Roger Jaldin v. ReconTrust Company, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1214

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 10:02 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404494623 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/17/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999131545] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
    SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari denied. 05/19/2014 [13-1214] (ABW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
      SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 12/23/2013. 13-1054. [13-1214] (ABW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
        Mandate issued referencing: [28] Unpublished per curiam Opinion, [29] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. [13-1214] (ALC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
          COURT ORDER filed [999199506] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [30]. Copies to all parties. [13-1214] (ALC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
            Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1). [13-1214] (ALC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
              PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: opn.u.sub. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Entered on Docket Date: 08/29/2013. [999183125] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [13-1214] (ALC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                  UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [999183121]. [13-1214] (ALC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                    BRIEF by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/19/2013. [999153915] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                      BRIEF by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/17/2013. [999131532] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                        LREF
                        Blank 20
                        BRIEF by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/17/2013. [999131532] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                          LREF
                          Blank 20
                          BRIEF by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/17/2013. [999131532] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                            LREF
                            Blank 20
                            BRIEF by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/17/2013. [999131532] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2013. Response Brief due 07/18/2013.[13-1214] (ALC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2013. Response Brief due 07/18/2013.[13-1214] (ALC)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2013. Response Brief due 07/18/2013.[13-1214] (ALC)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2013. Response Brief due 07/18/2013.[13-1214] (ALC)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                      BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2013. Response Brief due 07/18/2013.[13-1214] (ALC)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing and Opinion of Court on 11/9/2012 (in addition to previously ordered transcript of 01/18/2013 proceedings by Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin). Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defts./Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 06/10/2013. [13-1214] --[Docket Text Edited 04/17/2013 by ALC] (ALC)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                  Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                    Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                      Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                        Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                            OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                              OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                  OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                    OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                      OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                              Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Roger Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055048] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Janet Jaldin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055047] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A. for Rhonda Montgomery. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Rhonda Montgomery. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing, Opening Statements and Opinion of Court on 1/18/2013. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Plaintiffs/Appellants Roger Jaldin and Janet Jaldin. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Transcript due from Rhonda Montgomery, Official Court Reporter, on 05/07/2013. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adrien C. Pickard for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999064395] [13-1214] Adrien Pickard
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin. [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gregory Bryl for Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin.[999054821] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                              Designation of additional transcript pursuant to Rule 10(b)(3), FRAP by Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6
                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gregory Bryl for Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin.[999054821] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gregory Bryl for Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin.[999054821] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gregory Bryl for Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin.[999054821] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gregory Bryl for Janet Jaldin and Roger Jaldin.[999054821] [13-1214] Gregory Bryl
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054533] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054533] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054533] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054533] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054533] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of America, NA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054532] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1214] (LP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of America, NA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054532] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of America, NA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054532] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of America, NA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054532] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of America, NA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999054532] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joseph J. Patry for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999048344] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joseph J. Patry for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999048344] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joseph J. Patry for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999048344] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joseph J. Patry for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999048344] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joseph J. Patry for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company, N.A..[999048344] [13-1214] Joseph Patry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:12-cv-01117-AJT-JFA. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1214] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?