Erdberg v. On Line Information Services Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-03883-RDP
District Judge R David Proctor, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 5:02 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Erdberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Lee Hodges +1 205 251 6306 +1 205 250 7057 deanleehodges@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE EVANS LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Daniel Evans +1 205 870 1970 +1 205 870 7763 gdevans@evanslawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandria Parrish +1 205 870 1970 +1 205 870 7763 ap@evanslawpc.com
v.
No Logo On-Line Information Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ann Couch +1 205 521 8281 +1 205 488 6281 macouch@babc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew H. Lembke +1 205 521 8560 +1 205 488 6560 mlembke@babc.com
Space Matthew H. Lembke +1 205 521 8560 +1 205 488 6560 mlembke@babc.com
No Logo Rich Hobson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Elizabeth Howell +1 334 353 1018 +1 334 353 8440 lhowell@ago.state.al.us
Space William G. Parker, Jr. +1 334 242 7432 +1 334 353 8440 Wparker@ago.state.al.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office Southern
Filed 11/16/2012
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Jefferson
Terminated 10/9/2013
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
ORDER denying [55] Motion to Alter or Amend. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/10/2013. (AVC)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [50] Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/10/2013. (AVC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Opposition to Motion to Alter and Amend [57] filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Response (other)
        RESPONSE to Motion to Alter or Amend [55] filed by Rich Hobson, On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 56 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 OrderCourt Filing
          TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend (Doc. # 55), filed November 6, 2013. The parties are reminded to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B attached to the court's January 30, 2013 Initial Order (Doc. # 12). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/7/2013. (AVC)
            LREF
            Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013, Terminated: 12/10/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct
            MOTION to Alter and Amend by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Reply Brief
              REPLY Brief filed by Defendant On Line Information Services Inc re:[50] PETITION for Attorneys' Fees filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to Motion re [50] PETITION for Attorneys' Fees RESPONSE TO ON-LINES PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 52 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                  TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant's Petition for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. # 50), filed October 23, 2013. The parties are REMINDED to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B attached to the court's January 30, 2013 Initial Order (Doc. # 12). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/25/13. (SFR, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 51 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                    TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on Defendant's Petition for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. # 50), filed October 23, 2013. The parties are reminded to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B attached to the court's January 30, 2013 Initial Order (Doc. # 12). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/25/2013. (AVC)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013, Terminated: 12/10/2013 Motion for Attorney Fees
                      PETITION for Attorneys' Fees by On Line Information Services Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Lembke, Matthew)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL-re: Motions [35]&[38]. The motions are GRANTED IN PART. Counts One through Four of Pltf's Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Counts Five and Six are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/9/2013. (AVC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 48 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Memorandum OpinionCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OPINION-re: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [35] and Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stirke Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement [38]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/9/2013. (AVC)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Notice of Appearance
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E Howell on behalf of Rich Hobson (Howell, Laura)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 46 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                              TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Rule 26 Planning and Commencement of Discovery(Doc. # 44). Defendants oppose Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. # 45). The Motion (Doc. # 44) is DENIED. The Rule 26 planning meeting and discovery remain STAYED. The parties SHALL file the required Rule 26 report within fourteen (14) days of a ruling on Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss, if necessary. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/3/2013. (AVC)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [44] MOTION to Allow Rule 26 Planning and Commencement of Discovery filed by Rich Hobson, On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013, Terminated: 10/3/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION to Allow Rule 26 Planning and Commencement of Discovery by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 10/2/2013 (AVC).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [38] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint or to Strike Class Allegations or for a More Definite Statement filed by Rich Hobson. (Parker, William)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [38] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS RESPONSIVE SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO EXHIBIT B OF THE COURT'S ORDER IN RESPONSE TO AOCS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Reply Brief
                                        REPLY Brief filed by Defendant On Line Information Services Inc re:[35] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint or, In Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in Further Alternative, For a More Definite Statement (OPPOSED) filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Response to Motion
                                          RESPONSIVE Submission re: Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [35] filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 8/2/2013 (AVC).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 39 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                            TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Rich Hobson's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or, in the alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Doc. # 38), filed July 31, 2013. The parties are REMINDED to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B attached to the court's January 30, 2013 Initial Order (Doc. # 12). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 08/01/13. (SFR, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013, Terminated: 10/9/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Rich Hobson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Administrative Order Regarding Electronic Filing)(Parker, William)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 37 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on Defendant On-Line Information Service, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint or, in the alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Doc. # 9), filed July 25, 2013. The parties are REMINDED to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B attached to the court's January 30, 2013 Initial Order (Doc. # 12). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12-3883. (AVC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Brief
                                                  Brief re[35] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint or, In Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in Further Alternative, For a More Definite Statement (OPPOSED) filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Lembke, Matthew)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013, Terminated: 10/9/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint or, In Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in Further Alternative, For a More Definite Statement (OPPOSED) by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Rich Hobson served on 7/10/2013, answer due 7/31/2013. (AVC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Summons Issued
                                                        Summons Issued as to Rich Hobson; mailed certified mail. (AVC)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against On Line Information Services Inc, Rich Hobson, filed by Mark Erdberg.(Evans, G)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting Motion to Amend Complaint [25]. Because the original complaint is no longer the operative Complaint, Dft's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement [9] is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/3/2013. (AVC)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Response (other)
