Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00256
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 8:06 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 806 3818 +1 817 377 3485 coneill@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

No Logo Aspyr Media, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Activision Blizzard, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert F Harris, III +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 afharris@shb.com
Space Patrick Allan Lujin +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 plujin@shb.com
Space Basil Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brittany A. Boswell +1 816 559 4010 +1 816 421 5547 bboswell@shb.com
No Logo Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Folsom +1 903 255 3251 +1 903 255 3266 dfolsom@jw.com
No Logo Digital River, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com
Space Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com
Space FAHD KHALID MAJIDUDDIN +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 fmajiduddin@lernerdavid.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Gear Software, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Mcafee, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaustuv Mukul Das +1 206 359 8217 +1 206 359 9217 kmdas@perkinscoie.com
Space Jonathan M. James +1 602 351 8440 +1 602 648 7032 jjames@perkinscoie.com
Space Ryan J. McBrayer +1 206 359 3073 +1 206 359 4073 rmcbrayer@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Pervasive Software, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daffer McDaniel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meredith J Fitzpatrick +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250 mfitzpatrick@dmtechlaw.com
Space Charles D Huston +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250 chuston@dmtechlaw.com
No Logo Sage Software, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martina Tyreus Hufnal +1 302 652 5070 +1 302 652 0607 hufnal@fr.com
Space Warren Keith Mabey, Jr. +1 302 778 8456 mabey@fr.com
Space Jonathan E. Singer +1 612 335 5070 +1 612 288 9696 singer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens Love

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Phillip Love +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 greg@stevenslove.com
No Logo Solarwinds Worldwide, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
Space Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
Space Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com
Space Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Consol Defendant
Sony Corporation of America Sony Corporation of America, Consol Defendant
Sony DADC US, Inc. Sony DADC US, Inc., Consol Defendant
Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale Chang +1 213 891 8662 dale.chang@lw.com
Space Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
Space Mark A. Flagel +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 mark.flagel@lw.com
Space Andrew John Fossum +1 714 755 8117 +1 713 546 5401 andrew.fossum@lw.com
Space Kathy Yu +1 213 485 1234 kathy.yu@lw.com
No Logo Wildpackets, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael John Sacksteder +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 msacksteder@fenwick.com
Space Lauren Estelle Whittemore +1 650 988 8500 +1 415 281 1350 lwhittemore@fenwick.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (635) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Witness List
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Seal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Pretrial Conference held on 11/17/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Activision Blizzard, Inc. for proceedings held on Pretrial Conference before Judge Leonard Davis. (Webb, Basil) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 573 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 526 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION (DEFENDANT ACTIVISION BLIZZARD, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Perez, Courtney) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 440 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. WILLIAM KERR filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Sessions, # 2 Exhibit A - 2014.10.09 Kerr Depo - Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit B - HMGH0000772 Expert Report of Joseph Gemini - Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit C - UNI066984 - End User License Agreement - Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit D - Sept 20 Response ReExam - Excerpts)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 527 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION in Limine for Trial Against Electronic Arts, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION (DEFENDANT ACTIVISION BLIZZARD, INC.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 525 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Sessions, # 2 Ex. 1 - Kerr Expert Report Excerpts-, # 3 Ex. 2 - DiEuliis Infringement Report Excerpts-, # 4 Ex. 3 - DiEuliis Depo Excerpts-, # 5 Ex. 4 - Kerr Depo Excerpts-, # 6 Ex. 5 - Uniloc's Response to EA's 1st Set of ROGS-, # 7 Ex. 6 - Decl of Sunil Swami (UNI290416)-, # 8 Ex. 7 - UNI066984 - End User License Agreement Excerpts-, # 9 ORDER GRANTING EA MOTION IN LIMINE)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 521 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 520 Emergency SEALED MOTION Fifth Sealed Emergency Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Kerr Dec. - Hsu Dep. Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Kerr Dec. - EA10021, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Kerr Dec. - EA10685, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Kerr Dec. - EA10684, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Kerr Dec. - EA Sales Data, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Kerr Dec. - EA9801)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency SEALED MOTION Fifth Sealed Emergency Motion to Compel by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Loveless Dec. - 2014-10.28 ELC to EA re Disc Responses, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 to Loveless Dec. - - EA Objections and Responses to Unilocs 1st Set of Common Rogs, # 4 Exhibit Ex 3 to Loveless Dec. - EA's Responses and Objc to Individual Interrogatories Nos. 1-11, # 5 Exhibit Ex 4 to Loveless Dec. - - July 22, 2014 email, # 6 Exhibit Ex 5 to Loveless Dec. - July 27, 2014 email, # 7 Exhibit Ex 6 to Loveless Dec. - 2014.08-14 Hearing Transcript, # 8 Exhibit Ex 7 to Loveless Dec. - 2014.09-03. Transcript of M to Compel Hearing Transcript, # 9 Exhibit Ex 8 to Loveless Dec. - Zvenigoroodsky 08-27-14.Pages 38-40, # 10 Exhibit Ex 9 to Loveless Dec. - 2014.09-18 Letter from EA, # 11 Exhibit Ex 10 to Loveless Dec. - 2014-07-10 Letter to Justina Sessions re Meet and Confer, # 12 Exhibit Ex 11 to Loveless Dec. - 2014.07-24 email, # 13 Exhibit Ex 12 to Loveless Dec. - Third Supp Responses to Common Rogs 1-3, # 14 Exhibit Ex 13 to Loveless Dec. - Second Supp Answers to Uniloc Individual Rogs, # 15 Declaration of Dr. William Kerr, # 16 Exhibit Ex 1 to Kerr Dec. - Kerr - Damages by EA 8-11-14, # 17 Exhibit Ex 2 to Kerr Dec. - Damages by EA. Supp Expert Report 9-3-14, # 18 Exhibit Ex 3 to Kerr Dec. - 2nd Supplemental Report re EA 9-15-14, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Kerr Dec. - EA10567, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kerr Dec. - EA 9565-9567, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Kerr Dec. - EA9800, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Kerr Dec. - EA10022)(Loveless, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2014: # 23 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 11/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 11/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 518 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Joint Status Report. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Courtney B. Perez, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Perez, Courtney) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 445 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The Court SETS jury selection for 12-01-2014 at 9:00 a.m. with trial to begin immediately thereafter. All parties SHALL be prepared to proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 472 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Objections and Rebuttal Designations to Activision's Initial Deposition Designations (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 469 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Objections and Rebuttal Designations to EA's Initial Deposition Designations (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' and Defendant Activision Blizzard's Joint Pretrial Order (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 476 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Exhibit List for Electronic Arts Trial (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 475 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Exhibit List for Activision Trial (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 453 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 395 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Suit Damages filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix A, # 2 Affidavit Sessions Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A - Griggs Transcript Excerpts, # 4 Errata B -Griggs Depo Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit C - Kelly Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit D - Burdick Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit E - Uniloc's First Initial Disclosure, # 8 Exhibit F - Uniloc's Pretrial Witness Disclosure, # 9 Exhibit G - Banerjee Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit H - Complaint, # 11 Exhibit I - DiEuliss Excerpts)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 452 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 396 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I Versluys Deposition, # 2 Exhibit J Uniloc's Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit K 1st Amended Contentions, # 4 Exhibit L Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions, # 5 Exhibit M Uniloc's 1st Supp Infringement Contentions, # 6 Exhibit N DiEuliis Report, # 7 Exhibit O Mercer Report)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jonathan Putnam by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Putnam testimony, # 2 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit C - SecurROM Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - Putnam Expert Report, # 5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Uniloc Response re Kerr, # 6 Exhibit F - EA00003890, # 7 Exhibit G - Putnam Supplemental Report, # 8 Exhibit H - Excerpts from DiEuliis Supp Report re EA, # 9 Exhibit I - SONY7800, # 10 Exhibit J - EA00009568, # 11 Exhibit K - EA00008698)(Loveless, Ryan) Modified on 10/9/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 440 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. WILLIAM KERR by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Justina K. Sessions ISO of Motion to Exclude, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude)(Van Nest, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 428 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 396 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Banerjee Depo Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B DiEuliis Exh 3, # 3 Exhibit C Mercer Depo Excerpts)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 393 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -Banerjee Depo Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - DiEuliis Report Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - DiEuliis Exh 10 Exerpts, # 4 Exhibit D Euliis Exh 11 Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit E EA 9249, # 6 Exhibit F EA 9699, # 7 Exhibit G Freedman Report Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit H Mathematics Excerpt, # 9 Exhibit I Zvenigorodsky Depo Excerpt, # 10 Exhibit J EA 10320)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 426 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 394 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR.WILLIAM KERR THAT VIOLATE THE ENTIRE MARKET VALUE RULE filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Richardson Depo Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - Hernandez Depo Excerpts)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 407 Emergency SEALED MOTION Fourth Motion to Compel filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/9/2014, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 364 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 334 Emergency SEALED MOTION For an Order Under Rule 37 Modifying the Docket Control Order with Brief in Support filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Val DiEuliss, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Kalyan Banerjee, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Motion re Disclosure of Damages Experts, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of John S. Torkelson)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 346 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document(Ex. N-R to Sessions Dec and proposed orders): 344 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N - 2013 Yr in Review, # 2 Exhibit O - Sessions 7-17-14 email 1., # 3 Exhibit P - Sessions 7-21-14 corresp, # 4 Exhibit. Q- Sessions 7-25-14 corresp, # 5 Exhibit R - Sessions 7-29-14 email.pdf, # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 343 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 320 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Disqualify Dr. Paul C. Clark as Symantec's Non-Infringement and Consulting Expert filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Yu declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Yu email, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Stahl email, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Fossum email, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Son email, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Richardson deposition, # 7 Affidavit Clark delcaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 321 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. The following briefing schedule SHALL apply to this Motion: Plaintiffs' Response Due 7-23-2014; EA's Reply Due 7-25-2014. No surreply will be considered on this Motion. The deadline for EA to file letter briefs for summary judgment and Daubert motions is hereby STAYED until further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/21/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 320 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Disqualify Dr. Paul C. Clark as Symantec's Non-Infringement and Consulting Expert, 317 MOTION to Amend/Correct 70 Notice (Other), 29 Notice (Other) Counterclaim-Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Replies to Symantec Corporation's Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties shall meet and confer in good faith to resolve these issues prior to the hearing and to include the status of these motions in their previously required notice due 8-07-2014. Briefing Schedule set: Response Due 7-28-2014; Reply Due 8-01-2014; Surreply Due 8-06-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/21/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 310 MOTION to Drop Counterclaim-Defendants from Symantec Corporation's Non-Patent Counterclaims and/or Sever Those Counterclaims and Force Them to Arbitration filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Yu, # 2 Ex. A-2014-02-06 Uniloc Australia 1st Rogs to Symantec, # 3 Ex. B-2014-02-06 Uniloc Australia 1st RFP to Symantec, # 4 Ex. C-2014-04-17 Notice of Subpoena to Flagel, # 5 Ex. D-2014-04-17 Notice of Subpoena to Kapgan, # 6 Ex. E-2014-04-17 Notice of Subpoena to Wald, # 7 Ex. F-2014-04-24 Uniloc Australia Amended Notice of Depo of Wald, # 8 Ex. G-2014-04-25 Amended Notice of Depo of Flagel, # 9 Ex. H-2014-04-29 Uniloc Australia 2nd Amended Notice of Subpoena to Flagel, # 10 Ex. I-2014-04-16 Uniloc Australia's Notice of 30(b)(6) Depo of Symantec, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Joinder by Activision Blizzard, Inc. re 326 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 329 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Letter Brief regarding Motion to Exclude Kerr filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ltr Brief re Motion to Exclude Kerr)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 328 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Letter Brief regarding Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement of '216 filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ltr Brief re MSJ Noninfringement '216)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 327 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Letter Brief regarding Motion for Summary Judgment for Marking filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ltr Brief re MSJ for Marking)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ltr Brief re MSJ that Claims are Unpatentable)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 325 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Letter Brief regarding Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of '216 filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ltr Brief re MSJ Noninfringement '216)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Symantec Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Letter Brief filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 322 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Letter Brief filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 321 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Sessions, # 2 Ex A - 2013.08.30 Uniloc's Damages Statement (FINAL), # 3 Ex B - 2014.05.09 Uniloc's Response to EA's 3rd Set of ROGS [Nos 8-16], # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed SEALED MOTION To Disqualify Dr. Paul C. Clark as Symantec's Non-Infringement and Consulting Expert by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 319 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 306 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Overrule Uniloc's Objections to Disclosure of Protected Materials Under the Protective Order to Symantec's Non-Infringement Expert filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 140 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 70 Notice (Other), 29 Notice (Other) Counterclaim-Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Replies to Symantec Corporation's Counterclaims by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert D. Hunt, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hunt Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hunt Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hunt Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hunt Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 306 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Overrule Uniloc's Objections to Disclosure of Protected Materials Under the Protective Order to Symantec's Non-Infringement Expert filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Loveless, Ryan) Modified on 7/15/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 7/16/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 239 MOTION to Compel Counterclaim-Plaintiff Symantec Corporation to Produce a Rule 30(b)(6) Designee and Responsive Information, 312 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, 246 SEALED MOTION For Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline to Complete Discovery of Certain Third Parties, 310 MOTION to Drop Counterclaim-Defendants from Symantec Corporation's Non-Patent Counterclaims and/or Sever Those Counterclaims and Force Them to Arbitration , 306 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Overrule Uniloc's Objections to Disclosure of Protected Materials Under the Protective Order to Symantec's Non-Infringement Expert, 245 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court orders parties to meet and confer in good faith to resolve these issues prior to the hearing and to file a report indicating the status of each motion by 8/7/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/10/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 121 Sealed Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/10/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 309 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each bear their own attorney's