District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit United States Supreme Court

CLS Bank International v. Alice Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 11-1301

Tags
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 11:44 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alice Corporation, Pty Ltd., Defendant-Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine L. Trela +1 312 853 7000 ctrela@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Sokohl +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 rsokohl@skgf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley Edward Fisher +1 202 434 5289 sfisher@wc.com
Space Bruce Roger Genderson +1 202 434 5999 +1 202 434 5029 bgenderson@wc.com
Space David Milton Krinsky +1 202 434 5338 +1 202 434 5029 dkrinsky@wc.com
Space Adam L Perlman +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 aperlman@wc.com
Space Ryan T. Scarborough +1 202 434 5173 +1 202 434 5029 rscarborough@wc.com
No Logo American Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GERO MCCLELLAN

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Robin Selinger +1 214 272 0957 +1 214 296 0246 jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey I.D. Lewis +1 212 336 2549 +1 212 336 2544 jidlewis@pbwt.com
No Logo Bakul Banerjee, Ph.d., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Greenspoon +1 312 431 3800 +1 312 551 9501 rpg@fg-law.com
No Logo Bancorp Services, LLC, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
Space Ian Shelton +1 213 443 3000 ianshelton@quinnemanuel.com
Space Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Bgc Partners, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF GARY A ROSEN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY ALLEN ROSEN , +1 215 972 0600 +1 215 972 6006 grosen@logarpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID F. BOUNDY
No Logo British Airways Plc, Amicus Curiae
Unknown Role, Usair Group, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
No Logo Bsa I The Software Alliance, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Whitfield Hughes +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 5347 phughes@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald, LP, Amicus Curiae
Unknown Role, Espeed, Inc.
Unknown Role, Newmark Group, Inc.
Unknown Role, Lutnick, Howard W.

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF GARY A ROSEN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY ALLEN ROSEN , +1 215 972 0600 +1 215 972 6006 grosen@logarpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID F. BOUNDY
No Logo Computer & Communications Industry Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Computer & Communications Industry Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Christian Schruers +1 202 783 0070 +1 202 783 0534 mschruers@ccianet.org
No Logo Conejo Valley Bar Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Alexander Goldstein +1 305 390 2341 +1 850 230 1355 markgoldstein98@yahoo.com
Space Jonathan Parker Pearce
Space Meenakshi Kala Sarvaiya

Toggle Switch Represented by Netzero, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven C. Sereboff
No Logo Crutchfield Corporation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com
No Logo Dale R. Cook, Esq., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Searete LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DALE R. COOK
No Logo Eharmony, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie P. Samuels +1 415 436 9993 julie@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Barclay +1 650 853 1711 +1 650 853 1712 mbarclay@yahoo.com
Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daryl Joseffer +1 202 626 9252 +1 202 626 3737 djoseffer@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam M. Conrad aconrad@kslaw.com
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Amicus Curiae
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam M. Conrad aconrad@kslaw.com
Space Daryl Joseffer +1 202 626 9252 +1 202 626 3737 djoseffer@kslaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Law Association Of Chicago, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles W. Shifley +1 312 463 5000 +7151 715 715 1234 cshifley@bannerwitcoff.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Owners Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by 3M Innovative Properties Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin H Rhodes +1 651 736 4533 +1 651 737 2948 krhodes@mmm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Caterpillar Tractor Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD F. PHILLIPS

Toggle Switch Represented by Intellectual Property Owners Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert Clare Wamsley +1 202 507 4500 +1 202 507 4500 rmuthig@ipo.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Leonard Graff +1 212 318 6019 +1 212 230 7860 glgraff@graffadr.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KENNETH R. CORSELLO
Space MANNY W. SCHECTER

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 pclement@bancroftpllc.com
Space David Zachary Hudson +1 202 640 6528 zhudson@bancroftpllc.com
No Logo Internet Retailers, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by hakens.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JACK E. HAKEN ip@hakens.us

Toggle Switch Represented by philips.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Fuerch michael.fuerch@philips.com
Space Paul Im paul.im@philips.com
Space David L. Schreiber david.schreiber@philips.com
No Logo L. L. Bean, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com
No Logo Lee A. Hollaar, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER K. TRZYNA
LinkedIn Corporation LinkedIn Corporation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
No Logo New York Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kasdan +1 212 336 8030 +1 212 335 8001 mkasdan@arelaw.com
Space Anthony F. Locicero +1 212 336 8000 +3368 336 336 8001 alocicero@arelaw.com
Space Charles Robert Macedo +1 212 336 8074 +1 212 336 8001 cmacedo@arelaw.com
No Logo Newegg, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com
Overstock.com, Inc. Overstock.com, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com
No Logo Peter K. Trzyna, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER K. TRZYNA
No Logo Presidio International, Inc., Dba A/x Armani Exchange, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
Space Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
Space David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com
No Logo Public Knowledge, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie P. Samuels +1 415 436 9993 julie@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Barclay +1 650 853 1711 +1 650 853 1712 mbarclay@yahoo.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam M. Conrad aconrad@kslaw.com
Space Daryl Joseffer +1 202 626 9252 +1 202 626 3737 djoseffer@kslaw.com
SAP America, Inc. SAP America, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
No Logo Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft Mbh, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Sughrue Mion, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael R. Dzwonczyk +1 202 857 3233 +1 202 293 7860 mdzwonczyk@sughrue.com
No Logo Stephen R. Stites, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Stites
No Logo Telecommunication Systems, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Greenspoon +1 312 431 3800 +1 312 551 9501 rpg@fg-law.com
No Logo The Clearing House Association L.l.c., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan M. Davies +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 susan.davies@kirkland.com
Space Liam Patrick Hardy +1 202 879 5000 liam.hardy@kirkland.com
No Logo The Juhasz Law Firm, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by The Juhasz Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Robert Juhasz +1 713 260 9651 pjuhasz@patenthorizon.com
No Logo Trading Technologies International, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Trading Technologies International, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven F. Borsand +1 312 476 1000 steve.borsand@tradingtechnologies.com
No Logo Travelocity.com LP, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
Twitter, Inc. Twitter, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam M. Conrad aconrad@kslaw.com
Space Daryl Joseffer +1 202 626 9252 +1 202 626 3737 djoseffer@kslaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS W. KRAUSE

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Freeman +1 202 514 5714 +1 202 514 9405 mark.freeman2@usdoj.gov
Space Scott R. McIntosh scott.mcintosh@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Patent and Trademark Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan K. Kelley nathan.kelley@uspto.gov
Space Bernard J. Knight Bernard.Knight@uspto.gov
Space Scott Weidenfeller scott.weidenfeller@uspto.gov
No Logo University of New Hampshire School of Law, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin Pierce Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Jeffrey Hawley +1 603 228 1541 +1 603 228 1074 jhawley@piercelaw.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space P.A., ANN M. MCCRACKIN
Yelp! Inc. Yelp! Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
No Logo CLS Bank International, Plaintiff-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian M Buroker +1 202 955 8541 +1 202 530 4200 bburoker@gibsondunn.com
Space Alexander Norman Harris +1 202 530 9685 aharris@gibsondunn.com
Space Michael Murray mmurray@gibsondunn.com
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
Space Michael Anthony Valek +1 214 698 3369 +1 214 571 2916 mvalek@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Cls Services Ltd., Counterclaim Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian M Buroker +1 202 955 8541 +1 202 530 4200 bburoker@gibsondunn.com
Space Alexander Norman Harris +1 202 530 9685 aharris@gibsondunn.com
Space Michael Murray mmurray@gibsondunn.com
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
Space Michael Anthony Valek +1 214 698 3369 +1 214 571 2916 mvalek@gibsondunn.com
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Case Type Civil Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=07-CV-974
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=07-CV-974
  Entries (253) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130106370 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies, International, Inc.. [56623] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [209]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130106249 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
    TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C.. Title: Brief of Bancorp Services, LLC as amicus curiae on rehearing enbanc in support of Alice Corporation.. [56555] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [205]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130105511 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
      TENDERED from Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law. [56103] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [201]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130105488 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
        TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook, Esq.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook. [56089] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [199]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130102354 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
          TENDERED from Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Internet Retailers in support of neither party.. [54365] This brief has been rejected. See doc no.[176]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 013097998 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
            TENDERED from Amici Curiae Lee A. Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna. Title: Brief of Professor Lee Hollar and Peter K. Trzyna as Amicus Curiae. [52089] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [101]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 013096006 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
              BRIEF FILED for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. [27]. Title: Brief of CLS Bank International, et al. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 58. Service: 08/26/2011 by US mail. [51061] This brief has been replaced.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 013095999 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                TENDERED from Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Title: Brief of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank International, et al.. [51057] This brief has been replaced.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                  Appellate record (copies of docket entries; extra copies of briefs) returned from the Supreme Court of the United States.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                    Certified judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States issued on 07/21/2014 for 13-298. [169050]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                      Petition for writ of Certiorari filed on 09/04/2013 in the Supreme Court of the United States. Supreme Court #: 13-298, Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. v. CLS Bank International, et al.
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                        Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States of an extension of time, until September 6, 2013, to file a petition for a writ of certiorari.
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                          Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Service: 06/17/2013 by clerk. [86402]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                            ERRATA to the Precedential Per Curiam Opinion Doc No.: [247]. Service: 05/13/2013 by clerk. [77142]
                              LREF
                              Blank 247 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Affirmed. (Precedential Per Curiam Opinion). (For the Court: Rader,Chief Judge; Newman,Circuit Judge; Lourie,Circuit Judge; Linn,Circuit Judge; Dyk,Circuit Judge; Prost,Circuit Judge; Moore,Circuit Judge; O'Malley,Circuit Judge; Reyna,Circuit Judge and Wallach,Circuit Judge). LOURIE concurring, RADER concurring-in-part and dissenting-in-part, MOORE dissenting-in-part, NEWMAN concurring-in-part and dissenting-in-part, LINN dissenting. [76451]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                Clerk's Notice to Parties Regarding Electronic Filing: This case has been assigned to the court's CMECF system. All further filings in this appeal must be made using ECF). To: Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. and Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd., and Amici Curiae AIPLA, BGC Partners, Inc., BSA I The Software Alliance, Bancorp Services, L.L.C., Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D., British Airways PLC, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., The Clearing House Association L.L.C., Computer & Communications Industry Association, Conejo Valley Bar Association, Dale R. Cook, Esq., Crutchfield Corporation, Dell Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lee A. Hollaar, Homeaway, Inc., Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago, Intellectual Property Owners Association, IBM, Internet Retailers, Intuit Inc., The Juhasz Law Firm, Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., L.L. Bean, Inc., Linkedin Corporation, NYIPLA, Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Presidio International, Inc., Public Knowledge, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft MBH, Stephen R. Stites, Telecommunication Systems, Inc., The Financial Services Roundtable, Trading Technologies International, Inc., Travelocity.com LP, Peter K. Trzyna, Twitter, Inc., US, University of New Hampshire School of Law, Yelp! Inc., Zynga Inc., eHarmony, Inc.. Service: 03/25/2013 by clerk. [61447]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                  Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by
                                  Mr. Nathan K. Kelley for US, Adam Lawrence Perlman for Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. and Mr. Mark Andrew Perry for CLS Services. Ltd. and CLS Bank International.
                                  Panel: Rader, Newman, Lourie, Linn, Dyk, Prost, Moore, O'Malley, Reyna and Wallach. [61437]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Bancorp Services, L.L.C. [243]. Title: Brief of Bancorp Services, LLC as Amicus Curiae on Rehearing En Banc in Support of Alice Corporation, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 26. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [61105]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                      TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C.. Title: Brief of Bancorp Services, LLC as Amicus Curiae on Rehearing En Banc in Support of Alice Corporation. [61102]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                        BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for University of New Hampshire School of Law [241]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law Intellectual Property, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 21. Service: 01/30/2013 by US mail. [56866]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                          TENDERED from Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law Intellectual Property. [56861]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                            ORDER filed denying [229] motion to allow argument filed by The Clearing House Association L.L.C. and The Financial Services Roundtable. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service: 02/01/2013 by clerk. [56847]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                              Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law. Service: 01/30/2013 by US mail. [56846]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 238 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                Entry of appearance for Joseph Jeffrey Hawley as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law. Service: 01/24/2013 by US mail. [56808]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Entry of appearance for Ann M. McCrackin as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law. Service: 01/24/2013 by US mail. [56807]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEF FILED for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. [231]. Title: En Banc Reply Brief for CLS Bank International, et al. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 01/25/2013 by US mail. [56803]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                      BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Trading Technologies International, Inc. [234]. Title: Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc. on Rehearing En Banc in Support of Defendant-Appellant Alice Corporation PTY, Ltd., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 11. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail.. [56800]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Title: Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc. on Rehearing En Banc in Support of Defendant-Appellant Alice Corporation PTY, Ltd.. [56798]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Dale R. Cook, Esq. [232]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook, Pro Se, On Rehearing En Banc in Support of Respondent, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 20. Service: 01/16/2013 by US mail. [56793]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                            TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook, Esq.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook, Pro Se, On Rehearing En Banc in Support of Respondent. [56791]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                              TENDERED from Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Title: En Banc Reply Brief of CLS Bank International, et al.. [56789]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Response to oral argument order from the Amicus Curiae US designating Nathan Kelley as arguing attorney. Service: 01/30/2013 by US mail. [56786]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION of Amici Curiae The Clearing House Association L.L.C. and The Financial Services Roundtable to allow argument. Service: 01/30/2013 by US mail. [56778]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Entry of appearance for Dale R. Cook as pro se for Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook, Esq.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56753]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Entry of appearance for Gary A. Rosen as of counsel for Amici Curiae BGC Partners, Inc. and Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56752]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Entry of appearance for David E. Boundy as principal counsel for Amici Curiae BGC Partners, Inc. and Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56751]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae BGC Partners, Inc. and Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56749]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae AIPLA. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56672]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Entry of appearance for Jeffrey I.D. Lewis as of counsel for Amicus Curiae AIPLA. Service: 01/16/2013 by US mail. [56671]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Entry of appearance for Gero McClellan as of counsel for Amicus Curiae AIPLA. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56669]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Jerry R. Selinger as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae AIPLA. Service: 01/16/2013 by US mail. [56668]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D. and Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. Service: 01/18/2013 by US mail. [56663]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Robert P. Greenspoon as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D. and Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. Service: 01/18/2013 by US mail. [56661]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56656]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Steven F. Borsand as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56653]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Ian S. Shelton as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56647]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56644]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Charles K. Verhoeven as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56643]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C.. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56641]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for BGC Partners, Inc. [210]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae BGC Partners, Inc. and Cantor Fitzgerald, LP. [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 0. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56631]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      TENDERED from Amicus Curiae BGC Partners, Inc.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae BGC Parters, Inc. and Cantor Fitzgerald, LP. [56626]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc., Brief of Amicus Curiae Trading Technologies International, Inc. [208], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [56624]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER filed granting motion to allow argument [206] filed by Amicus Curiae US. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service: 01/29/2013 by clerk. [56575]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION of Amicus Curiae US to allow argument. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/18/2013 by US mail. [56565]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amicus Curiae Bancorp Services, L.L.C., Brief of Bancorp Services, LLC as amicus curiae on rehearing enbanc in support of Alice Corporation. [204], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [56556]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                This entry was made in error and has been removed from the docket.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for AIPLA [202]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae American Intellectual Property Law Association in Support of Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 18. Service: 01/17/2013 by US mail. [56306]--[Edited 03/25/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Amicus Curiae AIPLA. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The American Intellectual Property Law Association. [56207]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amicus Curiae University of New Hampshire School of Law, Brief of Amicus Curiae for University of New Hampshire School of Law. [200], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [56106]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amicus Curiae Dale R. Cook, Esq., Amicus Brief of Dale R. Cook [198], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [56091]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D. and Telecommunication Systems, Inc. [196]. Title: Brief of Amicus Cuiae Telecommuniccation Systems, Inc. and Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 27. Service: 01/16/2013 by US mail. [56087]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            TENDERED from Amici Curiae Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D. and Telecommunication Systems, Inc.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Telecommunication Systems, Inc. and Bakul Banerjee, Ph.D.. [56082]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Robert Sokohl as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 01/10/2013 by US mail. [54534]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. [193]. Title: En Banc Response Brief of Defendant-Appellant Alice Corporation Pty, Ltd. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 57. Service: 01/10/2013 by US mail. [54526]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Title: En Banc Response Brief of Defendant-Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. [54515]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Response to oral argument order from the Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. designating Mark A. Perry as arguing attorney. Service: 12/19/2012 by US mail. [54511]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. designating Adam L. Perlman as arguing attorney. Service: 12/21/2012 by US mail. [54509]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Amended Entry of appearance for Thomas W. Krause as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Director of the Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 12/14/2012 by US mail. [54488]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Corrected Entry of appearance for Scott C. Weidenfeller as of counsel for Amicus Curiae United States. Service: 12/14/2012 by US mail. [54423]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Corrected Entry of appearance for Nathan K. Kelley as of counsel for Amicus Curiae United States. Service: 12/14/2012 by US mail. [54422]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Corrected Entry of appearance for Bernard J. Knight as of counsel for Amicus Curiae United States. Service: 12/14/2012 by US mail. [54421]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Corrected Entry of appearance for Raymond T. Chen as of counsel for Amicus Curiae United States. Service: 12/14/2012 by US mail. [54419]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for United States. [184]. Title: Brief for the United States as Amicus Curiae, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 26. Service: 12/14/2012 by US mail. [54413]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Amicus Curiae United States. Title: Brief for the United States as Amicus Curiae. [54412]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Scott C. Weidenfeller as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Director of the Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 12/12/2012 by US mail. [54409]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Raymond T. Chen as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Director of the Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 12/12/2012 by US mail. [54407]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Thomas W. Krause as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Director of the Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 12/12/2012 by US mail. [54404]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Bernard J. Knight as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Director of the Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 12/13/2012 by US mail. [54395]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Nathan K. Kelly as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Director of the Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 12/13/2012 by US mail. [54392]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc. [177]. Title: Amici Curiae Internet Retailers Corrected brief in support of neither party [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 23. Service: 12/11/2012 by US mail. [54385]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc.. Title: Amici Curiae Internet Retailers Corrected brief in support of neither party. [54382]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc., Brief of Amicus Curiae Internet Retailers in support of neither party. [175], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [54372]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Scott R. Mcintosh as of counsel for Amicus Curiae US. Service: 11/29/2012 by US mail. [54335]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Mark R. Freeman as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae US. Service: 11/29/2012 by US mail. [54333]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae The Juhasz Law Firm. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [54327]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for David Swetnam-Burland as of counsel for Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc.. Service: 11/30/2012 by US mail. [54319]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Stacy O. Stitham as of counsel for Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc.. Service: 11/30/2012 by US mail. [54317]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Peter J.Brann as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, Internet Retailers, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc.. Service: 11/30/2012 by US mail. [54314]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Crutchfield Corporation, L.L. Bean, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc. and Presidio International, Inc.. Service: 12/03/2012 by US mail. [52677]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for Alexander Norman Harris as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 11/27/2012 by US mail. [52671]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Certificate of Interest for the Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 11/26/2012 by US mail. [52667]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Lee A. Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna [164]. Title: Corrected Brief of Lee Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 12/10/2012 by US mail.[52603]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          TENDERED from Amici Curiae Lee A. Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna. Title: Corrected Brief of Lee Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna. [52601]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for The Clearing House Association L.L.C. and The Financial Services Roundtable. [162]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The Clearing House Association LLC. and The Financial Services Roundtable in support of Petitioners [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 22. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52597]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 162 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              TENDERED from Amicus Curiae The Clearing House Association L.L.C. and The Financial Services Roundtable. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The Clearing House Association LLC. and The Financial Services Roundtable in support of Petitioners [52595]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for BSA I The Software Alliance [160]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae BSA The Software Alliance, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 26. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52592]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Amicus Curiae BSA I The Software Alliance. Title: Brief for BSA The Software Allliance. [52587]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for IBM [158]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae International Business Machines Corporation on Rehearing En Banc in Support of Neither Party, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail.[52584]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TENDERED from Amicus Curiae IBM. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae International Business Machines Corporation on Rehearing En Banc in Support of Neither Party. [52582]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Conejo Valley Bar Association [156]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 18. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52581]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association. [52571]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Lee A. Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna, Esq. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52570]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Intellectual Property Owners Association [153]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 21. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52564]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. [52563]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Google Inc., Dell Inc., Facebook, Inc., Homeaway, Inc., Intuit Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., and Zynga Inc. [151]. Title: Brief of Amici Curiae Google Inc., Dell Inc., Facebook, Inc., Homeaway, Inc., Intuit Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., and Zynga Inc. in support of Petitioners. [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52562]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Google Inc., Dell Inc., Facebook, Inc., Homeaway, Inc., Intuit Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., and Zynga Inc. Title: Brief of Amici Curiae Google Inc., Dell Inc., Facebook, Inc., Homeaway, Inc., Intuit Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., and Zynga Inc. in support of Petitioners. [52559]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Manny W. Schecter as of counsel for Amicus Curiae IBM. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52524]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Kenneth R. Corsello as of counsel for Amicus Curiae IBM. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52523]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for D. Zachary Hudson as of counsel for Amicus Curiae IBM. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52521]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae IBM. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52519]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Paul D. Clement as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae IBM. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52485]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae The Clearing House Association L.L.C. and Financial Services Roundtable. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52482]--[Edited 03/25/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Susan M. Davies as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae The Clearing House Association L.L.C.. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52479]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for Liam P. Hardy as of counsel for Amicus Curiae The Clearing House Association L.L.C.. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52478]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for George L. Graff as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52477]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Richard F. Phillips as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52476]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Kevin H. Rhodes as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52472]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Herbert C. Wamsley as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52471]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Owners Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52468]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Mark A. Goldstein as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52466]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Steven C. Sereboff as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52465]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for M. Kala Sarvaiya as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52464]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Jonathan Pearce as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Conejo Valley Bar Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52461]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Michael R. Dzwonczyk as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft MBH. Service: 12/06/2012 by US mail. [52460]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Paul W. Hughs as of counsel for Amicus Curiae BSA I The Software Alliance. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52457]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Andrew J. Pincus as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae BSA I The Software Alliance. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52456]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae BSA I The Software Alliance. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52455]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Computer & Communications Industry Association [128]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 17. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. [52444]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP, Twitter, Inc., Yelp! Inc. and eHarmony, Inc. [126]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae British Airways Plc, et al. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 9. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52438]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TENDERED from Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP, Twitter, Inc., Yelp! Inc. and eHarmony, Inc.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae British Airways Plc, et al.. [52436]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for NYIPLA [124]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae New York Intellectual Property Law Association, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 16. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail.. [52426]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TENDERED from Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae New York Intellectual Property Law Association. [52421]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge [122]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundationtion and Public Knowledge in support of appellee's and remand , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 22. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52325]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge in support of Appellees and Remand. [52323]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by CC]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52320]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Matthew Schruers as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52317]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae British Airways PLC., eHarmony, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corp., SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP., Twitter, Inc., and Yelp Inc. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52316]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for John D. Vandenberg as principal counsel for Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP, Twitter, Inc., Yelp! Inc. and eHarmony, Inc.. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52255]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Anthony F. Lo Cicero as of counsel for Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. Service: 12/06/2012 by US mail. [52246]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Charles R. Macedo as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. Service: 12/06/2012 by US mail. [52242]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Michael J.Kasdan as of counsel for Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. Service: 12/06/2012 by US mail. [52228]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae NYIPLA. Service: 12/06/2012 by US mail. [52210]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Michael Barclay as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. Service: 12/07/2012 by US mail. [52196]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft MBH [111]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 14. Service: 12/06/2012 by US mail. [52158]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by CC]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft MBH. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH.. [52157]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Peter K. Trzyna as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Lee A. Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna. Service: 11/30/2012 by US mail. [52154]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Paul R. Juhasz as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae The Juhasz Law Firm. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [52149]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Charles W. Shifley as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [52148]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago [106]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [52140]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago. [52135]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for The Juhasz Law Firm [104]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The Juhasz Law Firm, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 15. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [52133]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Amicus Curiae The Juhasz Law Firm. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae The Juhasz Law Firm. [52132]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [52131]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion to extend time to file amicus brief [90] filed by Amicus Curiae US.. Service: 12/04/2012 by US mail. [52128]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Amici Curiae Lee A. Hollaar and Peter K. Trzyna, Brief of Professor Lee Hollar and Peter K. Trzyna as Amicus Curiae [100], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [52090]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF FILED for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. [98]. Title: Principal En Banc Brief for CLS Bank International and CLS Services, Ltd., [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 60. Service: 11/30/2012 by US mail.[52088]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TENDERED from Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Title: Principal En Banc Brief for CLS Bank International and CLS Services, Ltd.. [52087]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.. Service: 11/27/2012 by US mail. [52073]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Paul Im as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.. Service: 11/26/2012 by US mail. [52072]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Michael Fuerch as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.. Service: 11/26/2012 by US mail. [52070]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for David Schreiber as of counsel for Amicus Curiae Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.. Service: 11/28/2012 by US mail. [52067]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Jack E. Haken as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.. Service: 11/27/2012 by US mail. [52066]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. [91]. Title: Brief of Koninklijke Phillips Electronics NV, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 14. Service: 11/29/2012 by US mail. [52058]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.. Title: Brief of Koninklijke Phillips Electronics NV. [52054]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Amicus Curiae US to extend the time to file the amicus curiae brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/29/2012 by US mail. [52035]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Michael Valek as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 11/21/2012 by US mail. [52008]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Stephen R. Stites [87]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 5. Service: 11/01/2012 by US mail. [52004]--[Edited 03/22/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites. [51994]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for Stephen R. Stites as pro se for Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites. Service: 11/01/2012 by US mail. [51980]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Stephen R. Stites , Brief of Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites on En Banc Rehearing [84], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing.. [51965]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Stephen R. Stites on En Banc. [51962] This brief has been rejected. See doc no. [85]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filed denying as moot [76] motion to file a response/reply filed by CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service: 10/19/2012 by clerk. [51937]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CALENDARING issued. Panel: 1302A. Calendar date/location: Friday, 02/08/2013 Washington, D.C. Courtroom 201. [51934]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER filed granting motion to extend briefing schedule [79] filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service: 10/17/2012 by clerk. [51807]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION of Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. to extend briefing schedule for en banc briefs. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/12/2012 by US mail. [51806]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER filed granting petition for en banc rehearing [52] filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.; vacating the the court's opinion of July 9, 2012; reopening appeal; setting briefing schedule; scheduling oral argument. By: En Banc (Per Curiam). Service: 10/09/2012 by clerk. [51800]--[Edited 03/25/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY of Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. to response filed by Appellant in 11-1301 , Doc. No [75]. Service: 09/28/2012 by US mail. [51793] Leave to file was denied. See Doc. No. [83]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. for leave to file a response/reply to [75] response. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 09/28/2012 by US mail. [51792]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE of Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. to the petition for en banc rehearing [52] filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. in 11-1301. Service: 09/20/2012 by US mail. [51781]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc. and Twitter, Inc. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51776]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Adam M. Conrad as of counsel for Amici Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc. and Twitter, Inc.. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51774]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Daryl L. Joseffer as principal counsel for Amici Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc. and Twitter, Inc.. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51772]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Julie P. Samuels as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. Service: 09/06/2012 by US mail. [51771]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interest for the Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. Service: 09/06/2012 by US mail. [51767]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc. and Twitter, Inc. [59]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Red Hat, Inc., and Twitter Inc. in support of petitioners, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51764]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge [61]. Title: Brief of Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge in Support of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank International's and Counterclaim-Defendant Appellee CLS Services, Ltd.'s Motion for Rehearing En Banc, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 18. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51758]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [60] filed by Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 09/10/2012 by clerk. [51754]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [58] filed by Amici Curiae Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Google Inc. and Twitter, Inc.. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 09/10/2012 by clerk. [51753]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interest for the Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP and eHarmony, Inc.. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51751]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for John D. Vandenberg as principal counsel for Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP and eHarmony, Inc.. Service: 09/04/2012 by US mail. [51750]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP and eHarmony, Inc. [57]. Title: Brief for Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, eHarmony, Inc., Linkedin Corp., SAP America, Inc., and Travelocity.com LP in Support of Rehearing En Banc (in support of neither party), [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 10. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51748]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER filed granting motion to file amicus brief on en banc or rehearing petition [56] filed by Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, SAP America, Inc., Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Travelocity.com LP and eHarmony, Inc.. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 09/07/2012 by clerk. [51743]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Title: Brief of Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge in Support of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank International's and Counterclaim-Defendant Appellee CLS Services, Ltd.'s Motion for Rehearing En Banc. [51740]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge for leave to file amicus brief in support of CLS Bank International and CLS Services Ltd. on petition for en banc rehearing [52]. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51739]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TENDERED from Amici Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc. and Twitter, Inc.. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Co., Red Hat, Inc., and Twitter Inc. in support of petitioners. [51737]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of Amici Curiae Google Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc. and Twitter, Inc. for leave to file amicus brief in support of petitioner on petition for en banc rehearing [52]. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51734]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TENDERED from Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP and eHarmony, Inc. Title: Brief for Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, eHarmony, Inc., Linkedin Corp., SAP America, Inc., and Travelocity.com LP in Support of Rehearing En Banc (in support of neither party). [51732]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION of Amici Curiae British Airways PLC, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Travelocity.com LP and eHarmony, Inc. for leave to file amicus brief in support of neither party on petition for en banc rehearing [52]. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/05/2012 by US mail. [51731]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file a response to en banc/rehearing petition [54] filed by Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 08/29/2012 by clerk. [51729]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION of Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. to extend the time to file a response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc until. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 08/27/2012 by US mail. [51728]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    The court invites a response from Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. to the petition for en banc rehearing filed by Appellees in 11-1301. Service: 08/23/2012 by clerk [51727]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Petition for en banc rehearing filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 08/22/2012 by US mail. [51722]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing [50] filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd... Petitioner for Rehearing En Banc due before August 22, 2012.. By: Merits Panel. Service: 07/30/2012 by clerk. [51308]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. to extend the time to file a Petition for Hearing En Banc [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/26/2012 by US mail. [51305]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Certificate of Interest for the Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 07/24/2012 by US mail. [51296]--[Edited 02/15/2013 by CC]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Mark A. Perry as principal counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 07/24/2012 by US mail. [51295]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filed granting motion to withdraw attorneys [46] filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. By: Merits Panel. Service: 07/27/2012 by clerk. [51285]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION of Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. to withdraw counsel Steven J. Glassman. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/25/2012 by US mail. [51278]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice to Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. (Rejected EOA: Mark A. Perry).. Service: 07/18/2012 by US mail. [51273]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Brian Buroker as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 07/18/2012 by US mail. [51271]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Michael Murray as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 07/18/2012 by US mail. [51269]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The judgment or decision is: Reversed. (Precedential Opinion). (For the Court: Linn,Circuit Judge; Prost,Circuit Judge and O'Malley,Circuit Judge). Dissenting opinion by Judge Prost. [51262] [THIS OPINION VACATED by the court's order filed 10/9/12]--[Edited 03/25/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE of Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. to the supplemental authority [40] filed by Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. in 11-1301. Service: 04/02/2012 by Hand. [51232]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 03/28/2012 by US mail. [51229]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adam Lawrence Perlman for Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. and Steven J. Glassman for CLS Services. Ltd. and CLS Bank International.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Panel: Linn, Prost and O'Malley. [51183]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. designating Adam L. Perlman as arguing attorney. Service: 12/12/2011 by US mail. [51182]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to oral argument order from the Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. designating Steven J. Glassman as arguing attorney. Service: 11/30/2011 by US mail. [51181]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CALENDARING issued. Panel: 1201L. Calendar date/location: Friday, 01/13/2012 Washington, D.C. Courtroom 402. [51180]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX FILED for Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. [34]. Title: Joint Appendix, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 837. Service: 09/23/2011 by US mail. [51094]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TENDERED from Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Title: Joint Appendix. [51092]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. [32]. Title: Reply Brief of Appellant Alice Corporation PTY, Ltd. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 09/16/2011 by US mail. [51091]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TENDERED from Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Title: Reply Brief of Appellant Alice Corporation PTY Ltd.. [51089]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pursuant to the notice of correction and the filing of a replacement brief, the previously filed brief filed by Appellees CLS Bank International, CLS Services. Ltd. [28] [27] is withdrawn. [51901]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. [30]. Title: Corrected Brief of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank International, et al. , [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 58. Service: 09/09/2011 by US mail. [51071]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Title: Corrected Brief of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank International, et al.. [51069]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [27] for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. Service: 09/09/2011 by US mail. [51065]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd., Brief of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank International, et al. [25], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. [51055]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TENDERED from Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Title: Brief of Plaintiff-Appellee CLS Bank Inernational, et al.. [51053] This brief has been rejected. See Doc. No. [26]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for William A. Tanenbaum as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 08/12/2011 by US mail. [51049]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Constantine L. Trela as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 06/24/2011 by US mail. [51046]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. [21]. Title: Brief of Appellant, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 51. Service: 06/24/2011 by US mail. [51045]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Title: Brief of Appellant. [51033]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion to set briefing schedule [19] filed by Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. and Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Alice's brief due June 24, 2011 CLS's brief due August 22, 2011 Alice's reply brief due September 16, 2011.. Service: 05/19/2011 by clerk. [50988]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION of Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. and Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. to revise briefing schedule. Service: 05/13/2011 by US mail. [50987]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interest for the Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50985]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docketing Statement for the Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50983]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for David O. Bickart as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50974]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Stephen J. Elliott as of counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50971]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Steven J. Glassman as principal counsel for Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50968]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Notice to Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. (Rejected EOA Stephen J. Elliott).. Service: 04/22/2011 by clerk. [50962]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice to Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. (Rejected EOA David O Bickart).. Service: 04/22/2011 by clerk. [50959]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice to Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. (Rejected Docketing Statement Appellee, CLS Bank International, et al. ).. Service: 04/22/2011 by clerk. [50952]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice to Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. (Rejected COI, CLS Bank International, et al.).. Service: 04/22/2011 by clerk. [50947]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice to Appellees CLS Bank International and CLS Services. Ltd. (Rejected EOA, Steven J. Glassman).. Service: 04/22/2011 by clerk. [50946]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docketing Statement for the Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50944]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50943]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for David M. Krinsky as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50940]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Stanley E. Fisher as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50922]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for Bruce R. Genderson as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50921]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Adam L. Perlman as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50916]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Ryan T. Scarborough as of counsel for Appellant Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd.. Service: 04/21/2011 by US mail. [50914]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by AT]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appeal docketed. Received: 04/06/2011. [50900].
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 690 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?