                                                              RESPONSE to Opposition to Motion to Amend Complaint [29] filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 6/21/2013 (AVC).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                OPPOSITION to Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint [25] filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 6/21/2013 (AVC).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  TEXT ORDER- This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 27). For good cause shown, the Motion to Suspend Briefing (Doc. # 27) is GRANTED. If Plaintiff is denied leave to amend, final briefs on the Motion to Dismiss will be due three days following the Court's decision. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/17/2013. (AVC)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013, Terminated: 6/17/2013 Motion to Stay
                                                                    MOTION to Suspend Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement [9] by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 6/17/2013 (AVC).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Response (other)
                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION in Response to Court's June 6th Order filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 6/17/2013 (AVC).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013, Terminated: 7/3/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                        MOTION to Amend Complaint by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 6/17/2013 (AVC).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re [9] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, In The Alternative, To Strike Class Allegations or, In the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Lembke, Matthew)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Evidentiary Material
                                                                            Evidentiary Material re:[22] Order,,,, Evidentiary Material Submitted in Response to the Court's June 6, 2013 Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Lembke, Matthew)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Doc. # 9) and supplemental letters from counsel following the June 4, 2013, hearing. As a result of matters discussed at the hearing and issues raised in counsel's correspondence, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) on or before June 10, 2013, Defendant SHALL file copies of all relevant contracts between Defendant and the Alabama Administrative Office of Courts addressing Defendant's operation of alapay and alacourt; (2) on or before June 14, 2013, the parties may file simultaneous supplemental briefs limited to fifteen (15) pages; and (3) on or before June 19, 2013, the parties may file simultaneous responsive briefs limited to ten (10) pages. Upon receipt of these submissions, the court will determine whether further argument is warranted. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/5/2013. (AVC)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Oral argument held on 6/4/2013 re [9] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, In The Alternative, To Strike Class Allegations or, In the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by On Line Information Services Inc. The court will take the motion under advisement. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (KLL)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [9]: This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Doc. # 9). The Motion (Doc. # 9) is SET for hearing on Tuesday, June 4, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North. A court reporter will be present. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/19/13. (ASL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                    TEXT ORDER- This matter is before the court on Defendant's Opposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Rule 26 Conference (Doc. # 20), filed March 4, 2013. For good cause shown, the Motion (Doc. # 20) is GRANTED. The parties' obligation to conduct the Rule 26 planning meeting is STAYED. The parties SHALL file the required Rule 26 report within fourteen (14) days of a ruling on Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss, if necessary. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/5/2013. (AVC)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013, Terminated: 3/5/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      Opposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Rule 26 Conference by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 3/4/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Reply Brief
                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative to Strike Class Allegation or, in the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement [9] filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 2/21/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL Submission in Response to Motion to Dismiss [9] filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 2/20/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Reply Brief
                                                                                            REPLY Brief re: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement [9] filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 2/12/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                              TEXT ORDER- This matter is before the court on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Doc. # 15), filed February 6, 2013. For good cause shown, the Motion (Doc. # 15) is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL file its reply brief on or before February 12, 2013. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/7/2013. (AVC)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013, Terminated: 2/7/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement [9] by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 2/6/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSIVE Submission in Response to Exhibit B of the Court's Order in Response to Motion to Dismiss [9] filed by Mark Erdberg. (Evans, G) Modified on 2/6/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER- This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Strike Class Allegations or, in the further alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Doc. # 9), filed January 29, 2013. The parties are reminded to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B attached to the court's January 30, 2013 Initial Order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/1/2013. (AVC)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Uniform Initial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS-reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule LR26.1(d) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/30/2013. (AVC)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 1/29/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 Brief
                                                                                                          Brief in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, In The Alternative, To Strike Class Allegations or, In the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement [9] filed by On Line Information Services Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 1/29/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013, Terminated: 7/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, In The Alternative, To Strike Class Allegations or, In the Further Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by On Line Information Services Inc. (Lembke, Matthew) Modified on 1/29/2013 (AVC).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Erdberg. On Line Information Services Inc served on 1/9/2013, answer due 1/30/2013. (Evans, G)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                Summons Reissued as to On Line Information Services Inc; returned to plaintiff for service. (AVC)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                  Summons Returned Unexecuted as to On Line Information Services Inc. (AVC)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                    Summons Reissued as to On Line Information Services Inc; mailed certified mail. (AVC)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                      Summons Returned Unexecuted as to On Line Information Services Inc. (JLC)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                        Case Reassigned to Judge R David Proctor. Judge James H Hancock no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to On Line Information Services Inc; mailed certified mail. (AVC)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Certified Mail Request
                                                                                                                            Request for service by certified mail filed by Mark Erdberg. (AVC)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against On Line Information Services Inc (Filing fee $350 Receipt# B4601038899), filed by Mark Erdberg.(AVC)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?