Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00273
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 5:02 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Dow Jones & Company "

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2013 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING Apple the Court hereby orders that Apples counterclaim against Lodsys is DISMISSED AS MOOT. This dismissal for mootness does not bar reassertion of such claims at a future date, either before this Court or elsewhere. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Dow Jones & Company Inc was hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
        ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay all pending deadlines up to and including August 23, 2013, pending finalization of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/10/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Dow Jones & Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dow Jones & Companys deadline 7/9/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Dow Jones & Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                    APPLE INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM IN INTERVENTION against Lodsys Group LLC by Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dow Jones & Company.( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dow Jones & Company.( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 8 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/9/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E Ostrow on behalf of Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4128422. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Dow Jones & Company served CMRR on 4/26/2013, answer due 5/17/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M Huck on behalf of Lodsys Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4108084. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Dow Jones & Company. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Dow Jones & Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4095992.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?