Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Digital River, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00258
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 3:52 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 806 3818 +1 817 377 3485 coneill@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Digital River, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Digital River, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Digital River, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Kenneth Larus on behalf of Digital River, Inc. (Larus, Christopher) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mathew John Yang on behalf of Digital River, Inc. (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Louis Germer on behalf of Digital River, Inc. (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Digital River, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv256 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. A single ESI, Discovery, Protective, and Docket Control Order shall govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order by 6-14-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant Digital River, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                              Digital River, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Digital River, Inc..(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Digital River, Inc..( Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                  Return of Service Executed as to Digital River, Inc. on 4/25/2013, by personal service; answer due: 5/16/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding May 21, 2013 Case Management Conference (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Digital River, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Henry, Claire) Modified on 3/22/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against Digital River, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4056313.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?