Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00315
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 9:25 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
v.
No Logo Happy Hotel Inc, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. Happy Hotel Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/7/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Happy Hotel Inc.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. Happy Hotel Inc served on 4/30/2013, answer due 5/21/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
          SUMMONS Issued as to Happy Hotel Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT against Happy Hotel, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4108203.), filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 112 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?