Choyce v. SF Bay Area Independent Media Center et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01842
District Judge Jon S. Tigar, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jon S. Tigar
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 9:57 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Dionne Choyce, Plaintiff

Represented by Smith Patten

v.
No Logo Cernio Technology Cooperative, Defendant
No Logo Layer42.net, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Casa Riley & Simonian, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel L. Casas +1 650 948 7200 +1 650 948 7220 dcasas@legalteam.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder abasile@legalteam.com

Represented by Casas Riley & Simonian, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a California Corporation TTAB Attorney Placeholder abasile@legalteam.com
No Logo SF Bay Area Independent Media Center, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Mae Harrison +1 949 223 7219 +1 949 223 7100 katherine.harrison@bryancave.com
Space Leila Christine Knox +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 leila.knox@bryancave.com
an unincorporated association 

also known asIMC, SF Bay Area
also known asSF Bay Area IMC Jessica Elizabeth Mar +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 jessica.mar@bryancave.com
Space Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@hro.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Abstract Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/27/2017, Entered: None Abstract Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Proposed Abstract of Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Abstract Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Abstract Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Abstract Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None USCA Case Number
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 67 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
RESPONSE to (re 59 MOTION for Attorney's Fees; -Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 17 U.S.C.§ 505 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Dionne Choyce. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Dow W. Patten, #(2) Exhibit)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 7/31/2014) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
RESPONSE to (re 61 MOTION for Attorney's Fees FOLLOWING DISMISSAL OF COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM) filed by Dionne Choyce. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Dow W. Patten, # 2 Exhibit)(Patten, Dow) (Filed on 7/31/2014) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel L. Casas (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
LREF
Blank 63 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees FOLLOWING DISMISSAL OF COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM, 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees filed by Dionne Choyce. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Stipulation
STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees FOLLOWING DISMISSAL OF COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM, re 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees; -Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 17 U.S.C.§ 505 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; --STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEY'S FEES MOTIONS filed by Dionne Choyce. (Patten, Dow) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Motion for Attorney Fees
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Recovery of Attorney's Fees FOLLOWING DISMISSAL OF COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM filed by Layer42.net, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/16/2014. Replies due by 7/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel L. Casas, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to re 59 MOTION for Award of Attorney's Fees. This motion has been noticed for a hearing date that is closed to further settings. The hearing is CONTINUED to 9/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. All other deadlines remain the same. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Motion for Attorney Fees
MOTION for Attorney's Fees; -Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 17 U.S.C.§ 505 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by SF Bay Area Independent Media Center. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/16/2014. Replies due by 7/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leila Knox, # 2 Declaration of Roger Myers, # 3 Proposed Order)(Knox, Leila) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/19/2014 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Proposed Order
[Proposed] Order of Judgment filed by SF Bay Area Independent Media Center. (Knox, Leila) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jessica Elizabeth Mar; DEFENDANT SF BAY AREA INDEPENDENT MEDIA CENTER'S NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (Mar, Jessica) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Patent/Trademark Copy
REPORT on the termination of the action regarding copyright inringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tnS) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS, DENYING ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Clerks Notice
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 5/7/2014 is CONTINUED to 6/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 6/11/2014. The stipulation at Docket 52 is terminated as moot. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Stipulation
STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by SF Bay Area Independent Media Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Knox, Leila) (Filed on 4/22/2014) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 49 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by SF Bay Area Independent Media Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leila Knox in Support of Motion to Continue Case Management Conference, # 2 Proposed Order)(Knox, Leila) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
  • Attachment 1 Declaration of Leila Knox in Support of Motion to Continue Case Management Confe
  • Attachment 2 Proposed Order
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Transcript Order
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Motion to Continue
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Stipulation and Order
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Stipulation
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Transcript Order
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Order
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Proposed Order
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Declaration in Support
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Motion to Dismiss
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Patent/Trademark Copy
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Motion to Dismiss
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Motion for Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/1/2013, Entered: 12/1/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Case Management Statement
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Motion Hearing
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Certificate Of Service.
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Declaration in Opposition
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Opposition/Response to Motion
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Reply to Opposition/Response
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Motion to Strike
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Declaration in Opposition
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Opposition/Response to Motion
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Motion to Dismiss
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Show Cause Hearing - Non Evidentiary
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013 Stipulation
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Certificate Of Service.
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Order to Show Cause
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 7/24/2013 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 at 2:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Defendants Cernio Technology Cooperative, Layer42.net, Inc. & SF Bay Area Independent Media Center. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Damages & Injunctive Relief: (1) Infringement of Copyright, (2) Defamation, and (3) Libel, and Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued]against Cernio Technology Cooperative, Layer42.net, Inc. & SF Bay Area Independent Media Center, [Filing Fee: $350.00, receipt number 34611085371]Filed by Dionne Choyce. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 206 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?