Causaundra Brooks, Anita Brown, Anita Brown, Tabatha Bundesen, Ruby Carter, Jorge Cavazos, Stephanie Celtrick, Juan Chambers, Alexis Charles, Erin Emanuel, Melonie Elder, Diane Dripps, Karlyn Dozier, Nicholas Donchess, Diego Deleon, Patrick Debose, Brenda Davis, Slavica Cvijanovic, Keisha Esteph, Charnette Estes, Jody Evans, Erica Fairfield, Hannah Fisher-Arlinghaus, Ilene Flores, Margie Flynn, Rita Foster, Lynne Galante, Anthony Goin, Joseph Gonzales, Giomara Gonzalez, Kee'shaun Haymon, Cassie Hewitt, Kimberly Hirsch, Tiffany Ireland, Jennifer James, Sheri Jayne, William Jennings, Sandra Kelly, Terra Klein and Donna Lamb. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 554 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amy Starkey Branch, Angelina Barnes, Kelli Brooks, Robert Gilstrap, Michael Fortner, Alexander Rogers, Anthony Mosley, Barbie Carrico, Brittney Wilhite, Cathy West, Dennisha Toliver, Julie Villanveva-Kor, Tammy Thomas, Crystal Williams, Tenille Willis-Cleftenant, Tracie Williams, Brian Carney, Nicole Bryant, Gwen Hall, Jamie Haase, Lisa Gill, Samantha Gilbert, William Granfield, Dawn Kramer, Deborah Henry, Enesia Jackson, Jacqueline Jolicoeur, Julie Humphrey, Bobbie Lagarde, Kimberly Lacey, Paul Newman, Demi Moore, Kimberly Nogales, Rebecca Nahay, Chelsey Rittgers-Rake, Jason Rosner, Lynn Santos, Patricia Pryjma, Stephen Rue, Trecha Robinson, Zoe Ralston, Charles Sherman, David Strollo, Latrice Savannah, Naticia Simon, Nicholas Seidel, Paul Schieicher, Jamica Banks, Jodi Alexander, Lascia Kelly, Alexandra Llanos, Angelique Levell, Benjamin Lockley, Chad Landells, Davidson Louis, Janelle Lucas, Karan Lovett, Amanda Mason, Alex Myers, Chantell Mims-Penland, Christian Mendoza, Antoinette Neal, Brandi Owens, Deborah Owen, Jason Neal, Brad Perry, Brandy Power, Bridget Ranney, Hamed Ranjbar, Lananh Pham, Ashtyn Rodriguez, Danielle Scicluna, Fendy Saget, Jasmine Rodriguez, Kane Shaffner, Katya Reed, Kayla Rubio, Lauren Smith, Kelli Brooks, Cindy Castillo, Dian Clarke, Chantez Diggs, Ayoniyi Fakorede, Cathy Eicher, Dawn Evans, Joseph Eurell, Ashley Gee, Catherine Gable, Cheryl Fry-Banales, Jesus Garcia, Alicia Hassan, Cole Henry, Jacob Henry, Ashley Jablonski, Benisha Hill, Crystal Holton, Glee Hobbs, Laneika Howell, Lolita Russell and Luz Melecio. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 551 Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs a Ten-Day Grace Period to Process and File Consents Returned Within the Opt-In Period. Plaintiffs shall have until November 22, 2013 to file any Consent Forms which are postmarked, faxed, emailed, or delivered to the Third-Party Administrator no later than November 12, 2013. Plaintiffs shall provide Defendants with supporting documentation by December 4, 2013, with regard to those Consent Forms filed with the Court after November 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/15/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 542 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/15/2013. (jsh) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs a Ten Day Grace Period to Process and File Consents Returned within the Opt-In Period re 228 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 549 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Timothy Owens, Annessa Pace, Dean Pagonakis, Roberta Panosh, Thomas Parker, Melinda Patrick, Nikole Perez, Kiara Perry, Lauren Phagan, Samantha Pierce, Brenda Portillo, Sara Pownell, Ehsan Razi, Tuesdi Reaves, Ranae Rice, Starr Richardson, Cynthia Rivera, Victor Rivero, Gay Roberts, Laura Romero, Jill Ruiz-Plowman, Monica Ryun, Sherry Sabo, Stephen Sacco, Tonishia Scott, David Sears, George Shackett, Pietra Shartle, Tia Siler, Tara Simms, Nina Sittler, Courtney Snell, Diana Sochalski, Guy Sperlazzo, Shirley Stadtmueller, Andrea Stankus, Lori Stanton, Cynthia Stark-Weir, Michael Stickney, Kymberly Talley, Heather Taylor, Mahikol Torres, Christopher Turner, Sherrie Uplinger, Charles Van Order, Cheryl Vilela, Julio Vivas, Zachary Voller, Kenesha Wadsworth, Stephanie Watro, Mara Welch, Angelica Will, Felishia Williams, Lacey Williford, Natalia Wood, Ryan Woodward, Sarah Woudenberg, Michael Ybarra, Damon Yee and Christopher Zoog. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 547 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sasha Green, Ramon Grijalva, Matthew Guidotti, Daniel Guillotte, Sonya Habinek, Kristy Hadley, Pepper Hahn, Holly Hale, Tawanna Hall, Diane Hamilton, Alicia Handville, Alisha Hardester, Celeste Hardin, Amanda Harris, Barbara Harris, Sam Hart, Cassandra Hatfield, Nichole Hawley, Shawn Helvey, Briana Hente, Andre Hicks, Crystal Hill, Santisha Hill, Louis Holmes, Kyle Hovasse, Sharon Hunter, Kassandra Jackson, Patrick Jackson Sr, Kristin Jacob, Danielle Jacobs, Imia Johnson, Robert Johnson, Brandon Johnson, Jenna Johnston, Jonette Jones, Jennifer Justice, Taylor Kelly, Jillian Kelm, Linda Kinne, Adam Kittredge, Adria Kling, Cynthia Knight, Miriam Krugliak, Ronda Labier, Branden Lamb, Destiny Landi, Kristen Lenz, Kelly Lesniak, Rachel Lewis, Sandy Love, Melissa Luciano, Ashley Ludlam, Sonny Luka, Mija Maiorano, Jennifer Manes, Julia Markey, Michael Martin, Fayette Martin, Cyrinda Martucci, Farrouk Masri, Stephanie Mcdonald-Ball, Andew Mcgarr, Jacqueline Mcgrath, Erica Mckee, Rebecca Mcpherson, Jeanne Meadows, John Mehler, Nicole Mejia, Ginger Melchor, Tracy Metivier, Melinda Meyer, Ashley Miller, Melanie Miller, Shelley Mitchell, Richard Montie, Sarah Moore-Carlysle, Lori Morgan, Emily Morrow, Deborah Mosley, Melissa Munguia, Heather Murphy, Kevon Murray, Elizabeth Nava, Kortorcha Nelson, Kara Noesen, Matt Nonemacher and Paul Norris. (Marshall, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF