David Dominick Ruggiero
Bankruptcy Case California Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-41292
District Judge William J. Lafferty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 1:52 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Dominick Ruggiero, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Patrick L. Forte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Yi-wen Shiau +1 510 465 3328

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonic.net

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick L. Forte +1 510 465 3328 plforte@sonic.net
No Logo Martha G. Bronitsky, Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Rhina Ruggiero, Joint Debtor
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
Motion To Dismiss Or Convert Chapter 13 Case For Failure To Make Plan Payments with Certificate of Service. (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT CORRECTED DOCKET TEXT TO MATCH PDF. Modified on 2/24/2016 (lb). (Entered: 02/23/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
    Substitution of Attorney . Attorney Anne Yi-wen Shiau terminated. Patrick L. Forte added to the case. Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
      Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
        Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Stonehenge Trustee Services (acc) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 58 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
          Order Modifying Chapter 13 Plan (Related Doc # 51 Amended Motion). (dmp) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
            Declaration of Default in Support of Order Modifying Chapter 13 Plan (RE: related document(s)51 Amended Application/Motion). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
              Request for Entry of Default Re: Order Modifying Chapter 13 Plan (RE: related document(s)51 Amended Application/Motion). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                Withdrawal of Documents (RE: related document(s)53 Objection). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                  Amended Schedule I, Schedule J. Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                    Chapter 13 Trustee's Objection to Modification of Chapter 13 Plan and Motion to Dismiss Chapter 13 Case (RE: related document(s)51 Amended Application/Motion). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT CORRECTED DOCKET TEXT TO MATCH PDF. Modified on 7/8/2015 (rs). (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                      Notice and Opportunity for Hearing (RE: related document(s)51 Amended Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan (RE: related document(s)49 Motion to Modify Plan filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Certificate of Service)). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                        Amended Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan (RE: related document(s)49 Motion to Modify Plan filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Certificate of Service) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                          Notice to Creditors of Motion to Modify Plan and of Deadline to Request a Hearing (RE: related document(s)49 Motion to Modify Plan Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Certificate of Service)). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Shiau, Anne) Modified on 6/30/2015 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT CORRECTED DOCKET TEXT TO MATCH PDF. (tw). (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                            Motion to Modify Plan Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Certificate of Service) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                              Adequate Protection Order.(RE: related document(s)47 Stipulation for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association). (dmp) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 47 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                Amended Stipulation for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association). (Micklas, M.). Related document(s) 40 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT ADDED LINKAGE TO DOC#40. Modified on 6/9/2015 (lb). (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                  Stipulation for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association). (Micklas, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 44 Stipulation and Order). Notice Date 05/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                      Order to Continue Hearing RE: (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay, 43 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association Hearing Continued to 05/27/15 at 9:30 am). (dmp) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        Stipulation to Continue Hearing Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay). Continued Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2015 at 09:30 AM Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. (Micklas, M.) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT CORRECTED HEARING TYPE TO MATCH PDF. Modified on 5/13/2015 (cf). (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                          Order to Continue Hearing Re Motion for Relief from Stay (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association, 40 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association). Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2015 at 09:30 AM Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty for 38, . (acc). (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                            Pre-Hearing Statement (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (Micklas, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                              Stipulation to Continue Hearing On Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association). Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2015 at 09:30 AM Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty for 38,. (Micklas, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)38 Motion for Relief from Stay). Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2015 at 09:30 AM at Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities # 2 RS Cover Sheet # 3 Declaration # 4 Certificate of Service) (Micklas, M.) ADDRESS FOR HEARING NOT LISTED IN THE CAPTION. Modified on 3/27/2015 (cf). (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Motion for Relief from Stay or in the Alternative, Adequate Protection RS #MJM-114, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor Marina Garden Homeowners Association (Micklas, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Withdrawal of Documents (RE: related document(s)36 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments with Certificate of Service. (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Withdrawal of Documents (RE: related document(s)33 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Document: Debtors' Proposed Resolution of Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (RE: related document(s)33 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments with Certificate of Service. (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Withdrawal of Documents (RE: related document(s)30 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Document: Debtors' Proposed Resolution of Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (RE: related document(s)30 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments with Certificate of Service. (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Withdrawal of Documents (RE: related document(s)27 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Document: Debtors' Proposed Resolution of Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (RE: related document(s)27 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments with Certificate of Service. (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Withdrawal of Documents (RE: related document(s)25 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments with Certificate of Service. (Bronitsky, Martha (harbor)) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (batch)). Notice Date 05/08/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Order Approving Ex Parte Application For Lien Strip Fee (Related Doc # 22). fees awarded: $1500.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 for Anne Yi-wen Shiau (ew) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Ex Parte Application for Compensation for Lien Strip Fee; Trustee's Consent for Anne Yi-wen Shiau, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $1500.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney Anne Yi-wen Shiau (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Signed Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (ew) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 19 Order on Motion Setting Property Value). Notice Date 05/02/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Order Valuing Lien of Franklin Credit Management as Successor to Bosco Credit, LLC (Related Doc # 12) (ew) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Corrected Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)12 Motion Setting Property Value). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Declaration of Default in Support of Order Valuing Lien (RE: related document(s)12 Motion Setting Property Value). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Request for Entry of Default Re: Order Valuing Lien (RE: related document(s)12 Motion Setting Property Value). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice Regarding First Amended Chapter 13 Plan & Deadline to File Objection (RE: related document(s)14 First Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Exhibit Plan) (Shiau, Anne) Modified on 4/12/2013 ERROR: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT SELECTED. PLEASE USE THE PATH: BK > NOTICES > OPPORTUNITY FOR HEARING.(ew). (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  First Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (RE: related document(s)2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero). (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice and Opportunity for Hearing (RE: related document(s)12 Motion Setting Property Value of Franklin Credit Management Corporation as Successor to Bosco Credit, LLC Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero). Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Motion Setting Property Value of Franklin Credit Management Corporation as Successor to Bosco Credit, LLC Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities # 4 Exhibit Plan# 5 Exhibit A# 6 Exhibit B# 7 Exhibit C# 8 Exhibit D# 9 Exhibit E# 10 Exhibit F) (Shiau, Anne) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Singer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice Regarding Trustee's Initial Report of Deficiencies & Requested Corrections (RE: related document(s)7 Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Service. 341). Filed by Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky (Bronitsky, Martha (ls)) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Plan. (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 03/09/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/09/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 03/09/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/09/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Service. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/4/2013 at 02:00 PM Oakland U.S. Trustee Office Objection to Dischargeability due by 6/3/2013 Proofs of Claims due by 7/3/2013 (Bronitsky, Martha (cr)) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income (Form 22C) Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Statement of Social Security Number. Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 6300 Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor David Dominick Ruggiero, Joint Debtor Rhina Ruggiero). (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $281. Filed by David Dominick Ruggiero, Rhina Ruggiero. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 04/4/2013. Chapter 13 Plan due by 03/19/2013. (Forte, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 974 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?