fees,expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Drop Counterclaim-Defendants from Symantec Corporation's Non-Patent Counterclaims and/or Sever Those Counterclaims and Force Them to Arbitration by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachany Thi Son on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Son, Rachany) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 305 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edward E Casto, Jr; Steven Wayne Hartsell; Steven Brannon Latimer; Edward R Nelson, III; Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Anthony Michael Vecchione; Barry Bumgardner and Brent Nelson Bumgardner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 306 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION to Overrule Uniloc's Objections to Disclosure of Protected Materials Under the Protective Order to Symantec's Non-Infringement Expert by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Yu, # 2 Ex. A-2014.06.06 Clark Disclosure, # 3 Ex. B-2014-06-16 Fossum Email, # 4 Ex. C-2014-06-26 Email Chain, # 5 Ex. D-UNI078348-51, # 6 Ex. E-UNI094134, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 301 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorney's fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/23/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 302 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/23/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Steven Torkelson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda R Stahl on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stahl, Linda) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua James Bennett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Robert Arnett, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Arnett, James) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 293 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 205 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions; denying 259 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc. of Compliance Regarding F.R.C.P. 26(a)(2) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by McAfee, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Bowen, Tyler) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Symantec Corporation of Compliance regarding Expert Report (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 289 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 245 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 285 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the present case with respect to Plaintiffs and Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. are hereby STAYED 30 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 284 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendants Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorney's fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 278 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant McAfee, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorney's fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement with regard to Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sony Defendants by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 246 SEALED MOTION For Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline to Complete Discovery of Certain Third Parties filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 239 MOTION to Compel Counterclaim-Plaintiff Symantec Corporation to Produce a Rule 30(b)(6) Designee and Responsive Information filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Yu, # 2 Ex. F-2014-06-04 Hunt Email, # 3 Ex. G-2014-04-01 Olin Email, # 4 Ex. H-2014-04-21 Olin Email, # 5 Ex. I-2013-12-13 Symantec Privilege Log, # 6 Ex. J-2014-04-30 Symantec Privilege Log)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Bufe, John) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 269 Motion to Stay Certain Deadlines. ORDERED that all deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant McAfee, Inc. are hereby stayed for ten (10) days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 273 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Walter Thomas Henson terminated as counsel for Electronic Arts Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthias Andreas Kamber on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4693506. (Kamber, Matthias) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Justina K Sessions on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4693328. (Sessions, Justina) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney & Request for Termination of Electronic Notifications by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Asim M Bhansali on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Bhansali, Asim) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A Van Nest on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Stay with regard to Defendant McAfee, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 266 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc. are hereby stayed for 30 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 245 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Symantec Corporation. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Stay Regarding Pervasive Software, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 265 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 239 MOTION to Compel Counterclaim-Plaintiff Symantec Corporation to Produce a Rule 30(b)(6) Designee and Responsive Information filed by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert D. Hunt, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hunt Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hunt Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hunt Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hunt Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Hunt Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Hunt Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Hunt Decl., # 9 Declaration of Christopher W. Arledge, # 10 Exhibit 1 to Arledge Decl., # 11 Exhibit 2 to Arledge Decl., # 12 Exhibit 3 to Arledge Decl., # 13 Exhibit 4 to Arledge Decl., # 14 Exhibit 5 to Arledge Decl., # 15 Exhibit 6 to Arledge Decl., # 16 Declaration of Jaime Olin)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 246 SEALED MOTION For Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline to Complete Discovery of Certain Third Parties filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot 213 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 260 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 245 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Arledge, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Arledge Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Arledge Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Arledge Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Arledge Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Arledge Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Arledge Decl., # 8 Declaration of Robert D. Hunt, # 9 Exhibit 1 to Hunt Decl., # 10 Exhibit 2 to Hunt Decl., # 11 Exhibit 3 to Hunt Decl., # 12 Exhibit 4 to Hunt Decl., # 13 Exhibit 5 to Hunt Decl., # 14 Exhibit 6 to Hunt Decl., # 15 Exhibit 7 to Hunt Decl., # 16 Exhibit 8 to Hunt Decl., # 17 Exhibit 9 to Hunt Decl., # 18 Declaration of Jaime Olin, # 19 Exhibit 1 to Olin Decl., # 20 Exhibit 2 to Olin Decl., # 21 Exhibit 3 to Olin Decl., # 22 Exhibit 4 to Olin Decl., # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Hearing re 205 SEALED MOTION by Symantec Corporation, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 239 MOTION to Compel Counterclaim-Plaintiff Symantec Corporation to Produce a Rule 30(b)(6) Designee and Responsive Information filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Yu, # 2 Exhibit A - 042514 Burdick trans, # 3 Exhibit B - 031314 Obj and Resp to 1st ROGS, # 4 Exhibit C - 080913 Symantec to Uniloc ltr, # 5 Exhibit D - 081511 Symantec to Uniloc ltr, # 6 Exhibit E - 021114 email from Uniloc Australia, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 246 SEALED MOTION For Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline to Complete Discovery of Certain Third Parties filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Olin Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Hunt Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 256 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 205 SEALED MOTION filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Yu, # 2 Exhibit J - 050114 Kazanegras depo excerpts)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: unsuccessful (Symantec Corporation)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Digital River, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Wildpackets, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Digital River, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 247 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wildpackets inc dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendant shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 244 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 243 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Fact Discovery Deadline due May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/6/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 205 SEALED MOTION filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Wildpackets, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 246 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION For Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline to Complete Discovery of Certain Third Parties by Activision Blizzard, Inc., McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Tyler R. Bowen, # 2 Exhibit 1-10 to Declaration of Tyler R. Bowen, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathy Yu, # 2 Exhibit A - 040314 Symantec Obj to Omnibus 30b6, # 3 Exhibit B - 031314 Symantec Obj to 1st ROGS, # 4 Exhibit C - 031314 Symantec Obj to 1st RFP, # 5 Exhibit D - 041614 Uniloc 30b6 of Symantec, # 6 Exhibit E - 041714 email from Uniloc to Symantec, # 7 Exhibit F - 041714 Uniloc Subpoena to Kapgan, # 8 Exhibit G - 042414 Uniloc Amended Subpoena to Wald, # 9 Exhibit H - 042914 Uniloc Amended Subpoena to Flagel, # 10 Exhibit I - 042714 Ltr from Symantec to Uniloc Australia, # 11 Exhibit J - 043014 email from Symantec to Uniloc Australia, # 12 Exhibit K - 042714 Symantec Obj to 30b6, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 95 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Pervasive Software, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzpatrick, Meredith) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 95 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 159 Motion for Protective Order. Uniloc is barred from seeking discovery on products other than those listed in its infringement contentions and those McAfee activation mechanisms that operate in a reasonably similar manner. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 236 Motion to Serve Amended Infringement. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve their amended infringement contentions on Defendant McAfee, Inc. within one week of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/1/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 237 Motion for Leave. ORDERED that McAfee and defendants shall serve their supplemental invalidity contentions as to the DEC system on Plaintiff Uniloc no later than May 2, 2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/1/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Counterclaim-Plaintiff Symantec Corporation to Produce a Rule 30(b)(6) Designee and Responsive Information by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert D. Hunt, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Sealed Motion to Complel Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 122 Sealed Motion to Compel Production; denying 190 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Disclosure of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions as to Defendant McAfee, Inc. Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(b) by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBrayer, Ryan) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions as to Defendant McAfee, Inc. Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(b) by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 4/24/14 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2014. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Michael Vecchione on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Vecchione, Anthony) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of McAfee, Inc., Symantec Corporation (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 205 SEALED MOTION filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathy Yu, # 2 Ex. A-2011-06-03 Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, # 3 Ex. B-Source Code Access Log 2011, # 4 Ex. C-2011-10-13 Flagel E-mail to Bumgardner, # 5 Ex. D-2013-11-13 Noteware Ltr to Casto, # 6 Ex. E-2013-05-29 Hearing Transcript-EXCERPTS, # 7 Ex. F-2013-10-31 Sym Ltr to Uniloc, # 8 Ex. G-2013-11-19 Sym Doc Prod Ltr, # 9 Ex. H-2013-12-16 O'Neill E-mail to Fossum & Yu, # 10 Ex. I-2014-02-26 Fossum Ltr to Hartsell, # 11 Declaration of A. Fossum, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited of Lead Counsel (Arledge, Christopher) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of McAfee, Inc., Symantec Corporation (Bufe, John) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 225 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Digital River, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2014 re 122 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code from Defendant Pervasive Software filed by Uniloc; 190 MOTION to Continue filed by Uniloc; 159 MOTION for Protective Order filed by McAfee; 120 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Electronic Arts filed by Uniloc (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign in Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 223 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Sony are hereby STAYED for 30 days. Sony is excused from attending the motions hearing scheduled on 4-24-2014 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery from the Sony Defendants 121 will not be heard at that hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/14. (mll, ) Modified on 4/24/2014 (mll, ). