Lodsys Group, LLC v. Glu Mobile, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00275
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 9:44 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Glu Mobile, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE CASES. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/14. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:12-cv-729. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael A Goldfarb on behalf of Lodsys Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4244475. (Goldfarb, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kit W Roth on behalf of Lodsys Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4244060. (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines to Compy with P.R. 3-1 Through 3-4. Deadline is extended to 8/2/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION for One Week Extension of the Parties' Deadlines to Comply with P.R. 3-1 through 3-4 by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 01:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                ANSWER to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                  Plaintiff Lodsys Group LLC's Original ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Defendant Glu Mobile Inc. by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                      APPLE INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM IN INTERVENTION against Lodsys Group LLC by Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Douglas Schumann on behalf of Glu Mobile Inc (Schumann, David) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Estelle Whittemore on behalf of Glu Mobile Inc (Whittemore, Lauren) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Glu Mobile Inc (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Glu Mobile Inc (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                DEFENDANT GLU MOBILE, INC.'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group LLC by Glu Mobile Inc.(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 8 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/9/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Glu Mobile Inc.( Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E Ostrow on behalf of Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4128426. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Glu Mobile Inc served on 4/29/2013, answer due 5/20/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M Huck on behalf of Lodsys Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4108088. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Glu Mobile Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Glu Mobile, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4096028.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?