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Digital River, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 190 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Continuance filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay Regarding Sony Defendants by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 190 MOTION to Continue filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Solo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. to 207 Order on Motion for Hearing (JOINT STATUS REPORT) filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) Modified on 4/21/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Activision Blizzard, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc., Symantec Corporation re 212 Sealed Response to Motion, (Sunderland, Sara) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc. re 207 Order on Motion for Hearing,,, (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 210 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Supplemental Notice Regarding Motion Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - docket text resetting trial in Virginia Civ. Action No. 2:12cv548)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles P Kennedy on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4616646. (Kennedy, Charles) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Devon Hunt on behalf of Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4614554. (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 210 Notice filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Due to the scheduling conflicts outlined in the Notice, Edward R. Nelson III, lead counsel for Uniloc, and Wesley Hill, primary local counsel for Uniloc, are EXCUSED from attending the hearing on 4-24-2014. However, alternative counsel for Uniloc SHALL appear fully prepared to discuss the motions set for hearing and with full authority to resolve any disputes with respect to those motions. The hearing remains as scheduled on 4-24-2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 211 Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 190 MOTION to Continue by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 190 MOTION to Continue filed by McAfee, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tyler R. Bowen, # 2 Exhibit 1-13 to Declaration of Tyler R. Bowen, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) WITH REGARD TO DEFENDANTS SOLARWINDS WORLDWIDE, LLC AND SOLARWINDS, INC. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 207 Order on Motion for Hearing,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Order in Civ. Action No. 2:13-cv-332, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice regarding Hearings in Civ. Action No. 6:12-cv-245 and 6:12-cv-350, # 3 Exhibit C - Order regarding Trial Setting in Cause No. 13-0367-A)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 208 Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Plaintiff shall serve its supplemented infringement contentions on Defendant Activision Blizzard, Inc. within one week of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(b) by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 180 Motion for Hearing on Motions. The Court sets the following motions for hearing on 4-24-2014 at 9:00 a.m.: Uniloc's Motion to Compel Discovery from Electronic Arts, Inc. (Docket No. 120); Uniloc's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sony (Docket No. 121); Uniloc's Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code from Pervasive (Docket No. 122); McAfee's Motion for Protective Order (Docket No. 159); and Uniloc's Motion to Continue (Docket No. 190). Lead and local counsel for Uniloc, EA, Sony, McAfee, and Pervasive must attend. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer in good faith to resolve these issues prior to the hearing and to file a status report indicating which motions are still unresolved by 4-18-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 198 Motion for Clarification Regarding the DCO's Mediation Requirement. The parties have satisfied the 4-01-2014 mediation required by the Docket Control Order. The parties are encouraged to continue settlement discussions to reach an amicable resolution to this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION for leave to amend infringement contentions by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V)(Nelson, Edward) Modified on 4/8/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Dawn Sunderland on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc. (Sunderland, Sara) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Pervasive Software, Inc..(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 198 MOTION for Clarification Regarding the DCO's Mediation Requirement filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 197 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc. Defendant-Intervenor Valve Corporation is hereby DISMISSED from this civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Solo on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4591913. (Solo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Albert F Harris, III terminated as counsel in this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/1/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Clarification Regarding the DCO's Mediation Requirement by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant/Intervenor Valve Corporation] by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Regarding Albert F. Harris) by Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 189 Notice (Other) regarding mediation with Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time. The mediation completion date is extended, and Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Symantec Corporation shall have to 5-15-2014 to complete mediation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): 192 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 192 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 190 MOTION to Continue . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit O)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Symantec Corporation, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit N)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with DCO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (Digital River, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs and Defendant McAfee Inc shall have to 5-22-2014 to complete mediation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tyler R Bowen on behalf of McAfee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4583415. (Bowen, Tyler) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 182 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Alan Flagel terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Activision Blizzard, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mark Flagel by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Procedure 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted, filed in member case 6:13cv261. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBrayer, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 23 Motion to Change Venue to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 87 Motion to Dismiss because Uniloc Australia has waived its venue defense by untimely raising it, and because a 12(b)(3) motion is no longer an acceptable way to enforce an arbitration clause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by McAfee, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Joint Request for Hearing) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBrayer, Ryan) Modified on 3/21/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 3/17/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 172 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are STAYED as to Plaintiffs and Defendant Wildpackets Inc for 60 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (Wildpackets, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Pervasive Software, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan S Banks on behalf of McAfee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4549690. (Banks, Bryan) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Electronic Arts, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, and Sony DADC US, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION for Protective Order filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kyle Amborn in Support of McAfee's Motion for Protective Order)(McBrayer, Ryan) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle M Amborn on behalf of McAfee, Inc. (Amborn, Kyle) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 163 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 159 MOTION for Protective Order; Replies due by 2/26/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 162 Sealed Response to Motion,, 159 MOTION for Protective Order by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBrayer, Ryan) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 159 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher W Arledge on behalf of Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4504028. (Arledge, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick A Lujin on behalf of Valve Corporation (Lujin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan M. James, # 2 Exhibit 1-16 to Declaration of Jonathan M. James, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Valve Corporation. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Valve Corporation (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint in Intervention by Valve Corporation.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 154 Motion to Intervene as Defendant. Valve Corporation may file its Answer in Intervention forthwith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Intervene As Defendant by Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Answer in Intervention, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 121 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendants Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US, Inc. filed by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin in Support, # 2 Exhibit 20 to Majiduddin Declaration)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 2 Exhibit 26 to Majiduddin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 27 to Majiduddin Declaration)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Russell W Faegenburg on behalf of Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4478196. (Faegenburg, Russell) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Russell W Faegenburg on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4478136. (Faegenburg, Russell) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendants Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration - O'Neill, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 148 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration - O'Neill, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc.s Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code (Fitzpatrick, Meredith) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code from Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hartsell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendants GEAR Software Inc and GEAR Softwre Holdings Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own litigation costs, attys' fees and other expenses and costs related to this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc. re 142 Sealed Response to Motion, of Attachments (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificates of Service and Permission to File Under Seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc. re 141 Sealed Response to Motion, of Attachments (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Permission to File Under Seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 25 to Majiduddin Declaration)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 121 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendants Sony Corporation of America and Sony DADC US, Inc. filed by Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 19 to Majiduddin Declaration)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Change Venue by Electronic Arts, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony DADC US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Toto, # 2 Declaration of Russell Evans, # 3 Declaration of Fahd K. Majiduddin, # 4 Exhibits 1 - 12 to Majiduddin Declaration, # 5 Exhibits 13 - 18 to Majiduddin Declaration, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 122 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Production of Source Code from Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc. filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Fitzpatrick, Meredith) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 123 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Aspyr Media, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 492 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?